Depot: Haverton Hill
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Haverton Hill | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 162 | m/e | 06/1903 (New) | HAV | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 411 | m/e | 03/1904 (New) | HAV | on | 27/05/1937 | MID | Middlesbrough | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1111 | m/e | 03/1904 (New) | HAV | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1682 | m/e | 12/1902 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 19/03/1928 | HAV | on | 14/11/1948 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1694 | m/e | 02/1903 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 19/03/1928 | HAV | on | 25/01/1935 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1128 | on | 07/02/1925 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 19/03/1928 | HAV | on | 02/08/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 901 | m/e | 10/1919 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 19/07/1928 | HAV | on | 05/05/1931 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 904 | m/e | 11/1919 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 19/07/1928 | HAV | on | 05/05/1931 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 905 | m/e | 11/1919 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 19/07/1928 | HAV | on | 05/05/1931 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 625 | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | Stockton | on | 03/04/1930 | HAV | on | 06/12/1937 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1173 | on | 07/02/1925 | SKN | Stockton | on | 25/06/1930 | HAV | on | 12/02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 660 | m/e | 06/1907 | SKN | Stockton (New) | on | 25/06/1930 | HAV | on | 31/12/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1729 | m/e | 06/1902 | SKN | Stockton (New) | on | 15/12/1930 | HAV | on | 27/05/1937 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 770 | m/e | 09/1911 | NBH | Blyth (North) (New) | on | 23/04/1931 | HAV | on | 25/01/1935 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1279 | on | 14/10/1929 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 23/04/1931 | HAV | on | 05/05/1931 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1700 | m/e | 04/1902 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 05/05/1931 | HAV | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 772 | on | 30/01/1924 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 05/05/1931 | HAV | on | 28/03/1943 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 130 | m/e | 03/1902 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 18/06/1931 | HAV | on | 23/07/1945 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1472 | on | 27/03/1934 | MID | Middlesbrough (New) | on | 12/10/1936 | HAV | on | 19/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1587 | on | 29/04/1937 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 25/05/1937 | HAV | on | 28/03/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2223 | on | 06/05/1937 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 27/05/1937 | HAV | on | 26/11/1938 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2249 | on | 05/05/1937 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 27/05/1937 | HAV | on | 26/11/1938 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1458 | on | 09/11/1926 | WHL | West Hartlepool (New) | on | 07/11/1938 | HAV | on | 28/03/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1459 | on | 12/11/1926 | WHL | West Hartlepool (New) | on | 07/11/1938 | HAV | on | 28/03/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 651 | m/e | 06/1903 | EHL | East Hartlepool (New) | on | 10/12/1938 | HAV | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 783 | m/e | 10/1911 | EHL | East Hartlepool (New) | on | 10/12/1938 | HAV | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1453 | on | 31/08/1932 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | HAV | on | 19/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1469 | on | 06/10/1932 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | HAV | on | 19/06/1943 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1252 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | on | 20/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1253 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | on | 29/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2227 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | on | 18/10/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2229 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | on | 18/10/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2244 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | on | 18/10/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2254 | on | 28/03/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 19/06/1943 | HAV | on | 18/10/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2216 | m/e | 06/1917 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) (New) | on | 04/12/1943 | HAV | on | 18/10/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3252 | on | 28/03/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 27/07/1947 | HAV | on | 07/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3306 | on | 28/07/1945 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 05/10/1947 | HAV | on | 20/12/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3331 | on | 23/07/1945 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 05/10/1947 | HAV | on | 12/02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3340 | on | 01/02/1943 | SKN | Stockton | on | 05/10/1947 | HAV | on | 07/01/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3374 | on | 23/06/1943 | SKN | Stockton | on | 05/10/1947 | HAV | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3416 | on | 04/12/1943 | SKN | Stockton | on | 05/10/1947 | HAV | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5787 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 51E | Stockton | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5818 | H | 12/1935 | SEL | Selby | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | w/e | 13/11/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5833 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 51E | Stockton | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5835 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5839 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5840 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5866 | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | w/e | 13/11/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9419 | by | 01/01/1923 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | m/e | 02/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3275 | on | 13/04/1947 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 15/02/1948 | HAV | on | 18/04/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 2804 | on | 05/05/1945 | Withdrawn | w/e | 21/02/1948 (R) | HAV | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5660 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 06/03/1948 | HAV | w/e | 12/01/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3425 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 12/05/1948 | HAV | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3425 | on | 12/05/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HAV | on | 24/09/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3405 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 07/11/1948 | HAV | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63453 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 07/11/1948 | HAV | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3405 | on | 07/11/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HAV | on | 07/01/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63453 | on | 07/11/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HAV | on | 24/09/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3314 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NMN | on | 14/11/1948 | HAV | w/e | 20/11/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3314 | on | 14/11/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 20/11/1948 | HAV | on | 03/09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63367 | on | 02/11/1947 | SKN | Stockton | on | 06/02/1949 | HAV | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3407 | on | 19/06/1943 | SKN | Stockton | on | 06/02/1949 | HAV | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3446 | on | 07/02/1948 | SKN | Stockton | on | 06/02/1949 | HAV | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5805 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | Stockton | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HAV | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63367 | on | 06/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HAV | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3407 | on | 06/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HAV | on | 14/06/1959 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3446 | on | 06/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HAV | on | 14/06/1959 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63423 | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 13/02/1949 | HAV | w/e | 19/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3443 | on | 06/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 13/02/1949 | HAV | w/e | 19/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63423 | on | 13/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 19/02/1949 | HAV | on | 24/09/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3443 | on | 13/02/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 19/02/1949 | HAV | on | 14/06/1959 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63311 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 01/05/1949 | HAV | w/e | 07/05/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63311 | on | 01/05/1949 | HAV | Haverton Hill | w/e | 07/05/1949 | HAV | on | 29/09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65865 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 51C | West Hartlepool | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 51G | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90089 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51G | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90382 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51G | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90695 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51G | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90089 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51G | Haverton Hill | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51G | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90382 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51G | Haverton Hill | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51G | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90695 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51G | Haverton Hill | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51G | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62056 | on | 24/11/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 07/01/1951 | 51G | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62057 | on | 30/11/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 07/01/1951 | 51G | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62056 | on | 07/01/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51G | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62057 | on | 07/01/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51G | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62048 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 02/09/1951 | 51G | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62058 | on | 06/12/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 02/09/1951 | 51G | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62059 | on | 13/12/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 02/09/1951 | 51G | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62048 | on | 02/09/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51G | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62058 | on | 02/09/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51G | on | 16/06/1957 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62059 | on | 02/09/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51G | on | 16/06/1957 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | D31 | 4-4-0 | 62281 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 51G | on | 11/12/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62050 | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 07/10/1951 | 51G | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62061 | m/e | 12/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 07/10/1951 | 51G | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62050 | on | 07/10/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 51G | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62061 | on | 07/10/1951 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 51G | on | 10/06/1956 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65790 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 51G | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43050 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 51G | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63341 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 10/06/1956 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63343 | on | 19/06/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 10/06/1956 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63344 | on | 12/04/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 10/06/1956 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63345 | on | 20/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 10/06/1956 | 51G | on | 08/05/1959 | 52K | Consett |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63347 | on | 23/07/1945 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 10/06/1956 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68423 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 51G | on | 11/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63391 | on | 01/07/1956 | 52F | Blyth (North) | on | 16/06/1957 | 51G | on | 08/06/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63412 | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 16/06/1957 | 51G | on | 08/06/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61018 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton | on | 08/06/1958 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61021 | on | 25/09/1955 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61024 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51A | Darlington | on | 08/06/1958 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61037 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | SKN | Stockton | on | 08/06/1958 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90479 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51G | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90661 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51G | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68722 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 51G | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90086 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | SKN | Stockton | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 51G | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63361 | on | 08/06/1958 | 51E | Stockton | on | 12/10/1958 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63382 | on | 08/06/1958 | 51E | Stockton | on | 12/10/1958 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63432 | on | 08/06/1958 | 51E | Stockton | on | 12/10/1958 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90397 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51A | Darlington | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 51G | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61255 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 15/02/1959 | 51G | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |