Depot: Dundee Tay Bridge
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Dundee Tay Bridge | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6372 | 08/1921 | ROD | on | 30/08/1924 | DEE | on | 15/07/1943 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6551 | on | 01/12/1928 | DEE | on | 20/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2741 | on | 12/07/1929 (New) | DEE | on | 01/08/1929 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2786 | on | 13/02/1930 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 17/02/1930 | DEE | on | 15/06/1947 | IPS | Ipswich |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2566 | on | 14/08/1924 | HAY | Haymarket (New) | on | 18/08/1930 | DEE | on | 07/02/1937 | EFD | Eastfield |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2567 | on | 14/08/1924 | HAY | Haymarket (New) | on | 18/08/1930 | DEE | on | 07/02/1937 | EFD | Eastfield |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2565 | on | 05/07/1928 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 06/10/1930 | DEE | on | 17/08/1931 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6582 | on | 15/01/1929 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 07/10/1930 | DEE | on | 29/07/1943 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6291 | on | 14/08/1924 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | on | 12/03/1931 | DEE | on | 03/08/1937 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6286 | on | 19/08/1924 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | on | 12/03/1931 | DEE | m/e | 09/1931 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2565 | on | 17/08/1931 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 01/12/1931 | DEE | on | 10/08/1935 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2734 | on | 30/10/1931 | EFD | Eastfield | on | 07/11/1933 | DEE | on | 15/07/1946 | CAR | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | 2002 | on | 09/06/1935 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 22/06/1935 | DEE | on | 10/09/1936 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | 2005 | on | 08/08/1936 (New) | DEE | on | 18/01/1943 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | 2003 | on | 13/06/1936 | HAY | Haymarket (New) | on | 04/09/1936 | DEE | on | 23/10/1942 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4775 | on | 28/11/1936 (New) | DEE | on | 23/12/1955 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2797 | on | 04/06/1930 | HAY | Haymarket (New) | on | 15/02/1937 | DEE | on | 20/11/1938 | EFD | Eastfield |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4800 | on | 01/04/1938 (New) | DEE | on | 26/10/1938 | NWE | New England | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4807 | on | 23/09/1938 (New) | DEE | m/e | 11/1939 | STM | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4809 | on | 11/10/1938 (New) | DEE | on | 23/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4811 | on | 28/10/1938 (New) | DEE | on | 19/10/1952 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4822 | on | 24/03/1939 (New) | DEE | on | 01/04/1939 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2563 | on | 19/07/1938 | STM | St Margarets | on | 12/01/1940 | DEE | on | 11/10/1940 | EFD | Eastfield |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 2796 | on | 19/07/1938 | EFD | Eastfield | on | 05/10/1940 | DEE | on | 14/12/1940 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3664 | on | 09/03/1942 (New) | DEE | on | 13/10/1958 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2556 | on | 04/12/1940 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 07/03/1943 | DEE | on | 24/04/1943 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3681 | on | 29/04/1943 (New) | DEE | on | 20/10/1958 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1863 | m/e | 06/1941 | EFD | Eastfield | m/e | 08/1943 | DEE | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2739 | m/e | 08/1940 | POL | Polmont | on | 18/08/1943 | DEE | on | 17/08/1959 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3685 | m/e | 07/1943 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | m/e | 10/1943 | DEE | on | 11/04/1945 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2979 | on | 17/04/1943 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 12/12/1943 | DEE | on | 15/06/1946 | CAR | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2980 | on | 17/04/1943 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 12/12/1943 | DEE | on | 15/06/1946 | CAR | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4815 | m/e | 05/1941 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 12/12/1943 | DEE | on | 08/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 3683 | on | 02/06/1943 | EFD | Eastfield (New) | on | 20/08/1945 | DEE | on | 13/10/1958 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4891 | on | 04/10/1941 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 13/10/1945 | DEE | on | 22/01/1959 | 64B | Haymarket |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4784 | on | 15/07/1946 | THJ | Thornton Junction | on | 04/11/1946 | DEE | on | 21/09/1947 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1101 | on | 28/11/1946 (New) | DEE | on | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1102 | on | 02/12/1946 (New) | DEE | on | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4822 | on | 25/11/1943 | STM | St Margarets | on | 30/04/1947 | DEE | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4786 | on | 20/08/1945 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | on | 18/06/1947 | DEE | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4790 | on | 20/08/1945 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | on | 28/09/1947 | DEE | on | 17/08/1959 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1263 | on | 03/12/1947 (New) | DEE | on | 19/02/1950 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 7461 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 7471 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 7483 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 20/04/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 7484 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 22/04/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 7486 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 22/04/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 7489 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 02/09/1955 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 7490 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 22/04/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 7491 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 02/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 7498 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 01/08/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 7499 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 02/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | 62409 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 29/10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | 2410 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | w/e | 03/12/1949 | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | 2412 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 62C | |||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 2418 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 2434 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | m/e | 05/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 2438 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 30/10/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 2485 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2713 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2718 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 2728 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65614 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | ||||||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65622 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | ||||||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4482 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4485 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4493 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | w/e | 03/12/1949 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4506 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | w/e | 01/10/1949 | STM | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4512 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | w/e | 01/10/1949 | STM | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4523 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | w/e | 01/10/1949 | STM | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4530 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 12/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5319 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 64F | Bathgate | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5328 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | m/e | 03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5330 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 64G | Hawick | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5333 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 29/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4537 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | w/e | 01/10/1949 | POL | Polmont | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4548 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | w/e | 29/05/1948 | PKD | Parkhead | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4575 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4587 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 08/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4593 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | w/e | 01/10/1949 | POL | Polmont | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4615 | S | 01/1936 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4619 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 09/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4620 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4627 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 14/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4631 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4634 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 64D | Carstairs | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 8446 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 30/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 8452 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 27/06/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 8455 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 14/05/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 8466 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 8100 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 28/09/1957 | 65E | Kipps | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 8107 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | on | 01/12/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 8108 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 8110 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 65A | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 8114 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | LOAN | |||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 8123 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 65E | Kipps | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1278 | on | 19/01/1948 (New) | DEE | on | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1293 | on | 27/02/1948 (New) | DEE | on | 17/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77456 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | DEE | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1007 | on | 15/05/1944 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 28/06/1948 | DEE | w/e | 03/07/1948 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1007 | on | 28/06/1948 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | w/e | 03/07/1948 | DEE | on | 25/07/1948 | HAY | Haymarket |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61292 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 25/07/1948 | DEE | on | 10/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 958 | on | 17/04/1943 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 12/12/1948 | DEE | w/e | 18/12/1948 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 958 | on | 12/12/1948 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | w/e | 18/12/1948 | DEE | on | 20/10/1958 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 7493 | on | 01/01/1948 | STM | St Margarets | w/e | 19/02/1949 | DEE | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60527 | on | 30/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 26/06/1949 | DEE | w/e | 02/07/1949 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60528 | on | 21/02/1948 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 26/06/1949 | DEE | w/e | 02/07/1949 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60527 | on | 26/06/1949 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | w/e | 02/07/1949 | DEE | on | 04/04/1960 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60528 | on | 26/06/1949 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | w/e | 02/07/1949 | DEE | on | 02/05/1960 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61147 | on | 22/04/1947 | KIT | Kittybrewster (New) | on | 03/07/1949 | DEE | w/e | 09/07/1949 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61147 | on | 03/07/1949 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | w/e | 09/07/1949 | DEE | on | 14/10/1951 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63017 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | DEE | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79306 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | DEE | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 67502 | on | 01/01/1948 | EFD | Eastfield | w/e | 01/10/1949 | DEE | on | 22/04/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60931 | on | 29/10/1944 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 08/01/1950 | DEE | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 62B | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45460 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 62B | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65309 | on | 01/01/1948 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 62B | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 64F | Bathgate |
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 62427 | on | 01/01/1948 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62B | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 62436 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62B | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | 62457 | on | 01/01/1948 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62B | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | 62466 | on | 01/01/1948 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62B | on | 10/09/1950 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61263 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 63A | Perth South | on | 13/03/1950 | 62B | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61263 | on | 13/03/1950 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 62B | on | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64598 | on | 01/01/1948 | THJ | Thornton Junction | on | 04/06/1950 | 62B | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64598 | on | 04/06/1950 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 62B | on | 06/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61402 | on | 27/04/1950 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | on | 02/07/1950 | 62B | on | 08/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61403 | on | 27/04/1950 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | on | 02/07/1950 | 62B | on | 07/03/1955 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | G4 | 0-4-4T | 8108 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 60A | Inverness | on | 09/10/1950 | 62B | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 8108 | on | 01/01/1948 | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 62B | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60822 | on | 09/12/1937 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill (New) | on | 05/11/1950 | 62B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60834 | on | 17/04/1943 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 12/11/1950 | 62B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60822 | on | 05/11/1950 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62B | on | 07/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60834 | on | 12/11/1950 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62B | on | 19/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61132 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 14/01/1951 | 62B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60972 | on | 20/08/1945 | HAY | Haymarket | on | 14/01/1951 | 62B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 55162 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29D | Forfar | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62B | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46464 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 64A | St Margarets | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62B | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61132 | on | 14/01/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62B | on | 11/01/1960 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60972 | on | 14/01/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62B | on | 02/01/1956 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 55162 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 62B | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 60A | Inverness |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46464 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 62B | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 61A | Kittybrewster |
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 68465 | on | 01/01/1948 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 62B | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 68465 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 62B | on | 12/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 68114 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | LOAN | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 62B | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 65D | Dawsholm | |
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 67466 | on | 01/01/1948 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 62B | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45330 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 62B | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45384 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 62B | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45384 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 62B | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62744 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | YK | York (North) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 62B | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 55169 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 63C | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62B | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62744 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62B | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 55169 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 62B | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62744 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 62B | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 55172 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29D | Forfar | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 62B | on | 28/11/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40600 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12H | Stranraer | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 62B | 4w/e | 15/05/1954 | 61A | Kittybrewster |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42733 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 62B | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42866 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 62B | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 68103 | 8w/e | 05/09/1953 | 64A | St Margarets | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 62B | on | 21/08/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68551 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 65G | Yoker | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 62B | on | 21/06/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68535 | on | 01/01/1948 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 62B | on | 20/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45486 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 64A | St Margarets | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 62B | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42693 | on | 01/01/1948 | 27A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 62B | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 63B | Stirling |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42690 | 4w/e | 02/10/1954 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 62B | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 63B | Stirling |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42691 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 62B | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42692 | on | 01/01/1948 | 27A | Polmadie | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 62B | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45164 | 4w/e | 02/10/1954 | 63A | Perth South | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 62B | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61180 | on | 30/06/1947 | EFD | Eastfield (New) | on | 20/06/1955 | 62B | on | 28/08/1966 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | 11703 | on | 29/08/1955 (New) | 62B | 4w/e | 23/11/1957 | 64E | Polmont | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80123 | on | 09/09/1955 (New) | 62B | 4w/e | 24/04/1965 | 66A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80124 | on | 22/09/1955 (New) | 62B | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 68108 | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 64A | St Margarets | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 62B | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 65E | Kipps |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46464 | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 4w/e | 24/12/1955 | 62B | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 61A | Kittybrewster |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60804 | on | 23/12/1955 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 02/01/1956 | 62B | on | 05/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61172 | on | 13/06/1947 | EFD | Eastfield | on | 27/01/1956 | 62B | on | 16/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64545 | on | 01/01/1948 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 62B | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64556 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 62B | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13347 | on | 03/05/1957 (New) | 62B | w/e | 02/11/1968 | 40A | Lincoln | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64542 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | Stirling | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 62B | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 65E | Kipps |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64544 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | Stirling | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 62B | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 65E | Kipps |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64585 | on | 01/01/1948 | STG | Stirling | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 62B | 4w/e | 16/01/1960 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 11708 | on | 16/07/1957 (New) | 62B | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 99C | Crewe Works | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 11709 | on | 16/08/1957 (New) | 62B | w/e | 06/11/1965 | Wolverton Works | |||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 11710 | on | 27/08/1957 (New) | 62B | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 11711 | on | 31/08/1957 (New) | 62B | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 99C | Crewe Works | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 11712 | on | 31/08/1957 (New) | 62B | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 69135 | on | 01/01/1948 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 62B | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 69136 | on | 01/01/1948 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 62B | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 69150 | on | 01/01/1948 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 62B | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 69154 | on | 01/01/1948 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 62B | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 69204 | on | 01/01/1948 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 62B | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 69224 | on | 01/01/1948 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 62B | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 61C | Keith |
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 11713 | on | 13/09/1957 (New) | 62B | on | 04/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 11714 | on | 20/09/1957 (New) | 62B | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 11715 | on | 03/10/1957 (New) | 62B | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 11716 | on | 11/10/1957 (New) | 62B | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 11717 | on | 23/10/1957 (New) | 62B | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46464 | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 4w/e | 23/11/1957 | 62B | m/e | 09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 67496 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 61C | Keith | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 62B | on | 02/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 67501 | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 61C | Keith | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 62B | on | 22/04/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40054 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 62B | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 16C | Mansfield |
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 69164 | on | 01/01/1948 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 62B | on | 15/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64600 | on | 01/01/1948 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 62B | on | 09/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64602 | on | 01/01/1948 | THJ | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 62B | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80090 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 62B | on | 27/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | D5342 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 60A | Inverness | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 62B | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 60A | Inverness |
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | D5343 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 60A | Inverness | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 62B | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 60A | Inverness |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61262 | on | 01/12/1947 | THJ | Thornton Junction (New) | on | 18/04/1960 | 62B | on | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61277 | on | 04/05/1957 | 62A | Thornton Junction | on | 18/04/1960 | 62B | on | 02/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80091 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 62B | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) |
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | D6142 | on | 22/03/1960 | 61A | Kittybrewster (New) | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 62B | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 61A | Kittybrewster |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60089 | on | 18/02/1951 | 64B | Haymarket | on | 21/11/1960 | 62B | on | 19/12/1960 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60090 | on | 02/07/1950 | 64B | Haymarket | on | 21/11/1960 | 62B | on | 19/12/1960 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60528 | on | 28/05/1960 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 19/06/1961 | 62B | on | 24/04/1966 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60532 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 19/06/1961 | 62B | on | 04/12/1966 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61340 | on | 16/10/1961 | 62A | Thornton Junction | on | 12/11/1961 | 62B | on | 13/11/1966 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60973 | on | 30/05/1960 | PTH | Perth (LNER) | on | 09/07/1962 | 62B | on | 24/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3346 | on | 26/04/1957 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper (New) | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 62B | on | 21/06/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64615 | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | m/e | 01/1963 (R) | 62B | |||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64631 | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | m/e | 01/1963 (R) | 62B | |||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 65338 | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 62B | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64557 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 62B | on | 28/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64576 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 62B | on | 04/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64577 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 62B | on | 17/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64541 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 67C | Ayr | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 62B | on | 07/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64597 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 62B | on | 22/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2745 | on | 30/04/1961 | 64A | St Margarets | on | 21/10/1963 | 62B | on | 10/04/1966 | 64A | St Margarets |
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2746 | on | 15/02/1960 | 64A | St Margarets (New) | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 62B | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61403 | on | 03/01/1961 | 65F | Grangemouth | on | 11/11/1963 | 62B | on | 14/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60818 | on | 17/11/1960 | 64A | St Margarets | on | 24/11/1963 | 62B | on | 22/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64558 | on | 01/01/1948 | EFD | Eastfield | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 62B | w/e | 03/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64608 | on | 01/01/1948 | STM | St Margarets | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 62B | on | 24/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64624 | on | 01/01/1948 | STM | St Margarets | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 62B | w/e | 17/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2750 | on | 07/05/1962 | 61A | Kittybrewster | on | 20/12/1963 | 62B | on | 10/04/1966 | 64A | St Margarets |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3343 | on | 12/04/1957 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper (New) | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 62B | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 8J | Allerton |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64613 | on | 23/01/1964 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 (R) | 62B | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60836 | on | 24/11/1963 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 13/04/1964 | 62B | on | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64547 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 64A | St Margarets | 4w/e | 25/04/1964 | 62B | w/e | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60825 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | STM | St Margarets | on | 27/04/1964 | 62B | on | 27/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60919 | on | 13/10/1945 | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 11/05/1964 | 62B | on | 02/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61081 | on | 18/11/1963 | 64A | St Margarets | on | 15/06/1964 | 62B | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61398 | on | 17/02/1956 | 64A | St Margarets | on | 20/07/1964 | 62B | on | 05/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60530 | on | 15/09/1963 | 66A | Polmadie | on | 31/07/1964 | 62B | on | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64563 | on | 29/12/1962 | 65A | Eastfield | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 62B | on | 19/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61221 | on | 20/01/1964 | 62A | Thornton Junction | on | 10/01/1965 | 62B | on | 27/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3558 | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 64A | St Margarets | 5w/e | 30/01/1965 | 62B | 5w/e | 07/08/1971 | 64B | Haymarket |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61147 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 62A | Thornton Junction | on | 04/04/1965 | 62B | on | 16/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2585 | on | 13/04/1959 | 62A | Thornton Junction (New) | 5w/e | 29/05/1965 | 62B | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3540 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 5w/e | 29/05/1965 | 62B | 4w/e | 26/02/1972 | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill |
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | 60512 | on | 15/09/1963 | 66A | Polmadie | on | 14/06/1965 | 62B | on | 19/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3734 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 64C | Dalry Road | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 62B | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | 64H | Leith Central |
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | D2411 | 4w/e | 05/10/1963 | 63A | Perth South | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 62B | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 67C | Ayr |
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | D2412 | 4w/e | 05/10/1963 | 63A | Perth South | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 62B | on | 15/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | D2444 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 63A | Perth South | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 62B | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 67C | Ayr |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2584 | on | 28/02/1959 | 62A | Thornton Junction (New) | 4w/e | 25/12/1965 | 62B | on | 07/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | D2414 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 62B | 5w/e | 06/02/1971 | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill |
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | D2415 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 61A | Kittybrewster | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 62B | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | 64H | Leith Central |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60813 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 64A | St Margarets | on | 24/04/1966 | 62B | on | 26/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44722 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 63A | Perth South | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 62B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44879 | on | 02/07/1950 | 63A | Perth South | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 62B | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 63A | Perth South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45473 | on | 01/01/1948 | 29A | Perth South | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 62B | on | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44720 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63A | Perth South | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 62B | on | 27/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45127 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 64A | St Margarets | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 62B | on | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61072 | on | 25/08/1958 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | on | 06/11/1966 | 62B | on | 04/12/1966 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61180 | on | 28/08/1966 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | on | 06/11/1966 | 62B | on | 27/11/1966 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61340 | on | 12/11/1961 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | on | 13/11/1966 | 62B | on | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61354 | on | 24/04/1966 | 62A | Thornton Junction | on | 13/11/1966 | 62B | on | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64623 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 8w/e | 18/11/1966 | 62B | on | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64569 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 62B | w/e | 10/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64602 | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 62B | on | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64611 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 62B | on | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 64620 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 62B | on | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61029 | on | 06/11/1966 | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | on | 04/12/1966 | 62B | on | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61072 | on | 04/12/1966 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 06/01/1967 | 62B | on | 01/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61180 | on | 27/11/1966 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | on | 12/03/1967 | 62B | on | 01/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2574 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 62B | on | 08/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2575 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 62B | on | 08/06/1968 | Withdrawn |