Depot: Faversham
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Faversham | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 1674 | q/e | 12/1935 | FAV | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | Faversham | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 4-4-0 | 1231 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1279 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | STL | St Leonards | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1309 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | STL | St Leonards | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1310 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | STL | St Leonards | ||||
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1440 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||||
Steam | Flying Bedsteads | 4-4-0 | 1448 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1487 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | FAV | Faversham | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1489 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 74D | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 1493 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | STL | St Leonards | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 1496 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 1501 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 73E | Faversham | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1502 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1505 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 74A | Ashford | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1509 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | FAV | Faversham | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1631 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1639 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 1667 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 1674 | q/e | 12/1935 | FAV | Faversham | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | on | 07/06/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1739 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1741 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1808 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1699 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | m/e | 01/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1709 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1691 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1692 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1715 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1229 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1242 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1481 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1495 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1260 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | AFD | Ashford | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31369 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31379 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | m/e | 05/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31106 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | m/e | 01/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31046 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | m/e | 10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31438 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | m/e | 11/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1850 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FAV | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1854 | P | 02/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 1727 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | FAV | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 1661 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | FAV | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1903 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | BAT | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1904 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | BAT | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31639 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FAV | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 31673 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FAV | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1808 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | BM | Bournemouth | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FAV | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1696 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FAV | w/e | 03/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1698 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FAV | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 31705 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FAV | w/e | 09/06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31487 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | Faversham | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | FAV | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31509 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | Faversham | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | FAV | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1273 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | FAV | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31638 | 2w/e | 12/08/1949 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | FAV | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31806 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | FAV | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31830 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FAV | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31268 | on | 01/01/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FAV | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 31157 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73E | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31808 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | FAV | Faversham | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73E | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31868 | P | 02/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73E | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31501 | on | 01/01/1948 | FAV | Faversham | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 73E | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31259 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | RAM | Ramsgate | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 73E | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31532 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | RAM | Ramsgate | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 73E | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31259 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73E | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31532 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73E | w/e | 03/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31487 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | FAV | Faversham | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73E | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31492 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73E | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31494 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31586 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73E | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31737 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 74B | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73E | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31741 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73E | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31748 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 74B | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73E | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31509 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 74D | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 73E | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31545 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74D | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 73E | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31509 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 73E | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31545 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 73E | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31591 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 74A | Ashford | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73E | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31803 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73E | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31804 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73E | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 31708 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73E | w/e | 11/10/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31693 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73E | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31267 | on | 01/01/1948 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73E | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31317 | on | 01/01/1948 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73E | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31162 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 74A | Ashford | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73E | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 74E | St Leonards |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31305 | on | 01/01/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73E | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31255 | on | 24/06/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31256 | on | 01/01/1948 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31253 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73E | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31481 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31295 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 74A | Ashford | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73E | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31326 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73E | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31327 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73E | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31714 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31715 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31461 | on | 01/01/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73E | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31260 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 74D | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 73E | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31260 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 73E | Faversham | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73E | m/e | 05/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31324 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 73E | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31500 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 73E | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31503 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41304 | m/e | 03/1952 (New) | 73E | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 31166 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 73E | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 31315 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 73E | w/e | 20/03/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41305 | m/e | 04/1952 (New) | 73E | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41306 | m/e | 04/1952 (New) | 73E | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41308 | m/e | 04/1952 (New) | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41309 | m/e | 05/1952 (New) | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41310 | m/e | 05/1952 (New) | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41311 | m/e | 05/1952 (New) | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41312 | m/e | 05/1952 (New) | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31505 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 74A | Ashford | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73E | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31637 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 30/07/1952 | 73E | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31637 | 4w/e | 30/07/1952 | 73E | Faversham | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 73E | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 71D | Fratton |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31247 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73E | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 31660 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73E | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 31663 | on | 01/01/1948 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73E | m/e | 07/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 31671 | on | 01/01/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73E | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33002 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73E | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33004 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73E | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33005 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73E | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33016 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73E | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 31704 | on | 01/01/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73E | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31519 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 74D | Tonbridge | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 73E | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 74E | St Leonards |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30052 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 71D | Fratton | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 73E | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30053 | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71D | Fratton | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 73E | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30129 | on | 01/01/1948 | YEO | Yeovil Town | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 73E | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31305 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73E | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31505 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73E | Faversham | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73E | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31852 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 74A | Ashford | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31470 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 73E | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31720 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 73E | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31508 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 73E | 4w/e | 19/03/1954 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31802 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 70C | Guildford | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73E | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31505 | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73E | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31509 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31892 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 73C | Hither Green | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31893 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 73C | Hither Green | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31903 | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31242 | 4w/e | 19/03/1954 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41313 | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 75E | Three Bridges | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31505 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 74A | Ashford | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31765 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31766 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 74D | Tonbridge | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31767 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74E | St Leonards | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 73E | w/e | 18/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 31768 | 2w/e | 13/08/1952 | 74E | St Leonards | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31720 | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31298 | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | RAM | Ramsgate | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 73E | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3670 | on | 25/03/1959 | 73F | Ashford (New) | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73E | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3671 | on | 26/03/1959 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73E | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 73F | Ashford |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3719 | on | 13/04/1959 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73E | m/e | 09/12/1963 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3720 | on | 15/04/1959 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73E | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3721 | on | 13/04/1959 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73E | m/e | 09/12/1963 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2277 | on | 21/09/1959 (New) | 73E | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3670 | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 73C | Hither Green | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 73E | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73E | Faversham |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D3670 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 73E | Faversham | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73E | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 73F | Ashford |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2274 | on | 10/07/1959 | 71B | Bournemouth (New) | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 73E | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11227 | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 73E | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 73F | Ashford |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2256 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 73F | Ashford | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 73E | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 73F | Ashford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3465 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 73E | m/e | 09/12/1963 | 73C | Hither Green |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3471 | on | 28/08/1957 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 73E | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 73F | Ashford |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15221 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 73F | Ashford | m/e | 09/12/1963 | 73E | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 73F | Ashford |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15223 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | HIT | Hither Green (New) | m/e | 09/12/1963 | 73E | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 73F | Ashford |
Diesel | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15226 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 74A | Ashford | m/e | 09/12/1963 | 73E | m/e | 27/01/1964 | 73F | Ashford |