Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 796 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6196 Week
» 24248 Month
» 257168 Year
» 1922544 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Fratton


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Fratton Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam T3 4-4-0 571       m/e 08/1893 (New) FRA m/e 02/1943 Withdrawn
Steam T3 4-4-0 573       m/e 09/1893 (New) FRA m/e 09/1931 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 27       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 11/04/1951 70C Guildford
Steam M7 0-4-4T 45       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 06/10/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam M7 0-4-4T 54       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 06/10/1951 71B Bournemouth
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 113       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 114       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 115       on 01/01/1948 FRA w/e 12/05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 118       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 164       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 166       on 01/01/1948 FRA on 15/07/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 170       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 06/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 172       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 06/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 280       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 287       on 01/01/1948 FRA w/e 16/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 303       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 304       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 05/02/1951 72B Salisbury
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 305       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 314       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 338       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 11/04/1951 72C Yeovil Town
Steam M7 0-4-4T 377       on 01/01/1948 FRA 8w/e 07/10/1952 71A Eastleigh
Steam S11 4-4-0 395       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 405       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 409       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 410       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 12/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 411       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 06/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 412       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 12/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 413       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 13/11/1950 70A Nine Elms
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 414       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 07/10/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 417       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 424       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 07/10/1950 70C Guildford
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 425       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 05/02/1951 71A Eastleigh
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 441       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 480       on 01/01/1948 FRA 6w/e 20/03/1951 71A Eastleigh
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 731       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 732       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 27/07/1951 71D Fratton
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 733       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 08/12/1950 71B Bournemouth
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1797       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 11/04/1951 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1831       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 09/09/1950 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2153       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D1M 0-4-2T 2269       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 07/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2337       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 07/10/1950 75G Eastbourne
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2338       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 05/02/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2490       on 01/01/1948 FRA w/e 17/12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2509       on 01/01/1948 FRA 5w/e 26/11/1959 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2537       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A Brighton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2548       on 01/01/1948 FRA 6w/e 20/03/1951 71D Fratton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2554       on 01/01/1948 FRA w/e 06/02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2559       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 06/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2562       on 01/01/1948 FRA 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A Brighton
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2690       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 01/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2691       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 2694       on 01/01/1948 FRA 6w/e 15/06/1956 71I Southampton Docks
Steam T1 0-4-4T 20       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 2640       on 01/01/1948 FRA 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 2644       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 17/06/1950 To Store
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 2655       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 26/05/1953 74A Ashford
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 2659       on 01/01/1948 FRA m/e 08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 2661       on 01/01/1948 FRA 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 2662       on 01/01/1948 FRA 4w/e 01/10/1953 74E St Leonards
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32646       4w/e 30/06/1949 FRA 6w/e 05/09/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32677       4w/e 30/06/1949 FRA 4w/e 12/05/1951 74A Ashford
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 30426 on 01/01/1948 BAS Basingstoke 4w/e 17/06/1950 71D 4w/e 05/02/1951 71A Eastleigh
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 30427 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 17/06/1950 71D 4w/e 05/02/1951 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31612 on 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 13/11/1950 71D 4w/e 05/02/1951 70E Reading (S.R.)
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30053 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 08/12/1950 71D 6w/e 27/03/1953 73E Faversham
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 30416 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 08/12/1950 71D 8w/e 27/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30711 on 01/01/1948 PLY Plymouth Friary 4w/e 08/12/1950 71D 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32139 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 4w/e 08/12/1950 71D w/e 10/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Marsh Goods 0-6-0 32302 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 08/12/1950 71D on 12/01/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32399 on 01/01/1948 HOR Horsham 4w/e 08/12/1950 71D 4w/e 05/02/1951 75D Horsham
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 30418 on 01/01/1948 BAS Basingstoke 4w/e 05/02/1951 71D 8w/e 27/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31807 on 01/01/1948 RDG Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 05/02/1951 71D w/e 11/03/1959 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31870 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 05/02/1951 71D 4w/e 06/10/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31871 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 05/02/1951 71D 4w/e 06/10/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32568 4w/e 08/12/1950 75B Redhill 4w/e 05/02/1951 71D 4w/e 01/10/1953 70D Basingstoke
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30733 4w/e 08/12/1950 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 20/03/1951 71D 4w/e 12/05/1951 71D Fratton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32548 on 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 6w/e 20/03/1951 71D 4w/e 12/05/1951 71D Fratton
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32647 on 01/01/1948 NHN Newhaven 4w/e 11/04/1951 71D m/e 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30307 4w/e 30/06/1949 YEO Yeovil Town 4w/e 12/05/1951 71D 8w/e 07/10/1952 72B Salisbury
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30733 6w/e 20/03/1951 71D Fratton 4w/e 12/05/1951 71D 4w/e 21/01/1952 71D Fratton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32548 6w/e 20/03/1951 71D Fratton 4w/e 12/05/1951 71D 5w/e 26/11/1959 75C Norwood Junction
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30051 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 7w/e 27/06/1951 71D 8w/e 20/07/1953 75A Brighton
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 30415 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 7w/e 27/06/1951 71D m/e 02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 32160 4w/e 11/04/1951 70C Guildford 7w/e 27/06/1951 71D m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32549 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951 71D 5w/e 26/11/1959 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32550 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951 71D 5w/e 26/11/1959 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33016 4w/e 09/09/1950 70C Guildford 7w/e 27/06/1951 71D 4w/e 21/01/1952 71A Eastleigh
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30732 on 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 4w/e 27/07/1951 71D 4w/e 08/01/1953 70C Guildford
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32349 4w/e 07/10/1950 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 27/07/1951 71D 5w/e 26/11/1959 75E Three Bridges
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31851 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951 71D 8w/e 20/07/1953 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31852 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951 71D 5w/e 14/02/1953 70B Feltham
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30733 4w/e 12/05/1951 71D Fratton 4w/e 21/01/1952 71D m/e 06/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32479 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 21/01/1952 71D 5w/e 26/11/1959 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32495 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 21/01/1952 71D 4w/e 10/10/1955 70A Nine Elms
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30725 4w/e 06/10/1951 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 30/06/1952 71D on 06/12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30726 4w/e 06/10/1951 70D Basingstoke 9w/e 30/06/1952 71D q/e 06/06/1958 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam P 0-6-0T 31027 4w/e 19/03/1952 71A Eastleigh 9w/e 30/06/1952 71D 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C Dover Marine
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32640 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton 9w/e 30/06/1952 71D 6w/e 13/08/1952 74E St Leonards
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31844 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 13/08/1952 71D 8w/e 20/07/1953 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31808 4w/e 19/03/1952 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 07/10/1952 71D w/e 11/03/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32138 4w/e 19/03/1952 71I Southampton Docks 8w/e 07/10/1952 71D w/e 03/11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30732 4w/e 08/01/1953 70C Guildford 5w/e 14/02/1953 71D 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32677 4w/e 12/05/1951 74A Ashford 5w/e 14/02/1953 71D w/e 12/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30023 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 27/03/1953 71D 4w/e 26/05/1953 71D Fratton
Steam O2 0-4-4T 30207 on 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 6w/e 27/03/1953 71D w/e 29/06/1957 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30023 6w/e 27/03/1953 71D Fratton 4w/e 26/05/1953 71D 8w/e 20/07/1953 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30055 7w/e 27/06/1951 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 20/07/1953 71D 6w/e 21/06/1955 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30356 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 20/07/1953 71D 9w/e 08/02/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30357 7w/e 27/06/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 20/07/1953 71D 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31805 5w/e 14/02/1953 75B Redhill 8w/e 20/07/1953 71D 5w/e 26/11/1959 70C Guildford
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32505 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 8w/e 20/07/1953 71D 4w/e 10/10/1955 70C Guildford
Steam O2 0-4-4T 30183 on 01/01/1948 PLY Plymouth Friary 8w/e 20/07/1953 71D 4w/e 29/10/1953 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32646 6w/e 05/09/1951 75A Brighton 5w/e 24/08/1953 71D 8w/e 13/05/1954 75A Brighton
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32650       5w/e 24/08/1953 71D 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31637 6w/e 13/08/1952 73E Faversham 4w/e 01/10/1953 71D w/e 11/03/1959 70C Guildford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31638 8w/e 20/07/1953 73C Hither Green 4w/e 01/10/1953 71D 5w/e 26/11/1959 70C Guildford
Steam D15 4-4-0 30465 8w/e 20/07/1953 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 10/12/1953 71D 6w/e 18/06/1954 70A Nine Elms
Steam D15 4-4-0 30471 4w/e 01/10/1953 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 30/12/1953 71D m/e 03/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32640 8w/e 07/10/1952 75A Brighton 8w/e 13/05/1954 71D 4w/e 10/10/1955 75A Brighton
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30729 4w/e 12/05/1951 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 18/06/1954 71D q/e 06/06/1958 72B Salisbury
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32343 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 4w/e 06/11/1954 70F 4w/e 11/12/1954 75A Brighton
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32337 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 11/12/1954 70F 5w/e 26/11/1959 75E Three Bridges
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30337 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 9w/e 08/02/1955 70F 3w/e 17/11/1956 70C Guildford
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30022 4w/e 08/02/1954 70C Guildford 6w/e 21/06/1955 70F w/e 17/05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30039 4w/e 12/05/1951 72D Plymouth Friary 6w/e 21/06/1955 70F 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31611 8w/e 13/05/1954 75B Redhill 6w/e 21/06/1955 70F 3w/e 13/10/1958 71A Eastleigh
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32495 4w/e 10/10/1955 70A Nine Elms 7w/e 19/12/1955 70F 5w/e 26/11/1959 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32640 4w/e 10/10/1955 75A Brighton 6w/e 15/06/1956 70F 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32646 8w/e 13/05/1954 75A Brighton 6w/e 15/06/1956 70F 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32694 6w/e 15/06/1956 71I Southampton Docks 4w/e 11/07/1956 70F 7w/e 27/08/1956 71I Southampton Docks
Steam Black Tanks 0-6-0T 32694 7w/e 27/08/1956 71I Southampton Docks 3w/e 17/11/1956 70F 5w/e 26/11/1959 71I Southampton Docks
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31804 6w/e 15/06/1956 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 25/01/1957 70F 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30356 9w/e 08/02/1955 71A Eastleigh q/e 06/06/1958 70F w/e 06/12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32678 4w/e 08/02/1954 74E St Leonards q/e 06/06/1958 70F 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30377 4w/e 08/02/1954 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 14/06/1959 70F 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31614 6w/e 21/06/1955 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 14/06/1959 70F 5w/e 26/11/1959 70C Guildford
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 32636 q/e 06/06/1958 74A Ashford 6w/e 22/10/1959 70F 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh