Depot: Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Ebbw Junction (Newport) | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2769 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2811 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5612 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1235 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | NPT | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2636 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | NPT | on | 29/07/1946 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1714 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | NPT | m/e | 07/1946 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4253 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | LTS | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6352 | on | 01/01/1934 | 44 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4304 | on | 01/01/1934 | 203 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | NPT | m/e | 10/1938 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1600 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | NPT | ||||||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4263 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4268 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3594 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | NPT | ||||||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | on | 14/12/1935 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 05/1937 | NPT | m/e | 06/1937 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | m/e | 08/1940 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 02/1941 | NPT | m/e | 03/1941 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5030 | on | 14/05/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 03/1941 | NPT | m/e | 08/1942 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2218 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2239 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3726 | 4w/e | 03/11/1945 | 16 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4271 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4289 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4671 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4225 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | NPT | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3712 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5545 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8778 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9616 | 4w/e | 03/11/1945 | 86 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | Llantrisant | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4225 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4260 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4820 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | CVCYS | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4821 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | LTS | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4941 | 4w/e | 03/11/1945 | 66 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2063 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 05/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2073 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 06/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2122 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 11/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2218 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 83C | Westbury |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2239 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2280 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2407 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2726 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 08/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2794 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 11/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2795 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 01/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2842 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2851 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2865 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2866 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2876 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2879 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2894 | on | 15/11/1938 | 132 | (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2896 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2979 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 01/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3634 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 89B | Brecon | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3636 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 02/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3647 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3662 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 08/1965 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3700 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3712 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86K | Tredegar |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3714 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3726 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3796 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3800 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3801 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3804 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3805 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3807 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3810 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3816 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3830 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3833 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4145 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4203 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7245 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86F | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4206 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 83E | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7249 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7241 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4224 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4225 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4230 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4242 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 83E | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7247 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LMTN | Leamington | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7253 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4247 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 76 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 83E | St Blazey | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4248 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4260 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4263 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4268 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4270 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 76 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4271 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4276 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86F | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4289 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4294 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 83E | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4518 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 30/06/1948 | MCH | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4593 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4599 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 30/06/1948 | MCH | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4671 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1421 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | LTS | Llantrisant |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4941 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5201 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5206 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5208 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 76 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86F | Tondu | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5217 | 4w/e | 03/11/1945 | 76 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5218 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5222 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5224 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5229 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 76 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5233 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 08/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5234 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 06/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5238 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5243 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 85C | Hereford | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5251 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7231 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7203 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7212 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7217 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5364 | on | 01/01/1934 | Sw Wks | Swindon Works | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5516 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5545 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5550 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87H | Neyland | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5602 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5603 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5638 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PILL | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5709 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 03/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5732 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5741 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5906 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5911 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6409 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 86D | Llantrisant | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6415 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6426 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6428 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6439 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 86D | Llantrisant | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6612 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6649 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86F | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6654 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6663 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6672 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6821 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6837 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 31/05/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6868 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 30/06/1948 | TN | Taunton | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6870 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | OXF | Oxford | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6874 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6926 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6927 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7712 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7736 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86K | Tredegar | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7753 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86F | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7768 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | pprd | Branches Fork | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7771 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86K | Tredegar | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7781 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 07/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8710 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 76 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 86F | Tondu | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8711 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86K | Tredegar | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8778 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8786 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 86J | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8796 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9632 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9637 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9644 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9731 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1713 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1720 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1800 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 12/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1862 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 12/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1883 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 12/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1894 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5255 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5256 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5264 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86J | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | 1668 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 02/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | 1670 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 02/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | 1372 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 10/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | 1373 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 05/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77123 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5259 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | NPT | m/e | 03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2817 | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | m/e | 30/04/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5212 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | m/e | 31/05/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4156 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4282 | on | 15/06/1947 | SED | Swansea East Dock | m/e | 30/06/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4296 | on | 15/06/1947 | SED | Swansea East Dock | m/e | 30/06/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SED | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5214 | on | 15/06/1947 | SED | Swansea East Dock | m/e | 30/06/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5221 | on | 15/06/1947 | SED | Swansea East Dock | m/e | 30/06/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SED | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5253 | on | 15/06/1947 | SED | Swansea East Dock | m/e | 30/06/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6834 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | on | 14/10/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3836 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7252 | on | 15/06/1947 | DID | Didcot | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7247 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LMTN | Leamington | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | NPT | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2889 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4148 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4599 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | MCH | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | MCH | Machynlleth |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5238 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6820 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | NPT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7215 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | NPT | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1752 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | NPT | m/e | 03/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2227 | on | 15/06/1947 | DID | Didcot | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | NPT | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4137 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5605 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | NPT | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | RHY | Rhymney |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5603 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | NPT | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5603 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | NPT | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | SED | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8450 | on | 31/08/1949 (New) | NPT | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3663 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | NPT | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3798 | on | 15/06/1947 | SLO | Slough | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | NPT | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5096 | m/e | 12/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 22/11/1949 | NPT | m/e | 01/1950 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8453 | on | 30/11/1949 (New) | NPT | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86F | Tondu | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4168 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | NEY | Neyland | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | NPT | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1509 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | NPT | m/e | 08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8406 | on | 31/12/1949 (New) | NPT | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2834 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | NPT | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7214 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | NPT | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2815 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2819 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2821 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2861 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77184 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86A | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77368 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4130 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4130 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4275 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82C | Swindon | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5911 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5929 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | LDR | Landore | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4275 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5911 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5929 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90188 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86A | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90225 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86A | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90630 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86A | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90685 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 84D | Leamington | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86A | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90701 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86A | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90188 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90225 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90630 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90685 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90701 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5318 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5318 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2090 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4611 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6386 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6932 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2090 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86A | m/e | 03/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4611 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6386 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6932 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90125 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 84B | Oxley | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90573 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90585 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2048 | on | 15/06/1947 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86A | on | 17/05/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4145 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90323 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90544 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90676 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9458 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | NYA | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4145 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90323 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90544 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90676 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9458 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90149 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2826 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2835 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2858 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2868 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2895 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3813 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2858 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86A | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7232 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7210 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5260 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PILL | Newport Pill | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2136 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9731 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8493 | m/e | 11/1930 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 (R) | 86A | |||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8493 | on | 30/09/1952 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8494 | on | 30/09/1952 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9482 | on | 30/09/1952 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2035 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 86A | m/e | 03/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9482 | on | 30/09/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5173 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6812 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6823 | on | 15/06/1947 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6847 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0PT | 28 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86A | m/e | 11/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7243 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1421 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | LTS | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7227 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4298 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7208 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7218 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6823 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8497 | on | 30/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8498 | on | 30/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8499 | on | 30/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8794 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3691 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86A | m/e | 04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6642 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7319 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4290 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4277 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9674 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82D | Westbury | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90356 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8499 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4916 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4951 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4982 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7219 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2864 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4957 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5236 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5921 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6102 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6107 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4246 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5201 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5228 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 86A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88G | Llantrisant |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8766 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 86A | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92000 | on | 31/01/1954 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92001 | on | 31/01/1954 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92002 | on | 31/01/1954 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92003 | on | 31/01/1954 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92004 | on | 31/01/1954 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2873 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4255 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4286 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4951 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9490 | on | 28/02/1954 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92005 | on | 28/02/1954 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92006 | on | 28/02/1954 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92007 | on | 28/02/1954 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7229 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8440 | on | 31/03/1954 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3806 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3808 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90676 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48475 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7249 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7252 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6439 | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 86D | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 86A | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3824 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4259 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4283 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5227 | on | 15/06/1947 | SED | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5382 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5414 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6370 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6430 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8494 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1430 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5318 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6318 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2858 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3170 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 86A | m/e | 08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1653 | on | 31/12/1954 (New) | 86A | on | 05/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4211 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 86A | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90069 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90179 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1656 | on | 31/01/1955 (New) | 86A | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2800 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 86A | m/e | 04/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2894 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 86A | on | 01/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4130 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9499 | on | 31/07/1955 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2845 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2868 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86A | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6639 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3634 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8493 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2874 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3827 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86A | on | 13/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1421 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1422 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7222 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5657 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 86A | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4267 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86D | Llantrisant |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5772 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 86A | m/e | 06/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4227 | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4242 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6361 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9459 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7251 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7755 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7787 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86K | Tredegar |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2814 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86A | m/e | 08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4119 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7246 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 81F | Oxford | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7212 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 81F | Oxford | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6114 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5205 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6412 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6425 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86A | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6401 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6849 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90312 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2820 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86A | m/e | 11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3808 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6838 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6865 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9468 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 86A | m/e | 08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5916 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2839 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 86A | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3772 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 86A | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3832 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7233 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7234 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6426 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 86A | m/e | 03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7215 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5261 | on | 15/06/1947 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5657 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 86A | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2898 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4247 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5790 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86K | Tredegar |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8495 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4211 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86A | m/e | 08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4200 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86A | m/e | 03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7774 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86K | Tredegar | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 86A | m/e | 11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6417 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 86A | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6431 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 86J | Aberdare |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7250 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7240 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2807 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1471 | on | 15/06/1947 | LTS | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7738 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86A | m/e | 02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6348 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2823 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92237 | on | 30/09/1958 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92238 | on | 30/09/1958 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92239 | on | 30/09/1958 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92236 | on | 30/09/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road (New) | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90149 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92240 | on | 31/10/1958 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92241 | on | 31/10/1958 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92242 | on | 31/10/1958 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92243 | on | 31/10/1958 (New) | 86A | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4229 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5188 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86A | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92244 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 30/11/1958 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92248 | on | 31/12/1958 (New) | 86A | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92249 | on | 31/12/1958 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3807 | on | 29/12/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3808 | on | 16/01/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3809 | on | 23/01/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3853 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9745 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86A | m/e | 06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3837 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 86A | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6876 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6656 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 88C | Barry |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3807 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill | m/e | 08/1959 | 86A | m/e | 09/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3743 | on | 20/06/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | DG | Danygraig |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3744 | on | 20/06/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | DG | Danygraig |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3745 | on | 26/06/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3746 | on | 02/07/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3747 | on | 04/07/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | CED | Cardiff East Dock |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3748 | on | 29/07/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 84E | Tyseley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3820 | on | 02/04/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | w/e | 01/01/1971 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3822 | on | 15/04/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3823 | on | 24/04/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3824 | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 87C | Danygraig | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7211 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 87F | Llanelli |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3749 | on | 04/08/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | CED | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 15xx | 0-6-0PT | 1506 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2223 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2818 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92166 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92235 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3817 | on | 18/03/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2219 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2236 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2893 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3638 | on | 15/06/1947 | BCN | Brecon | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3681 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3706 | on | 15/06/1947 | BCN | Brecon | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | m/e | 11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3747 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3767 | on | 15/06/1947 | BCN | Brecon | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6850 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7794 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | m/e | 10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92231 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2884 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3694 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3824 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92250 | on | 31/12/1958 | 84C | Banbury (New) | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7204 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7217 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3713 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4146 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4297 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92229 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92230 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2247 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92225 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8751 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 86A | on | 18/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4265 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86A | m/e | 06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6401 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 86A | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3807 | m/e | 09/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3808 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3809 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3810 | on | 30/01/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3811 | on | 04/02/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3812 | on | 13/02/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87F | Llanelli |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3813 | on | 20/02/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87F | Llanelli |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3814 | on | 26/02/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87B | Margam |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3815 | on | 04/03/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 7w/e | 01/01/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3816 | on | 10/03/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3818 | on | 20/03/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 87B | Margam |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3819 | on | 26/03/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3821 | on | 08/04/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill (New) | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3700 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 86K | Tredegar | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3712 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86K | Tredegar | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4230 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6408 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7736 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86K | Tredegar | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7771 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86K | Tredegar | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7787 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86K | Tredegar | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8711 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 86K | Tredegar | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9662 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86K | Tredegar | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90685 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3974 | on | 25/06/1960 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3975 | on | 25/06/1960 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3976 | on | 02/07/1960 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3977 | on | 09/07/1960 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3978 | on | 09/07/1960 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3980 | on | 09/07/1960 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3979 | on | 16/07/1960 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90565 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2209 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86A | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2243 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3722 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86A | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4229 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86A | m/e | 03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4266 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86A | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9424 | on | 31/08/1950 | 81B | Slough (New) | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 86A | on | 29/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90225 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 86A | on | 02/12/1962 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5213 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6805 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86A | m/e | 03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6813 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6829 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92249 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86A | on | 06/10/1963 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4258 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6754 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9488 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92004 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92222 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92226 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4002 | on | 12/11/1960 (New) | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4235 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 86A | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90323 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 86A | on | 20/05/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4001 | on | 05/11/1960 | 84E | Tyseley (New) | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3756 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4225 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4657 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90188 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86A | on | 02/12/1962 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3211 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 86A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3667 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 86A | m/e | 05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3800 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4257 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4293 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 86A | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92223 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 85D | Bromsgrove |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2857 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2897 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4852 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 86A | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3818 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 86A | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92005 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 86A | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92209 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90312 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5173 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5236 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7214 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6819 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6820 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6821 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5257 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3661 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88G | Llantrisant |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90201 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 86A | on | 20/05/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3764 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3748 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4011 | on | 20/04/1961 | DG | Danygraig (New) | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86A | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4012 | on | 26/04/1961 | DG | Danygraig (New) | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4290 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9494 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2240 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86A | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7237 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6434 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92006 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86A | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92012 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 38B | Annesley | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86A | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 17C | Rowsley |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4252 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 86D | Llantrisant | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7223 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5306 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5330 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6366 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 86K | Tredegar | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7325 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7224 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 86A | on | 06/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92214 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92238 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 86A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7238 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 86A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6849 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6852 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 86A | m/e | 01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8702 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 86C | Hereford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4126 | on | 12/04/1962 (New) | 86A | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4127 | on | 19/04/1962 (New) | 86A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | Landore | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4679 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 86A | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88E | Abercynon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4128 | on | 30/04/1962 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4125 | on | 05/04/1962 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 86A | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4170 | on | 02/06/1962 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4171 | on | 05/06/1962 (New) | 86A | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 87B | Margam | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4172 | on | 07/06/1962 (New) | 86A | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90529 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 86A | on | 02/12/1962 | 41F | Mexborough |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4173 | on | 19/06/1962 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4174 | on | 20/06/1962 (New) | 86A | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4175 | on | 22/06/1962 (New) | 86A | w/e | 25/11/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4137 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4151 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6800 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 86A | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2298 | on | 15/06/1947 | MCH | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 86A | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4176 | on | 22/08/1962 (New) | 86A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4177 | on | 28/08/1962 (New) | 86A | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4178 | on | 31/08/1962 (New) | 86A | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4179 | on | 05/09/1962 (New) | 86A | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3201 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86A | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83G | Templecombe (S&D) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4299 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86A | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8781 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 86A | on | 13/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4180 | on | 12/09/1962 (New) | 86A | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 87A | Landore | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4181 | on | 20/09/1962 (New) | 86A | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 84D | Penzance | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4182 | on | 27/09/1962 (New) | 86A | w/e | 17/05/1975 | ED | Eastfield | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2885 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 86A | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6850 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 86A | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92233 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 86A | on | 06/10/1963 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4183 | on | 17/10/1962 (New) | 86A | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4184 | on | 23/10/1962 (New) | 86A | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4185 | on | 02/11/1962 (New) | 86A | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92226 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 86A | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92230 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 86A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 85D | Bromsgrove |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3729 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86C | Hereford | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 86A | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1614 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 86A | m/e | 02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2818 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2867 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 86A | on | 29/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3824 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 86A | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4627 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 86A | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5235 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7217 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7203 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5938 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86A | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6965 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86A | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5203 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5939 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 86A | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3705 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4233 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 88H | Tondu |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4238 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4258 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4259 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | m/e | 03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4271 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4643 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | m/e | 04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5200 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5244 | on | 15/06/1947 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5250 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PILL | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6935 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9664 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5256 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86B | Newport Pill | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3621 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 86A | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3800 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 86A | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3812 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 86A | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2876 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 86J | Aberdare | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 86A | m/e | 01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3805 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 86A | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6841 | on | 10/05/1963 | 88A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 09/1963 | 86A | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 66A | Polmadie | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2890 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86B | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3808 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86B | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5214 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 86F | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 86B | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9678 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 88H | Tondu | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 88J | Aberdare |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3747 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 86B | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4227 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 86B | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6818 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 86B | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4241 | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 (R) | 86B | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4255 | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 (R) | 86B | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3816 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86B | w/e | 14/07/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4214 | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 (R) | 86B | |||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4233 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 88H | Tondu | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86B | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5209 | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86B | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7206 | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86B | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6878 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87F | Llanelli | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5241 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7229 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92210 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 81C | Southall | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | w/e | 09/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92214 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92225 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | on | 02/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92226 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92229 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81C | Southall | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | w/e | 09/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92250 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81C | Southall | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86B | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7201 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3861 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86B | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92230 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 85D | Bromsgrove | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2895 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86B | m/e | 04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4852 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86B | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3818 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86B | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3837 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86B | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3840 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86B | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6918 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86B | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6958 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 86B | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92226 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | 86B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2890 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86B | m/e | 04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9649 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86B | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7249 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86B | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5235 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 86B | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92207 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81C | Southall | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 86B | m/e | 12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4254 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 86B | m/e | 04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3864 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 86B | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4268 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 88J | Aberdare | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 86B | m/e | 08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7253 | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 88J | Aberdare | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86B | m/e | 04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5223 | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 (R) | 86B | |||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5961 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86B | on | 30/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6978 | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86B | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9666 | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 88F | Treherbert | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86B | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5256 | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 (R) | 86B | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92237 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 86B | on | 10/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5200 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87F | Llanelli | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86B | ||||
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5252 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 87F | Llanelli | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 86B | m/e | 05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3708 | m/e | 02/1965 | Withdrawn | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 (R) | 86B | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3830 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 86B | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4620 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 86B | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9600 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 86B | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5992 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 86B | m/e | 08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4662 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86B | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6847 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6876 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7925 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7927 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9675 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 88B | Radyr | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86B | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92243 | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92244 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3819 | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3821 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86B | on | 25/10/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3397 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 86B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3515 | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 85A | Worcester | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 86B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3809 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86B | 7w/e | 01/01/1971 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3812 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87F | Llanelli | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 87B | Margam |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3813 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87F | Llanelli | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86B | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3814 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87B | Margam | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86B | w/e | 08/02/1975 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3817 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86B | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3267 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 86B | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3102 | on | 11/02/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction (New) | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86B | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3103 | on | 16/02/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction (New) | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86B | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3104 | on | 23/02/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction (New) | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86B | w/e | 21/02/1970 | 8J | Allerton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3188 | on | 09/11/1955 | 86F | Tondu (New) | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3189 | on | 10/11/1955 | 86F | Tondu (New) | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86B | m/e | 05/1977 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3190 | on | 15/11/1955 | 86F | Tondu (New) | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86B | w/e | 03/10/1970 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4001 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | 86B | 6w/e | 16/11/1972 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4162 | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 82C | Swindon | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 86B | on | 31/08/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4170 | on | 02/06/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86B | on | 24/07/1988 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3596 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 87B | Margam | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86B | on | 31/08/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4185 | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 86B | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3819 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | 86B | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3817 | 2w/e | 27/12/1969 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 86B | m/e | 07/1977 | EH | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3196 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82C | Swindon | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3808 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87F | Llanelli | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4006 | on | 03/12/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 86B | w/e | 15/07/1972 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3990 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86B | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4027 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87B | Margam | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 86B | w/e | 01/11/1975 | DR | Doncaster |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5179 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5180 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 86B | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5181 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5182 | 4w/e | 30/12/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7624 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 86B | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7625 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/11/1970 | 86B | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3807 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4002 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore | q/e | 14/11/1970 | 86B | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | FP | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3355 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 86B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3762 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 86B | on | 23/07/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3998 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | Landore | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 86B | 5w/e | 30/09/1971 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4011 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | 86B | w/e | 22/03/1975 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3972 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 86B | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | SW | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4005 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 83D | Laira | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 86B | w/e | 24/02/1973 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4013 | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86B | w/e | 03/02/1973 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4014 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82C | Swindon | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86B | w/e | 11/01/1975 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4021 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86B | w/e | 14/06/1975 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3754 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 86B | on | 30/09/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7677 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 24/07/1971 | 86B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 84A | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3185 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 86B | m/e | 30/11/1979 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3593 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87E | Landore | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 86B | w/e | 17/05/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3594 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 87A | Landore | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 86B | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3806 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 86B | on | 30/10/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3824 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87B | Margam | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | on | 22/11/1991 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4024 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | w/e | 22/06/1974 | DY | Derby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5180 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5209 | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5213 | on | 17/06/1968 | D01 | London Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D5227 | w/e | 07/12/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7510 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7511 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7512 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7513 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7514 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7515 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7516 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4016 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 86B | on | 15/05/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4019 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 86B | w/e | 09/02/1974 | ED | Eastfield |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4010 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 86B | w/e | 12/10/1974 | DY | Derby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7517 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 86B | w/e | 11/08/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7518 | on | 17/06/1968 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 86B | w/e | 12/05/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 53 | Co-Co | D1200 | w/e | 19/12/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 08/1972 | 86B | w/e | 21/10/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4012 | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86B | w/e | 11/01/1975 | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7509 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 84A | Laira | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 86B | w/e | 11/05/1974 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3819 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 11/11/1972 | 86B | on | 20/06/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3749 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 86B | on | 30/09/2008 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7508 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 84A | Laira | w/e | 09/12/1972 | 86B | w/e | 12/05/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3602 | on | 29/10/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 86B | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | SW | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3433 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87B | Margam | 2w/e | 13/01/1973 | 86B | on | 01/08/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 53 | Co-Co | D1200 | w/e | 21/10/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 12/05/1973 | EJ | on | 18/05/1974 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4018 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 14/07/1973 | EJ | 5w/e | 07/03/1974 | EH | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3203 | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 66C | Hamilton (West) | w/e | 09/02/1974 | EJ | m/e | 12/1976 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3041 | 9w/e | 19/07/1973 | EH | Eastleigh | w/e | 09/03/1974 | EJ | on | 05/03/1978 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 53 | Co-Co | D1200 | on | 18/05/1974 | Withdrawn | on | 17/06/1974 (R) | EJ | on | 30/06/1975 | To Store | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08109 | w/e | 18/03/1972 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 22/06/1974 | EJ | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08110 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/10/1974 | EJ | on | 09/01/1978 | LE | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08579 | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 21/12/1974 | EJ | on | 12/12/1977 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08117 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/01/1975 | EJ | m/e | 12/1976 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08119 | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 11/01/1975 | EJ | m/e | 12/1976 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08812 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 08/02/1975 | EJ | w/e | 15/02/1975 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08812 | w/e | 08/02/1975 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | w/e | 15/02/1975 | EJ | on | 06/02/1978 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08574 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 22/03/1975 | EJ | on | 12/12/1977 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08634 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 22/03/1975 | EJ | on | 01/02/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08323 | on | 25/10/1957 | 65A | Eastfield (New) | w/e | 14/06/1975 | EJ | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | SR | To Southern Region |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08801 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | 41A | Tinsley | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | EJ | on | 31/01/2004 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08111 | w/e | 13/04/1974 | WS | Worcester | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | EJ | 2w/e | 19/06/1976 | WS | Worcester |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08035 | w/e | 23/03/1974 | OC | Old Oak Common | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | EJ | m/e | 03/1978 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08636 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 11/1976 | EJ | on | 27/07/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08483 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | EJ | m/e | 08/1977 | OC | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08492 | m/e | 11/1976 | LE | Landore | m/e | 01/1977 | EJ | on | 12/12/1977 | BH | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08594 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 10/1977 | EJ | on | 20/07/2001 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08780 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | m/e | 10/1977 | EJ | on | 01/03/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08781 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 85A | Worcester | m/e | 10/1977 | EJ | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08791 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | m/e | 10/1977 | EJ | on | 04/10/1987 | HA | Haymarket |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08489 | m/e | 10/1977 | SW | Swindon | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | EJ | m/e | 07/1981 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08361 | 2w/e | 04/10/1975 | CF | Cardiff Canton | on | 09/01/1978 | EJ | on | 08/12/1980 | MG | Margam |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08410 | m/e | 12/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | EJ | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08786 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | EJ | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08822 | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | CF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 03/1978 | EJ | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08586 | 2w/e | 04/10/1975 | MG | Margam | m/e | 30/11/1979 | EJ | on | 24/07/1988 | CL | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08359 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87B | Margam | m/e | 07/1981 | EJ | on | 22/01/1984 | Withdrawn |