Depot: Aston
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Aston | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13270 | on | 11/01/1934 (New) | 3D | w/e | 27/01/1934 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2969 | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 3D | w/e | 30/11/1935 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5517 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 3D | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13272 | w/e | 06/07/1935 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 16/11/1935 | 3D | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13273 | w/e | 15/06/1935 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 16/11/1935 | 3D | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2968 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 3D | w/e | 14/12/1935 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2969 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 30/11/1935 | 3D | w/e | 14/11/1936 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5596 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 3D | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2968 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 14/12/1935 | 3D | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2815 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 3D | on | 01/01/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2961 | w/e | 09/03/1935 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 07/03/1936 | 3D | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2981 | w/e | 12/05/1934 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 06/06/1936 | 3D | w/e | 14/11/1936 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2983 | w/e | 12/05/1934 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 06/06/1936 | 3D | w/e | 17/11/1936 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2984 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 06/06/1936 | 3D | w/e | 11/07/1936 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2610 | on | 01/01/1937 (New) | 3D | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2611 | on | 01/01/1937 (New) | 3D | on | 01/01/1948 | 5E | Alsager | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2973 | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 20/03/1937 | 3D | w/e | 12/06/1937 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2980 | w/e | 25/04/1936 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 20/03/1937 | 3D | w/e | 12/06/1937 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2981 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 02/07/1937 | 3D | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2961 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 3D | w/e | 02/07/1938 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2983 | w/e | 09/01/1937 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 3D | w/e | 24/09/1938 | 4D | Abergavenny |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2984 | w/e | 02/01/1937 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 3D | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2973 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 28/01/1939 | 3D | w/e | 29/04/1939 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2963 | w/e | 17/07/1943 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 02/10/1943 | 3D | w/e | 18/09/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2966 | w/e | 17/07/1943 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 02/10/1943 | 3D | w/e | 05/12/1953 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4058 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4077 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4219 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 2E | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4302 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 12F | Workington | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4350 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4490 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4517 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7363 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 3D | Aston | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7364 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 10C | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7365 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 10C | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7366 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9017 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | m/e | 06/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9362 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | m/e | 08/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9309 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | on | 03/07/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9011 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | on | 31/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2782 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2811 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2891 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2892 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2894 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2921 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 11A | Carnforth | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2929 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2440 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2441 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2449 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2470 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2538 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 1C | Watford | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2552 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2578 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2616 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 24K | Preston | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4872 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2D | Banbury | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5051 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5058 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2E | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5132 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5349 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1H | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5390 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5397 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5446 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4120 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3D | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 22904 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 25344 | m/e | 01/1937 | Withdrawn | w/e | 28/02/1948 (R) | 3D | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9A | Longsight | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5387 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 3D | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2957 | w/e | 13/12/1947 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 3D | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 51 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 3D | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4061 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 3D | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4B | Northampton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45052 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5094 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3D | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42958 | w/e | 06/12/1947 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 3D | w/e | 20/09/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2960 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 3D | w/e | 20/01/1951 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2974 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 3D | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4942 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 3D | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9211 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 3D | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9248 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 3D | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58295 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 3D | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49261 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 3D | w/e | 10/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42947 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 3D | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42948 | w/e | 17/08/1940 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 3D | w/e | 26/09/1953 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2951 | w/e | 03/10/1942 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 3D | w/e | 09/05/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8911 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2F | Coventry | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3D | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42947 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 3D | Aston | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3D | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8911 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 3D | on | 31/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42946 | w/e | 20/07/1946 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 3D | w/e | 20/09/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42973 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 3D | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42954 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 3D | w/e | 20/09/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43308 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 3D | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49370 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 3D | w/e | 30/06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43308 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 3D | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45448 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3D | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45448 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3D | Aston | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3D | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42658 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3D | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42658 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 3D | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42489 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 3D | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42489 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 3D | Aston | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 3D | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46427 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 3D | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49346 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3D | w/e | 10/05/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46427 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3D | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12088 | on | 16/06/1951 (New) | 3D | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 1F | Rugby | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12089 | on | 16/06/1951 (New) | 3D | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42773 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3D | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49083 | on | 14/01/1950 | Withdrawn | w/e | 14/07/1951 (R) | 3D | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49089 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3D | w/e | 22/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42773 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3D | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42978 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 3D | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40001 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 3D | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44876 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 3D | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45065 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 3D | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47363 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 3D | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44876 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 3D | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45065 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 3D | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45448 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 3D | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44360 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 3D | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 11D | Tebay |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46492 | m/e | 12/1951 (New) | 3D | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45322 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 3D | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 5D | Stoke |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12095 | on | 29/12/1951 (New) | 3D | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 21B | Bescot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44844 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3D | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45070 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3D | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45370 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3D | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24L | Carnforth |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12090 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 3D | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40045 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3D | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44897 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3D | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 21E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45418 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3D | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45114 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3D | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58117 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 3D | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49092 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 3D | on | 27/09/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 48902 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 3D | w/e | 21/02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58429 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 3D | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49278 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 3D | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49278 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 3D | Aston | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44120 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4B | Northampton | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 3D | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44354 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 4B | Northampton | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 3D | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44525 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2E | Northampton | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 3D | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44120 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 3D | Aston | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 3D | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44354 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 3D | Aston | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 3D | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44525 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 3D | Aston | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 3D | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42810 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 3D | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49189 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 3D | w/e | 26/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13020 | on | 18/04/1953 (New) | 3D | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42951 | w/e | 09/05/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 06/06/1953 | 3D | w/e | 01/06/1957 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42979 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 13/06/1953 | 3D | w/e | 26/09/1953 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40206 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 3D | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43389 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 3D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42948 | w/e | 26/09/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 31/10/1953 | 3D | w/e | 05/12/1953 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42979 | w/e | 26/09/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 31/10/1953 | 3D | w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49186 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3D | w/e | 14/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40180 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3D | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45132 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 3D | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45231 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2E | Northampton | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 3D | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40129 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 3D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45034 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 5B | Crewe South | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 3D | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45038 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 3D | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44492 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3D | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44942 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3D | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45416 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 3D | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45403 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 3D | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45114 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 3D | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45114 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 3D | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58288 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 3D | w/e | 05/10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44492 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 3D | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49275 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3D | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42853 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3D | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42929 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3D | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45385 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 6J | Holyhead | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3D | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49045 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 3D | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49063 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 3D | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42951 | w/e | 06/06/1953 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 01/06/1957 | 3D | w/e | 29/06/1957 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42951 | w/e | 01/06/1957 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 29/06/1957 | 3D | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42885 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3D | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42118 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3D | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45073 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3D | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45130 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3D | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45249 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3D | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45424 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3D | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48718 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3D | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48719 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3D | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48726 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3D | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42552 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3E | Monument Lane | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3D | on | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42601 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 3E | Monument Lane | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58124 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3D | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42560 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43187 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42854 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3D | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45416 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48297 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3D | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42658 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3D | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44807 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3D | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42975 | w/e | 10/05/1958 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/06/1958 | 3D | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44067 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 5F | Uttoxeter | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3D | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 5E | Alsager |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42920 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3D | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42940 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3D | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42944 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3D | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48752 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 3D | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42616 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 3D | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45353 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 3D | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45430 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 3D | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46423 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 3D | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42779 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 3D | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42921 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 3D | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45327 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 3D | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48504 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 3D | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45051 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 3D | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 21E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45114 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 3D | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45395 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 3D | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45114 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 3D | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44439 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 3D | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 12E | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42817 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 3D | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45065 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 3D | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42616 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 3D | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42782 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 3D | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45696 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 3D | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44710 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 3D | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44910 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 3D | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40180 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 3D | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45647 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 3D | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45709 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 3D | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45737 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 3D | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42982 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 21D | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45518 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 21D | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45550 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 21D | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45395 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 21D | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45052 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 21D | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D233 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 21D | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44742 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 21D | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45301 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21D | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45586 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21D | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45704 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21D | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44842 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 21D | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45292 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 21D | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44865 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 21D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45038 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 21D | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3774 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 17C | Rowsley | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 21D | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3838 | on | 02/01/1960 | 24L | Carnforth (New) | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 21D | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3775 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 17C | Rowsley | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 21D | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42956 | w/e | 19/09/1942 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 21D | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42964 | w/e | 09/02/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 21D | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42979 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 21D | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40206 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 21D | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45302 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 21D | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40180 | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 21D | w/e | 20/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44110 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 21D | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45593 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 21D | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 16F | Burton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44301 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 21D | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45231 | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 21D | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70017 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70031 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70043 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70024 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70025 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70026 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70027 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70028 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70029 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 10/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42966 | w/e | 03/05/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45638 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45583 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 21D | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45740 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 21D | on | 26/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44837 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 21D | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 21C | Bushbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45332 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 21D | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 21C | Bushbury |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45567 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 21D | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45578 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 21D | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44444 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44514 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47341 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 21E | Monument Lane | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47474 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47494 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46470 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42488 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42267 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70004 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 21D | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70021 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 21D | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70047 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 21D | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70046 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 21D | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42186 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 21D | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 5C | Stafford |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5010 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 73C | Hither Green | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 21D | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70028 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 21D | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70043 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 21D | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70045 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 21D | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76022 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 21D | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76051 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 21D | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76020 | w/e | 06/06/1959 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 21D | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76023 | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 21D | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45374 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 21D | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70022 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 21D | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70023 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 21D | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70028 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 21D | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45439 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 21D | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 21C | Bushbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44837 | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 21C | Bushbury | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 21D | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1F | Rugby |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75034 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 21D | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75037 | m/e | 08/1953 | 1E | Bletchley (New) | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 21D | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75053 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 21D | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75031 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 21D | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70017 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 21D | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70022 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 21D | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70023 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 21D | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70024 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 21D | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70048 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 21D | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70016 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 21D | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70019 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 21D | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70049 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 21D | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70001 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 2J | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70005 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 2J | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42665 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 2J | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42226 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 2J | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44859 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 2J | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44945 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 2J | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44966 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 2J | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45027 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 2J | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1G | Woodford Halse |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42478 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 2J | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42209 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 2J | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42075 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 2J | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76095 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 67A | Corkerhill | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2J | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76040 | w/e | 01/08/1964 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 2J | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42066 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 2J | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42069 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 2J | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44859 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 2J | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45052 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 2J | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45058 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 2J | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42604 | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 21C | Bushbury | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 2J | on | 08/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42062 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 2K | Bushbury | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 2J | on | 22/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45310 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 2J | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45405 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 2J | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45439 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 21C | Bushbury | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 2J | m/e | 11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3107 | on | 11/03/1955 | 84C | Banbury (New) | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 2J | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley |