Depot: Exeter
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Exeter | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2928 | on | 07/10/1907 (New) | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4037 | on | 17/06/1913 | LA | Laira | m/e | 12/1913 | EXE | on | 16/08/1915 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4032 | on | 14/01/1925 | LA | Laira | m/e | 07/1925 | EXE | on | 16/04/1926 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4075 | on | 18/08/1927 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 18/08/1928 | EXE | on | 12/01/1929 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4086 | on | 20/06/1925 | LA | Laira (New) | m/e | 09/1929 | EXE | on | 19/12/1929 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4009 | on | 06/12/1930 | LA | Laira | on | 03/09/1931 | EXE | on | 28/01/1932 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 08/01/1932 | LA | Laira | m/e | 08/1932 | EXE | on | 05/11/1932 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5014 | m/e | 12/1933 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 03/1934 | EXE | m/e | 04/1934 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5011 | m/e | 01/1933 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 03/03/1934 | EXE | m/e | 04/1934 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5030 | on | 01/06/1934 (New) | EXE | on | 14/05/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5013 | m/e | 07/1933 | LA | Laira | on | 03/07/1934 | EXE | on | 31/12/1935 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5015 | on | 09/07/1932 | CDF | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 05/07/1934 | EXE | on | 26/12/1935 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4085 | m/e | 07/1932 | CARM | Carmarthen | on | 17/07/1934 | EXE | on | 02/05/1937 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | m/e | 07/1933 | LDR | Landore | on | 16/09/1934 | EXE | on | 28/03/1937 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4098 | on | 29/05/1934 | TN | Taunton | m/e | 10/1934 | EXE | on | 27/01/1936 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | m/e | 11/1934 | LDR | Landore | on | 30/08/1935 | EXE | on | 28/08/1938 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4849 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | EXE | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4851 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5009 | on | 07/12/1935 | LA | Laira | m/e | 01/1936 | EXE | on | 06/03/1936 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1930 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | SBZ | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5543 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | TN | Taunton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4087 | m/e | 07/1933 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 21/02/1936 | EXE | on | 07/05/1937 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4707 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | EXE | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 114 | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | on | 01/05/1934 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 07/03/1936 | EXE | on | 17/09/1936 | TN | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5009 | on | 05/04/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common | m/e | 05/1936 | EXE | on | 12/06/1937 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | on | 17/09/1936 | TN | Taunton | m/e | 10/1936 | EXE | on | 17/09/1937 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4099 | on | 16/06/1934 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 17/10/1936 | EXE | on | 18/12/1943 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5026 | m/e | 12/1936 | PZ | Penzance | on | 03/05/1937 | EXE | m/e | 10/1939 | TN | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5059 | on | 08/06/1937 (New) | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5065 | on | 09/07/1937 (New) | EXE | on | 03/08/1939 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5003 | m/e | 05/1937 | TN | Taunton | on | 17/08/1937 | EXE | on | 20/01/1941 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4098 | on | 06/03/1937 | TR | Truro | on | 18/08/1937 | EXE | on | 24/09/1938 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5057 | on | 09/07/1936 | NA | Newton Abbot (New) | m/e | 03/1938 | EXE | m/e | 04/1938 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4090 | on | 22/03/1937 | LA | Laira | m/e | 04/1938 | EXE | m/e | 05/1938 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5076 | on | 25/08/1938 (New) | EXE | m/e | 12/1938 | LDR | Landore | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4077 | on | 14/03/1935 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 01/1939 | EXE | on | 01/03/1939 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5011 | on | 13/12/1936 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 04/1939 | EXE | on | 19/12/1939 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5012 | m/e | 01/1933 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 25/08/1939 | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5026 | m/e | 10/1939 | TN | Taunton | m/e | 11/1939 | EXE | on | 17/05/1947 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5050 | on | 22/07/1939 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 13/11/1939 | EXE | m/e | 11/1942 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5071 | on | 07/07/1938 | NA | Newton Abbot (New) | on | 12/06/1940 | EXE | m/e | 07/1940 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5003 | on | 20/01/1941 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 03/1941 | EXE | on | 14/07/1941 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5003 | on | 14/07/1941 | LA | Laira | on | 18/09/1941 | EXE | on | 07/08/1942 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4032 | m/e | 05/1943 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 06/1943 | EXE | on | 06/09/1943 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6957 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5525 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7316 | on | 01/01/1934 | 37 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9646 | on | 04/05/1946 | NA | Newton Abbot (New) | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9647 | on | 18/05/1946 (New) | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5098 | m/e | 05/1946 | SRD | Stafford Road (New) | m/e | 09/1946 | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7422 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | EXE | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | Truro | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1020 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | NEY | Neyland | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2088 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2230 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83B | Taunton | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2814 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2834 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2873 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3603 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86J | Aberdare | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3606 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3794 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3815 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3834 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4054 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4410 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | la | Moorswater | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | LA | Laira |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4530 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 89C | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | 47xx | 2-8-0 | 4706 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1405 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | exe | Tiverton Junction | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1429 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1435 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1440 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1449 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1451 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | EXE | Exeter | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 83E | Yeovil Town |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1468 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 83E | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1469 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 09/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5012 | on | 25/08/1939 | EXE | Exeter | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 03/1950 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5059 | on | 08/06/1937 | EXE | Exeter (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 05/1953 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5098 | m/e | 09/1946 | EXE | Exeter | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 10/1948 | PZ | Penzance |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5321 | on | 01/01/1934 | 174 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 83B | Taunton | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5525 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | EXE | Exeter | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5760 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 83B | Taunton | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6301 | on | 01/01/1934 | 87 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 83C | Exeter | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6397 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | LLY | Llanelli | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7316 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | EXE | Exeter | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7716 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7761 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9646 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | EXE | Exeter | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9647 | on | 18/05/1946 | EXE | Exeter (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3335 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3395 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | BAN | Banbury | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 08/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3451 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77288 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | on | 15/06/1947 | PZ | Penzance | m/e | 10/1948 | EXE | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | m/e | 10/1948 | EXE | Exeter | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | EXE | m/e | 03/1950 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1023 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | Truro | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | EXE | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4410 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | EXE | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3400 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | EXE | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3341 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | EXE | m/e | 11/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5976 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | EXE | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3677 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | SLO | Slough | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | EXE | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8456 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 83C | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5062 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | m/e | 05/1950 | 83C | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5062 | m/e | 05/1950 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 83C | m/e | 02/1951 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8421 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 83C | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 83C | Exeter | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8421 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 83C | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5003 | on | 15/06/1947 | TN | Taunton | on | 27/02/1951 | 83C | on | 09/02/1957 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4932 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 83C | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9439 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 83C | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83C | Exeter | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4932 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4954 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83C | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9439 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83C | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9439 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 83C | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6301 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 83C | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4401 | on | 15/06/1947 | WLN | Wellington | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 83C | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6301 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 44xx | 2-6-2T | 4401 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 83C | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5021 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | LA | Laira | m/e | 10/1952 | 83C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5021 | m/e | 10/1952 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83C | m/e | 03/1957 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4948 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 83C | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9765 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 83C | m/e | 12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1409 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 83C | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6318 | on | 15/06/1947 | PZ | Penzance | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 83C | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9629 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 83C | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5522 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 83C | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common | m/e | 09/1953 | 83C | m/e | 12/1953 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7711 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 83C | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4917 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 83C | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4917 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 83C | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6365 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 83C | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6938 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 83C | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6385 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 83C | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5992 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 83C | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2211 | on | 15/06/1947 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 83C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5412 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 83C | m/e | 04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9497 | on | 31/12/1954 (New) | 83C | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6322 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 83C | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5362 | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 83C | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5796 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 83C | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4133 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82D | Westbury | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 83C | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6103 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 83C | m/e | 12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1439 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4942 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4955 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83C | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4988 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6407 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9668 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83C | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5344 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83C | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6337 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83C | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6820 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83C | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6870 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | OXF | Oxford | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83C | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4174 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 83C | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5422 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5796 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 83C | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5959 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 83C | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9474 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 83C | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4117 | on | 15/06/1947 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 83C | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5091 | m/e | 09/1955 | 84K | Chester West | m/e | 06/1957 | 83C | m/e | 09/1957 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4967 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83C | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5536 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83C | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5959 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6394 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83C | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4117 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 83C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4548 | on | 15/06/1947 | PZ | Penzance | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 83C | m/e | 11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3746 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5530 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5339 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6965 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4553 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 20/03/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 16/05/1958 | 83C | on | 02/12/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4553 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4992 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7311 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83C | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7326 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 85C | Hereford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3512 | on | 09/05/1958 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3518 | on | 30/05/1958 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 84E | Tyseley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3521 | on | 06/06/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot (New) | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3598 | on | 03/10/1958 (New) | 83C | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4589 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1471 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83C | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5524 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5546 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83F | Truro |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3522 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4944 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6371 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 83C | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4960 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 83C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4117 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1462 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 83C | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5524 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 83G | Penzance | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 83C | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5075 | m/e | 04/1958 | 83D | Laira | on | 18/06/1959 | 83C | on | 25/07/1961 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1452 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 83C | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1007 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 83C | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1023 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 83C | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6319 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 83C | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1608 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9480 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88B | Radyr |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2131 | on | 02/02/1960 | 83B | Taunton (New) | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2132 | on | 12/02/1960 | 83B | Taunton (New) | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5946 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 83C | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4105 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4145 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4150 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4176 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 84D | Leamington |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4178 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 84H | Wellington |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4924 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4930 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5174 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6813 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6829 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4129 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 84G | Kidderminster |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4942 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5020 | on | 22/05/1960 | 83B | Taunton | on | 18/06/1960 | 83C | on | 07/10/1961 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1650 | on | 30/11/1954 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6146 | on | 15/06/1947 | SLO | Slough | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9487 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 83C | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4083 | on | 24/03/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 13/09/1960 | 83C | on | 13/09/1961 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4924 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4930 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5175 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5508 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6814 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6868 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 83C | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4165 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4967 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1466 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1470 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 83C | on | 01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4970 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4984 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4993 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7224 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5913 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83C | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4996 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1468 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5994 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5555 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 83C | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5560 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 83C | m/e | 04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4909 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6994 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 83C | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9633 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3659 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3709 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83C | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9635 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83C | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 83B | Taunton |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2182 | on | 05/03/1962 | 83B | Taunton (New) | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 83C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4162 | on | 04/05/1962 (New) | 83C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4129 | on | 07/05/1962 (New) | 83C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4130 | on | 14/05/1962 (New) | 83C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4673 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 83C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5917 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 83C | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4037 | m/e | 06/1957 | 83A | Newton Abbot | on | 14/07/1962 | 83C | on | 17/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1450 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 83C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5190 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 83C | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6346 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 83C | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1421 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 83C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1442 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82D | Westbury | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 83C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83E | Yeovil Town |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3517 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 83C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3519 | on | 30/05/1958 | 83A | Newton Abbot (New) | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 83C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |