Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 440 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7123 Week
» 18169 Month
» 18169 Year
» 1683545 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Frodingham


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Frodingham Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6074 m/e 07/1905 KEA Keadby (New) on 08/06/1932 FRO on 20/01/1936 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6568 on 17/03/1932 IMM Immingham on 11/06/1932 FRO on 12/09/1944 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 6518 on 09/04/1932 IMM Immingham on 11/06/1932 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5352 on 04/11/1930 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 01/07/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 6215 on 23/07/1931 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 22/02/1952 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6223 on 16/06/1931 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 05/05/1946 TUX Tuxford
Steam O4 2-8-0 6237 on 22/12/1931 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 01/07/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 6242 on 06/11/1930 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 22/01/1939 ANN Annesley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6243 on 15/11/1929 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 07/01/1945 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6248 on 06/11/1930 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 21/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6250 on 12/08/1931 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6569 on 07/01/1931 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 21/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6572 on 27/02/1930 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6366 on 14/04/1932 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 01/07/1951 39B Sheffield Darnall
Steam O4 2-8-0 6362 on 17/03/1932 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 18/10/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6515 on 11/06/1932 KEA Keadby on 12/06/1932 FRO on 06/12/1944 GOR Gorton
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5085 on 11/06/1932 KEA Keadby on 18/06/1932 FRO on 13/09/1939 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5139 on 11/06/1932 KEA Keadby on 18/06/1932 FRO on 18/08/1934 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5140 m/e 02/1904 KEA Keadby (New) on 18/06/1932 FRO on 27/11/1937 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5147 m/e 03/1904 KEA Keadby (New) on 18/06/1932 FRO on 27/08/1939 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5150 m/e 04/1904 KEA Keadby (New) on 18/06/1932 FRO on 06/03/1939 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5151 on 13/06/1929 KEA Keadby on 18/06/1932 FRO on 16/05/1939 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5153 m/e 05/1904 KEA Keadby (New) on 18/06/1932 FRO on 09/08/1943 BRN Barnsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5039 m/e 02/1909 KEA Keadby (New) on 18/06/1932 FRO on 07/01/1939 BRN Barnsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5356 on 12/10/1929 KEA Keadby on 18/06/1932 FRO on 08/05/1937 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5164 m/e 1923 KEA Keadby on 18/06/1932 FRO on 19/02/1939 BRN Barnsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5964 on 10/10/1929 KEA Keadby on 18/06/1932 FRO on 30/08/1938 Withdrawn
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5273 on 30/11/1929 IMM Immingham on 15/09/1932 FRO on 16/11/1944 MEX Mexborough
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5369 on 05/11/1929 IMM Immingham on 20/09/1932 FRO on 04/10/1941 NEA Neasden
Steam O4 2-8-0 6191 on 29/06/1932 LIN Lincoln on 19/08/1933 FRO on 07/04/1946 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 6642 on 24/02/1930 TUX Tuxford on 30/11/1933 FRO on 04/11/1945 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 5353 on 07/12/1927 LIN Lincoln on 02/12/1933 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5005 on 24/12/1926 DON Doncaster on 05/02/1934 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5377 on 04/12/1927 LIN Lincoln on 17/02/1934 FRO on 18/03/1951 38A Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 6571 on 25/07/1927 IMM Immingham on 01/09/1934 FRO on 11/09/1944 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 5334 on 06/01/1924 IMM Immingham on 04/09/1934 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6260 on 22/03/1924 GOR Gorton on 21/02/1935 FRO on 13/10/1941 Withdrawn
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5961 on 16/02/1924 DON Doncaster on 31/01/1936 FRO on 22/08/1939 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 6226 m/e 11/1912 ANN Annesley (New) on 12/02/1939 FRO on 22/12/1944 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 6523 on 22/11/1938 SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 03/03/1939 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6534 on 17/08/1925 DON Doncaster on 03/03/1939 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6538 on 27/09/1930 LNG Langwith Junction on 12/03/1939 FRO on 18/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6636 on 11/05/1937 LNG Langwith Junction on 12/03/1939 FRO on 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6525 on 30/03/1932 STV Staveley (G.C.) on 17/03/1939 FRO on 26/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6255 on 28/12/1923 GOR Gorton on 18/03/1939 FRO on 11/09/1944 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 6516 on 28/03/1926 SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 09/06/1939 FRO on 02/03/1952 36D Barnsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 5019 on 03/03/1924 MEX Mexborough on 23/08/1939 FRO on 14/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6263 on 17/01/1925 DON Doncaster on 05/09/1939 FRO on 24/12/1944 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 6561 on 24/02/1930 DON Doncaster on 13/09/1939 FRO on 24/12/1944 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 6239 on 16/02/1924 ANN Annesley on 28/09/1939 FRO on 21/09/1941 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6323 on 04/04/1924 ANN Annesley on 28/09/1939 FRO on 24/04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam A7 4-6-2T 1190 on 21/10/1926 DON Doncaster on 08/10/1941 FRO on 23/06/1943 SBK Starbeck
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 5058 on 28/04/1934 BRN Barnsley on 11/07/1942 FRO on 09/11/1942 LNG Langwith Junction
Steam K2 2-6-0 4633 on 16/02/1938 DON Doncaster on 04/07/1943 FRO on 25/07/1943 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4634 on 07/12/1935 DON Doncaster on 04/07/1943 FRO on 25/07/1943 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4637 on 27/02/1940 DON Doncaster on 04/07/1943 FRO on 25/07/1943 DON Doncaster
Steam K2 2-6-0 4673 m/e 06/1918 DON Doncaster (New) on 04/07/1943 FRO on 25/07/1943 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5966 on 07/04/1941 DON Doncaster on 25/07/1943 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6284 on 28/08/1932 DON Doncaster on 25/07/1943 FRO on 19/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6592 on 21/10/1940 DON Doncaster on 25/07/1943 FRO on 10/10/1965 36A Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6280 on 23/12/1924 DON Doncaster on 25/07/1943 FRO on 09/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6192 on 11/03/1939 BRN Barnsley on 13/08/1943 FRO on 12/09/1944 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 6365 on 10/02/1943 DFU Dunfermline Upper on 29/09/1943 FRO on 20/05/1951 40B Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 5022 on 03/02/1943 GOR Gorton on 06/12/1944 FRO on 22/09/1952 37A Ardsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6281 on 21/05/1944 GOR Gorton on 07/01/1945 FRO on 18/12/1949 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6190 on 20/08/1912 MEX Mexborough on 16/09/1945 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6548 on 06/10/1943 MEX Mexborough on 16/09/1945 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6543 on 03/10/1943 MEX Mexborough on 16/09/1945 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6321 on 25/06/1945 GOR Gorton on 04/11/1945 FRO on 14/04/1946 STV Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 5399 on 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster on 02/12/1945 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6354 on 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster on 02/12/1945 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6361 on 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster on 02/12/1945 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6604 on 23/01/1944 DON Doncaster on 02/12/1945 FRO on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3456 on 04/01/1938 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 17/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3459 on 07/10/1939 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3460 on 25/06/1945 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3462 on 25/06/1945 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3463 on 25/06/1945 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3464 on 25/06/1945 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3465 on 17/01/1936 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3466 on 14/12/1937 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3467 on 25/06/1945 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3468 on 25/06/1945 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3470 on 25/06/1945 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3471 on 25/06/1945 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3472 on 01/08/1945 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 19/06/1947 Withdrawn
Steam O3 2-8-0 3473 on 25/06/1945 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3474 on 25/06/1945 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 10/05/1947 Withdrawn
Steam O3 2-8-0 3475 on 23/11/1940 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O3 2-8-0 3476 on 12/07/1939 DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O1 2-8-0 6356 on 23/05/1938 LNG Langwith Junction on 07/04/1946 FRO on 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6364 on 10/08/1944 WFD Woodford Halse on 07/04/1946 FRO on 30/01/1955 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam O1 2-8-0 6213 on 30/09/1944 STV Staveley (G.C.) on 14/04/1946 FRO on 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O3 2-8-0 3458 on 26/08/1939 DON Doncaster on 25/04/1946 FRO on 17/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 5381 on 11/08/1944 WFD Woodford Halse on 28/04/1946 FRO on 13/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam O3 2-8-0 3457 on 25/06/1945 DON Doncaster on 04/05/1946 FRO on 18/01/1948 DON Doncaster
Steam O1 2-8-0 3796 on 04/08/1939 TUX Tuxford on 05/05/1946 FRO on 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton
Steam O4 2-8-0 6188 on 23/12/1945 IMM Immingham on 12/05/1946 FRO on 09/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6264 on 09/12/1945 IMM Immingham on 12/05/1946 FRO on 06/07/1958 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 5001 on 16/09/1945 IMM Immingham on 12/05/1946 FRO on 22/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 6500 on 16/09/1945 IMM Immingham on 12/05/1946 FRO on 17/08/1952 36D Barnsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 5405 on 12/05/1946 GOR Gorton on 26/05/1946 FRO on 02/03/1952 36D Barnsley
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 9930 on 25/08/1946 DON Doncaster on 24/09/1946 FRO on 16/04/1950 30A Stratford
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 9932 on 25/08/1946 DON Doncaster on 24/09/1946 FRO on 12/11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 9934 on 25/08/1946 DON Doncaster on 26/09/1946 FRO on 20/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 9935 on 25/08/1946 DON Doncaster on 26/09/1946 FRO on 03/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 9937 on 25/08/1946 DON Doncaster on 28/09/1946 FRO on 05/11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 9936 on 25/08/1946 DON Doncaster on 28/09/1946 FRO on 15/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O2 2-8-0 3934 on 25/06/1945 GRA Grantham on 09/02/1947 FRO on 13/06/1954 36A Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3937 on 25/06/1945 GRA Grantham on 09/02/1947 FRO on 18/10/1953 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam O2 2-8-0 3939 on 25/06/1945 GRA Grantham on 09/02/1947 FRO on 29/08/1954 36A Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3941 on 25/06/1945 GRA Grantham on 09/02/1947 FRO on 12/03/1950 40E Langwith Junction
Steam L3 2-6-4T 9058 on 20/10/1946 SHF Sheffield Darnall on 16/02/1947 FRO on 29/08/1949 Withdrawn
Steam L3 2-6-4T 9057 on 28/08/1946 SHF Sheffield Darnall on 09/03/1947 FRO on 10/10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam O2 2-8-0 3922 on 09/12/1945 DON Doncaster on 20/10/1947 FRO on 13/06/1954 36A Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3944 on 30/11/1945 DON Doncaster on 20/10/1947 FRO on 13/06/1954 36A Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3963 on 11/12/1945 DON Doncaster on 20/10/1947 FRO on 13/06/1954 36A Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 3975 on 11/12/1945 DON Doncaster on 20/10/1947 FRO on 12/03/1950 40E Langwith Junction
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8962       on 01/01/1948 FRO w/e 31/01/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8964       on 01/01/1948 FRO w/e 31/01/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8968       on 01/01/1948 FRO 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8970       on 01/01/1948 FRO 4w/e 19/07/1958 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8971       on 01/01/1948 FRO 4w/e 15/11/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8973       on 01/01/1948 FRO 4w/e 25/07/1953 36A Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 3572 on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 18/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O1 2-8-0 3594 on 13/01/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 22/02/1948 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 3601 on 29/12/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 20/05/1951 40B Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 3660 on 27/10/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 14/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 3671 on 27/10/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 13/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 3617 on 20/10/1947 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 12/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 3643 on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 10/09/1950 40E Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 3684 on 20/10/1947 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 18/03/1951 38A Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 3745 on 27/10/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 07/06/1953 40B Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 3587 on 12/01/1947 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 18/03/1951 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 3659 on 20/10/1947 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 13/11/1955 36D Barnsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3668 on 07/04/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 02/02/1948 MEX Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 3832 on 27/10/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 20/05/1951 40B Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 3847 on 27/10/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 18/03/1951 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 3728 on 03/02/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 20/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 3731 on 24/11/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 17/08/1952 36D Barnsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 3911 on 18/08/1946 DON Doncaster on 18/01/1948 FRO on 13/11/1955 36D Barnsley
Steam L3 2-6-4T 9051 on 07/05/1947 MEX Mexborough on 22/02/1948 FRO on 14/05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam L3 2-6-4T 9066 on 11/08/1947 MEX Mexborough on 22/02/1948 FRO on 17/04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 3576 on 18/08/1946 MEX Mexborough on 07/08/1949 FRO on 29/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63917 on 04/10/1947 IMM Immingham on 10/12/1949 FRO on 05/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63747 on 08/09/1946 MEX Mexborough on 25/12/1949 FRO on 18/05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 3906 on 20/09/1919 MEX Mexborough on 25/12/1949 FRO on 03/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63653 on 07/09/1944 MAR March on 26/03/1950 36C on 19/09/1965 36A Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 63718 on 29/03/1948 MAR March on 26/03/1950 36C on 17/08/1952 36D Barnsley
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 69930 on 16/04/1950 30A Stratford on 27/08/1950 36C on 02/10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63741 on 25/06/1950 40E Langwith Junction on 10/09/1950 36C on 04/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8974 on 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 21/10/1950 36C 4w/e 25/07/1953 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90111 4w/e 21/10/1950 31B March 5w/e 24/03/1951 36C on 06/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90540       5w/e 24/03/1951 36C w/e 04/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90422       5w/e 24/03/1951 36C w/e 06/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90425       5w/e 24/03/1951 36C on 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90013       5w/e 24/03/1951 36C w/e 05/03/1966 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90070 4w/e 21/10/1950 31B March 5w/e 24/03/1951 36C w/e 21/02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90032 4w/e 21/10/1950 31B March 5w/e 24/03/1951 36C w/e 27/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 69926 on 21/10/1948 MAR March on 08/04/1951 36C on 03/02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90646       4w/e 19/05/1951 36C on 05/05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68960 4w/e 21/10/1950 36A Doncaster 4w/e 19/05/1951 36C 4w/e 19/07/1958 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90133       5w/e 23/06/1951 36C on 17/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90456       5w/e 23/06/1951 36C w/e 27/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90031       4w/e 21/07/1951 36C w/e 11/11/1961 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90647 5w/e 24/03/1951 35A New England 4w/e 21/07/1951 36C w/e 07/03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90490       4w/e 21/07/1951 36C w/e 11/11/1961 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90059 4w/e 19/01/1952 36A Doncaster 4w/e 22/03/1952 36C w/e 04/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90714       4w/e 22/03/1952 36C on 13/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam O2 2-8-0 63983 on 02/07/1950 36B Mexborough on 17/08/1952 36C on 13/06/1954 36A Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 63984 on 02/07/1950 36B Mexborough on 17/08/1952 36C on 29/08/1954 36A Doncaster
Steam O2 2-8-0 63985 on 02/07/1950 36B Mexborough on 17/08/1952 36C on 13/06/1954 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68815 on 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952 36C 4w/e 13/12/1952 35B Grantham
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68793 on 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 15/11/1952 36C 4w/e 25/07/1953 36A Doncaster
Steam J52 0-6-0ST 68798 4w/e 23/12/1950 35B Grantham 4w/e 13/12/1952 36C 4w/e 20/06/1953 38A Colwick
Steam O2 2-8-0 63945 on 25/06/1950 36A Doncaster on 12/04/1953 36C on 03/01/1954 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam O2 2-8-0 63961 on 25/06/1950 36A Doncaster on 12/04/1953 36C on 03/01/1954 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68980 on 01/01/1948 DON Doncaster 4w/e 20/06/1953 36C 4w/e 25/05/1956 36A Doncaster
Steam L3 2-6-4T 69060 on 31/05/1953 34A Kings Cross on 21/06/1953 36C on 07/06/1954 Withdrawn
Steam L3 2-6-4T 69064 on 31/05/1953 34A Kings Cross on 21/06/1953 36C on 24/01/1955 Withdrawn
Steam L3 2-6-4T 69065 on 31/05/1953 34A Kings Cross on 21/06/1953 36C on 10/05/1954 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90232       4w/e 25/07/1953 36C w/e 02/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90596       4w/e 25/07/1953 36C 4w/e 13/04/1957 65D Dawsholm
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90512       4w/e 19/09/1953 36C on 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63761 on 26/11/1950 39A Gorton on 13/06/1954 36C on 18/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63799 on 20/10/1950 39A Gorton on 13/06/1954 36C on 24/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63662 on 26/11/1950 39A Gorton on 13/06/1954 36C on 18/05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63853 on 26/11/1950 39A Gorton on 13/06/1954 36C on 18/01/1959 41J Langwith Junction
Steam O4 2-8-0 63880 on 11/06/1950 39A Gorton on 13/06/1954 36C w/e 17/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63601 on 20/09/1953 39A Gorton on 18/07/1954 36C on 16/06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68973 4w/e 25/07/1953 36A Doncaster 5w/e 24/07/1954 36C w/e 31/01/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 63807 on 21/03/1954 39A Gorton on 22/08/1954 36C on 25/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64319 5w/e 23/08/1952 36A Doncaster 4w/e 13/11/1954 36C on 17/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64410       4w/e 13/11/1954 36C on 29/12/1956 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90601       4w/e 19/02/1955 36C w/e 06/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam S1 0-8-4T 69901 4w/e 23/01/1954 36A Doncaster 5w/e 23/04/1955 36C on 01/01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam S1 0-8-4T 69905 4w/e 23/01/1954 36A Doncaster 5w/e 23/04/1955 36C on 01/01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90597       3w/e 12/11/1955 36C on 08/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90598       3w/e 12/11/1955 36C on 25/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68965 4w/e 18/02/1956 40B Immingham 4w/e 15/12/1956 36C w/e 31/01/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68963 4w/e 25/08/1956 36A Doncaster 5w/e 19/01/1957 36C w/e 09/05/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68977 4w/e 18/02/1956 40B Immingham 5w/e 19/01/1957 36C w/e 09/05/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam J11 0-6-0 64315       4w/e 08/01/1958 36C w/e 01/08/1959 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J11 0-6-0 64365 5w/e 20/04/1957 40B Immingham 4w/e 08/01/1958 36C on 17/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64430       4w/e 08/01/1958 36C 4w/e 08/02/1958 40A Lincoln
Steam J11 0-6-0 64351       4w/e 08/02/1958 36C on 30/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63654 on 05/09/1947 RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 23/02/1958 36C on 22/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 69929 on 15/10/1944 LNG Langwith Junction on 15/06/1958 36C on 28/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-8-0T 69928 on 01/10/1944 LNG Langwith Junction on 15/06/1958 36C on 20/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90469 4w/e 16/03/1957 36A Doncaster 4w/e 19/07/1958 36C w/e 08/11/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3638       on 24/11/1958 (New) 36C w/e 12/08/1967 36A Doncaster
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3639       on 25/11/1958 (New) 36C w/e 06/07/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3640       on 28/11/1958 (New) 36C on 03/12/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3641       on 05/12/1958 (New) 36C on 05/12/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3642       on 05/12/1958 (New) 36C on 28/06/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3643       on 12/12/1958 (New) 36C on 06/10/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3644       on 12/12/1958 (New) 36C on 15/06/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3645       on 16/12/1958 (New) 36C on 15/03/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3646       on 19/12/1958 (New) 36C w/e 20/02/1971 36A Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 63781 on 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough on 21/12/1958 36C on 01/08/1965 40E Colwick
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3647       on 23/12/1958 (New) 36C w/e 29/11/1964 86A Cardiff Canton
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3648       on 07/01/1959 (New) 36C w/e 12/12/1959 36A Doncaster
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3649       on 09/01/1959 (New) 36C w/e 11/04/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92034 on 02/12/1954 35A New England (New) w/e 10/01/1959 36C w/e 25/04/1959 34E New England
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92035 on 03/12/1954 35A New England (New) w/e 10/01/1959 36C w/e 25/04/1959 34E New England
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92184 on 31/01/1958 35A New England (New) w/e 10/01/1959 36C w/e 20/06/1959 34E New England
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92189 5w/e 14/06/1958 36A Doncaster w/e 10/01/1959 36C w/e 25/04/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92190 5w/e 14/06/1958 36A Doncaster w/e 10/01/1959 36C w/e 02/05/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92197 on 30/09/1958 36A Doncaster (New) w/e 07/02/1959 36C w/e 02/05/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92199 on 31/10/1958 36A Doncaster (New) w/e 07/02/1959 36C w/e 14/09/1963 40E Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 63602 on 11/11/1956 38A Colwick on 21/06/1959 36C on 31/01/1960 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63647 on 20/09/1953 38A Colwick on 21/06/1959 36C on 31/01/1960 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J11 0-6-0 64385       w/e 01/08/1959 36C on 05/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64421       w/e 01/08/1959 36C on 11/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63665 on 01/02/1959 41J Langwith Junction on 06/08/1959 36C on 31/01/1960 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J11 0-6-0 64371 w/e 23/05/1959 41J Langwith Junction w/e 29/08/1959 36C on 30/01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J11 0-6-0 64404 4w/e 16/03/1957 36D Barnsley w/e 29/08/1959 36C on 06/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63748 on 13/06/1954 39B Sheffield Darnall on 13/09/1959 36C on 19/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63836 on 02/02/1958 36D Barnsley on 25/10/1959 36C on 29/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63824 on 02/03/1952 36D Barnsley on 22/11/1959 36C on 31/01/1960 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J11 0-6-0 64395 3w/e 14/05/1955 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 28/11/1959 36C w/e 15/10/1960 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam J11 0-6-0 64423       w/e 28/11/1959 36C on 30/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63666 on 05/10/1952 36B Mexborough on 27/12/1959 36C on 15/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63764 on 15/05/1955 36B Mexborough on 27/12/1959 36C on 20/11/1960 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63730 on 28/10/1951 36B Mexborough on 27/12/1959 36C on 20/11/1960 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam K1 2-6-0 62018 on 14/05/1950 31B March on 03/01/1960 36C on 13/03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62020 on 21/05/1950 31B March on 10/01/1960 36C on 10/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62032 on 26/08/1949 MAR March (New) on 17/01/1960 36C on 07/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62013 on 09/12/1958 30A Stratford on 24/01/1960 36C on 29/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62014 on 14/12/1958 30A Stratford on 31/01/1960 36C on 04/11/1962 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90550 4w/e 16/03/1957 36A Doncaster w/e 06/02/1960 36C on 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90007 5w/e 21/01/1956 38D Staveley (G.C.) w/e 06/02/1960 36C w/e 11/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90087 4w/e 19/07/1958 41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 06/02/1960 36C on 25/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90696 4w/e 16/03/1957 36A Doncaster w/e 06/02/1960 36C on 29/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90732 4w/e 16/03/1957 36A Doncaster w/e 06/02/1960 36C on 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90189 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A Colwick w/e 20/02/1960 36C w/e 11/01/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90053 w/e 16/04/1960 40B Immingham w/e 15/10/1960 36C w/e 04/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90161 w/e 16/04/1960 40B Immingham w/e 15/10/1960 36C on 07/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90166 w/e 16/04/1960 40B Immingham w/e 15/10/1960 36C w/e 09/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90288 w/e 13/08/1960 40E Colwick w/e 15/10/1960 36C on 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90648 w/e 13/08/1960 40B Immingham w/e 15/10/1960 36C on 30/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90115 5w/e 23/07/1955 38A Colwick w/e 22/10/1960 36C w/e 09/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90120 4w/e 18/02/1956 38A Colwick w/e 22/10/1960 36C w/e 04/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90025 4w/e 25/07/1953 38A Colwick w/e 22/10/1960 36C w/e 01/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90108 w/e 06/02/1960 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 05/11/1960 36C w/e 01/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90537 4w/e 16/03/1957 36A Doncaster w/e 26/11/1960 36C w/e 06/11/1965 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90602 4w/e 16/03/1957 36A Doncaster w/e 26/11/1960 36C w/e 10/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62016 on 21/05/1950 31B March on 11/12/1960 36C on 13/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62017 on 21/05/1950 31B March on 11/12/1960 36C on 10/10/1965 52F Blyth (North)
Steam K1 2-6-0 62033 on 31/08/1949 MAR March (New) on 18/12/1960 36C on 10/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62035 on 07/09/1949 MAR March (New) on 18/12/1960 36C on 18/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63593 on 09/12/1951 36B Mexborough on 05/11/1961 36C on 12/11/1961 36A Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 63802 on 03/01/1960 41F Mexborough on 05/11/1961 36C on 12/11/1961 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90079 w/e 24/09/1960 36A Doncaster w/e 18/11/1961 36C on 17/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90453 4w/e 16/03/1957 36A Doncaster w/e 18/11/1961 36C on 04/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63832 on 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough on 03/12/1961 36C on 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63628 on 29/01/1956 36B Mexborough on 03/12/1961 36C on 05/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63884 on 31/01/1960 41F Mexborough on 03/12/1961 36C on 09/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63897 on 28/10/1951 36B Mexborough on 03/12/1961 36C on 22/05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63791 on 18/08/1946 MEX Mexborough on 10/12/1961 36C on 05/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63898 on 13/01/1950 MEX Mexborough on 10/12/1961 36C on 02/05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90119 4w/e 19/07/1958 41F Mexborough w/e 25/08/1962 36C w/e 17/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63586 on 30/07/1961 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 16/09/1962 36C on 03/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63693 on 22/03/1959 36A Doncaster on 16/09/1962 36C on 19/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63613 on 29/01/1956 36A Doncaster on 16/09/1962 36C on 14/10/1962 36A Doncaster
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D3648 w/e 12/12/1959 36A Doncaster w/e 29/09/1962 36C w/e 29/11/1964 86A Cardiff Canton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90000 w/e 21/02/1959 34E New England w/e 29/09/1962 36C w/e 06/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90165       w/e 29/09/1962 36C w/e 26/01/1963 41F Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90239       w/e 29/09/1962 36C on 25/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90024 w/e 20/02/1960 34E New England w/e 29/09/1962 36C w/e 27/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90665       w/e 29/09/1962 36C w/e 24/07/1965 40E Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90730       w/e 29/09/1962 36C w/e 11/01/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam O4 2-8-0 63802 on 12/11/1961 36A Doncaster on 14/10/1962 36C on 23/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90544 4w/e 03/11/1962 81C Southall w/e 08/12/1962 36C w/e 26/01/1963 41F Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90573 4w/e 06/10/1962 81C Southall w/e 08/12/1962 36C w/e 26/01/1963 41F Mexborough
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90613       w/e 13/04/1963 36C w/e 30/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90439       w/e 13/04/1963 36C w/e 07/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92192 w/e 14/09/1963 40E Colwick w/e 30/11/1963 36C w/e 21/02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92198 w/e 14/09/1963 40E Colwick w/e 30/11/1963 36C on 02/08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92199 w/e 14/09/1963 40E Colwick w/e 30/11/1963 36C on 02/08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90315 w/e 18/07/1964 9J Agecroft w/e 12/09/1964 36C w/e 21/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90283 w/e 25/07/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/09/1964 36C w/e 03/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62014 on 04/11/1962 36A Doncaster on 10/01/1965 36C on 06/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62015 on 04/11/1962 36A Doncaster on 10/01/1965 36C on 25/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam K1 2-6-0 62067 on 27/05/1962 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 10/01/1965 36C on 10/10/1965 52F Blyth (North)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90248 w/e 03/10/1964 8L Aintree w/e 17/04/1965 36C w/e 07/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90274 w/e 26/12/1964 8L Aintree w/e 17/04/1965 36C w/e 02/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90381 4w/e 25/02/1956 27B Aintree w/e 17/04/1965 36C on 24/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90493 w/e 21/07/1962 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 17/04/1965 36C w/e 27/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90516 w/e 19/09/1964 8L Aintree w/e 17/04/1965 36C w/e 06/11/1965 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61195 on 24/05/1947 IMM Immingham (New) on 09/05/1965 36C on 14/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61370 on 28/03/1965 40B Immingham on 09/05/1965 36C on 04/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61389 on 14/06/1964 40B Immingham on 09/05/1965 36C on 14/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90178 w/e 17/09/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 29/05/1965 36C w/e 27/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90183 w/e 07/12/1963 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 29/05/1965 36C w/e 29/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90212 w/e 10/09/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 29/05/1965 36C w/e 15/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90390 w/e 14/03/1964 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 29/05/1965 36C w/e 19/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90702 w/e 25/07/1964 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 29/05/1965 36C w/e 01/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63651 on 30/12/1962 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 13/06/1965 36C on 11/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam O4 2-8-0 63661 on 22/09/1963 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 13/06/1965 36C on 08/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90551 w/e 11/05/1963 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 19/06/1965 36C w/e 06/11/1965 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90223 m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn w/e 19/06/1965 (R) 36C      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90280 w/e 28/09/1963 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 19/06/1965 36C w/e 05/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90501 w/e 09/03/1963 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 19/06/1965 36C w/e 06/11/1965 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90669 w/e 17/04/1965 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 19/06/1965 36C w/e 24/07/1965 40E Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90689 w/e 17/04/1965 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 19/06/1965 36C w/e 24/07/1965 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61127 on 13/06/1965 36A Doncaster on 11/07/1965 36C on 15/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61348 on 13/06/1965 36A Doncaster on 11/07/1965 36C on 14/11/1965 40E Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90075 w/e 29/09/1962 40B Immingham w/e 11/09/1965 36C w/e 05/03/1966 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90035 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B Immingham w/e 11/09/1965 36C w/e 27/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90498 w/e 22/10/1960 36A Doncaster w/e 25/09/1965 36C w/e 27/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90410 w/e 09/10/1965 40E Colwick w/e 13/11/1965 36C w/e 05/03/1966 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90471 w/e 09/10/1965 40E Colwick w/e 13/11/1965 36C w/e 05/03/1966 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90367 w/e 09/10/1965 40E Colwick w/e 25/12/1965 36C w/e 27/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90148 w/e 09/10/1965 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 36C w/e 05/03/1966 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90080 w/e 12/06/1965 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 36C w/e 27/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90241 w/e 12/06/1965 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 36C w/e 09/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90384 w/e 09/10/1965 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 36C w/e 27/02/1966 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90514 w/e 19/06/1965 40E Colwick w/e 01/01/1966 36C w/e 23/01/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3280 5w/e 07/09/1963 66C Hamilton (West) w/e 05/10/1968 36C on 26/09/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13252 on 26/04/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 30/11/1968 36C w/e 19/02/1972 36A Doncaster
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13281 4w/e 28/12/1968 64B Haymarket on 26/01/1969 36C 2w/e 20/11/1976 TE Thornaby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3549 5w/e 31/08/1968 62A Thornton Junction w/e 29/03/1969 36C w/e 12/04/1969 40B Immingham
Diesel 10 0-6-0 D4062 w/e 13/11/1965 40B Immingham w/e 29/11/1969 36C w/e 08/01/1972 40B Immingham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3299 w/e 07/01/1967 30E Colchester w/e 27/06/1970 36C on 04/12/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3663 w/e 30/11/1968 36A Doncaster w/e 20/02/1971 36C on 01/10/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3080 w/e 26/09/1970 50C Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 11/12/1971 36C w/e 15/01/1972 40B Immingham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3519 w/e 24/08/1968 36A Doncaster w/e 08/01/1972 36C on 27/07/1978 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3512 w/e 24/08/1968 36A Doncaster w/e 15/01/1972 36C      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3507 w/e 17/08/1968 40B Immingham w/e 19/02/1972 36C on 01/12/1984 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3206 w/e 15/04/1972 36A Doncaster w/e 06/05/1972 36C w/e 23/05/1976 NR Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08207 w/e 26/10/1968 40A Lincoln 2w/e 29/12/1973 FH w/e 09/03/1974 SF Stratford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08099 w/e 20/06/1970 30A Stratford w/e 09/03/1974 FH w/e 07/06/1975 BG Hull Botanic Gardens
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08391 w/e 10/08/1968 40B Immingham 2w/e 09/11/1974 FH on 04/08/1985 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08093 w/e 16/11/1974 BG Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 23/05/1976 FH on 26/07/1981 Withdrawn