Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 36 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5567 Week
» 7305 Month
» 134748 Year
» 1800124 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Ipswich


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Ipswich Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam J39 0-6-0 2722 on 08/04/1929 YK York (North) (New) on 18/04/1929 IPS on 25/04/1929 PKS Parkeston Quay
Steam J39 0-6-0 2723 on 10/04/1929 YK York (North) (New) on 18/04/1929 IPS on 31/05/1929 PKS Parkeston Quay
Steam J39 0-6-0 2724 on 15/04/1929 YK York (North) (New) on 20/04/1929 IPS on 30/05/1929 PKS Parkeston Quay
Steam J39 0-6-0 2770 on 28/08/1929 YK York (North) (New) on 07/09/1929 IPS on 21/09/1929 PKS Parkeston Quay
Steam J39 0-6-0 2771 on 04/09/1929 YK York (North) (New) on 07/09/1929 IPS on 26/01/1935 PKS Parkeston Quay
Steam J39 0-6-0 2772 on 11/09/1929 YK York (North) (New) on 18/09/1929 IPS on 09/05/1932 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 2770 on 21/09/1929 PKS Parkeston Quay on 07/01/1935 IPS on 09/02/1935 PKS Parkeston Quay
Steam J39 0-6-0 2990 on 04/10/1935 DON Doncaster (New) on 30/10/1935 IPS on 19/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 2950 on 31/10/1935 MAR March on 12/02/1936 IPS on 02/09/1942 MAR March
Steam J39 0-6-0 2941 on 13/02/1936 MAR March on 25/02/1936 IPS on 16/04/1950 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 2994 on 22/10/1935 DON Doncaster (New) on 13/03/1936 IPS on 15/09/1943 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2996 on 05/08/1936 DON Doncaster (New) on 04/09/1936 IPS on 15/01/1939 YAR Yarmouth South Town
Steam J39 0-6-0 1928       on 14/05/1938 (New) IPS on 11/05/1939 MAR March
Steam J39 0-6-0 1997       on 24/08/1938 (New) IPS on 10/05/1939 MAR March
Steam J39 0-6-0 2996 on 14/05/1939 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 02/07/1939 IPS on 24/06/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 1971 on 28/06/1938 NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) on 01/02/1940 IPS on 08/04/1947 CAR Carlisle Canal
Steam J39 0-6-0 1933 on 31/05/1938 STR Stratford (New) on 11/12/1940 IPS on 14/10/1951 30A Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 1940 on 30/05/1938 STR Stratford (New) on 29/01/1941 IPS on 06/10/1946 LOW Lowestoft
Steam J39 0-6-0 1803 on 02/10/1936 MAR March on 14/07/1941 IPS on 28/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 1869 on 14/11/1936 STR Stratford on 22/10/1941 IPS on 06/10/1946 LOW Lowestoft
Steam J39 0-6-0 1922 on 04/05/1938 NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) on 22/10/1941 IPS on 02/07/1947 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 1266 on 26/04/1930 STR Stratford on 24/10/1941 IPS on 31/12/1941 MAR March
Steam J39 0-6-0 2965 on 18/01/1935 STR Stratford on 24/10/1941 IPS on 25/10/1942 MAR March
Steam J39 0-6-0 2969 on 15/10/1934 STR Stratford on 24/10/1941 IPS on 04/01/1942 MAR March
Steam J39 0-6-0 2949 on 29/09/1939 STR Stratford on 29/10/1941 IPS on 13/04/1947 CAR Carlisle Canal
Steam J39 0-6-0 2989 on 03/12/1939 STR Stratford on 05/11/1941 IPS on 17/10/1943 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2699 on 09/02/1936 ARD Ardsley on 11/09/1943 IPS on 01/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 2973 on 09/09/1943 STR Stratford on 12/09/1943 IPS on 19/06/1949 NOR Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 1266 on 16/07/1943 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 24/10/1943 IPS on 30/04/1946 LOW Lowestoft
Steam J39 0-6-0 1259 on 29/08/1943 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 07/11/1943 IPS on 30/04/1950 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 2774 on 12/09/1943 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 07/11/1943 IPS on 25/10/1959 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 8302 on 10/07/1943 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 25/06/1944 IPS on 11/01/1945 PKS Parkeston Quay
Steam B1 4-6-0 8304 on 09/01/1944 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 25/06/1944 IPS on 13/07/1944 CAM Cambridge
Steam J39 0-6-0 2985 on 14/10/1935 STR Stratford on 06/09/1944 IPS on 06/10/1946 LOW Lowestoft
Steam J39 0-6-0 1984 on 28/07/1938 STR Stratford (New) on 06/09/1944 IPS on 22/09/1946 LOW Lowestoft
Steam B1 4-6-0 8307 on 03/08/1944 GOR Gorton on 11/12/1944 IPS on 05/01/1945 PKS Parkeston Quay
Steam B1 4-6-0 8302 on 11/01/1945 PKS Parkeston Quay on 28/02/1945 IPS on 24/07/1946 STR Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 8307 on 05/01/1945 PKS Parkeston Quay on 28/02/1945 IPS on 14/08/1946 STR Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 2991 on 08/09/1940 STR Stratford on 28/01/1946 IPS on 17/04/1946 LOW Lowestoft
Steam J39 0-6-0 2771 on 23/06/1945 STR Stratford on 07/04/1946 IPS on 19/05/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 2965 on 16/07/1943 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 26/04/1946 IPS on 25/10/1959 31B March
Steam J39 0-6-0 2968 on 06/10/1943 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 26/04/1946 IPS on 18/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1052       on 24/06/1946 (New) IPS on 17/08/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 1053       on 27/06/1946 (New) IPS on 02/09/1951 50A York (North)
Steam B1 4-6-0 1054       on 02/07/1946 (New) IPS on 26/07/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B1 4-6-0 1055       on 04/07/1946 (New) IPS on 08/11/1959 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 1056       on 04/07/1946 (New) IPS on 13/05/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam B1 4-6-0 1057       on 08/07/1946 (New) IPS on 17/04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1058       on 10/07/1946 (New) IPS on 22/11/1959 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 1059       on 27/07/1946 (New) IPS on 29/11/1959 31B March
Steam J39 0-6-0 2777 on 22/09/1944 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 29/07/1946 IPS on 14/10/1951 30A Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 2991 on 17/04/1946 LOW Lowestoft on 29/07/1946 IPS on 28/03/1947 CAR Carlisle Canal
Steam J39 0-6-0 2988 on 16/07/1943 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 07/11/1946 IPS on 10/06/1947 CAR Carlisle Canal
Steam J39 0-6-0 4957 on 07/09/1944 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 07/11/1946 IPS on 26/05/1957 33A Plaistow
Steam J39 0-6-0 4838 on 12/12/1943 CAR Carlisle Canal on 24/03/1947 IPS on 20/04/1947 NOR Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 4785 on 20/08/1945 CAR Carlisle Canal on 28/03/1947 IPS on 12/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 4841 on 15/06/1946 CAR Carlisle Canal on 15/04/1947 IPS on 06/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 4793 on 01/02/1933 CAR Carlisle Canal on 01/05/1947 IPS on 26/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 4820 on 17/02/1930 DEE Dundee Tay Bridge on 15/06/1947 IPS on 21/01/1951 37A Ardsley
Steam B1 4-6-0 1251       on 04/11/1947 (New) IPS on 20/11/1947 KX Kings Cross
Steam B1 4-6-0 1252       on 06/11/1947 (New) IPS on 01/11/1959 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 1253 on 10/11/1947 STR Stratford (New) on 16/11/1947 IPS on 01/11/1959 31B March
Steam B12 4-6-0 1509       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 15/10/1948 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 1516       on 01/01/1948 IPS 5w/e 19/01/1957 35B Grantham
Steam B12 4-6-0 1561       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 30/09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 1562       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 08/08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 1564       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 24/11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 1566       on 01/01/1948 IPS 5w/e 14/06/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B12 4-6-0 1569       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 01/01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 1570       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 31/03/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B12 4-6-0 1577       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 16/08/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B17 4-6-0 1600       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 14/02/1953 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 1601       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 14/02/1953 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 1602       on 01/01/1948 IPS 5w/e 19/01/1957 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam B17 4-6-0 1604       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 19/07/1952 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 1618       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 21/11/1953 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 1634       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 21/11/1953 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 1645       on 01/01/1948 IPS m/e 30/11/1949 CAM Cambridge
Steam B17 4-6-0 1649       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 10/02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 1668       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 14/02/1953 30A Stratford
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7447       on 01/01/1948 IPS 3w/e 31/05/1950 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7448       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 21/07/1951 39A Gorton
Steam C14 4-4-2T 7450       on 01/01/1948 IPS 3w/e 31/05/1950 37C Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam D16 4-4-0 2526       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 20/06/1953 31B March
Steam D16 4-4-0 2552       on 01/01/1948 IPS 5w/e 16/02/1952 32B Ipswich
Steam D16 4-4-0 2556       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 25/11/1950 32C Lowestoft
Steam D16 4-4-0 2560       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 24/09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2590       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 28/01/1952 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 2611       on 01/01/1948 IPS 3w/e 31/05/1950 32E Yarmouth Vauxhall
Steam D16 4-4-0 2612       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 19/06/1954 32B Ipswich
Steam F3 2-4-2T 7128       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 04/12/1950 Withdrawn
Steam F3 2-4-2T 7143       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 22/07/1948 Withdrawn
Steam F4 2-4-2T 7182       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 19/04/1952 32B Ipswich
Steam J15 0-6-0 5377       on 01/01/1948 IPS m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5386       on 01/01/1948 IPS m/e 01/1950 IPS Ipswich
Steam J15 0-6-0 5407       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 05/04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5409       on 01/01/1948 IPS m/e 11/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5415       on 01/01/1948 IPS m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5421       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 17/03/1948 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5423       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 25/11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5428       on 01/01/1948 IPS m/e 08/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5429       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 25/11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5430       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 02/01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5447       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 13/04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 5459       on 01/01/1948 IPS w/e 05/12/1959 30A Stratford
Steam J15 0-6-0 5467       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 03/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 5510       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 25/11/1950 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J65 0-6-0T 8211       on 01/01/1948 IPS w/e 23/11/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J66 0-6-0T 8373       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 28/01/1952 Withdrawn
Steam J66 0-6-0T 8374       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 22/08/1953 38D Staveley (G.C.)
Steam J66 0-6-0T 8375       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 24/11/1952 Withdrawn
Steam J66 0-6-0T 68386       on 01/01/1948 IPS m/e 04/1950 Withdrawn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 8498       on 01/01/1948 IPS 4w/e 22/08/1953 31C Kings Lynn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 8510       on 01/01/1948 IPS 5w/e 14/06/1958 40A Lincoln
Steam J67 0-6-0T 8518       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 18/02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J70 0-6-0T 8216       on 01/01/1948 IPS w/e 30/11/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J70 0-6-0T 8219       on 01/01/1948 IPS 5w/e 21/03/1953 32B Ipswich
Steam J70 0-6-0T 8221       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 21/05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam J70 0-6-0T 8224       on 01/01/1948 IPS on 24/03/1952 Withdrawn
Steam J70 0-6-0T 8225       on 01/01/1948 IPS 5w/e 22/09/1951 30E Colchester
Steam J17 0-6-0 5560       on 01/01/1948 IPS w/e 02/04/1960 31C Kings Lynn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1254 on 10/12/1947 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 25/01/1948 IPS on 01/11/1959 31B March
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41200 on 01/01/1948 7B Bangor m/e 07/1949 IPS 5w/e 16/07/1949 91E To Eastern Region
Steam B17 4-6-0 61670 on 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe m/e 07/1949 IPS 4w/e 21/07/1951 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam N7 0-6-2T 9717 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford m/e 07/1949 IPS 3w/e 31/05/1950 30A Stratford
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69719 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford m/e 07/1949 IPS 3w/e 31/05/1950 30A Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 64834 on 19/06/1949 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 19/10/1949 IPS on 20/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam F6 2-4-2T 7220 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford m/e 30/11/1949 IPS on 25/07/1955 Withdrawn
Steam F6 2-4-2T 7239 on 01/01/1948 KL Kings Lynn m/e 30/11/1949 IPS on 30/12/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 65386 on 01/01/1948 IPS Ipswich m/e 01/1950 IPS m/e 01/1950 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61001 on 01/02/1948 STR Stratford on 26/03/1950 32B on 30/04/1950 30A Stratford
Steam B1 4-6-0 61206 on 05/02/1950 31A Cambridge on 26/03/1950 32B on 07/05/1950 35A New England
Steam B1 4-6-0 61201 on 10/06/1947 DON Doncaster (New) on 30/04/1950 32B on 20/09/1953 38A Colwick
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41200 5w/e 16/07/1949 91E To Eastern Region 3w/e 31/05/1950 32B w/e 19/06/1965 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69012 m/e 12/1949 DON Doncaster (New) 3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 4w/e 23/02/1952 62A Thornton Junction
Steam J72 0-6-0T 69013 m/e 12/1949 DON Doncaster (New) 3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 4w/e 23/02/1952 62A Thornton Junction
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67702       3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 5w/e 19/01/1957 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67703       3w/e 31/05/1950 32B w/e 17/01/1959 30A Stratford
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67704       3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 4w/e 20/10/1951 32C Lowestoft
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67705       3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 3w/e 12/11/1955 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67706 m/e 07/1949 STR Stratford 3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 5w/e 19/01/1957 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67708       3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 4w/e 20/10/1951 32C Lowestoft
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67709       3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 4w/e 23/01/1954 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67710       3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 4w/e 21/04/1951 51A Darlington
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67711       3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 4w/e 21/09/1957 32C Lowestoft
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67716       3w/e 31/05/1950 32B w/e 17/01/1959 30A Stratford
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67719       3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 5w/e 22/09/1951 32C Lowestoft
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67787       3w/e 31/05/1950 32B 5w/e 21/03/1953 34E Neasden
Steam B1 4-6-0 61052 on 17/08/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 24/09/1950 32B on 01/11/1959 31B March
Steam J39 0-6-0 4708 on 12/11/1935 STR Stratford on 15/10/1950 32B on 22/10/1950 30A Stratford
Steam J39 0-6-0 64767 on 28/09/1949 STR Stratford on 15/10/1950 32B on 13/01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64771 on 19/01/1946 STR Stratford on 15/10/1950 32B on 14/01/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B12 4-6-0 61530 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 21/10/1950 32B 5w/e 24/03/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 4773 on 19/01/1946 STR Stratford on 22/10/1950 32B on 19/01/1951 30A Stratford
Steam J15 0-6-0 65361 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 25/11/1950 32B on 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 5578 on 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 25/11/1950 32B w/e 05/12/1959 31A Cambridge
Steam J17 0-6-0 65512 on 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 17/02/1951 32B 4w/e 19/05/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J15 0-6-0 65422 on 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 24/03/1951 32B 5w/e 23/08/1952 31B March
Steam B12 4-6-0 61568 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 19/05/1951 32B 4w/e 21/07/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J70 0-6-0T 68220 5w/e 24/03/1951 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 19/05/1951 32B 4w/e 21/07/1951 31C Kings Lynn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67710 5w/e 23/06/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 21/07/1951 32B 4w/e 23/01/1954 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam J70 0-6-0T 68220 4w/e 21/07/1951 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 20/10/1951 32B on 23/02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65580 4w/e 20/01/1951 31A Cambridge 4w/e 20/10/1951 32B 5w/e 16/02/1952 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61056 on 13/05/1951 37A Ardsley on 16/12/1951 32B on 29/06/1952 38A Colwick
Steam D16 4-4-0 62552 on 01/01/1948 IPS Ipswich 5w/e 16/02/1952 32B 4w/e 20/06/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68567 on 01/01/1948 PKD Parkhead 5w/e 16/02/1952 32B 4w/e 22/03/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J15 0-6-0 65388 4w/e 25/11/1950 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/03/1952 32B 4w/e 20/09/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68555 on 01/01/1948 THJ Thornton Junction 4w/e 22/03/1952 32B 4w/e 22/08/1953 31A Cambridge
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68572 on 01/01/1948 HAT Hatfield 4w/e 22/03/1952 32B w/e 29/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68586 on 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 22/03/1952 32B 5w/e 21/06/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam F4 2-4-2T 67182 on 01/01/1948 IPS Ipswich 4w/e 19/04/1952 32B w/e 12/01/1953 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11100       on 17/05/1952 (New) 32B 5w/e 24/03/1956 30A Stratford
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67704 4w/e 20/10/1951 32C Lowestoft 5w/e 21/06/1952 32B 4w/e 20/09/1952 32C Lowestoft
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67708 4w/e 20/10/1951 32C Lowestoft 5w/e 21/06/1952 32B 4w/e 11/10/1958 32C Lowestoft
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67719 5w/e 22/09/1951 32C Lowestoft 5w/e 21/06/1952 32B 4w/e 20/09/1952 32C Lowestoft
Steam B12 4-6-0 61533 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 19/07/1952 32B 4w/e 15/11/1952 31D South Lynn
Steam F3 2-4-2T 67127 4w/e 23/09/1950 32C Lowestoft 5w/e 17/01/1953 32B on 08/04/1953 Withdrawn
Steam B17 4-6-0 61631 4w/e 19/07/1952 30A Stratford 4w/e 14/02/1953 32B on 10/04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68557 4w/e 13/12/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 14/02/1953 32B 4w/e 22/08/1953 40F Boston
Steam B12 4-6-0 61571 4w/e 14/02/1953 35B Grantham 5w/e 21/03/1953 32B 4w/e 14/12/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B12 4-6-0 61572 4w/e 14/02/1953 35B Grantham 5w/e 21/03/1953 32B w/e 17/10/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J70 0-6-0T 68219 on 01/01/1948 IPS Ipswich 5w/e 21/03/1953 32B w/e 31/08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67720       5w/e 21/03/1953 32B 4w/e 16/05/1953 34A Kings Cross
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67719 4w/e 20/09/1952 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 16/05/1953 32B w/e 30/01/1960 34A Kings Cross
Steam J39 0-6-0 64882 on 08/12/1946 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 07/06/1953 32B on 20/09/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J39 0-6-0 64968 on 26/03/1947 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 14/06/1953 32B on 07/10/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B17 4-6-0 61621 5w/e 23/06/1951 31B March 4w/e 20/06/1953 32B 4w/e 21/11/1953 30A Stratford
Steam B17 4-6-0 61625 on 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/06/1953 32B w/e 31/10/1959 31A Cambridge
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67715 5w/e 21/03/1953 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 20/06/1953 32B 4w/e 24/10/1953 32C Lowestoft
Steam B17 4-6-0 61637 4w/e 20/06/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 25/07/1953 32B on 24/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67739 4w/e 16/05/1953 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 25/07/1953 32B 4w/e 24/10/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68493 on 01/01/1948 KL Kings Lynn 4w/e 22/08/1953 32B m/e 10/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68509 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 22/08/1953 32B on 22/03/1954 Withdrawn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68523 4w/e 25/07/1953 39B Sheffield Darnall 4w/e 22/08/1953 32B 4w/e 19/09/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68606 3w/e 31/05/1950 30A Stratford 4w/e 22/08/1953 32B w/e 07/03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68586 5w/e 21/06/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/09/1953 32B w/e 21/05/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J70 0-6-0T 68222 4w/e 25/07/1953 30E Colchester 4w/e 21/11/1953 32B m/e 01/1955 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67715 4w/e 24/10/1953 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 21/11/1953 32B w/e 13/12/1958 30A Stratford
Steam B12 4-6-0 61533 4w/e 18/04/1953 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 23/01/1954 32B 5w/e 24/04/1954 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam B12 4-6-0 61568 4w/e 24/10/1953 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 23/01/1954 32B 4w/e 22/05/1954 32F Yarmouth Beach
Steam B17 4-6-0 61618 4w/e 21/11/1953 30A Stratford 4w/e 23/01/1954 32B w/e 31/10/1959 31A Cambridge
Steam J17 0-6-0 65513 on 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 20/03/1954 32B w/e 02/04/1960 31C Kings Lynn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68521 on 01/01/1948 PKS Parkeston Quay 5w/e 24/04/1954 32B on 17/08/1956 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67709 4w/e 23/01/1954 32D Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 24/04/1954 32B 4w/e 21/09/1957 32C Lowestoft
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67710 4w/e 23/01/1954 32D Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 24/04/1954 32B 5w/e 19/01/1957 32C Lowestoft
Steam J39 0-6-0 64726 on 26/03/1947 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 09/05/1954 32B on 15/06/1958 32G Melton Constable
Steam B1 4-6-0 61228 on 31/10/1948 GOR Gorton on 13/06/1954 32B on 04/10/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam D16 4-4-0 62552 4w/e 20/06/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/06/1954 32B on 25/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam D16 4-4-0 62612 on 01/01/1948 IPS Ipswich 4w/e 19/06/1954 32B w/e 18/04/1959 31F Spital Bridge
Steam B12 4-6-0 61568 4w/e 22/05/1954 32F Yarmouth Beach 5w/e 24/07/1954 32B 4w/e 21/08/1954 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67704 5w/e 24/04/1954 32C Lowestoft 5w/e 24/07/1954 32B 4w/e 23/10/1954 32C Lowestoft
Steam B12 4-6-0 61537 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 21/08/1954 32B on 22/04/1957 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11112       on 25/09/1954 (New) 32B 4w/e 20/08/1955 30A Stratford
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68594 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 13/11/1954 32B on 18/11/1955 Withdrawn
Diesel D1/1 0-4-0 11500       on 25/12/1954 (New) 32B w/e 31/12/1966 50D Goole
Diesel D1/1 0-4-0 11501       on 25/12/1954 (New) 32B w/e 21/01/1967 50D Goole
Diesel D1/1 0-4-0 11502       on 02/01/1955 (New) 32B on 25/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64882 on 20/09/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe on 18/02/1955 32B on 13/10/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67717 5w/e 21/03/1953 32C Lowestoft 5w/e 18/06/1955 32B 5w/e 22/10/1955 32C Lowestoft
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67739 4w/e 24/10/1953 32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 18/06/1955 32B 5w/e 22/10/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67770 4w/e 19/03/1955 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 23/07/1955 32B 3w/e 12/11/1955 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67775 4w/e 19/06/1954 34A Kings Cross 5w/e 23/07/1955 32B w/e 12/03/1960 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61270 on 25/12/1947 NOR Norwich Thorpe (New) on 07/08/1955 32B on 23/10/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B12 4-6-0 61533 4w/e 22/01/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/08/1955 32B 4w/e 14/12/1957 32F Yarmouth Beach
Steam B17 4-6-0 61629 6w/e 25/12/1954 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/08/1955 32B on 25/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 65435 on 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/08/1955 32B on 15/10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam J17 0-6-0 65512 5w/e 23/04/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 17/09/1955 32B on 07/12/1959 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11136       on 07/10/1955 (New) 32B m/e 21/07/1956 30F Parkeston Quay
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11137       on 08/10/1955 (New) 32B 4w/e 25/08/1956 30F Parkeston Quay
Steam J39 0-6-0 64724 on 24/01/1954 32A Norwich Thorpe on 09/10/1955 32B on 08/02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam J15 0-6-0 65472 on 01/01/1948 YB Yarmouth Beach 5w/e 21/01/1956 32B 4w/e 21/04/1956 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67705 3w/e 12/11/1955 32D Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 21/01/1956 32B w/e 31/10/1959 30A Stratford
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67739 5w/e 22/10/1955 32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 21/01/1956 32B w/e 17/01/1959 30A Stratford
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11138       on 07/02/1956 (New) 32B 3w/e 16/06/1956 30F Parkeston Quay
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11139       on 08/02/1956 (New) 32B 5w/e 24/03/1956 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam J15 0-6-0 65433 on 01/01/1948 MAR March 4w/e 21/04/1956 32B on 08/02/1958 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11128 on 08/09/1955 30A Stratford (New) w/e 25/05/1956 32B w/e 27/07/1963 31B March
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11111 6w/e 25/12/1954 30F Parkeston Quay m/e 21/07/1956 32B 5w/e 20/04/1957 32D Yarmouth South Town
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11115 on 13/11/1954 30F Parkeston Quay (New) m/e 21/07/1956 32B 4w/e 08/03/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11142       on 25/07/1956 (New) 32B w/e 12/02/1966 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11143       on 16/08/1956 (New) 32B 4w/e 08/02/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11113 on 23/10/1954 30F Parkeston Quay (New) 4w/e 25/08/1956 32B 4w/e 16/02/1957 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam J15 0-6-0 65389 on 01/01/1948 LOW Lowestoft 4w/e 15/12/1956 32B w/e 19/03/1960 30F Parkeston Quay
Steam B17 4-6-0 61611 4w/e 17/11/1956 30E Colchester 5w/e 19/01/1957 32B w/e 01/08/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11163       on 01/02/1957 (New) 32B w/e 05/02/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11141 4w/e 20/10/1956 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 16/02/1957 32B w/e 30/05/1959 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam B1 4-6-0 61001 on 20/01/1957 35C Spital Bridge on 03/03/1957 32B on 27/09/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11113 4w/e 16/02/1957 32D Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 20/04/1957 32B 4w/e 11/10/1958 32D Yarmouth South Town
Steam J39 0-6-0 64891 on 07/04/1957 33A Plaistow on 26/05/1957 32B on 25/10/1959 31B March
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67702 5w/e 19/01/1957 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 15/06/1957 32B w/e 17/01/1959 30A Stratford
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67706 5w/e 19/01/1957 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 15/06/1957 32B w/e 17/01/1959 30A Stratford
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67710 5w/e 19/01/1957 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 15/06/1957 32B 4w/e 21/09/1957 32C Lowestoft
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11164 4w/e 15/06/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe 5w/e 24/08/1957 32B w/e 05/02/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61056 on 29/06/1952 38A Colwick on 06/10/1957 32B on 22/11/1959 31B March
Steam B1 4-6-0 61160 on 28/10/1956 38A Colwick on 06/10/1957 32B on 19/07/1959 32C Lowestoft
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11111 5w/e 20/04/1957 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 19/10/1957 32B 4w/e 08/02/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11175 on 28/12/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 4w/e 08/03/1958 32B w/e 01/09/1962 30F Parkeston Quay
Steam J15 0-6-0 65388 4w/e 20/09/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 08/03/1958 32B on 22/05/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J67 0-6-0T 68555 5w/e 24/03/1956 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 08/03/1958 32B on 05/05/1958 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11143 4w/e 08/02/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 10/05/1958 32B w/e 05/02/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam B17 4-6-0 61609 4w/e 14/02/1953 30A Stratford 4w/e 10/05/1958 32B on 23/06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67710 4w/e 21/09/1957 32C Lowestoft 5w/e 14/06/1958 32B w/e 20/06/1959 32C Lowestoft
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67711 4w/e 21/09/1957 32C Lowestoft 5w/e 14/06/1958 32B w/e 31/10/1959 30A Stratford
Steam J17 0-6-0 65561 5w/e 17/01/1953 31A Cambridge 5w/e 14/06/1958 32B on 07/12/1959 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 11139 4w/e 19/10/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 19/07/1958 32B 4w/e 13/09/1958 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B17 4-6-0 61612 5w/e 14/06/1958 30E Colchester 4w/e 16/08/1958 32B on 29/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70013 on 30/05/1951 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) 4w/e 11/10/1958 32B w/e 10/01/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam B17 4-6-0 61672 5w/e 22/10/1955 30A Stratford 5w/e 15/11/1958 32B w/e 20/06/1959 32C Lowestoft
Steam J15 0-6-0 65454 4w/e 21/10/1950 30A Stratford 5w/e 15/11/1958 32B on 22/05/1959 Withdrawn
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5521       on 05/03/1959 (New) 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2564 4w/e 08/02/1958 32D Yarmouth South Town w/e 07/03/1959 32B w/e 23/06/1962 30F Parkeston Quay
Steam J15 0-6-0 65478 on 01/01/1948 NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 07/03/1959 32B w/e 19/03/1960 31A Cambridge
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5502 on 16/12/1957 30A Stratford (New) w/e 14/03/1959 32B w/e 07/11/1959 30A Stratford
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2040       on 31/03/1959 (New) 32B w/e 28/05/1966 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2041       on 13/04/1959 (New) 32B w/e 28/05/1966 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2042       on 27/04/1959 (New) 32B w/e 28/05/1966 75C Norwood Junction
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2043       on 06/05/1959 (New) 32B w/e 28/05/1966 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5538       on 02/07/1959 (New) 32B w/e 23/02/1963 41A Sheffield Darnall
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6120       on 07/07/1959 (New) 32B w/e 13/08/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5539       on 09/07/1959 (New) 32B w/e 23/03/1963 41A Sheffield Darnall
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5540       on 16/07/1959 (New) 32B w/e 20/02/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5541       on 23/07/1959 (New) 32B w/e 03/04/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5542       on 30/07/1959 (New) 32B w/e 23/03/1963 41A Sheffield Darnall
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5543       on 30/07/1959 (New) 32B w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6121       on 18/08/1959 (New) 32B w/e 02/07/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5020       on 20/08/1959 (New) 32B w/e 18/03/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5021       on 20/08/1959 (New) 32B w/e 01/04/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5544       on 20/08/1959 (New) 32B w/e 07/01/1967 40B Immingham
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5546       on 27/08/1959 (New) 32B w/e 12/09/1959 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5547       on 27/08/1959 (New) 32B w/e 12/09/1959 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5548       on 03/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 06/08/1966 31B March
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5022       on 07/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 26/09/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5549       on 10/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5551       on 10/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 06/08/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5038       on 15/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 09/01/1960 31B March
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6122       on 15/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 13/08/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5552       on 17/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 03/04/1965 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6123       on 22/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 04/06/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5550       on 24/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5553       on 24/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 22/06/1963 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5023       on 25/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 18/03/1961 1C Watford
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5041       on 28/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 28/11/1959 31B March
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6124       on 29/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 07/05/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6125       on 29/09/1959 (New) 32B w/e 30/04/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5554       on 01/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 22/06/1963 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5555       on 01/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5024       on 02/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 18/03/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6126       on 06/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/10/1959 34B Hornsey
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6127       on 06/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 07/05/1960 32B Ipswich
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5556       on 08/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5040       on 12/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 28/11/1959 31B March
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5042       on 12/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 31/10/1959 31B March
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6128       on 13/10/1959 (New) 32B on 22/05/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5557       on 15/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5025       on 16/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 15/07/1961 1A Willesden
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5043       on 16/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 31/10/1959 31B March
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5026       on 22/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/09/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5558       on 22/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5559       on 22/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5044       on 23/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 31/10/1959 31B March
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5039       on 24/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 05/12/1959 31B March
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6129       on 27/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 18/06/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6130       on 27/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 07/11/1959 65A Eastfield
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5560       on 29/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5561       on 29/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5027       on 31/10/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/09/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6131       on 03/11/1959 (New) 32B on 19/06/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5562       on 05/11/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5022 w/e 26/09/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 07/11/1959 32B w/e 18/03/1961 1B Camden
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5520 on 26/02/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 07/11/1959 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5522 on 12/03/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 07/11/1959 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5523 on 19/03/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 07/11/1959 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5526 on 16/04/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 07/11/1959 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5527 on 23/04/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 07/11/1959 32B w/e 23/02/1963 41A Sheffield Darnall
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5531 on 21/05/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 07/11/1959 32B w/e 26/11/1960 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5536 on 18/06/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 07/11/1959 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5537 on 25/06/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 07/11/1959 32B w/e 15/09/1962 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5028       on 13/11/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/09/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6132       on 17/11/1959 (New) 32B w/e 04/06/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6133       on 24/11/1959 (New) 32B w/e 21/05/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5029       on 28/11/1959 (New) 32B w/e 17/09/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6134       on 01/12/1959 (New) 32B on 26/06/1960 32B Ipswich
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6117 on 16/06/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 05/12/1959 32B w/e 30/07/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6119 on 30/06/1959 30A Stratford (New) w/e 05/12/1959 32B w/e 27/08/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6135       on 08/12/1959 (New) 32B on 10/07/1960 32B Ipswich
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6136       on 17/12/1959 (New) 32B on 10/07/1960 32B Ipswich
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6137       on 22/12/1959 (New) 32B w/e 30/07/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6126 w/e 17/10/1959 34B Hornsey w/e 16/01/1960 32B w/e 07/05/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8223       on 08/04/1960 (New) 32B w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5515 w/e 05/03/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/04/1960 32B w/e 17/09/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8224       on 29/04/1960 (New) 32B w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8226       on 03/05/1960 (New) 32B w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5036 on 03/09/1959 31B March (New) w/e 07/05/1960 32B w/e 23/02/1963 32B Ipswich
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5037 on 07/09/1959 31B March (New) w/e 07/05/1960 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6127 on 06/10/1959 32B Ipswich (New) w/e 07/05/1960 32B m/e 07/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8225       on 11/05/1960 (New) 32B w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8227       on 27/05/1960 (New) 32B w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5622       on 09/06/1960 (New) 32B w/e 27/08/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5623       on 09/06/1960 (New) 32B w/e 27/08/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5038 w/e 09/01/1960 31B March w/e 11/06/1960 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5039 w/e 05/12/1959 31B March w/e 11/06/1960 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5040 w/e 28/11/1959 31B March w/e 11/06/1960 32B w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5041 w/e 28/11/1959 31B March w/e 11/06/1960 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5042 w/e 31/10/1959 31B March w/e 11/06/1960 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8228       on 14/06/1960 (New) 32B w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5624       on 16/06/1960 (New) 32B w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5625       on 16/06/1960 (New) 32B w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5626       on 23/06/1960 (New) 32B w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5627       on 23/06/1960 (New) 32B w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6134 on 01/12/1959 32B Ipswich (New) on 26/06/1960 32B on 17/07/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5628       on 30/06/1960 (New) 32B w/e 26/11/1960 31B March
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6135 on 08/12/1959 32B Ipswich (New) on 10/07/1960 32B on 17/07/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 21 Bo-Bo D6136 on 17/12/1959 32B Ipswich (New) on 10/07/1960 32B on 17/07/1960 65A Eastfield
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5043 w/e 31/10/1959 31B March w/e 23/07/1960 32B w/e 26/11/1960 31B March
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5044 w/e 31/10/1959 31B March w/e 23/07/1960 32B w/e 07/01/1961 32B Ipswich
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5524 w/e 05/12/1959 30A Stratford w/e 27/08/1960 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5583 on 21/01/1960 30A Stratford (New) w/e 27/08/1960 32B w/e 26/11/1960 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5507 w/e 05/12/1959 30A Stratford w/e 17/09/1960 32B w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8235       on 30/09/1960 (New) 32B w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8236       on 07/10/1960 (New) 32B w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5630 on 07/07/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) w/e 26/11/1960 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5631 on 07/07/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) w/e 26/11/1960 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8220 on 10/03/1960 30A Stratford (New) w/e 26/11/1960 32B w/e 23/04/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8221 on 21/03/1960 30A Stratford (New) w/e 26/11/1960 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8222 on 30/03/1960 30A Stratford (New) w/e 26/11/1960 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5044 w/e 23/07/1960 32B Ipswich w/e 07/01/1961 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6708       on 10/02/1961 (New) 32B w/e 17/06/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5575 on 23/12/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) w/e 18/02/1961 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5581 on 14/01/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) w/e 18/02/1961 32B w/e 24/02/1962 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5582 on 21/01/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) w/e 18/02/1961 32B w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8200 w/e 13/02/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 18/02/1961 32B w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8201 w/e 05/12/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 18/02/1961 32B w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5045 w/e 17/09/1960 30A Stratford w/e 18/03/1961 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5046 w/e 17/09/1960 30A Stratford w/e 18/03/1961 32B w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5048 w/e 17/09/1960 30A Stratford w/e 18/03/1961 32B w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5049 w/e 17/09/1960 30A Stratford w/e 18/03/1961 32B w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5047 w/e 17/09/1960 30A Stratford w/e 01/04/1961 32B w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6704 on 06/01/1961 30A Stratford (New) w/e 20/05/1961 32B w/e 17/06/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8202 on 29/11/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe on 11/06/1961 32B on 17/06/1962 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8203 on 03/01/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe on 11/06/1961 32B on 17/06/1962 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8205 on 03/01/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe on 11/06/1961 32B on 17/06/1962 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8206 on 03/01/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe on 11/06/1961 32B on 17/06/1962 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8204 w/e 09/01/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961 32B w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8207 w/e 23/01/1960 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/06/1961 32B w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5043 w/e 26/11/1960 31B March w/e 08/07/1961 32B w/e 19/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5622 w/e 27/08/1960 30A Stratford w/e 22/07/1961 32B w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5626 w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford w/e 22/07/1961 32B w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6722 on 13/07/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) w/e 29/07/1961 32B w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5528 w/e 31/10/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/09/1961 32B w/e 23/02/1963 41A Sheffield Darnall
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5529 w/e 31/10/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/09/1961 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5530 w/e 07/11/1959 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/09/1961 32B w/e 23/06/1962 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5531 w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 16/09/1961 32B w/e 23/06/1962 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8208 w/e 06/02/1960 30A Stratford w/e 10/02/1962 32B w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8209 w/e 06/02/1960 30A Stratford w/e 10/02/1962 32B w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8223 w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford w/e 10/02/1962 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8224 w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8225 w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962 32B w/e 10/12/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8226 w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962 32B w/e 10/12/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8227 w/e 16/09/1961 30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962 32B w/e 07/01/1967 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8228 w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962 32B w/e 10/12/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8229 w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford w/e 15/09/1962 32B w/e 04/05/1963 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5036 w/e 07/05/1960 32B Ipswich w/e 23/02/1963 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5656 w/e 15/09/1962 30A Stratford w/e 23/02/1963 32B w/e 14/09/1963 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5657 w/e 15/09/1962 30A Stratford w/e 23/02/1963 32B w/e 14/09/1963 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5658 w/e 15/09/1962 30A Stratford w/e 23/02/1963 32B w/e 14/09/1963 31B March
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8240 on 23/01/1961 34G Finsbury Park (New) w/e 04/05/1963 32B w/e 09/10/1965 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5667 w/e 15/09/1962 30A Stratford w/e 22/06/1963 32B w/e 09/01/1965 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8214 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford w/e 22/06/1963 32B w/e 23/04/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8215 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford w/e 22/06/1963 32B w/e 23/04/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8216 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford w/e 22/06/1963 32B w/e 23/04/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8217 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford w/e 22/06/1963 32B w/e 23/04/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8218 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford w/e 22/06/1963 32B w/e 23/04/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8219 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford w/e 22/06/1963 32B w/e 23/04/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2550 m/e 21/07/1956 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 27/07/1963 32B on 23/10/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2229 w/e 14/09/1963 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 21/09/1963 32B w/e 05/10/1963 31B March
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2566 on 04/08/1957 32A Norwich Thorpe (New) w/e 05/10/1963 32B w/e 04/09/1965 32B Ipswich
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5525 on 09/04/1959 31B March (New) w/e 05/10/1963 32B w/e 25/09/1965 30A Stratford
Diesel 47 Co-Co D1542 w/e 14/11/1964 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 21/11/1964 32B w/e 09/01/1965 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5546 w/e 12/09/1959 31B March w/e 09/01/1965 32B w/e 31/07/1965 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5547 w/e 23/02/1963 31B March w/e 09/01/1965 32B w/e 06/08/1966 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5575 w/e 23/06/1962 31B March w/e 09/01/1965 32B w/e 06/08/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5576 w/e 23/06/1962 31B March w/e 09/01/1965 32B w/e 19/06/1965 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5577 w/e 23/06/1962 31B March w/e 09/01/1965 32B w/e 06/08/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5578 w/e 26/11/1960 31B March w/e 09/01/1965 32B w/e 17/07/1965 40B Immingham
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5690 on 26/04/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 20/02/1965 32B w/e 17/07/1965 40B Immingham
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5857 on 26/04/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 03/04/1965 32B w/e 19/06/1965 31B March
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5040 w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 17/07/1965 32B w/e 03/01/1966 1E Bletchley
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5046 w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 17/07/1965 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5047 w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 17/07/1965 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5048 w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 17/07/1965 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo D5049 w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 17/07/1965 32B w/e 12/08/1967 D05 Stoke Division
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5692 w/e 10/04/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 31/07/1965 32B w/e 09/10/1965 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2566 w/e 05/10/1963 32B Ipswich w/e 04/09/1965 32B on 12/09/1965 82C Swindon
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2568 w/e 14/07/1962 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 25/09/1965 32B w/e 05/02/1966 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5667 w/e 09/01/1965 30A Stratford w/e 25/09/1965 32B w/e 09/10/1965 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5573 w/e 09/01/1965 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 23/10/1965 32B w/e 06/08/1966 30A Stratford
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2241 w/e 11/01/1964 40E Colwick w/e 06/11/1965 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30E Colchester
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2296 w/e 11/01/1964 40E Colwick w/e 06/11/1965 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30E Colchester
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2297 on 07/10/1960 40A Lincoln (New) w/e 06/11/1965 32B w/e 11/05/1968 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2303 on 01/11/1960 40A Lincoln (New) w/e 06/11/1965 32B w/e 17/09/1966 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2030 w/e 07/11/1964 34E New England w/e 13/11/1965 32B w/e 28/05/1966 70D Eastleigh
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D200 w/e 07/11/1959 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 32B w/e 21/01/1967 31B March
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D201 w/e 17/06/1961 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 32B w/e 14/01/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D202 w/e 07/11/1959 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 32B w/e 05/07/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D203 w/e 07/11/1959 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 32B w/e 20/08/1966 36A Doncaster
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D204 w/e 07/11/1959 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 32B w/e 19/08/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D205 w/e 07/11/1959 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 32B w/e 05/07/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D206 w/e 17/06/1961 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 32B w/e 05/07/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D207 w/e 17/06/1961 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 32B w/e 19/08/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D208 w/e 07/10/1961 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 32B w/e 05/11/1966 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D209 w/e 07/10/1961 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1966 32B w/e 05/07/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2281 on 27/02/1960 75A Brighton (New) w/e 28/05/1966 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30E Colchester
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2282 on 28/02/1960 75A Brighton (New) w/e 28/05/1966 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30E Colchester
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2283 4w/e 01/05/1962 75A Brighton w/e 28/05/1966 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30E Colchester
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2284 4w/e 01/05/1962 70C Guildford w/e 28/05/1966 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30E Colchester
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2285 4w/e 27/04/1964 70D Eastleigh w/e 28/05/1966 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30E Colchester
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5533 w/e 12/02/1966 40B Immingham w/e 20/08/1966 32B w/e 15/10/1966 40B Immingham
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5547 w/e 06/08/1966 31B March w/e 20/08/1966 32B w/e 07/01/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D203 w/e 20/08/1966 36A Doncaster w/e 15/10/1966 32B w/e 05/07/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5586 w/e 06/08/1966 34G Finsbury Park w/e 05/11/1966 32B w/e 15/04/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D208 w/e 05/11/1966 34G Finsbury Park w/e 03/12/1966 32B w/e 05/07/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2278 w/e 28/05/1966 30F Parkeston Quay w/e 10/12/1966 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30E Colchester
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5616 w/e 18/12/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 10/12/1966 32B w/e 15/04/1967 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5588 w/e 08/10/1966 34G Finsbury Park w/e 14/01/1967 32B w/e 18/02/1967 34G Finsbury Park
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6724 w/e 20/08/1966 31B March w/e 21/01/1967 32B w/e 20/05/1967 31B March
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D201 w/e 14/01/1967 34G Finsbury Park w/e 18/02/1967 32B w/e 05/07/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5528 w/e 19/06/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 11/03/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5547 w/e 07/01/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 11/03/1967 32B w/e 07/10/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5551 w/e 06/08/1966 30A Stratford w/e 11/03/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5555 w/e 09/10/1965 41A Tinsley w/e 11/03/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5573 w/e 06/08/1966 30A Stratford w/e 11/03/1967 32B w/e 09/03/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5575 w/e 06/08/1966 30A Stratford w/e 11/03/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8220 w/e 23/04/1966 30A Stratford w/e 11/03/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8225 w/e 10/12/1966 30A Stratford w/e 11/03/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8226 w/e 10/12/1966 30A Stratford w/e 11/03/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8227 w/e 07/01/1967 30A Stratford w/e 11/03/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8228 w/e 10/12/1966 30A Stratford w/e 15/04/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8229 w/e 23/04/1966 30A Stratford w/e 15/04/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8236 w/e 10/12/1966 30A Stratford w/e 15/04/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 15 Bo-Bo D8237 w/e 27/04/1963 30A Stratford w/e 15/04/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 D200 w/e 21/01/1967 31B March w/e 20/05/1967 32B w/e 05/07/1967 WL Western Lines (LMR)
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5525 w/e 23/04/1966 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5527 w/e 23/04/1966 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5534 w/e 23/04/1966 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 32A Norwich Thorpe
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5548 w/e 07/01/1967 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 07/10/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5556 w/e 25/02/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5559 w/e 23/04/1966 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5562 w/e 17/06/1961 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5570 w/e 23/04/1966 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5571 w/e 23/04/1966 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5574 w/e 23/04/1966 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5577 w/e 15/04/1967 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 02/12/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5578 w/e 15/04/1967 34G Finsbury Park w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 02/12/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5581 w/e 22/01/1966 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5582 w/e 23/04/1966 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 02/12/1967 41A Tinsley
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5633 w/e 18/03/1967 41C Wath w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5657 w/e 15/04/1967 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 24/02/1968 40B Immingham
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5658 w/e 15/04/1967 40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5679 w/e 20/08/1966 41C Wath w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A D5842 w/e 20/08/1966 41C Wath w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6749 on 26/04/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 20/01/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6750 on 26/04/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6751 on 26/04/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6752 on 26/04/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6753 on 26/04/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 06/01/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6754 on 26/04/1964 41A Tinsley w/e 12/08/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5517 on 25/09/1958 30A Stratford (New) w/e 07/10/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5519 w/e 26/11/1960 30A Stratford w/e 07/10/1967 32B w/e 13/01/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2277 w/e 07/01/1967 30E Colchester w/e 28/10/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30E Colchester
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5514 on 24/07/1958 30A Stratford (New) w/e 02/12/1967 32B w/e 06/04/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5515 w/e 17/09/1960 30A Stratford w/e 02/12/1967 32B w/e 13/01/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5516 on 04/09/1958 30A Stratford (New) w/e 02/12/1967 32B w/e 11/05/1968 30A Stratford
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6962 w/e 30/09/1967 30A Stratford w/e 06/01/1968 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5530 w/e 23/06/1962 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 13/01/1968 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A D5531 w/e 23/06/1962 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 13/01/1968 32B w/e 11/05/1968 31B March