Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 53 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4968 Week
» 16205 Month
» 249125 Year
» 1914501 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Gillingham (Kent)


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Gillingham (Kent) Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 1002       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 06/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1013       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1092       on 01/01/1948 GIL w/e 23/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 1105       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1112       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 1215       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1234       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 1256       on 01/01/1948 GIL 7w/e 27/06/1951 73E Faversham
Steam C 0-6-0 1267       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 12/05/1951 73E Faversham
Steam H 0-4-4T 1278       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 12/05/1951 74A Ashford
Steam H 0-4-4T 1308       on 01/01/1948 GIL 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A Brighton
Steam C 0-6-0 1317       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 12/05/1951 73E Faversham
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1449       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1510       on 01/01/1948 GIL 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 1573       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam C 0-6-0 1579       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam C 0-6-0 1583       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam C 0-6-0 1585       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 06/10/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 1588       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 06/10/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1658       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1659       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1660       on 01/01/1948 GIL 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1662       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 10/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1663       on 01/01/1948 GIL 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1665       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1666       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 1682       on 01/01/1948 GIL 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 1684       on 01/01/1948 GIL 6w/e 05/09/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 1688       on 01/01/1948 GIL 7w/e 27/06/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam R1 0-4-4T 1697       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 03/1953 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1713       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1746       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 08/12/1950 74D Tonbridge
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 1750       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 07/10/1950 70E Reading (S.R.)
Steam O1 0-6-0 1378       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 11/1948 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31014       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 06/1948 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31238       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 07/1949 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31384       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 12/1949 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31391       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31003       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 01/1949 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 1064       on 01/01/1948 GIL 4w/e 27/07/1951 74A Ashford
Steam O1 0-6-0 31039       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 08/1949 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31066       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 1430       on 01/01/1948 GIL w/e 16/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31439       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31051       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 08/1948 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31007       on 01/01/1948 GIL m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31729 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 4w/e 09/09/1950 73D 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31501 4w/e 09/09/1950 73E Faversham 4w/e 08/12/1950 73D 4w/e 21/01/1952 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31586 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 08/12/1950 73D 4w/e 05/02/1951 73E Faversham
Steam D1 4-4-0 31741 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 08/12/1950 73D 4w/e 05/02/1951 73E Faversham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33026 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 08/12/1950 73D 6w/e 05/09/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam D1 4-4-0 31735 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951 73D 4w/e 11/04/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 31227 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 1229 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 31234 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D w/e 08/08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31242 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 4w/e 08/02/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 31253 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 7w/e 27/06/1951 73E Faversham
Steam H 0-4-4T 31306 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 4w/e 11/12/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam H 0-4-4T 31307 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 5w/e 11/12/1952 75B Redhill
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31488 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 4w/e 10/10/1955 70C Guildford
Steam C 0-6-0 31495 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 31508 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 4w/e 08/02/1954 73E Faversham
Steam C 0-6-0 31584 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam C 0-6-0 31681 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D w/e 14/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31683 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D w/e 13/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31687 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 7w/e 27/06/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33027 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 6w/e 05/09/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33028 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D 6w/e 05/09/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31586 4w/e 05/02/1951 73E Faversham 7w/e 27/06/1951 73D 4w/e 27/07/1951 75B Redhill
Steam C 0-6-0 31712 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 27/07/1951 73D w/e 09/02/1957 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31713 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 27/07/1951 73D w/e 02/04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31593 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 6w/e 05/09/1951 73D 4w/e 11/12/1954 70C Guildford
Steam C 0-6-0 31684 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 05/09/1951 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 31686 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 6w/e 05/09/1951 73D 9w/e 30/06/1952 73C Hither Green
Steam C 0-6-0 31112 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31816 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 4w/e 06/10/1951 73D 4w/e 01/10/1953 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31501 4w/e 08/12/1950 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 21/01/1952 73D m/e 05/1953 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31295 4w/e 27/07/1951 73E Faversham 9w/e 30/06/1952 73D 8w/e 20/07/1953 74E St Leonards
Steam H 0-4-4T 31305 7w/e 27/06/1951 73E Faversham 9w/e 30/06/1952 73D 5w/e 11/12/1952 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam H 0-4-4T 31305 9w/e 30/06/1952 73D Gillingham (Kent) 5w/e 11/12/1952 73D 8w/e 20/07/1953 73E Faversham
Steam H 0-4-4T 31161 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 5w/e 14/02/1953 73D 8w/e 20/07/1953 74E St Leonards
Steam H 0-4-4T 31518 4w/e 19/03/1952 74E St Leonards 5w/e 14/02/1953 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam L1 4-4-0 31758 5w/e 11/12/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 26/05/1953 73D 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam L1 4-4-0 31759 5w/e 11/12/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 26/05/1953 73D 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam D1 4-4-0 31509 4w/e 26/05/1953 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 20/07/1953 73D 6w/e 21/06/1955 73E Faversham
Steam D1 4-4-0 31545 4w/e 26/05/1953 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 20/07/1953 73D 6w/e 21/06/1955 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 31660 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham 8w/e 20/07/1953 73D m/e 12/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 31671 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham 8w/e 20/07/1953 73D on 06/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31158 4w/e 29/10/1953 74E St Leonards 4w/e 10/12/1953 73D w/e 16/04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31711 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 4w/e 08/02/1954 73D w/e 05/01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31242 4w/e 08/02/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 19/03/1954 73D 6w/e 21/06/1955 73E Faversham
Steam C 0-6-0 31508 4w/e 08/02/1954 73E Faversham 4w/e 19/03/1954 73D w/e 28/09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31815 4w/e 01/10/1953 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 13/05/1954 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31816 4w/e 01/10/1953 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 13/05/1954 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C Guildford
Steam D1 4-4-0 31505 8w/e 20/07/1953 73E Faversham 6w/e 18/06/1954 73D 6w/e 21/06/1955 73E Faversham
Steam H 0-4-4T 31161 8w/e 20/07/1953 74E St Leonards 4w/e 20/08/1954 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 75E Three Bridges
Steam H 0-4-4T 31320 4w/e 29/10/1953 75A Brighton 3w/e 09/05/1955 73D w/e 17/12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31322 4w/e 27/07/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 21/06/1955 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam L1 4-4-0 31785 8w/e 20/07/1953 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 21/06/1955 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam L1 4-4-0 31786 6w/e 18/06/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 21/06/1955 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam L1 4-4-0 31787 6w/e 18/06/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 21/06/1955 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam H 0-4-4T 31512 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 7w/e 19/12/1955 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 31297 6w/e 27/03/1953 73B Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 12/06/1957 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 31037 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 08/10/1957 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 31576 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 7w/e 08/10/1957 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 31579 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 08/10/1957 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam H 0-4-4T 31548 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine q/e 06/06/1958 73D 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A Brighton