Depot: Goole
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Goole | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12930 | w/e | 22/02/1936 | 25C | ||||||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12173 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25C | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12273 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25C | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12381 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25C | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12386 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25C | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 585 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 25C | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 589 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 25C | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 685 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 25C | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8429 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8441 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8449 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 11207 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 11241 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 11244 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | on | 06/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11323 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 05/05/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11458 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11521 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | on | 20/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11432 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | on | 16/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51443 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11516 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | on | 20/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | 12037 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | 12041 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | 12043 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | 12044 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | 12056 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4105 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4221 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4485 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4486 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12133 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52181 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12592 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52454 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9539 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9582 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9600 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 6407 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | on | 18/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 6408 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 50F | Malton | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 585 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 25C | Goole | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 586 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 589 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 25C | Goole | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 685 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 25C | Goole | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8761 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8768 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 25C | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8738 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 25C | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4042 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 25C | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 23B | Aintree |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44220 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 25C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44062 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 25C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51361 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 25C | on | 27/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48722 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 25C | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41100 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 25C | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41101 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 25C | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41102 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 25C | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48727 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 25C | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46405 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 25C | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 6409 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 25C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46437 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 25C | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51222 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 25C | on | 06/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51379 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 25C | w/e | 09/04/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52273 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 25C | on | 27/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90228 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | on | 01/07/1950 | 25C | on | 02/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90262 | on | 01/07/1950 | 25C | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42411 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 25C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90300 | on | 06/09/1950 | 25C | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90300 | on | 06/09/1950 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 25C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90531 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 25C | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90531 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25C | on | 02/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42477 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25C | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52191 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25C | w/e | 08/12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52331 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25C | w/e | 27/08/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52448 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25C | w/e | 24/11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46436 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25C | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46437 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25C | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42553 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25C | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90213 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | HIT | Hither Green | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25C | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90237 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 25C | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52309 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25C | w/e | 23/01/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52410 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25C | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52408 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 25C | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44042 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 25C | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52411 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 25C | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52561 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 25C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52237 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 25C | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90135 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 25C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90186 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 25C | on | 22/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52345 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 25C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52121 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 25C | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52252 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 25C | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52121 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 25C | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52252 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 25C | on | 10/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51503 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 25C | on | 11/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51479 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 25C | w/e | 06/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52305 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 25C | on | 10/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90639 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90679 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46487 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25C | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51240 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 25C | on | 24/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90397 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 25C | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90260 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 25C | on | 02/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52154 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 25C | on | 10/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52244 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 25C | on | 10/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90404 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 25C | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90679 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 25C | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42324 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42407 | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42411 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25C | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42311 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 25C | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90633 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25C | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52319 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 53E | on | 10/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51241 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 26B | Agecroft | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | on | 18/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 41661 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 20B | Stourton | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | m/e | 07/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 41797 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 20B | Stourton | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | m/e | 09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 41855 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 55F | Manningham | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | on | 04/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 65142 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | on | 08/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 65145 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 8E | Brunswick | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | on | 11/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 65147 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 8E | Brunswick | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | on | 12/03/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 65196 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 8E | Brunswick | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | on | 02/06/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69008 | m/e | 12/1949 | TDK | Tyne Dock (New) | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69918 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 53E | on | 01/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69921 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 53E | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90265 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 53E | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68912 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 53E | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46409 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 53E | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90094 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 53E | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90478 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 53E | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13233 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 53E | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3675 | on | 05/06/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 53E | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3676 | on | 12/06/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 53E | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46415 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 53E | on | 31/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68705 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 53E | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90044 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53E | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47634 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53E | on | 26/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43125 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53E | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47438 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 53E | on | 26/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47462 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 53E | on | 26/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47581 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 53E | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90704 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 53E | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90160 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 50D | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46478 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 50D | on | 30/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90475 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50D | on | 13/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47589 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50D | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | D2700 | on | 25/07/1953 | 51C | West Hartlepool (New) | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50D | on | 02/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | D2701 | on | 19/12/1953 | 51C | West Hartlepool (New) | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50D | on | 12/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | D2702 | on | 21/08/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool (New) | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50D | on | 12/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2598 | on | 30/06/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 50D | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2599 | on | 08/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 50D | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2600 | on | 13/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 50D | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2601 | on | 20/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50D | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2602 | on | 28/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50D | on | 06/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2609 | on | 13/12/1960 (New) | 50D | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2610 | on | 21/12/1960 (New) | 50D | on | 04/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2611 | on | 16/01/1961 (New) | 50D | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2613 | on | 21/02/1961 (New) | 50D | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2614 | on | 27/02/1961 (New) | 50D | on | 12/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2616 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 50D | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90435 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 50D | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90461 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 50D | on | 02/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46413 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50D | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 67B | Hurlford |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90132 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 50D | w/e | 10/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90273 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 50D | on | 25/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90072 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50D | on | 27/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90081 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90406 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90451 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50D | on | 23/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46473 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 50D | w/e | 16/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90427 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90172 | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90099 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90091 | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90092 | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50D | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43133 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 51F | West Auckland | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 50D | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43077 | on | 11/10/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 50D | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62010 | on | 08/09/1963 | 50A | York (North) | on | 18/10/1965 | 50D | on | 18/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90030 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 50D | w/e | 17/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77001 | 4w/e | 06/12/1965 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 01/01/1966 | 50D | on | 02/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77012 | 4w/e | 06/12/1965 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 01/01/1966 | 50D | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | SBH | Blyth (South) |
Diesel | D1/3 | 0-4-0 | D2957 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 50D | on | 12/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D1/1 | 0-4-0 | D2950 | on | 25/12/1954 | 32B | Ipswich (New) | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 50D | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90057 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90016 | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90704 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D1/1 | 0-4-0 | D2951 | on | 25/12/1954 | 32B | Ipswich (New) | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 50D | on | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90352 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90272 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90458 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90670 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90688 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50D | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2859 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 50D | on | 15/03/1970 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2865 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 50D | on | 15/03/1970 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2245 | on | 05/07/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 27/08/1967 | 50D | on | 26/05/1968 | 98Ss | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2112 | on | 09/12/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50D | w/e | 23/11/1968 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2158 | on | 22/08/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50D | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2262 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50D | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2268 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50D | on | 10/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2081 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 50D | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2151 | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 50D | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2159 | on | 29/08/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 50D | w/e | 10/07/1971 | 40A | Lincoln |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2325 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 50D | on | 08/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2152 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 50D | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2169 | on | 15/11/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 50D | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2245 | on | 26/05/1968 | 98Ss | on | 24/06/1968 | 50D | on | 21/07/1968 | 98Ss | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2157 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 21/12/1968 | 50D | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2267 | w/e | 14/12/1968 | 55B | York (North) | w/e | 25/01/1969 | 50D | on | 31/12/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2049 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | w/e | 29/03/1969 | 50D | on | 17/08/1971 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2173 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | 56A | Knottingley | w/e | 21/08/1971 | 50D | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |