Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 79 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 79 Week
» 11224 Month
» 111009 Year
» 1776385 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Hither Green


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Hither Green Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5452 on 30/06/1928 KX Kings Cross on 29/11/1935 HIT on 06/05/1937 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5007 on 05/12/1929 KX Kings Cross on 29/11/1935 HIT on 07/05/1937 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam B1 4-6-0 1096       on 12/11/1946 (New) HIT on 17/06/1948 MAR March
Steam B1 4-6-0 1097       on 15/11/1946 (New) HIT on 07/08/1960 34E New England
Steam B1 4-6-0 1098       on 19/11/1946 (New) HIT on 17/06/1948 MAR March
Steam B1 4-6-0 1099       on 21/11/1946 (New) HIT on 11/01/1953 34A Kings Cross
Steam B1 4-6-0 1105       on 09/12/1946 (New) HIT on 11/01/1953 34A Kings Cross
Steam B1 4-6-0 1106       on 11/12/1946 (New) HIT on 23/01/1949 GOR Gorton
Steam B1 4-6-0 1107       on 13/12/1946 (New) HIT on 14/11/1948 LEI Leicester (G.C.)
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 800       on 01/01/1948 HIT 4w/e 17/06/1950 73C Hither Green
Steam Z 0-8-0T 950       on 01/01/1948 HIT 5w/e 14/02/1953 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Z 0-8-0T 951       on 01/01/1948 HIT 5w/e 14/02/1953 75E Three Bridges
Steam Z 0-8-0T 953       on 01/01/1948 HIT 4w/e 11/12/1954 71H Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Z 0-8-0T 955       on 01/01/1948 HIT 4w/e 21/01/1952 74A Ashford
Steam Z 0-8-0T 956       on 01/01/1948 HIT 4w/e 20/08/1954 75A Brighton
Steam C 0-6-0 1018       on 01/01/1948 HIT w/e 10/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 1028       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Jumbos 4-4-0 1031       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1054       on 01/01/1948 HIT 5w/e 14/02/1953 74B Ramsgate
Steam C 0-6-0 1059       on 01/01/1948 HIT w/e 22/02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1061       on 01/01/1948 HIT 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 1068       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1071       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1113       on 01/01/1948 HIT 4w/e 08/07/1960 70B Feltham
Steam C 0-6-0 1191       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1243       on 01/01/1948 HIT w/e 10/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1244       on 01/01/1948 HIT 5w/e 14/02/1953 74B Ramsgate
Steam C 0-6-0 1245       on 01/01/1948 HIT 3w/e 13/10/1958 73G Ramsgate
Steam C 0-6-0 1253       on 01/01/1948 HIT 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 1257       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 08/1949 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1270       on 01/01/1948 HIT 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 1298       on 01/01/1948 HIT 9w/e 12/06/1957 73E Faversham
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1455       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 06/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1457       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 02/1949 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1480       on 01/01/1948 HIT 6w/e 01/04/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 1486       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 05/1953 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1572       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 03/1954 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1581       on 01/01/1948 HIT 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam C 0-6-0 1689       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 09/11/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 1695       on 01/01/1948 HIT w/e 24/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1720       on 01/01/1948 HIT 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam N1 2-6-0 1878       on 01/01/1948 HIT 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam N1 2-6-0 1879       on 01/01/1948 HIT 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam N1 2-6-0 1880       on 01/01/1948 HIT 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam W 2-6-4T 1911       on 01/01/1948 HIT 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam W 2-6-4T 1913       on 01/01/1948 HIT 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam W 2-6-4T 1921       on 01/01/1948 HIT 4w/e 20/08/1954 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam W 2-6-4T 1922       on 01/01/1948 HIT 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam W 2-6-4T 1923       on 01/01/1948 HIT 8w/e 17/01/1961 70B Feltham
Steam W 2-6-4T 1924       on 01/01/1948 HIT 3w/e 26/05/1961 70B Feltham
Steam W 2-6-4T 1925       on 01/01/1948 HIT 3w/e 26/05/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam O1 0-6-0 31374       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 09/1949 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31377       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 01/1950 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31385       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 09/1949 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31386       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 10/1948 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31109       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 01/1949 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31248       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 1251       on 01/01/1948 HIT 4w/e 27/07/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam O1 0-6-0 31044       on 01/01/1948 HIT m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15223       w/e 01/10/1949 (New) HIT m/e 09/12/1963 73E Faversham
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15224       w/e 22/10/1949 (New) HIT 4w/e 24/02/1958 74A Ashford
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30800 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 4w/e 17/06/1950 73C 4w/e 08/12/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90267       4w/e 17/06/1950 73C 4w/e 26/01/1952 25G Farnley Junction
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30797 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 07/10/1950 73C 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15226       w/e 30/12/1950 (New) 73C 4w/e 24/02/1958 74A Ashford
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15227       w/e 03/02/1951 (New) 73C 4w/e 24/02/1958 74A Ashford
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30806 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 4w/e 05/02/1951 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90247       4w/e 05/02/1951 73C 4w/e 17/07/1951 27B Aintree
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31803 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C Guildford 4w/e 11/04/1951 73C 4w/e 12/05/1951 73E Faversham
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31804 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 11/04/1951 73C 4w/e 12/05/1951 73E Faversham
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15228       w/e 28/04/1951 (New) 73C 4w/e 24/02/1958 74A Ashford
Steam C 0-6-0 31481 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C 7w/e 27/06/1951 73E Faversham
Steam C 0-6-0 31582 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31631 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C 4w/e 27/07/1951 75B Redhill
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31638 on 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C 4w/e 27/07/1951 75B Redhill
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31800 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C 4w/e 16/09/1963 75C Norwood Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31801 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C 4w/e 01/10/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31802 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C 6w/e 18/06/1954 73E Faversham
Steam C 0-6-0 31063 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 7w/e 27/06/1951 73C m/e 04/1956 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31687 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 27/06/1951 73C w/e 02/04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31688 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 27/06/1951 73C w/e 20/02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31874 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951 73C 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31875 4w/e 08/12/1950 72B Salisbury 7w/e 27/06/1951 73C 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 31691 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C w/e 21/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31692 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C w/e 23/04/1960 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31693 4w/e 12/05/1951 73E Faversham 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C 4w/e 08/07/1960 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31857 on 01/01/1948 RDG Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C 8w/e 17/01/1961 70B Feltham
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31858 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C 6w/e 22/10/1959 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31859 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C 3w/e 26/05/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31860 4w/e 05/02/1951 75B Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31861 4w/e 05/02/1951 75B Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31862 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C 5w/e 14/02/1953 70C Guildford
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33014 4w/e 09/09/1950 70C Guildford 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33015 4w/e 09/09/1950 70C Guildford 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C 6w/e 18/06/1954 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15229       w/e 28/07/1951 (New) 73C 4w/e 24/02/1958 74A Ashford
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15230       w/e 22/09/1951 (New) 73C 5w/e 14/02/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam C 0-6-0 31225 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 06/10/1951 73C 4w/e 08/02/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31856 on 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951 73C 5w/e 14/02/1953 70C Guildford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31899 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1951 73C 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31900 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1951 73C 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15234       w/e 01/12/1951 (New) 73C 5w/e 11/03/1955 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15236       w/e 19/01/1952 (New) 73C 6w/e 20/04/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31619 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 9w/e 30/06/1952 73C 4w/e 01/10/1953 70E Reading (S.R.)
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31620 4w/e 12/05/1951 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 30/06/1952 73C 4w/e 01/10/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31621 4w/e 06/10/1951 71B Bournemouth 9w/e 30/06/1952 73C 4w/e 01/10/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam C 0-6-0 31686 6w/e 05/09/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent) 9w/e 30/06/1952 73C m/e 09/11/1961 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam C 0-6-0 31690 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 30/06/1952 73C m/e 09/11/1961 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33037 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 07/10/1952 73C 8w/e 13/05/1954 75A Brighton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13010       on 17/12/1952 (New) 73C 4w/e 06/11/1954 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13011       on 19/12/1952 (New) 73C 4w/e 06/11/1954 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13012       on 23/12/1952 (New) 73C 4w/e 06/11/1954 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13013       on 23/12/1952 (New) 73C 8w/e 13/05/1954 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13014       on 24/12/1952 (New) 73C 8w/e 13/05/1954 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15235 w/e 15/12/1951 75C Norwood Junction (New) 5w/e 14/02/1953 73C 6w/e 21/06/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31406 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 5w/e 14/02/1953 73C 8w/e 20/07/1953 74A Ashford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31408 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford 5w/e 14/02/1953 73C 4w/e 01/10/1953 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam W 2-6-4T 31916 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 5w/e 14/02/1953 73C 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33007 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 5w/e 14/02/1953 73C 4w/e 26/05/1953 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33009 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 5w/e 14/02/1953 73C 4w/e 26/05/1953 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33011 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 5w/e 14/02/1953 73C 4w/e 26/05/1953 70B Feltham
Steam C 0-6-0 31054 5w/e 14/02/1953 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 27/03/1953 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15220 9w/e 30/06/1952 75C Norwood Junction 8w/e 20/07/1953 73C 4w/e 24/02/1958 74A Ashford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31638 5w/e 14/02/1953 75B Redhill 8w/e 20/07/1953 73C 4w/e 01/10/1953 71D Fratton
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31856 4w/e 26/05/1953 75B Redhill 8w/e 20/07/1953 73C m/e 10/02/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33016 5w/e 14/02/1953 73E Faversham 8w/e 20/07/1953 73C 8w/e 13/05/1954 75C Norwood Junction
Steam W 2-6-4T 31912 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 5w/e 24/08/1953 73C 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31892 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/10/1953 73C 6w/e 21/06/1955 73E Faversham
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31893 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 01/10/1953 73C 6w/e 21/06/1955 73E Faversham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33018 5w/e 24/08/1953 70C Guildford 4w/e 01/10/1953 73C 8w/e 13/05/1954 75C Norwood Junction
Steam C 0-6-0 31498 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/02/1954 73C 6w/e 25/01/1957 74E St Leonards
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13043       on 20/02/1954 (New) 73C 3w/e 09/05/1955 74A Ashford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13045       on 26/03/1954 (New) 73C 4w/e 10/10/1955 74A Ashford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13047       on 14/04/1954 (New) 73C 9w/e 08/02/1955 75C Norwood Junction
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30795 4w/e 05/02/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 18/06/1954 73C 4w/e 20/08/1954 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31855 4w/e 06/10/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 18/06/1954 73C m/e 10/02/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30772 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 20/08/1954 73C 9w/e 12/06/1957 71B Bournemouth
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13044 on 17/03/1954 75C Norwood Junction (New) 4w/e 06/11/1954 73C 2w/e 07/07/1955 74A Ashford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13046 on 09/04/1954 75C Norwood Junction (New) 4w/e 06/11/1954 73C 4w/e 10/10/1955 74A Ashford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13049 on 23/04/1954 75C Norwood Junction (New) 4w/e 06/11/1954 73C 9w/e 08/02/1955 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31854 on 01/01/1948 RDG Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 06/11/1954 73C 5w/e 19/07/1957 74A Ashford
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33037 8w/e 13/05/1954 75A Brighton 4w/e 06/11/1954 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15218 4w/e 19/03/1952 75C Norwood Junction 9w/e 08/02/1955 73C on 31/01/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15219 4w/e 19/03/1952 75C Norwood Junction 9w/e 08/02/1955 73C 4w/e 28/05/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13095 w/e 18/12/1954 75C Norwood Junction (New) 5w/e 11/03/1955 73C 4w/e 01/05/1962 75A Brighton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13096 w/e 25/12/1954 75C Norwood Junction (New) 6w/e 20/04/1955 73C 6w/e 05/10/1960 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13097 w/e 15/01/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 6w/e 20/04/1955 73C on 31/05/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13217 w/e 02/04/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) 3w/e 09/05/1955 73C 6w/e 21/06/1955 75A Brighton
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15216 w/e 04/06/1949 NORW Norwood Junction (New) 3w/e 09/05/1955 73C 7w/e 08/10/1957 70C Guildford
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15217 w/e 18/06/1949 NORW Norwood Junction (New) 3w/e 09/05/1955 73C 7w/e 08/10/1957 70C Guildford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13098 6w/e 20/04/1955 75A Brighton 6w/e 21/06/1955 73C w/e 12/11/1966 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13099 6w/e 21/06/1955 75C Norwood Junction 2w/e 07/07/1955 73C 3w/e 10/01/1966 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13100 6w/e 21/06/1955 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 10/10/1955 73C 4w/e 05/04/1960 70B Feltham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13101 6w/e 21/06/1955 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 10/10/1955 73C m/e 12/10/1964 70D Eastleigh
Steam C 0-6-0 31724 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A Brighton 6w/e 15/06/1956 73C 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A Brighton
Steam C 0-6-0 31725 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A Brighton 6w/e 15/06/1956 73C 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A Brighton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13270       w/e 29/09/1956 (New) 73C 4w/e 24/11/1960 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13271       w/e 29/09/1956 (New) 73C 4w/e 05/03/1962 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13272       w/e 06/10/1956 (New) 73C 4w/e 01/05/1962 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13273       on 11/10/1956 (New) 73C 4w/e 30/07/1962 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13274       on 17/10/1956 (New) 73C 4w/e 05/03/1962 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel D3/12 0-6-0 15202 8w/e 20/07/1953 75C Norwood Junction 3w/e 17/11/1956 73C m/e 09/12/1963 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Steam C 0-6-0 31721 5w/e 11/12/1952 74E St Leonards 4w/e 17/12/1956 73C 3w/e 26/05/1961 73F Ashford
Steam C 0-6-0 31287 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 01/04/1957 73C w/e 08/10/1960 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11220       on 10/04/1957 (New) 73C 7w/e 08/10/1957 74C Dover Marine
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11223       on 10/04/1957 (New) 73C 7w/e 08/10/1957 73C Hither Green
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11221       on 17/04/1957 (New) 73C 4w/e 05/03/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11224       on 26/04/1957 (New) 73C w/e 11/03/1959 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11225       on 26/04/1957 (New) 73C 7w/e 08/10/1957 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30796 6w/e 27/03/1953 74B Ramsgate 9w/e 12/06/1957 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 72B Salisbury
Steam C 0-6-0 31724 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A Brighton 9w/e 12/06/1957 73C 7w/e 08/10/1957 75A Brighton
Steam C 0-6-0 31725 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A Brighton 9w/e 12/06/1957 73C 7w/e 08/10/1957 75A Brighton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3459       on 17/06/1957 (New) 73C 6w/e 05/10/1960 70B Feltham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3460       on 21/06/1957 (New) 73C 7w/e 23/08/1961 73C Hither Green
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3461       on 24/06/1957 (New) 73C 7w/e 08/10/1957 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3462       on 27/06/1957 (New) 73C 4w/e 01/05/1962 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3463       on 01/07/1957 (New) 73C 4w/e 30/07/1962 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3464       on 05/07/1957 (New) 73C 7w/e 08/10/1957 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3465       on 09/07/1957 (New) 73C 7w/e 08/10/1957 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3466       on 10/07/1957 (New) 73C 4w/e 05/03/1962 73C Hither Green
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33039 on 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 5w/e 19/07/1957 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33040 on 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 5w/e 19/07/1957 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3467       on 07/08/1957 (New) 73C 4w/e 01/05/1962 73C Hither Green
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3468       on 12/08/1957 (New) 73C 4w/e 09/07/1967 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3471       on 28/08/1957 (New) 73C 4w/e 24/06/1963 73E Faversham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3472       on 30/08/1957 (New) 73C 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11226       on 20/09/1957 (New) 73C 4w/e 05/03/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11223 on 10/04/1957 73C Hither Green (New) 7w/e 08/10/1957 73C m/e 08/12/1961 73C Hither Green
Steam C 0-6-0 31253 6w/e 20/04/1955 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 08/10/1957 73C w/e 17/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31573 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 08/10/1957 73C 4w/e 08/07/1960 70B Feltham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3470 on 26/08/1957 74A Ashford (New) 4w/e 24/02/1958 73C on 12/09/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15216 7w/e 08/10/1957 70C Guildford 4w/e 24/02/1958 73C m/e 12/10/1964 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15217 7w/e 08/10/1957 70C Guildford 4w/e 24/02/1958 73C 4w/e 05/04/1960 73C Hither Green
Steam C 0-6-0 31498 6w/e 25/01/1957 74E St Leonards q/e 06/06/1958 73C 4w/e 08/07/1960 70B Feltham
Steam C 0-6-0 31724 7w/e 08/10/1957 75A Brighton q/e 06/06/1958 73C 3w/e 01/05/1959 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam C 0-6-0 31725 7w/e 08/10/1957 75A Brighton q/e 06/06/1958 73C 3w/e 01/05/1959 73C Hither Green
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2083       on 06/03/1959 (New) 73C 5w/e 18/03/1961 73F Ashford
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3671       on 26/03/1959 (New) 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 73E Faversham
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5009 on 14/03/1959 17A Derby (New) w/e 28/03/1959 73C w/e 12/05/1962 5B Crewe South
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5010 on 21/03/1959 17A Derby (New) w/e 11/04/1959 73C w/e 02/06/1962 21D Aston
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5011 w/e 28/03/1959 17A Derby w/e 11/04/1959 73C w/e 05/05/1962 5B Crewe South
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3719       on 13/04/1959 (New) 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 73E Faversham
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3721       on 13/04/1959 (New) 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 73E Faversham
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3720       on 15/04/1959 (New) 73C 6w/e 14/06/1959 73E Faversham
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5012 w/e 11/04/1959 17A Derby w/e 18/04/1959 73C w/e 12/05/1962 5B Crewe South
Steam C 0-6-0 31725 q/e 06/06/1958 73C Hither Green 3w/e 01/05/1959 73C 5w/e 26/11/1959 75A Brighton
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5017 w/e 06/06/1959 17A Derby w/e 04/07/1959 73C w/e 05/05/1962 5B Crewe South
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3670 6w/e 14/06/1959 73E Faversham 6w/e 22/10/1959 73C 5w/e 26/11/1959 73E Faversham
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31816 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C Guildford 6w/e 22/10/1959 73C 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2278       on 11/11/1959 (New) 73C 5w/e 31/12/1959 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6500       on 30/01/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Steam C 0-6-0 31268 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73C 3w/e 26/05/1961 73F Ashford
Steam C 0-6-0 31298 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73C m/e 11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31682 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73C w/e 21/10/1961 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6501       on 27/02/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 25/10/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam C 0-6-0 31579 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 10/03/1960 73C 4w/e 08/07/1960 70B Feltham
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6502       on 12/03/1960 (New) 73C on 17/05/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6503       on 19/03/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 25/10/1965 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2284       on 25/03/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 01/05/1962 70C Guildford
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6504       on 26/03/1960 (New) 73C w/e 18/02/1961 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15217 4w/e 24/02/1958 73C Hither Green 4w/e 05/04/1960 73C m/e 08/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6505       on 09/04/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6506       on 23/04/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6507       on 04/05/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 25/10/1965 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2283 on 24/03/1960 73F Ashford (New) 4w/e 06/05/1960 73C m/e 10/02/1961 73F Ashford
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2292       on 19/05/1960 (New) 73C 7w/e 03/05/1961 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6508       on 21/05/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6509       on 21/05/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 25/10/1965 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6510       on 04/06/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 07/03/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6511       on 04/06/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 07/02/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6512       on 18/06/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6513       on 25/06/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 15/05/1967 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6514       on 02/07/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 02/05/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6515       on 08/07/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 25/10/1965 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6516       on 15/07/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 04/04/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6517       on 22/07/1960 (New) 73C w/e 16/12/1961 34E New England
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6518       on 19/08/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 02/05/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6519       on 27/08/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 02/05/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6520       on 03/09/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6521       on 11/09/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6522       on 17/09/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 07/03/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6523       on 24/09/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6524       on 01/10/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6525       on 08/10/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6526       on 15/10/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6527       on 22/10/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6528       on 29/10/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 21/12/1964 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6529       on 05/11/1960 (New) 73C 3w/e 10/01/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6530       on 12/11/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6532       on 19/11/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 18/01/1965 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6531       on 22/11/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/08/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6533       on 03/12/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6534       on 03/12/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6535       on 10/12/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 21/12/1964 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6536       on 17/12/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6537       on 31/12/1960 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6538       on 07/01/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/08/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6539       on 14/01/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/08/1966 70D Eastleigh
Steam C 0-6-0 31481 4w/e 08/07/1960 70B Feltham 8w/e 17/01/1961 73C 3w/e 26/05/1961 73F Ashford
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6540       on 21/01/1961 (New) 73C m/e 17/08/1964 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6541       on 28/01/1961 (New) 73C m/e 17/08/1964 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6542       on 04/02/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/08/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6543       on 10/02/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 19/09/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6504 w/e 18/02/1961 34G Finsbury Park w/e 25/02/1961 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6544       on 25/02/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 18/01/1965 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6545       on 08/03/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 21/12/1964 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2283 m/e 10/02/1961 73F Ashford 5w/e 18/03/1961 73C 4w/e 01/05/1962 75A Brighton
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6546       on 18/03/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6547       on 25/03/1961 (New) 73C 2w/e 23/09/1968 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6548       on 01/04/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 18/01/1965 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6549       on 01/04/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6550       on 13/04/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 25/10/1965 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6551       on 20/04/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 12/12/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6552       on 24/04/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 17/10/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2291 on 15/05/1960 71A Eastleigh (New) 7w/e 03/05/1961 73C m/e 09/11/1961 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6553       on 06/05/1961 (New) 73C w/e 27/07/1963 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6554       on 13/05/1961 (New) 73C w/e 18/01/1967 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6555       on 20/05/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 01/01/1969 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6556       on 01/06/1961 (New) 73C on 12/11/1961 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6557       on 03/06/1961 (New) 73C on 18/05/1989 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6558       on 10/06/1961 (New) 73C on 14/05/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6559       on 24/06/1961 (New) 73C w/e 02/12/1961 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6561       on 08/07/1961 (New) 73C on 23/09/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6560       on 15/07/1961 (New) 73C on 08/10/1996 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6562       on 15/07/1961 (New) 73C on 11/09/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6563       on 22/07/1961 (New) 73C on 30/10/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6564       on 29/07/1961 (New) 73C on 31/03/2007 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6565       on 19/08/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 17/10/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3460 on 21/06/1957 73C Hither Green (New) 7w/e 23/08/1961 73C 4w/e 05/03/1962 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6566       on 26/08/1961 (New) 73C on 13/02/1997 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6567       on 09/09/1961 (New) 73C on 28/03/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6568       on 09/09/1961 (New) 73C on 14/05/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6569       on 16/09/1961 (New) 73C on 31/08/2003 Withdrawn
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4099       on 19/09/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 05/03/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2398       on 30/09/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 01/02/1962 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6570       on 30/09/1961 (New) 73C on 13/02/1997 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6571       on 14/10/1961 (New) 73C on 01/01/1995 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6572       on 14/10/1961 (New) 73C on 17/12/1986 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6574       on 28/10/1961 (New) 73C on 04/02/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6573       on 04/11/1961 (New) 73C 3w/e 10/01/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6575       on 04/11/1961 (New) 73C on 31/08/2005 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6576       on 11/11/1961 (New) 73C on 03/11/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6556 on 01/06/1961 73C Hither Green (New) on 12/11/1961 73C on 03/12/1961 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6577       on 18/11/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 17/10/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6578       on 25/11/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6559 on 24/06/1961 73C Hither Green (New) w/e 02/12/1961 73C w/e 09/12/1961 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6579       on 02/12/1961 (New) 73C 2w/e 18/03/1968 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6556 on 12/11/1961 73C Hither Green on 03/12/1961 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2253 7w/e 08/10/1957 73C Hither Green m/e 08/12/1961 73C 4w/e 05/03/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6559 w/e 02/12/1961 73C Hither Green w/e 09/12/1961 73C w/e 23/12/1961 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6580       on 09/12/1961 (New) 73C 4w/e 25/10/1965 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6581       on 16/12/1961 (New) 73C on 25/06/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6559 w/e 09/12/1961 73C Hither Green w/e 23/12/1961 73C on 30/11/1975 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6582       on 23/12/1961 (New) 73C on 23/09/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6583       on 06/01/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6584       on 13/01/1962 (New) 73C on 15/10/1994 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6585       on 13/01/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2179       on 20/01/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 17/12/1962 70B Feltham
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11228 on 28/09/1957 72D Plymouth Friary (New) on 28/01/1962 73C 5w/e 02/07/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11229 on 28/09/1957 72D Plymouth Friary (New) on 28/01/1962 73C 5w/e 02/07/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2180       on 01/02/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 17/12/1962 70B Feltham
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11227 on 31/12/1961 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 01/02/1962 73C 4w/e 28/05/1962 73E Faversham
Diesel D3/12 0-6-0 15201 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 01/02/1962 73C 4w/e 19/08/1963 71A Eastleigh
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15213       4w/e 01/02/1962 73C on 03/11/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6586       on 02/02/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6587       on 09/02/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6588       on 16/02/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6589       on 23/02/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6590       on 23/02/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2083 4w/e 01/02/1962 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 05/03/1962 73C w/e 24/10/1967 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2084 on 19/03/1959 73F Ashford (New) 4w/e 05/03/1962 73C m/e 09/12/1963 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3466 on 10/07/1957 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 05/03/1962 73C 4w/e 09/07/1967 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15214 5w/e 26/11/1959 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 05/03/1962 73C 2w/e 25/02/1971 73F Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15215 w/e 07/05/1949 NORW Norwood Junction (New) 4w/e 05/03/1962 73C m/e 03/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6591       on 09/03/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6592       on 16/03/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6593       on 23/03/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6594       on 30/03/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6595       on 13/04/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6596       on 27/04/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2082 on 19/02/1959 75A Brighton (New) 4w/e 01/05/1962 73C 4w/e 19/04/1963 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2085 on 03/04/1959 71A Eastleigh (New) 4w/e 01/05/1962 73C m/e 12/10/1964 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3465 7w/e 08/10/1957 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 01/05/1962 73C 4w/e 24/06/1963 73E Faversham
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3467 on 07/08/1957 73C Hither Green (New) 4w/e 01/05/1962 73C w/e 12/11/1966 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15212       4w/e 01/05/1962 73C on 31/12/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6597       on 11/05/1962 (New) 73C 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3665 on 02/02/1959 71A Eastleigh (New) 4w/e 24/09/1962 73C 3w/e 10/01/1966 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11221 4w/e 05/03/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 19/04/1963 73C m/e 12/10/1964 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6553 on 06/05/1961 73C Hither Green (New) w/e 27/07/1963 73C m/e 09/1963 73C Hither Green
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15229 4w/e 05/03/1962 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 19/08/1963 73C on 31/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6553 w/e 27/07/1963 73C Hither Green m/e 09/1963 73C w/e 25/01/1964 73C Hither Green
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2253 4w/e 05/03/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 09/12/1963 73C w/e 04/02/1967 16C Derby
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3092 5w/e 10/06/1960 73F Ashford m/e 09/12/1963 73C on 01/10/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3465 4w/e 24/06/1963 73E Faversham m/e 09/12/1963 73C 4w/e 09/07/1967 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3719 6w/e 14/06/1959 73E Faversham m/e 09/12/1963 73C 4w/e 30/04/1972 73F Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3721 6w/e 14/06/1959 73E Faversham m/e 09/12/1963 73C      
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4099 4w/e 05/03/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 09/12/1963 73C w/e 30/09/1968 73F Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6553 m/e 09/1963 73C Hither Green w/e 25/01/1964 73C m/e 31/01/1964 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6553 w/e 25/01/1964 73C Hither Green m/e 31/01/1964 73C m/e 03/1964 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6553 m/e 31/01/1964 73C Hither Green m/e 03/1964 73C m/e 04/1964 73C Hither Green
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6553 m/e 03/1964 73C Hither Green m/e 04/1964 73C w/e 18/01/1967 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6504 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/04/1964 73C w/e 20/11/1964 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6508 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/04/1964 73C 4w/e 10/05/1965 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2084 m/e 09/12/1963 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 12/10/1964 73C 4w/e 07/02/1966 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2250 5w/e 10/06/1960 73F Ashford m/e 12/10/1964 73C 4w/e 18/01/1965 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3043 3w/e 09/05/1955 74A Ashford m/e 12/10/1964 73C 9w/e 04/10/1972 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4103 4w/e 30/07/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 12/10/1964 73C 3w/e 08/04/1968 75A Brighton
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15220 4w/e 24/02/1958 74A Ashford m/e 12/10/1964 73C on 31/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15222 4w/e 01/05/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 12/10/1964 73C on 31/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2252 4w/e 01/02/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 18/01/1965 73C on 27/10/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6541 m/e 17/08/1964 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 10/05/1965 73C 4w/e 25/10/1965 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6556 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 25/10/1965 73C on 05/10/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6580 4w/e 25/10/1965 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 22/11/1965 73C w/e 10/10/1967 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3471 m/e 27/01/1964 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 3w/e 10/01/1966 73C w/e 30/09/1968 91M To London Midland Region
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2255 4w/e 01/02/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 07/02/1966 73C w/e 18/01/1967 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6529 3w/e 10/01/1966 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 07/02/1966 73C 5w/e 17/04/1967 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6565 4w/e 17/10/1966 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 17/10/1966 73C on 12/02/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6577 4w/e 17/10/1966 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 12/12/1966 73C on 21/06/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2269 w/e 26/09/1959 50A York (North) w/e 18/01/1967 73C on 25/08/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 DS1173 on 06/1947 39A (New) m/e 03/1967 73C 3w/e 08/04/1968 73F Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6539 4w/e 22/08/1966 70D Eastleigh 5w/e 17/04/1967 73C w/e 10/10/1967 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6573 3w/e 10/01/1966 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 15/05/1967 73C on 24/12/1989 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2286 4w/e 01/05/1962 70C Guildford 4w/e 09/07/1967 73C on 12/05/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3665 3w/e 10/01/1966 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 09/07/1967 73C 4w/e 28/01/1974 SU Selhurst
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3670 m/e 27/01/1964 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 09/07/1967 73C      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6583 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh w/e 10/10/1967 73C on 13/02/1997 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6585 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh w/e 10/10/1967 73C on 13/02/1997 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6586 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C on 01/10/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6587 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C on 01/09/2007 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6588 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C on 19/04/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6589 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C on 13/02/1997 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6590 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C on 27/07/1992 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6591 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C on 08/10/1996 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6592 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6593 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C on 01/02/1997 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6594 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C on 02/12/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6595 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C on 05/08/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6596 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C on 01/10/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6597 4w/e 22/07/1963 73D St Leonards w/e 20/10/1967 73C on 11/09/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2042 4w/e 25/07/1966 75C Norwood Junction w/e 24/10/1967 73C on 07/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6522 4w/e 07/03/1966 70D Eastleigh 2w/e 18/03/1968 73C 2w/e 23/09/1968 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3668 m/e 06/01/1964 75A Brighton 3w/e 08/04/1968 73C on 31/07/2007 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6552 4w/e 17/10/1966 70D Eastleigh m/e 21/05/1968 73C 4w/e 01/01/1969 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6578 4w/e 22/07/1963 71A Eastleigh 2w/e 23/09/1968 73C on 27/09/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6579 2w/e 18/03/1968 70D Eastleigh 2w/e 23/09/1968 73C on 29/10/1990 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2003 4w/e 25/07/1966 75A Brighton w/e 30/09/1968 73C on 07/05/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3224 w/e 25/06/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) w/e 30/09/1968 73C 4w/e 03/06/1969 73F Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3225 w/e 02/07/1955 75C Norwood Junction (New) w/e 30/09/1968 73C 9w/e 04/10/1972 73F Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3671 m/e 27/01/1964 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon w/e 30/09/1968 73C      
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D4107 w/e 22/06/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 30/09/1968 73C 4w/e 03/06/1969 73F Ashford Chart Leacon
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3042 4w/e 08/06/1965 70B Feltham 4w/e 01/01/1969 73C 9w/e 04/10/1972 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15235 6w/e 21/06/1955 71A Eastleigh w/e 09/06/1969 73C on 31/05/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 12 0-6-0 15221 w/e 05/02/1968 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 30/04/1970 73C on 31/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 09 0-6-0 D3666 m/e 20/07/1964 75C Norwood Junction 5w/e 15/09/1970 73C 4w/e 28/01/1974 SU Selhurst
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6554 w/e 18/01/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 30/10/1970 73C 9w/e 29/12/1971 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6555 4w/e 01/01/1969 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 30/10/1970 73C on 23/09/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6553 w/e 18/01/1967 70D Eastleigh 6w/e 22/12/1970 73C 5w/e 30/09/1971 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3815 w/e 01/01/1971 70D Eastleigh 2w/e 13/01/1971 73C 4w/e 28/01/1974 SU Selhurst
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3820 w/e 01/01/1971 70D Eastleigh 2w/e 13/01/1971 73C      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6549 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh w/e 29/04/1971 73C 5w/e 30/09/1971 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6550 4w/e 25/10/1965 70D Eastleigh w/e 29/04/1971 73C 5w/e 30/09/1971 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6551 4w/e 12/12/1966 70D Eastleigh w/e 29/04/1971 73C 5w/e 30/09/1971 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6552 4w/e 01/01/1969 70D Eastleigh w/e 29/04/1971 73C 5w/e 30/09/1971 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3472 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 5w/e 30/09/1971 73C 4w/e 29/10/1971 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3924 w/e 01/01/1971 70D Eastleigh 5w/e 30/09/1971 73C m/e 31/01/1976 91W To Western Region / GWR
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3928 w/e 01/01/1971 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 29/10/1971 73C on 12/06/1988 To Store
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6554 9w/e 29/12/1971 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 31/01/1972 73C on 28/02/2007 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3220 4w/e 08/06/1965 75A Brighton w/e 02/05/1973 73C on 18/07/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3222 4w/e 14/11/1966 75A Brighton w/e 02/05/1973 73C on 13/10/1979 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3226 4w/e 14/11/1966 75A Brighton w/e 02/05/1973 73C on 02/01/1979 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6553 5w/e 30/09/1971 70D Eastleigh w/e 02/05/1973 73C on 01/10/1996 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6552 5w/e 30/09/1971 70D Eastleigh 2w/e 18/05/1973 HG on 25/01/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo D6551 5w/e 30/09/1971 70D Eastleigh 9w/e 19/07/1973 HG 3w/e 18/04/1975 EH Eastleigh
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3459 9w/e 22/07/1970 75C Selhurst 4w/e 28/01/1974 HG on 06/12/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08375 4w/e 14/06/1968 75C Selhurst 4w/e 28/01/1974 HG on 08/11/1991 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08378 4w/e 30/07/1962 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 28/01/1974 HG on 11/07/1981 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 33033 3w/e 18/04/1975 EH Eastleigh m/e 31/10/1976 HG on 17/05/1993 Withdrawn