Depot: Feltham
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Feltham | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 166 | q/e | 12/1935 | FEL | on | 01/01/1948 | FRA | Fratton | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 3154 | q/e | 12/1935 | FEL | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 838 | m/e | 10/1939 | FEL | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 839 | m/e | 10/1939 | FEL | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 840 | m/e | 10/1939 | FEL | w/e | 13/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 841 | m/e | 10/1939 | FEL | m/e | 05/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 842 | m/e | 10/1939 | FEL | m/e | 05/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 833 | m/e | 03/1940 | NX | New Cross Gate | m/e | 03/1943 | FEL | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 834 | m/e | 03/1940 | NX | New Cross Gate | m/e | 03/1943 | FEL | w/e | 01/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 835 | m/e | 03/1940 | NX | New Cross Gate | m/e | 03/1943 | FEL | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 836 | m/e | 03/1940 | NX | New Cross Gate | m/e | 03/1943 | FEL | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 837 | m/e | 03/1940 | NX | New Cross Gate | m/e | 03/1943 | FEL | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 139 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 09/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 140 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 01/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 144 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 07/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 153 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 158 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | GFD | Guildford | ||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 167 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 174 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 394 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S11 | 4-4-0 | 396 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | 492 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 02/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | 493 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | on | 05/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | 494 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Hump Engines | 4-8-0T | 495 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 15/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 516 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 517 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 518 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 519 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 520 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 3154 | q/e | 12/1935 | FEL | Feltham | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 3163 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 06/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 3167 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 29/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 3400 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 26/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 3433 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 24/11/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 3496 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70C | Guildford | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 687 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 09/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 688 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 28/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 689 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 697 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 698 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1696 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | P | 02/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1698 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | P | 02/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C31 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C32 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C33 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C34 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C35 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C36 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C37 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C38 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C39 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C40 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | T1 | 0-4-4T | 9 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | m/e | 07/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 254 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 31 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 72B | Salisbury | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 496 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 497 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 498 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 499 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 500 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 30/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 501 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 502 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 15/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 503 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 23/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 504 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 505 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 506 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | on | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 507 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 15/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 508 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 16/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 509 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 510 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 23/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 511 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 512 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 29/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 513 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 31/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 514 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 515 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | w/e | 14/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1696 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | P | 02/01/1948 | FEL | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 1698 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | P | 02/01/1948 | FEL | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 308 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | GFD | Guildford |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 309 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70G | |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 346 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 04/01/1962 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 352 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FEL | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C9 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FEL | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C10 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FEL | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C11 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FEL | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C12 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FEL | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C13 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | FEL | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Small Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 384 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOR | Dorchester | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | FEL | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C8 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | FEL | w/e | 25/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 43 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | FEL | m/e | 05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Hoppers | 4-4-0 | 164 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | FRA | Fratton | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | FEL | m/e | 10/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Z | 0-8-0T | 30955 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | FEL | 6w/e | 12/12/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 30696 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 3w/e | 31/12/1949 | FEL | w/e | 12/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 30331 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FEL | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 30334 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | SAL | Salisbury | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FEL | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | H15 | 4-6-0 | 30335 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | SAL | Salisbury | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FEL | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C6 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FEL | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | C7 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FEL | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30496 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FEL | w/e | 16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30497 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FEL | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 498 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | FEL | m/e | 08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30738 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 70B | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30249 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70B | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30249 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70B | Feltham | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 70B | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30249 | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 70B | Feltham | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 70B | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30455 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30457 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 30693 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAS | Basingstoke | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70B | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30038 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70B | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30038 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70B | m/e | 02/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 30339 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70B | 4w/e | 04/01/1962 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 30355 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70B | w/e | 18/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 30568 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70B | w/e | 12/04/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Jumbos | 0-6-0 | 30571 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 70B | m/e | 07/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30744 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70D | Basingstoke | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 70B | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30733 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71D | Fratton | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 70B | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71D | Fratton |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30230 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 71C | Dorchester | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 70B | on | 20/07/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31852 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 71D | Fratton | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 70B | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31863 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 70B | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31864 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 70B | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33007 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 70B | w/e | 26/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33009 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 70B | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33011 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 70B | w/e | 25/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33026 | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 74D | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 70B | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33027 | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 74D | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30253 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 70B | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30193 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 30/12/1953 | 70B | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13040 | on | 22/01/1954 (New) | 70B | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13041 | on | 27/01/1954 (New) | 70B | on | 06/10/1968 | 98Su | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13042 | on | 03/02/1954 (New) | 70B | 4w/e | 12/04/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30041 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 70B | w/e | 31/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30042 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 70B | w/e | 08/06/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33016 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 70B | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33018 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 70B | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30177 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 71A | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 70B | w/e | 03/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O2 | 0-4-4T | 30179 | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 71A | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 70B | on | 19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30243 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 70B | m/e | 09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32437 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | NHN | Newhaven | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 70B | w/e | 20/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32438 | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 70B | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30130 | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 71A | Eastleigh | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 70B | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30032 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70B | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30775 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70B | w/e | 27/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30777 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70B | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30793 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70B | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30795 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70B | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31892 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73E | Faversham | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70B | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 73J | Tonbridge |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31893 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73E | Faversham | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70B | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 73J | Tonbridge |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30031 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70B | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31033 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 70B | w/e | 19/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G6 | 0-6-0T | 30349 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70C | Guildford | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 70B | w/e | 22/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3100 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 70B | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31061 | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 73J | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 70B | w/e | 29/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31113 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 74C | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 70B | w/e | 15/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31150 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 70B | w/e | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31481 | 4w/e | 19/08/1959 | 73H | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 70B | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31498 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 70B | w/e | 29/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31573 | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 70B | w/e | 18/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31579 | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 70B | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3459 | on | 17/06/1957 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 70B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31414 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73H | Dover Marine | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31857 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31923 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70B | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32408 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32416 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30927 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30931 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30939 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 73F | Ashford | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32408 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70B | Feltham | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32416 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70B | Feltham | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | w/e | 10/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33001 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33002 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33003 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | w/e | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33004 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33014 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33015 | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33017 | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33024 | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 74D | Tonbridge | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33038 | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30035 | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | w/e | 17/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 30519 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 70B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 30516 | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 71A | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 30517 | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 71A | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | on | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 30518 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H16 | 4-6-2T | 30520 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31895 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31896 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31897 | 3w/e | 09/05/1955 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31924 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | 4w/e | 19/11/1962 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33040 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70B | w/e | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30837 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 70B | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4610 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 73H | Dover Marine | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 70B | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 30339 | 4w/e | 04/01/1962 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 70B | w/e | 19/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Black Motors | 0-6-0 | 30346 | 4w/e | 04/01/1962 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 70B | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33028 | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 74D | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 70B | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33029 | on | 01/01/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 70B | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3045 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 74A | Ashford | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 70B | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3046 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 70B | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3044 | 2w/e | 07/07/1955 | 74A | Ashford | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | 70B | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2179 | on | 20/01/1962 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | 4w/e | 12/04/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2180 | on | 01/02/1962 | 73C | Hither Green (New) | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2274 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2294 | on | 04/06/1960 | 75C | Norwood Junction (New) | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | 4w/e | 12/04/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3270 | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | 3w/e | 10/01/1966 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3271 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3272 | 4w/e | 01/05/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3273 | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3274 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3459 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3460 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 70B | 4w/e | 14/06/1968 | 75C | Selhurst |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31917 | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 70B | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30251 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 70B | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4672 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 70B | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4681 | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 70B | on | 06/10/1963 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80012 | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80148 | on | 29/11/1956 | 75A | Brighton (New) | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | on | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92205 | on | 01/01/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92206 | on | 01/01/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92211 | on | 02/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92231 | on | 01/01/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92239 | on | 02/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30835 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | w/e | 22/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30836 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30847 | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80143 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80154 | on | 26/03/1957 | 75A | Brighton (New) | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30841 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | on | 08/09/1963 | 70B | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30842 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | on | 08/09/1963 | 70B | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30843 | P | 02/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | on | 08/09/1963 | 70B | w/e | 20/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30844 | m/e | 11/1946 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | on | 08/09/1963 | 70B | w/e | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73167 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70B | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73168 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73169 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73170 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73171 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80095 | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80137 | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3093 | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | 70B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73016 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73043 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73065 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73155 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31912 | 2w/e | 28/09/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | w/e | 30/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31913 | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | w/e | 01/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31914 | 2w/e | 28/09/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | w/e | 30/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | W | 2-6-4T | 31924 | 2w/e | 28/09/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | w/e | 26/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33026 | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 75E | Three Bridges | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33030 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | w/e | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30823 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 72B | Salisbury | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | w/e | 29/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30824 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 72B | Salisbury | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30830 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70B | w/e | 26/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80018 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33006 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33020 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80133 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87E | Landore | on | 09/08/1964 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80134 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87F | Llanelli | on | 09/08/1964 | 70B | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73083 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73087 | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70B | m/e | 12/10/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34019 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 70E | Salisbury | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34077 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70B | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76053 | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76055 | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 70E | Salisbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76066 | m/e | 14/09/1964 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30824 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30833 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | w/e | 23/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30837 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | w/e | 19/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30838 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | w/e | 19/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30839 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | w/e | 19/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30842 | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3042 | 4w/e | 12/04/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 01/01/1969 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80033 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | on | 02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80034 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | on | 02/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80068 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | on | 02/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80085 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80089 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 20/12/1965 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80094 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | on | 31/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80140 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80141 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 20/12/1965 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73016 | w/e | 20/11/1964 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 70G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73084 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73085 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 25/10/1965 | 70B | 4w/e | 22/11/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3221 | 4w/e | 05/07/1965 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 19/09/1966 | 70B | 4w/e | 14/11/1966 | 70C | Guildford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3047 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70B | 4w/e | 01/01/1969 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3048 | 4w/e | 05/03/1962 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70B | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3221 | 4w/e | 14/11/1966 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70B | on | 29/12/1968 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4100 | 4w/e | 07/02/1966 | 73F | Ashford | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70B | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4101 | on | 03/10/1961 | 73F | Ashford (New) | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70B | 4w/e | 29/01/1968 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4102 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 73F | Ashford | 4w/e | 09/07/1967 | 70B | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3094 | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 10/10/1967 | 70B | 4w/e | 01/01/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2197 | m/e | 01/1968 | 98S | 4w/e | 29/01/1968 | 70B | w/e | 05/02/1968 | 70F | Bournemouth | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3094 | 4w/e | 01/01/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh | w/e | 05/02/1968 | 70B | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4103 | 3w/e | 08/04/1968 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 09/07/1968 | 70B | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4104 | on | 26/10/1961 | 75C | Norwood Junction (New) | 3w/e | 29/07/1968 | 70B | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4105 | on | 07/11/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) (New) | 2w/e | 23/09/1968 | 70B | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3094 | w/e | 30/09/1968 | 70D | Eastleigh | 2w/e | 11/10/1968 | 70B | 4w/e | 01/01/1969 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3041 | on | 06/10/1968 | 98Su | 5w/e | 09/12/1968 | 70B | 4w/e | 10/02/1969 | 75A | Brighton | |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4114 | w/e | 14/12/1968 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | on | 29/12/1968 | 70B | w/e | 04/01/1969 | 75C | Selhurst |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4106 | 2w/e | 23/09/1968 | 75C | Selhurst | 4w/e | 10/02/1969 | 70B | 3w/e | 05/03/1969 | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4111 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 26/04/1969 | 70B | 5w/e | 28/04/1969 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4108 | 4w/e | 10/02/1969 | 70D | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 03/06/1969 | 70B | 9w/e | 22/07/1970 | 75C | Selhurst |