Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 750 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6150 Week
» 24202 Month
» 257122 Year
» 1922498 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Guildford


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Guildford Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam T1 0-4-4T 68       m/e 03/1889 (New) GFD m/e 10/1931 Withdrawn
Steam T1 0-4-4T 69       m/e 03/1889 (New) GFD m/e 10/1931 Withdrawn
Steam T1 0-4-4T 70       m/e 04/1889 (New) GFD m/e 08/1934 Withdrawn
Steam T1 0-4-4T 71       m/e 06/1889 (New) GFD m/e 01/1936 Withdrawn
Steam T1 0-4-4T 72       m/e 06/1889 (New) GFD m/e 06/1933 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 541       on 23/01/1939 (New) GFD on 01/01/1948 3B Three Bridges
Steam Q 0-6-0 542       m/e 03/1939 (New) GFD on 01/01/1948 3B Three Bridges
Steam Q 0-6-0 543       on 29/03/1939 (New) GFD on 01/01/1948 HOR Horsham
Steam M7 0-4-4T 22       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 10/12/1953 75B Redhill
Steam M7 0-4-4T 26       on 01/01/1948 GFD m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 43       on 01/01/1948 GFD m/e 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 56       on 01/01/1948 GFD 7w/e 27/06/1951 71B Bournemouth
Steam M7 0-4-4T 60       on 01/01/1948 GFD 7w/e 27/06/1951 71B Bournemouth
Steam M7 0-4-4T 108       on 01/01/1948 GFD 5w/e 14/02/1953 75D Horsham
Steam M7 0-4-4T 110       on 01/01/1948 GFD q/e 06/06/1958 75E Three Bridges
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 141       on 01/01/1948 GFD m/e 10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 246       on 01/01/1948 GFD w/e 28/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam G6 0-6-0T 262       on 01/01/1948 GFD m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G6 0-6-0T 268       on 01/01/1948 GFD m/e 12/1950 Withdrawn
Steam G6 0-6-0T 269       on 01/01/1948 GFD m/e 10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G6 0-6-0T 270       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 08/12/1950 70E Reading (S.R.)
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 308       on 01/01/1948 GFD w/e 23/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 309       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 12/05/1951 70G  
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 311       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 07/10/1950 70C Guildford
Steam M7 0-4-4T 324       on 01/01/1948 GFD 9w/e 08/02/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 325       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A Brighton
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 326       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A Brighton
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 327       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 11/12/1954 72B Salisbury
Steam M7 0-4-4T 328       on 01/01/1948 GFD 9w/e 08/02/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 343       on 01/01/1948 GFD m/e 02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 346       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 04/01/1962 70C Guildford
Steam G6 0-6-0T 349       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 352       on 01/01/1948 GFD m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 390       on 01/01/1948 GFD m/e 11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 416       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 08/12/1950 71D Fratton
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 419       on 01/01/1948 GFD m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 433       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C Guildford
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 434       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C Guildford
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 438       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 27/07/1951 72C Yeovil Town
Steam Dock Engines 0-4-0ST 3458       on 01/01/1948 GFD on 12/06/1954 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 481       on 01/01/1948 GFD 6w/e 20/03/1951 71A Eastleigh
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 3083       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 07/10/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 3155       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 12/05/1951 70B Feltham
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 3436       on 01/01/1948 GFD w/e 05/01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 3439       on 01/01/1948 GFD 5w/e 11/12/1952 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 3442       on 01/01/1948 GFD w/e 10/08/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 3506       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 704       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 726       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 07/10/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1614       on 01/01/1948 GFD 8w/e 13/05/1954 75B Redhill
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1621       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 12/05/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1623       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1798       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 10/03/1960 72C Yeovil Town
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1799       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 11/04/1951 70C Guildford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1800       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1801       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1802       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1803       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1804       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 11/04/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1805       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 21/01/1952 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1806       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 06/11/1954 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1809       on 01/01/1948 GFD 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2487       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C Guildford
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2500       on 01/01/1948 GFD w/e 27/01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2504       on 01/01/1948 GFD w/e 25/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C1       on 01/01/1948 GFD 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C2       on 01/01/1948 GFD 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C3       on 01/01/1948 GFD 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C4       on 01/01/1948 GFD 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C5       on 01/01/1948 GFD 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C6       on 01/01/1948 GFD 4w/e 14/10/1963 75E Three Bridges
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C7       on 01/01/1948 GFD 5w/e 14/02/1953 73C Hither Green
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C8       on 01/01/1948 GFD w/e 25/08/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C9       on 01/01/1948 GFD 5w/e 14/02/1953 73C Hither Green
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C10       on 01/01/1948 GFD w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C11       on 01/01/1948 GFD 5w/e 14/02/1953 73C Hither Green
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C12       on 01/01/1948 GFD m/e 14/09/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Q1 0-6-0 C13       on 01/01/1948 GFD w/e 07/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30021 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 4w/e 09/09/1950 70C 6w/e 20/03/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33014 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 09/09/1950 70C 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33015 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 09/09/1950 70C 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33016 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 09/09/1950 70C 7w/e 27/06/1951 71D Fratton
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 311 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 07/10/1950 70C m/e 08/1952 Withdrawn
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 30384 on 01/01/1948 DOR Dorchester 4w/e 07/10/1950 70C 4w/e 11/04/1951 72C Yeovil Town
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 30424 on 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 4w/e 07/10/1950 70C 4w/e 05/02/1951 71A Eastleigh
Steam G6 0-6-0T 238 4w/e 07/10/1950 70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 13/11/1950 70C m/e 11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 30432 on 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C m/e 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 30433 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 30434 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C m/e 03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Large Hoppers 4-4-0 30442 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C 6w/e 20/03/1951 71A Eastleigh
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 3441 on 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C 9w/e 30/06/1952 70C Guildford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31624 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C 5w/e 24/08/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31803 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C 4w/e 11/04/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 32160 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C 4w/e 05/02/1951 70D Basingstoke
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2487 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C 4w/e 24/02/1958 70A Nine Elms
Steam G6 0-6-0T 30258 on 01/01/1948 RDG Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 05/02/1951 70C 4w/e 11/04/1951 70D Basingstoke
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30355 4w/e 08/12/1950 70D Basingstoke 4w/e 05/02/1951 70C 4w/e 12/05/1951 70B Feltham
Steam S11 4-4-0 30400 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 05/02/1951 70C 8w/e 20/07/1953 70C Guildford
Steam S11 4-4-0 30401 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 05/02/1951 70C m/e 09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 30430 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 05/02/1951 70C m/e 03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 30431 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 05/02/1951 70C m/e 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30109 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 6w/e 20/03/1951 70C 4w/e 06/10/1951 70C Guildford
Steam S11 4-4-0 30399 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 6w/e 20/03/1951 70C 4w/e 12/05/1951 70G  
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30027 on 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 4w/e 11/04/1951 70C w/e 11/03/1959 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam G6 0-6-0T 30349 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/04/1951 70C 6w/e 09/02/1960 70B Feltham
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31797 on 01/01/1948 FRA Fratton 4w/e 11/04/1951 70C 4w/e 16/09/1963 75C Norwood Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31799 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 11/04/1951 70C 6w/e 09/02/1960 75B Redhill
Steam E1-1 0-6-0T 32160 4w/e 05/02/1951 70D Basingstoke 4w/e 11/04/1951 70C 7w/e 27/06/1951 71D Fratton
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 30579 on 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 4w/e 12/05/1951 70C w/e 14/01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31623 4w/e 07/10/1950 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 12/05/1951 70C 6w/e 27/03/1953 71C Dorchester
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31625 on 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 70C 5w/e 24/08/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31626 on 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 12/05/1951 70C 5w/e 24/08/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31795 4w/e 07/10/1950 70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 12/05/1951 70C 3w/e 13/10/1958 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31796 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 4w/e 12/05/1951 70C 3w/e 13/10/1958 71A Eastleigh
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30028 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 7w/e 27/06/1951 70C 6w/e 21/06/1955 75E Three Bridges
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30693 4w/e 27/07/1951 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 05/09/1951 70C w/e 08/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30109 6w/e 20/03/1951 70C Guildford 4w/e 06/10/1951 70C q/e 06/06/1958 75A Brighton
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30310 on 01/01/1948 YEO Yeovil Town 4w/e 06/10/1951 70C 4w/e 29/10/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam G6 0-6-0T 30277 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/03/1952 70C 4w/e 10/12/1953 70C Guildford
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 30577 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C Guildford 9w/e 30/06/1952 70C w/e 04/02/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30120 4w/e 12/05/1951 71C Dorchester 5w/e 11/12/1952 70C 4w/e 08/01/1953 71C Dorchester
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30675 on 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 4w/e 08/01/1953 70C w/e 22/03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30732 4w/e 27/07/1951 71D Fratton 4w/e 08/01/1953 70C 5w/e 14/02/1953 71D Fratton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31856 4w/e 06/10/1951 73C Hither Green 5w/e 14/02/1953 70C 4w/e 26/05/1953 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31862 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C Hither Green 5w/e 14/02/1953 70C 4w/e 26/05/1953 75B Redhill
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33002 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham 6w/e 27/03/1953 70C 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33005 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham 4w/e 26/05/1953 70C w/e 16/06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33018 6w/e 27/03/1953 74B Ramsgate 4w/e 26/05/1953 70C 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam S11 4-4-0 30400 4w/e 05/02/1951 70C Guildford 8w/e 20/07/1953 70C m/e 11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33004 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham 8w/e 20/07/1953 70C 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33018 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 24/08/1953 70C 4w/e 01/10/1953 73C Hither Green
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33019 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 24/08/1953 70C w/e 01/12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31624 5w/e 24/08/1953 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/10/1953 70C 7w/e 27/08/1956 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31625 5w/e 24/08/1953 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/10/1953 70C w/e 12/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33022 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/10/1953 70C w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30350 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 4w/e 29/10/1953 70C w/e 24/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam G6 0-6-0T 30277 4w/e 19/03/1952 70C Guildford 4w/e 10/12/1953 70C 6w/e 01/04/1957 70E Reading (S.R.)
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31620 4w/e 01/10/1953 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 30/12/1953 70C 8w/e 13/05/1954 71A Eastleigh
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30022 4w/e 30/12/1953 70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 08/02/1954 70C 6w/e 21/06/1955 70F Fratton
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31496 4w/e 26/05/1953 70E Reading (S.R.) 8w/e 13/05/1954 70C m/e 09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31586 4w/e 26/05/1953 70E Reading (S.R.) 8w/e 13/05/1954 70C m/e 09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31616 4w/e 11/04/1951 70E Reading (S.R.) 8w/e 13/05/1954 70C 6w/e 09/02/1960 75B Redhill
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31617 4w/e 11/04/1951 70E Reading (S.R.) 8w/e 13/05/1954 70C 4w/e 20/08/1954 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31631 9w/e 30/06/1952 71C Dorchester 8w/e 13/05/1954 70C w/e 29/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31746 4w/e 12/05/1951 70E Reading (S.R.) 8w/e 13/05/1954 70C on 11/12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31632 8w/e 13/05/1954 70D Basingstoke 6w/e 18/06/1954 70C 5w/e 11/03/1955 71B Bournemouth
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31075 on 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 4w/e 20/08/1954 70C 4w/e 11/12/1954 75B Redhill
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33025 6w/e 18/06/1954 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 20/08/1954 70C w/e 07/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31622 8w/e 13/05/1954 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 06/11/1954 70C w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 30575 5w/e 11/12/1952 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/12/1954 70C w/e 13/12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 30580 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 11/12/1954 70C m/e 06/1957 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31253 7w/e 27/06/1951 73E Faversham 4w/e 11/12/1954 70C 6w/e 20/04/1955 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam C 0-6-0 31593 6w/e 05/09/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 11/12/1954 70C 6w/e 20/04/1955 74A Ashford
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31591 9w/e 08/02/1955 75E Three Bridges 5w/e 11/03/1955 70C m/e 06/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30697 4w/e 01/10/1953 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 20/04/1955 70C 2w/e 10/10/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30700 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 6w/e 20/04/1955 70C w/e 11/03/1959 70C Guildford
Steam B4 0-4-0T 30086 8w/e 13/05/1954 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 12/08/1955 70C m/e 02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31075 4w/e 11/12/1954 75B Redhill 5w/e 12/08/1955 70C w/e 15/12/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31549 4w/e 12/05/1951 74A Ashford 5w/e 16/09/1955 70C w/e 20/10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31574 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford 5w/e 16/09/1955 70C w/e 06/10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31577 4w/e 27/07/1951 75B Redhill 5w/e 16/09/1955 70C w/e 08/12/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32506 7w/e 27/06/1951 72B Salisbury 5w/e 16/09/1955 70C 4w/e 06/05/1960 70A Nine Elms
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30698 4w/e 01/10/1953 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 10/10/1955 70C w/e 19/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31488 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 10/10/1955 70C w/e 04/02/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32505 8w/e 20/07/1953 71D Fratton 4w/e 10/10/1955 70C 4w/e 06/05/1960 70A Nine Elms
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31737 8w/e 13/05/1954 74D Tonbridge 7w/e 19/12/1955 70C m/e 10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31636 6w/e 21/06/1955 71A Eastleigh 7w/e 27/08/1956 70C m/e 09/11/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30124 4w/e 19/03/1952 70A Nine Elms 3w/e 17/11/1956 70C w/e 20/05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30337 9w/e 08/02/1955 70F Fratton 3w/e 17/11/1956 70C m/e 11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30705 4w/e 05/02/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956 70C on 14/01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam D1 4-4-0 31145 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 17/12/1956 70C 4w/e 24/02/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam D1 4-4-0 31247 5w/e 11/12/1952 73E Faversham 4w/e 17/12/1956 70C 4w/e 24/02/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31612 4w/e 10/10/1955 70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 17/12/1956 70C m/e 09/11/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 31722 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 17/12/1956 70C 4w/e 01/02/1962 75A Brighton
Steam C 0-6-0 31723 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 17/12/1956 70C w/e 27/01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31635 6w/e 15/06/1956 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 25/01/1957 70C w/e 01/12/1963 Withdrawn
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15216 3w/e 09/05/1955 73C Hither Green 7w/e 08/10/1957 70C 4w/e 24/02/1958 73C Hither Green
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15217 3w/e 09/05/1955 73C Hither Green 7w/e 08/10/1957 70C 4w/e 24/02/1958 73C Hither Green
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3092 6w/e 21/06/1955 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 24/02/1958 70C 5w/e 10/06/1960 73F Ashford
Steam B4 0-4-0T 30089 3w/e 13/10/1958 71A Eastleigh w/e 11/03/1959 70C w/e 10/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30132 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms w/e 11/03/1959 70C w/e 27/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30700 6w/e 20/04/1955 70C Guildford w/e 11/03/1959 70C 2w/e 10/10/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 30724 8w/e 07/10/1952 70D Basingstoke w/e 11/03/1959 70C w/e 09/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31637 4w/e 01/10/1953 71D Fratton w/e 11/03/1959 70C 4w/e 10/03/1960 72C Yeovil Town
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31807 4w/e 05/02/1951 71D Fratton w/e 11/03/1959 70C 6w/e 09/02/1960 75B Redhill
Steam G6 0-6-0T 30277 6w/e 01/04/1957 70E Reading (S.R.) 3w/e 01/05/1959 70C w/e 11/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30378 on 01/01/1948 SAL Salisbury 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C 4w/e 02/1962 71B Bournemouth
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31615 6w/e 21/06/1955 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C w/e 06/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31811 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C w/e 04/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31812 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C on 08/09/1963 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31815 8w/e 13/05/1954 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C w/e 26/05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31816 8w/e 13/05/1954 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C 6w/e 22/10/1959 73C Hither Green
Steam C 0-6-0 31037 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 18/07/1959 70C 4w/e 05/04/1960 70C Guildford
Steam C 0-6-0 31054 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 18/07/1959 70C 4w/e 05/04/1960 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31858 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C Hither Green 6w/e 22/10/1959 70C w/e 26/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31614 6w/e 14/06/1959 70F Fratton 5w/e 26/11/1959 70C 4w/e 10/03/1960 72C Yeovil Town
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31638 4w/e 01/10/1953 71D Fratton 5w/e 26/11/1959 70C w/e 12/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31805 8w/e 20/07/1953 71D Fratton 5w/e 26/11/1959 70C 4w/e 10/03/1960 72C Yeovil Town
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30903 9w/e 12/06/1957 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 10/03/1960 70C on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30906 9w/e 12/06/1957 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 10/03/1960 70C on 23/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30909 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 10/03/1960 70C w/e 17/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31610 6w/e 21/06/1955 70D Basingstoke 4w/e 10/03/1960 70C on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31623 8w/e 20/07/1953 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 10/03/1960 70C w/e 01/12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31633 w/e 11/03/1959 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 10/03/1960 70C w/e 22/12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31790 6w/e 14/06/1959 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 10/03/1960 70C w/e 09/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31037 5w/e 18/07/1959 70C Guildford 4w/e 05/04/1960 70C w/e 25/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31054 5w/e 18/07/1959 70C Guildford 4w/e 05/04/1960 70C w/e 20/08/1960 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2290       on 06/05/1960 (New) 70C 4w/e 01/05/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2295       on 24/06/1960 (New) 70C 4w/e 01/05/1962 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31400 8w/e 20/07/1953 74A Ashford 4w/e 08/07/1960 70C m/e 08/12/1961 75A Brighton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31401 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 4w/e 08/07/1960 70C m/e 08/12/1961 75A Brighton
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30690 4w/e 06/11/1954 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 17/01/1961 70C on 23/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31414 8w/e 17/01/1961 70B Feltham m/e 10/02/1961 70C w/e 24/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31402 m/e 10/02/1961 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 70C m/e 08/12/1961 75A Brighton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31403 m/e 10/02/1961 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 70C m/e 08/12/1961 75A Brighton
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33034 on 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 3w/e 26/05/1961 70C w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33035 on 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 3w/e 26/05/1961 70C w/e 14/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33036 8w/e 07/10/1952 74D Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 70C w/e 28/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30049 4w/e 05/04/1960 75A Brighton 5w/e 06/07/1961 70C w/e 02/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31819 5w/e 06/07/1961 75A Brighton m/e 08/12/1961 70C w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31820 5w/e 06/07/1961 75A Brighton m/e 08/12/1961 70C m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31821 5w/e 06/07/1961 75A Brighton m/e 08/12/1961 70C on 08/09/1963 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31859 5w/e 06/07/1961 75A Brighton m/e 08/12/1961 70C 2w/e 31/08/1963 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30339 4w/e 12/05/1951 70B Feltham 4w/e 04/01/1962 70C 4w/e 01/02/1962 70B Feltham
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30346 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 04/01/1962 70C 4w/e 01/02/1962 70B Feltham
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2285 on 27/03/1960 73F Ashford (New) 4w/e 02/1962 70C 4w/e 27/04/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30112 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 4w/e 02/1962 70C 4w/e 09/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30325 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 01/02/1962 70C on 23/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 30326 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 01/02/1962 70C w/e 10/02/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3047 9w/e 08/02/1955 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 05/03/1962 70C 4w/e 09/07/1967 70B Feltham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3048 on 23/04/1954 75C Norwood Junction (New) 4w/e 05/03/1962 70C 4w/e 09/07/1967 70B Feltham
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2284 on 25/03/1960 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 01/05/1962 70C w/e 28/05/1966 32B Ipswich
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2286 on 26/03/1960 75A Brighton (New) 4w/e 01/05/1962 70C 4w/e 09/07/1967 73C Hither Green
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3049 9w/e 08/02/1955 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 01/05/1962 70C on 20/06/1965 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33032 on 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 4w/e 28/05/1962 70C w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33033 on 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 4w/e 28/05/1962 70C w/e 14/06/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3093 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A Brighton 4w/e 30/07/1962 70C 4w/e 14/10/1963 70B Feltham
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30055 7w/e 23/08/1961 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 30/07/1962 70C 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31857 m/e 10/02/1961 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 22/10/1962 70C w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82015 on 13/08/1952 71A Eastleigh (New) 4w/e 17/12/1962 70C 4w/e 01/04/1963 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82016 on 21/08/1952 71A Eastleigh (New) 4w/e 17/12/1962 70C 4w/e 01/04/1963 70A Nine Elms
Steam Q 0-6-0 30542 4w/e 09/09/1950 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 17/12/1962 70C w/e 20/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam USA 0-6-0T 30072 on 01/01/1948 SOT Southampton Docks 5w/e 04/03/1963 70C w/e 09/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80087 4w/e 17/12/1962 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/04/1963 70C 4w/e 16/09/1963 70D Basingstoke
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80095 4w/e 17/12/1962 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/04/1963 70C 4w/e 16/09/1963 70B Feltham
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80137 4w/e 17/12/1962 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 01/04/1963 70C 4w/e 16/09/1963 70B Feltham
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31611 w/e 11/03/1959 70D Basingstoke 4w/e 01/04/1963 70C w/e 20/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31618 4w/e 17/12/1962 70D Basingstoke 4w/e 01/04/1963 70C w/e 12/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31806 6w/e 21/06/1955 70D Basingstoke 4w/e 01/04/1963 70C w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 30541 3w/e 30/01/1963 70D Basingstoke 4w/e 01/04/1963 70C w/e 29/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82026 w/e 06/04/1963 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) w/e 14/09/1963 70C m/e 06/01/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82027 w/e 20/04/1963 50A York (North) w/e 14/09/1963 70C m/e 06/01/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82028 w/e 20/04/1963 50A York (North) w/e 14/09/1963 70C m/e 06/01/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82029 w/e 20/04/1963 50A York (North) w/e 14/09/1963 70C m/e 06/01/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76030 w/e 08/12/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C 4w/e 18/01/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76031 w/e 08/12/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C 4w/e 18/01/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76032 w/e 08/12/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C w/e 02/08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76033 w/e 08/12/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C 4w/e 18/01/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76034 w/e 08/12/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C w/e 13/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31404 3w/e 26/05/1961 72B Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C w/e 01/12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31408 m/e 09/11/1961 72B Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C w/e 05/06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31413 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C w/e 14/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31810 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C w/e 29/03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31813 4w/e 01/10/1953 72B Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C w/e 20/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31814 4w/e 01/10/1953 72B Salisbury 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C w/e 26/07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33001 m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham 4w/e 16/09/1963 70C w/e 17/05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31401 m/e 08/12/1961 75A Brighton m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 18/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31410 4w/e 16/09/1963 75B Redhill m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 01/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31412 4w/e 16/09/1963 75B Redhill m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 09/08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31619 8w/e 13/05/1954 71A Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 19/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31620 8w/e 13/05/1954 71A Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 04/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31639 6w/e 21/06/1955 71A Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 05/06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31791 4w/e 10/03/1960 71A Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 05/06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31793 3w/e 13/10/1958 71A Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 10/05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31799 4w/e 17/12/1962 75C Norwood Junction m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 07/02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31800 4w/e 16/09/1963 75C Norwood Junction m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 03/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31801 4w/e 01/10/1953 71A Eastleigh m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 14/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31833 4w/e 22/10/1962 75A Brighton m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 23/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31869 4w/e 11/04/1951 75B Redhill m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 02/08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33004 4w/e 14/10/1963 75E Three Bridges m/e 06/01/1964 70C on 03/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33006 4w/e 14/10/1963 75E Three Bridges m/e 06/01/1964 70C 4w/e 22/06/1964 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33014 w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn m/e 06/01/1964 (R) 70C      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33015 4w/e 17/12/1962 75E Three Bridges m/e 06/01/1964 70C w/e 15/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33018 4w/e 17/12/1962 75E Three Bridges m/e 06/01/1964 70C 4w/e 08/06/1965 70A Nine Elms
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2254 w/e 11/03/1959 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/04/1964 70C on 11/06/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41287 w/e 24/06/1961 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/05/1964 70C 4w/e 08/06/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41294 4w/e 01/04/1963 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/05/1964 70C 4w/e 08/06/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41299 4w/e 01/04/1963 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/05/1964 70C 4w/e 08/06/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41301 m/e 10/02/1961 75A Brighton 4w/e 25/05/1964 70C 4w/e 08/06/1965 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31842 3w/e 17/11/1956 72A Exmouth Junction on 14/06/1964 70C w/e 05/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76053 4w/e 06/05/1960 72B Salisbury 4w/e 22/06/1964 70C 4w/e 18/01/1965 70B Feltham
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76054 4w/e 06/05/1960 72B Salisbury 4w/e 22/06/1964 70C w/e 18/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76055 4w/e 06/05/1960 72B Salisbury 4w/e 22/06/1964 70C 4w/e 18/01/1965 70B Feltham
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31803 6w/e 21/06/1955 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 22/06/1964 70C w/e 13/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31809 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 22/06/1964 70C w/e 02/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76066 4w/e 10/03/1960 72B Salisbury m/e 14/09/1964 70C 4w/e 18/01/1965 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33009 4w/e 26/05/1953 70B Feltham m/e 14/09/1964 70C 4w/e 08/06/1965 70A Nine Elms
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33012 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford m/e 14/09/1964 70C w/e 22/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33006 4w/e 22/06/1964 70B Feltham w/e 20/11/1964 70C 4w/e 08/06/1965 70A Nine Elms
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33020 4w/e 22/06/1964 70B Feltham w/e 20/11/1964 70C 4w/e 08/06/1965 70A Nine Elms
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33026 m/e 06/01/1964 70B Feltham w/e 20/11/1964 70C 4w/e 08/06/1965 70A Nine Elms
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33027 4w/e 01/10/1953 70B Feltham w/e 20/11/1964 70C 4w/e 08/06/1965 70A Nine Elms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31405 4w/e 22/06/1964 75B Redhill 4w/e 18/01/1965 70C w/e 05/06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31411 4w/e 22/07/1963 75B Redhill 4w/e 18/01/1965 70C w/e 24/04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31816 4w/e 22/06/1964 75B Redhill 4w/e 18/01/1965 70C w/e 09/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31831 m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill 4w/e 18/01/1965 70C w/e 25/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31862 4w/e 26/05/1953 75B Redhill 4w/e 18/01/1965 70C w/e 11/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31866 4w/e 11/04/1951 75B Redhill 4w/e 18/01/1965 70C w/e 09/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31873 m/e 06/01/1964 75B Redhill 4w/e 18/01/1965 70C w/e 23/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 30535 m/e 06/01/1964 70E Salisbury 4w/e 18/01/1965 70C w/e 25/04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73022 m/e 12/10/1964 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 08/06/1965 70C 4w/e 27/06/1966 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73029 m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 08/06/1965 70C 4w/e 27/06/1966 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73037 on 28/03/1965 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 08/06/1965 70C 4w/e 27/06/1966 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73041 m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 08/06/1965 70C on 20/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73043 m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 08/06/1965 70C 4w/e 27/06/1966 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73065 w/e 20/11/1964 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 08/06/1965 70C 4w/e 27/06/1966 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73081 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 08/06/1965 70C w/e 31/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73082 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 08/06/1965 70C on 19/06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73087 m/e 12/10/1964 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 08/06/1965 70C w/e 02/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73088 3w/e 13/10/1958 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 25/10/1965 70C w/e 02/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73089 m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 25/10/1965 70C w/e 25/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73092 on 28/03/1965 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 25/10/1965 70C w/e 09/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73093 on 28/03/1965 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 25/10/1965 70C w/e 09/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73110 m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 25/10/1965 70C w/e 29/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33006 4w/e 08/06/1965 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 22/11/1965 70C w/e 09/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33020 4w/e 08/06/1965 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 22/11/1965 70C w/e 09/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33027 4w/e 08/06/1965 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 22/11/1965 70C w/e 09/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80011 4w/e 25/10/1965 70F Bournemouth 3w/e 10/01/1966 70C 4w/e 07/02/1966 70F Bournemouth
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77014 on 01/11/1964 8E Northwich w/e 02/04/1966 70C on 09/07/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2031 w/e 21/08/1965 30A Stratford w/e 28/05/1966 70C 4w/e 25/07/1966 70C Guildford
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76012 m/e 04/1953 71A Eastleigh (New) 4w/e 27/06/1966 70C w/e 04/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76016 m/e 05/1953 71A Eastleigh (New) 4w/e 27/06/1966 70C w/e 02/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76018 m/e 14/09/1964 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 27/06/1966 70C w/e 02/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76031 4w/e 18/01/1965 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 27/06/1966 70C w/e 09/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76033 4w/e 18/01/1965 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 27/06/1966 70C m/e 01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76053 4w/e 05/07/1965 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 27/06/1966 70C w/e 29/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76058 4w/e 05/03/1962 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/06/1966 70C w/e 26/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76059 4w/e 10/03/1960 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/06/1966 70C w/e 25/09/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2031 w/e 28/05/1966 70C Guildford 4w/e 25/07/1966 70C 4w/e 19/09/1966 75A Brighton
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2274 4w/e 14/10/1963 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 22/08/1966 70C w/e 04/02/1967 16C Derby
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2041 4w/e 25/07/1966 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 19/09/1966 70C 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73115 4w/e 27/06/1966 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 17/10/1966 70C w/e 19/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73117 4w/e 27/06/1966 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 17/10/1966 70C w/e 19/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73118 4w/e 27/06/1966 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 17/10/1966 70C w/e 09/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 76069 m/e 08/1956 71A Eastleigh (New) 4w/e 17/10/1966 70C w/e 18/06/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3221 4w/e 19/09/1966 70B Feltham 4w/e 14/11/1966 70C 4w/e 09/07/1967 70B Feltham
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73018 3w/e 13/10/1958 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 5w/e 17/04/1967 70C w/e 09/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73020 3w/e 13/10/1958 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 5w/e 17/04/1967 70C w/e 09/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73155 w/e 20/11/1964 70D Eastleigh 5w/e 17/04/1967 70C w/e 09/07/1967 Withdrawn