Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 779 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6179 Week
» 24231 Month
» 257151 Year
» 1922527 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Ardrossan


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Ardrossan Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 2P 4-4-0 578       on 01/01/1948 30C on 20/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 579       on 01/01/1948 30C on 29/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 606       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 25/10/1958 64D Carstairs
Steam 2P 4-4-0 607       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 29/11/1952 66A Polmadie
Steam 2P 4-4-0 608       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 11/04/1959 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 609       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 11/04/1959 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 624       on 01/01/1948 30C on 11/08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 625       on 01/01/1948 30C on 02/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 626       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 06/06/1959 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 667       on 01/01/1948 30C on 20/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 668       on 01/01/1948 30C on 31/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 669       on 01/01/1948 30C on 13/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 294 0-6-0 17276       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 06/08/1955 63D Oban
Steam 294 0-6-0 17274       on 01/01/1948 30C w/e 30/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 294 0-6-0 17282       on 01/01/1948 30C on 15/11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 294 0-6-0 57304       on 01/01/1948 30C on 05/06/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 294 0-6-0 17348       on 01/01/1948 30C w/e 01/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 294 0-6-0 17357       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 23/02/1952 67B Hurlford
Steam 294 0-6-0 17355       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 22/12/1962 67F Stranraer
Steam 294 0-6-0 17356       on 01/01/1948 30C on 06/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 812 0-6-0 17627       on 01/01/1948 30C on 07/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 812 0-6-0 57577       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 08/06/1957 67B Hurlford
Steam 812 0-6-0 57579       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 14/06/1952 67A Corkerhill
Steam 812 0-6-0 57590       on 01/01/1948 30C on 16/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 300 0-6-0 57669       on 01/01/1948 30C on 20/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 300 0-6-0 57673       on 01/01/1948 30C on 26/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 782 0-6-0T 56259       on 01/01/1948 30C m/e 07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 782 0-6-0T 56279       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 25/10/1958 67A Corkerhill
Steam 782 0-6-0T 56282       on 01/01/1948 30C on 02/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 782 0-6-0T 56311       on 01/01/1948 30C on 08/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 782 0-6-0T 56364       on 01/01/1948 30C 8w/e 27/10/1956 67A Corkerhill
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2209       on 01/01/1948 30C w/e 06/02/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2210       on 01/01/1948 30C w/e 06/02/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2211       on 01/01/1948 30C 4w/e 26/09/1959 67A Corkerhill
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2212 4w/e 22/06/1946 24B Rose Grove on 01/01/1948 30C 8w/e 09/09/1951 67A Corkerhill
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42212 8w/e 09/09/1951 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 06/10/1951 67D w/e 06/02/1960 6A Chester (MR)
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 42911 on 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 26/01/1952 67D on 30/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 42742 4w/e 17/05/1952 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 14/06/1952 67D w/e 30/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 294 0-6-0 57357 4w/e 23/02/1952 67B Hurlford 8w/e 21/03/1953 67D on 26/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40607 4w/e 13/06/1953 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 26/12/1953 67D 4w/e 06/06/1959 67B Hurlford
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40666 4w/e 26/12/1953 67B Hurlford 4w/e 20/02/1954 67D on 31/07/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40638 on 01/01/1948 30D Ayr 8w/e 17/04/1954 67D 4w/e 26/08/1961 68C Stranraer
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 42912 4w/e 07/08/1954 67C Ayr 4w/e 02/10/1954 67D 4w/e 26/09/1959 67C Ayr
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 42806 4w/e 17/05/1952 67A Corkerhill 8w/e 16/04/1955 67D on 28/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 294 0-6-0 57254 on 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 06/08/1955 67D w/e 30/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 294 0-6-0 57266 on 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 18/02/1956 67D on 13/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42697 4w/e 22/01/1955 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 12/05/1956 67D w/e 06/02/1960 26A Newton Heath
Steam 294 0-6-0 57309 on 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 8w/e 22/12/1956 67D on 07/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44159 4w/e 04/10/1952 67B Hurlford 4w/e 08/06/1957 67D 4w/e 19/12/1959 67A Corkerhill
Steam 812 0-6-0 57566 on 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 8w/e 31/08/1957 67D on 08/08/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 812 0-6-0 57579 4w/e 14/06/1952 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 28/09/1957 67D on 27/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44908 4w/e 28/11/1953 65A Eastfield 4w/e 26/10/1957 67D 4w/e 18/01/1958 65A Eastfield
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80030 8w/e 19/04/1952 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 25/10/1958 67D 4w/e 14/02/1959 67A Corkerhill
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42124       4w/e 25/10/1958 67D on 27/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40606 4w/e 25/10/1958 64D Carstairs 4w/e 22/11/1958 67D on 25/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 782 0-6-0T 56352 on 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 14/03/1959 67D on 15/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45456 on 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 14/03/1959 67D 4w/e 04/07/1959 67C Ayr
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45457 on 01/01/1948 29A Perth South 4w/e 14/03/1959 67D 4w/e 04/07/1959 67C Ayr
Steam 782 0-6-0T 56372 4w/e 25/10/1958 67C Ayr 4w/e 06/06/1959 67D 4w/e 04/07/1959 67C Ayr
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 42800 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 26/09/1959 67D 4w/e 19/12/1959 67C Ayr
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45456 4w/e 04/07/1959 67C Ayr 4w/e 26/09/1959 67D 5w/e 30/05/1964 67E Dumfries
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45457 4w/e 04/07/1959 67C Ayr 4w/e 26/09/1959 67D on 16/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45251 on 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 24/10/1959 67D on 28/12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45490 on 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 24/10/1959 67D 4w/e 08/09/1962 67C Ayr
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42194 8w/e 27/10/1956 67C Ayr 4w/e 21/11/1959 67D 4w/e 19/01/1963 65A Eastfield
Steam 782 0-6-0T 56372 4w/e 04/07/1959 67C Ayr 4w/e 13/02/1960 67D on 11/05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42123       4w/e 12/03/1960 67D w/e 19/10/1963 55H Neville Hill
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42191 4w/e 17/05/1952 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 09/04/1960 67D on 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 29 0-6-0T 56232 4w/e 04/07/1959 67C Ayr 4w/e 02/07/1960 67D w/e 30/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42193       4w/e 30/07/1960 67D on 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45053 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 22/10/1960 67D 4w/e 01/07/1961 64C Dalry Road
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45384 4w/e 07/05/1960 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 22/10/1960 67D 4w/e 08/09/1962 67C Ayr
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 55264 4w/e 04/07/1959 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 11/02/1961 67D m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90463 4w/e 25/10/1958 67C Ayr 4w/e 11/02/1961 67D on 14/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90505 4w/e 26/01/1952 67C Ayr 4w/e 11/02/1961 67D w/e 11/06/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3927       on 16/02/1961 (New) 67D 4w/e 25/07/1964 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3928       on 22/02/1961 (New) 67D 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3929       on 01/03/1961 (New) 67D 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90319 5w/e 24/03/1951 67C Ayr 4w/e 11/03/1961 67D 4w/e 08/09/1962 67C Ayr
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90549 4w/e 22/10/1960 67C Ayr 4w/e 11/03/1961 67D 4w/e 21/04/1962 67C Ayr
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45167 4w/e 04/06/1960 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 03/06/1961 67D 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80020       4w/e 01/07/1961 67D 4w/e 29/07/1961 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80021       4w/e 01/07/1961 67D 4w/e 29/07/1961 67A Corkerhill
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80028       4w/e 01/07/1961 67D 4w/e 14/07/1962 67B Hurlford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80029       4w/e 01/07/1961 67D 4w/e 14/07/1962 67B Hurlford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3926 on 08/02/1961 67A Corkerhill (New) 4w/e 26/08/1961 67D 4w/e 28/03/1964 67E Dumfries
Steam 294 0-6-0 57249 on 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 26/08/1961 67D 4w/e 26/08/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45463 4w/e 03/06/1961 67B Hurlford 4w/e 26/08/1961 67D 5w/e 30/05/1964 67E Dumfries
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43996 on 16/04/1951 67A Corkerhill on 25/09/1961 67D on 12/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67613 4w/e 14/01/1961 65C Parkhead 4w/e 21/10/1961 67D 6w/e 30/12/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67648 4w/e 06/05/1961 65E Kipps 4w/e 21/10/1961 67D 6w/e 30/12/1961 67B Hurlford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42203 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 18/11/1961 67D on 21/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45497 4w/e 21/10/1961 67A Corkerhill 6w/e 30/12/1961 67D 4w/e 08/09/1962 67C Ayr
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 42740 4w/e 23/11/1957 66D Greenock Ladyburn 4w/e 24/03/1962 67D 4w/e 28/03/1964 67C Ayr
Steam J36 0-6-0 65214 4w/e 18/11/1961 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 24/03/1962 67D on 14/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J36 0-6-0 65273 4w/e 12/04/1958 65C Parkhead 4w/e 24/03/1962 67D on 07/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90198 4w/e 24/03/1962 66A Polmadie 4w/e 21/04/1962 67D 4w/e 21/04/1962 67C Ayr
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44977 4w/e 27/11/1954 63D Fort William 4w/e 21/04/1962 67D 4w/e 08/09/1962 67C Ayr
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45470 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 21/04/1962 67D w/e 10/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45479 4w/e 21/04/1962 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 21/04/1962 67D m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 294 0-6-0 57336 4w/e 16/06/1962 67B Hurlford 4w/e 22/12/1962 67D on 16/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 294 0-6-0 57270 on 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell 5w/e 07/09/1963 67D on 07/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 652 0-6-0 57630 4w/e 16/03/1963 66E Carstairs 5w/e 07/09/1963 67D on 14/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44974 6w/e 30/12/1961 66A Polmadie 5w/e 07/09/1963 67D 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr
Steam 812 0-6-0 57581 on 01/01/1948 27A Polmadie 4w/e 05/10/1963 67D on 07/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80077 w/e 08/12/1962 56B Ardsley 4w/e 02/11/1963 67D 4w/e 25/07/1964 67A Corkerhill
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46482 w/e 01/12/1962 51A Darlington 4w/e 02/11/1963 67D 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46498 4w/e 13/04/1963 66A Polmadie 4w/e 02/11/1963 67D 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 42863 m/e 16/06/1956 25A Wakefield 4w/e 30/11/1963 67D 4w/e 28/03/1964 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80115 4w/e 26/08/1961 66A Polmadie 4w/e 25/01/1964 67D 4w/e 25/07/1964 66A Polmadie
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45158 on 01/01/1948 31A St Rollox (Balornock) 4w/e 25/01/1964 67D 5w/e 30/05/1964 67E Dumfries
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2574 on 18/07/1958 68C Stranraer (New) 4w/e 28/03/1964 67D 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44723 4w/e 04/06/1960 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 28/03/1964 67D 5w/e 30/05/1964 67E Dumfries
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45365 4w/e 02/07/1960 67A Corkerhill 4w/e 28/03/1964 67D 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76001 4w/e 08/09/1962 67A Corkerhill 5w/e 30/05/1964 67D 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76098 m/e 10/1957 67A Corkerhill (New) 5w/e 30/05/1964 67D 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76099 4w/e 19/01/1963 67A Corkerhill 5w/e 30/05/1964 67D w/e 23/01/1965 5D Stoke
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46413 4w/e 30/11/1963 67B Hurlford 5w/e 31/10/1964 67D 4w/e 27/02/1965 67C Ayr