Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 49 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5580 Week
» 7318 Month
» 134761 Year
» 1800137 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Kentish Town


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Kentish Town Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 6 0-4-4T 6         12/1880 16   04/1892 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 6 0-4-4T 15         12/1880 16   04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 6 0-4-4T 18         12/1880 16   04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 6 0-4-4T 137         12/1880 16   04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 6 0-4-4T 140         12/1880 16   04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 6 0-4-4T 141         12/1880 16   04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 6 0-4-4T 142         12/1880 16   04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 6 0-4-4T 143         12/1880 16   04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 6 0-4-4T 144         12/1880 16   04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 6 0-4-4T 147         12/1880 16   04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1547       m/e 02/1882 (New) 16 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1548       m/e 02/1882 (New) 16 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1549       m/e 03/1882 (New) 16 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1550       m/e 04/1882 (New) 16 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1551       m/e 04/1882 (New) 16 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1718       m/e 05/1885 (New) 16 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1719       m/e 05/1885 (New) 16 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1720       m/e 06/1885 (New) 16 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1721       m/e 06/1885 (New) 16 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1722       m/e 06/1885 (New) 16 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1728       m/e 03/1886 (New) 16 m/e 04/1892 10 Leicester Midland
Steam 6 0-4-4T 15   12/1880 16 Kentish Town   04/1892 16   01/1899 18S Southwell
Steam 6 0-4-4T 18   12/1880 16 Kentish Town   04/1892 16   01/1899 14H Hitchin (MR)
Steam 6 0-4-4T 137   12/1880 16 Kentish Town   04/1892 16   01/1899 11 Wigston
Steam 6 0-4-4T 140   12/1880 16 Kentish Town   04/1892 16   01/1899 7 Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 6 0-4-4T 141   12/1880 16 Kentish Town   04/1892 16   01/1899 7T Tewkesbury
Steam 6 0-4-4T 142   12/1880 16 Kentish Town   04/1892 16   01/1899 7 Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 6 0-4-4T 143   12/1880 16 Kentish Town   04/1892 16   01/1899 12 Kettering
Steam 6 0-4-4T 144   12/1880 16 Kentish Town   04/1892 16   05/1908 M&GN M&GN Joint Railway
Steam 6 0-4-4T 147   12/1880 16 Kentish Town   04/1892 16   01/1899 3 Saltley
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1547 m/e 02/1882 16 Kentish Town (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1548 m/e 02/1882 16 Kentish Town (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1549 m/e 03/1882 16 Kentish Town (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1550 m/e 04/1882 16 Kentish Town (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1551 m/e 04/1882 16 Kentish Town (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1718 m/e 05/1885 16 Kentish Town (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1719 m/e 05/1885 16 Kentish Town (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1720 m/e 06/1885 16 Kentish Town (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1721 m/e 06/1885 16 Kentish Town (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1722 m/e 06/1885 16 Kentish Town (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1723 m/e 06/1885 21 Belle Vue (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1724 m/e 06/1885 21 Belle Vue (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1725 m/e 06/1885 21 Belle Vue (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1726 m/e 06/1885 21 Belle Vue (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1727 m/e 06/1885 21 Belle Vue (New) m/e 04/1892 16 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2228       m/e 03/1895 (New) 16 m/e 01/1899 15S St Albans
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2229       m/e 04/1895 (New) 16 m/e 01/1899 15S St Albans
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2230       m/e 04/1895 (New) 16 m/e 01/1899 15S St Albans
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2231       m/e 04/1895 (New) 16 m/e 01/1899 15S St Albans
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 2232       m/e 05/1895 (New) 16 m/e 01/1899 15S St Albans
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1547 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1548 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1549 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1550 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1551 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1718 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1719 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1720 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1721 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1722 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1723 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1724 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1725 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1726 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1727 m/e 04/1892 16 Kentish Town m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1728 m/e 04/1892 10 Leicester Midland m/e 01/1899 16 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1547 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1548 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1549 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1550 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1551 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1718 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1719 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1720 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1721 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1722 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1723 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1724 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1725 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1726 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1727 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1728 m/e 01/1899 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1902 16 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1281 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1282 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1283 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1284 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1285 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1311 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1312 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1313 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1314 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1315 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1316 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1317 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1318 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1319 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1320 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1321 m/e 12/1902 16 Kentish Town m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1375 m/e 12/1902 15 Cricklewood East m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1376 m/e 12/1902 15 Cricklewood East m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1377 m/e 12/1902 15 Cricklewood East m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1379 m/e 12/1902 15 Cricklewood East m/e 05/1908 16 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1281 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 08/1919 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1282 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 04/1920 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1283 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1284 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1285 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1311 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1312 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1313 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1314 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1315 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1316 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1317 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1318 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1319 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1320 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1321 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1371 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1372 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1373 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1374 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1375 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1376 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1377 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1378 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1379 m/e 05/1908 16 Kentish Town m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1380 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1381 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1382 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1383 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1384 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1385 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1425 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1426 m/e 05/1908 15 Cricklewood East m/e 04/1914 16 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town
Steam 6 0-4-4T 1234   04/1914 11 Wigston   12/1921 16   03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1283 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 4w/e 20/06/1926 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1284 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 4w/e 24/04/1927 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1285 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1294 m/e 04/1914 29 Manningham m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1311 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 4w/e 30/11/1924 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1312 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1313 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1314 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 4w/e 14/06/1925 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1315 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1316 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 4w/e 09/08/1925 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1317 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1318 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 4w/e 22/02/1930 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1319 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 01/1924 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1320 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1321 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1371 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1377 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M15 Cricklewood East
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1378 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1425 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M18 Nottingham
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1426 m/e 04/1914 16 Kentish Town m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1427 m/e 04/1914 18 Nottingham m/e 12/1921 16 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 6 0-4-4T 1234   12/1921 16 Kentish Town   03/1930 M16 4w/e 06/09/1930 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1285 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 4w/e 28/11/1931 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1294 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M15 Cricklewood East
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1312 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1313 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1315 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1317 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 4w/e 12/08/1933 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1320 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 4w/e 26/12/1931 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1321 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1371 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1373 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1374 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1378 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1379 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1381 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M10 Leicester Midland
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1385 m/e 12/1921 15 Cricklewood East m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 M16 Kentish Town
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1426 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1427 m/e 12/1921 16 Kentish Town m/e 03/1930 M16 m/e 09/1933 7 Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1315 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town m/e 09/1933 M16 m/e 11/1945 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1321 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town m/e 09/1933 M16 4w/e 01/12/1934 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1371 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town m/e 09/1933 M16 m/e 11/1945 22E Highbridge
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1374 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town m/e 09/1933 M16 m/e 11/1945 14B Kentish Town
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1376 m/e 03/1930 M15 Cricklewood East m/e 09/1933 M16 4w/e 05/09/1936 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1378 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town m/e 09/1933 M16 4w/e 03/11/1945 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1380 m/e 03/1930 M15 Cricklewood East m/e 09/1933 M16 m/e 11/1945 14B Kentish Town
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 1385 m/e 03/1930 M16 Kentish Town m/e 09/1933 M16 m/e 11/1945 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5278       m/e 11/1936 (New) 14B on 01/01/1948 5D Stoke
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5279       m/e 11/1936 (New) 14B on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5280       m/e 11/1936 (New) 14B on 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5281       m/e 11/1936 (New) 14B on 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1374 m/e 09/1933 M16 Kentish Town m/e 11/1945 14B 4w/e 02/11/1946 Withdrawn
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1377 m/e 09/1933 M15 Cricklewood East m/e 11/1945 14B 4w/e 17/07/1951 22B Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1379 m/e 09/1933 M18 Nottingham m/e 11/1945 14B 4w/e 09/09/1950 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 1380 m/e 09/1933 M16 Kentish Town m/e 11/1945 14B 4w/e 05/10/1946 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 23       4w/e 22/06/1946 14B on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 24       4w/e 22/06/1946 14B on 01/01/1948 14C St Albans
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 26       4w/e 22/06/1946 14B on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 27       4w/e 22/06/1946 14B on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 28       4w/e 22/06/1946 14B on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 29       4w/e 22/06/1946 14B on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 75       4w/e 22/06/1946 14B on 01/01/1948 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 115       4w/e 22/06/1946 14B on 01/01/1948 21A Saltley
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 1207       w/e 28/12/1946 (New) 14B on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 1208       w/e 28/12/1946 (New) 14B on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7260       on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7262       on 01/01/1948 14B 5w/e 24/03/1951 33A Plaistow
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7263       on 01/01/1948 14B 3w/e 14/01/1950 16B Spital Bridge
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7282       on 01/01/1948 14B 5w/e 24/03/1951 33A Plaistow
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7283       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 04/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7427       on 01/01/1948 14B 3w/e 14/01/1950 16A Nottingham
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7428       on 01/01/1948 14B 8w/e 11/07/1953 20F Skipton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7429       on 01/01/1948 14B 5w/e 24/03/1951 33A Plaistow
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7432       on 01/01/1948 14B 3w/e 14/01/1950 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7640       on 01/01/1948 14B 5w/e 16/07/1949 20B Stourton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7644       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 13/06/1960 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7645       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 04/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3935       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 07/10/1950 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3964       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 25/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1050       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 04/12/1954 17A Derby
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1051       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 06/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1054       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 04/10/1952 15D Bedford
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1077       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 04/12/1954 17A Derby
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1117       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 29/12/1951 21B Bournville
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1018       on 01/01/1948 14B on 10/07/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Compound 4-4-0 1023       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 19/05/1951 14B Kentish Town
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1660       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 22/03/1952 19C Canklow
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1661       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 17/07/1951 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1664       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 21/11/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1668       on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1671       on 01/01/1948 14B on 14/02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1672       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 19/05/1951 14C St Albans
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1674       on 01/01/1948 14B on 29/05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1713       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 13/08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 477       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 24/02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 547       on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 01/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7229       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 20/02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7241       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 05/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7242       on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7244       on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7245       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 11/12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7246       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 07/02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4052       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 18/06/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4529       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 13/04/1963 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4531       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 04/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4532       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 04/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4563       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 05/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 2839       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 10/01/1959 17B Burton
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 22       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 06/02/1960 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 27 4w/e 22/06/1946 14B Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 14B on 07/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 28 4w/e 22/06/1946 14B Kentish Town on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 03/12/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 35       on 01/01/1948 14B on 22/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 36       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 09/04/1960 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 37       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 01/12/1956 14C St Albans
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40       on 01/01/1948 14B 3w/e 24/01/1953 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 79       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 22/03/1952 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 92       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 23/01/1960 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 96       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 22/03/1952 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 98       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 99       on 01/01/1948 14B 8w/e 29/11/1952 21A Saltley
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 100       on 01/01/1948 14B on 18/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 111       on 01/01/1948 14B on 20/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 112       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 03/10/1953 20E Manningham
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 114       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 09/10/1954 20E Manningham
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 148       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 29/12/1951 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 149       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 22/03/1952 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 155       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 160       on 01/01/1948 14B on 21/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 161       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 16/07/1960 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 164       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 14/08/1954 21A Saltley
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 166       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 03/12/1955 27A Bank Hall
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 167       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 10/01/1959 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 171       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 31/12/1951 86K Abergavenny
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 172       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B Kentish Town
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 1207 w/e 28/12/1946 14B Kentish Town (New) on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 16/06/1956 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 1208 w/e 28/12/1946 14B Kentish Town (New) on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 16/06/1956 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2325       on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2329       on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2331       on 01/01/1948 14B on 01/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2383       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 06/11/1954 21A Saltley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2683       on 01/01/1948 14B 5w/e 16/07/1949 5D Stoke
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2687       on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 30/11/1949 PLS Plaistow
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2230 on 05/06/1946 23C Southport (New) on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 15/11/1952 33A Plaistow
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4776       on 01/01/1948 14B 8w/e 11/07/1953 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4777       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 28/11/1953 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4816       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 10/01/1959 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4822       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 07/04/1962 17B Burton
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4846       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 22/09/1962 2F Woodford Halse
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4917       on 01/01/1948 14B 3w/e 14/01/1950 17A Derby
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4984       on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 16/06/1956 15D Bedford
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4985       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 12/11/1960 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5267       on 01/01/1948 14B m/e 16/06/1956 15D Bedford
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5279 m/e 11/1936 14B Kentish Town (New) on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 14/01/1961 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5557       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 21/11/1959 17A Derby
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5598       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 21/11/1959 17A Derby
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5609 4w/e 22/06/1946 19B Sheffield Millhouses on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 07/10/1950 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5612       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 21/11/1959 17A Derby
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5614       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 11/07/1959 26A Newton Heath
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5615       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 16/01/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5616       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 21/11/1959 16A Nottingham
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5627       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 30/11/1957 16A Nottingham
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5641       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 30/11/1957 16A Nottingham
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5648       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 30/11/1957 17A Derby
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5649       on 01/01/1948 14B w/e 21/11/1959 21A Saltley
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5650       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 30/11/1957 16A Nottingham
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5654       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 07/10/1950 19B Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5657       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 04/10/1952 63A Perth South
Steam 6P 4-6-0 5665       on 01/01/1948 14B 4w/e 04/10/1952 67A Corkerhill
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41199 on 01/01/1948 26C Bolton 3w/e 11/12/1948 14B 4w/e 12/07/1952 15D Bedford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42237 on 01/01/1948 5D Stoke 3w/e 11/12/1948 14B w/e 07/07/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43909 on 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 5w/e 24/12/1949 14B 4w/e 07/10/1950 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4210 on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 5w/e 24/12/1949 14B w/e 25/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44243 on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 5w/e 24/12/1949 14B w/e 25/08/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44397 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 5w/e 24/12/1949 14B 4w/e 24/03/1951 1A Willesden
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44440 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 5w/e 24/12/1949 14B 4w/e 24/03/1951 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42133       on 11/01/1950 (New) 14B 2w/e 17/06/1950 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47200 on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 3w/e 14/01/1950 14B w/e 01/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7202 on 01/01/1948 16B Spital Bridge 3w/e 14/01/1950 14B w/e 25/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58131       3w/e 14/01/1950 14B on 25/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45285 on 01/01/1948 17A Derby 3w/e 14/01/1950 14B w/e 14/01/1961 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42133 on 11/01/1950 14B Kentish Town (New) 2w/e 17/06/1950 14B 4w/e 09/10/1954 14C St Albans
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42051       on 14/09/1950 (New) 14B 4w/e 04/12/1954 20E Manningham
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41083 on 01/01/1948 17A Derby 4w/e 04/11/1950 14B 8w/e 19/06/1954 17A Derby
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45602 5w/e 24/12/1949 17A Derby 4w/e 04/11/1950 14B 4w/e 27/01/1951 17A Derby
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45221 on 01/01/1948 25F Low Moor 4w/e 02/12/1950 14B 4w/e 24/02/1951 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45589 on 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 02/12/1950 14B 4w/e 31/12/1950 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43909 4w/e 07/10/1950 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B 8w/e 14/06/1952 21A Saltley
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58200       4w/e 31/12/1950 14B 4w/e 17/02/1951 33A Plaistow
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 42791 4w/e 04/11/1950 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B 4w/e 27/01/1951 20A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40091 on 01/01/1948 14C St Albans 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B 4w/e 31/12/1951 86K Abergavenny
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40098 on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B 4w/e 31/03/1952 86K Abergavenny
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40155 on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B 4w/e 22/03/1952 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40172 on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 31/12/1950 14B on 21/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47204 on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 24/02/1951 14B w/e 04/03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47205 on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 24/02/1951 14B m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42680 on 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 24/02/1951 14B 4w/e 19/05/1951 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44228 on 01/01/1948 13A Plaistow 4w/e 24/03/1951 14B 4w/e 19/05/1951 91E To Eastern Region
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44530 on 01/01/1948 13A Plaistow 4w/e 24/03/1951 14B 4w/e 19/05/1951 91E To Eastern Region
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42685 4w/e 07/10/1950 21A Saltley 4w/e 24/03/1951 14B 4w/e 19/05/1951 21A Saltley
Steam Compound 4-4-0 40931 4w/e 27/01/1951 23C Lancaster Green Ayre 4w/e 19/05/1951 14B 4w/e 04/10/1952 15D Bedford
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41023 on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 19/05/1951 14B 4w/e 16/06/1951 17A Derby
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41061 on 01/01/1948 21B Bournville 4w/e 29/12/1951 14B 4w/e 16/05/1953 20E Manningham
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41074 on 01/01/1948 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 29/12/1951 14B on 07/08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47437 on 01/01/1948 15B Kettering 4w/e 22/03/1952 14B w/e 25/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40021 on 01/01/1948 20G Hellifield 8w/e 14/06/1952 14B 8w/e 05/09/1953 68D Beattock
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40079 4w/e 22/03/1952 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 09/08/1952 14B 8w/e 29/11/1952 16D Mansfield
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40096 4w/e 22/03/1952 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 09/08/1952 14B 4w/e 28/01/1956 16C Mansfield
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45260 4w/e 06/10/1951 17A Derby 4w/e 06/09/1952 14B 4w/e 28/11/1953 16A Nottingham
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45575 on 01/01/1948 30A Corkerhill 4w/e 06/09/1952 14B w/e 30/05/1959 16A Nottingham
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45579 on 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 06/09/1952 14B w/e 04/03/1961 21A Saltley
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44825 on 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 04/10/1952 14B w/e 21/11/1959 21A Saltley
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80048       on 13/10/1952 (New) 14B 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80047 on 30/09/1952 15D Bedford (New) 3w/e 24/01/1953 14B 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40040 on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 3w/e 24/01/1953 14B on 12/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80059       on 03/03/1953 (New) 14B 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80062       on 29/04/1953 (New) 14B 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47243 on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 31/10/1953 14B w/e 19/10/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44298 4w/e 07/10/1950 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 31/10/1953 14B w/e 12/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43975 4w/e 21/02/1953 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 02/01/1954 14B 8w/e 05/10/1957 17C Coalville
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47212 on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 02/01/1954 14B w/e 21/01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44981 on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 8w/e 19/06/1954 14B 4w/e 29/01/1955 17B Burton
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40021 8w/e 05/09/1953 68D Beattock 4w/e 14/08/1954 14B on 12/09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80091       on 10/09/1954 (New) 14B 4w/e 06/10/1956 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80092       on 24/09/1954 (New) 14B 4w/e 06/10/1956 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80094       on 25/10/1954 (New) 14B 4w/e 06/10/1956 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80063 on 19/05/1953 21A Saltley (New) 4w/e 06/11/1954 14B 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43919 on 01/01/1948 17B Burton 4w/e 06/11/1954 14B 8w/e 05/10/1957 17C Coalville
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44270 on 01/01/1948 17B Burton 4w/e 06/11/1954 14B w/e 16/01/1960 18A Toton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42682 on 01/01/1948 20E Manningham 4w/e 06/11/1954 14B w/e 21/05/1960 14E Bedford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42685 4w/e 27/02/1954 20E Manningham 4w/e 04/12/1954 14B w/e 07/07/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80045 on 04/09/1952 15D Bedford (New) 4w/e 29/01/1955 14B 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44143 on 01/01/1948 17B Burton 4w/e 29/01/1955 14B 4w/e 04/10/1958 21A Saltley
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47642 on 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 21/05/1955 14B w/e 16/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47209 on 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 31/12/1955 14B w/e 22/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45447 4w/e 17/07/1954 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 19/05/1956 14B w/e 21/11/1959 21A Saltley
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45238 4w/e 28/01/1956 15D Bedford m/e 16/06/1956 14B 4w/e 07/09/1957 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45407 4w/e 24/03/1956 17A Derby m/e 16/06/1956 14B w/e 23/01/1960 16A Nottingham
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45444 4w/e 28/01/1956 15D Bedford m/e 16/06/1956 14B w/e 14/02/1959 27F Brunswick
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42453 m/e 16/06/1956 6H Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B w/e 01/11/1958 14D Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42540 on 01/01/1948 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B w/e 20/06/1959 14D Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42587 on 01/01/1948 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B w/e 04/04/1959 14C St Albans
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42595 on 01/01/1948 11D Oxenholme 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B w/e 01/11/1958 14D Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42610 4w/e 11/08/1956 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B w/e 07/07/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42617 on 01/01/1948 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B w/e 25/02/1961 14D Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42156 2w/e 17/06/1950 7B Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B w/e 28/07/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42157 2w/e 17/06/1950 7B Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B w/e 01/11/1958 14D Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42178 4w/e 05/11/1955 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 06/10/1956 14B w/e 06/02/1960 14D Neasden
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44806 on 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 29/12/1956 14B 4w/e 30/11/1957 16A Nottingham
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44812 on 01/01/1948 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 29/12/1956 14B w/e 21/11/1959 21A Saltley
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44855 4w/e 01/12/1956 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 29/12/1956 14B w/e 06/02/1960 9A Longsight
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40534 on 01/01/1948 2C Northampton 4w/e 23/03/1957 14B 4w/e 04/10/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40548 8w/e 29/11/1952 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 23/03/1957 14B w/e 28/01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45610 on 01/01/1948 17A Derby 4w/e 16/06/1957 14B 4w/e 10/08/1957 17A Derby
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40413 4w/e 23/03/1957 21A Saltley 4w/e 10/08/1957 14B w/e 10/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40433 4w/e 23/03/1957 19B Sheffield Millhouses 4w/e 10/08/1957 14B m/e 11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45585 3w/e 24/01/1953 17A Derby 4w/e 10/08/1957 14B w/e 03/10/1959 14D Neasden
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44663 4w/e 26/01/1957 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 07/09/1957 14B w/e 21/11/1959 21A Saltley
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41114 8w/e 19/06/1954 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B 4w/e 22/02/1958 17A Derby
Steam Compound 4-4-0 41118 4w/e 14/08/1954 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B w/e 18/01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44810 on 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B w/e 21/11/1959 21A Saltley
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44821 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A Saltley 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B 4w/e 14/06/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46110 4w/e 06/10/1956 5A Crewe North 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B 4w/e 14/06/1958 1B Camden
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46116 m/e 16/06/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B 4w/e 12/07/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46127 8w/e 05/10/1957 5A Crewe North 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B 4w/e 12/07/1958 6J Holyhead
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46131 on 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B 4w/e 12/07/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46152 3w/e 24/01/1953 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B 4w/e 12/07/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46157 4w/e 09/10/1954 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 30/11/1957 14B 4w/e 14/06/1958 1B Camden
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40567 4w/e 04/10/1952 5A Crewe North 4w/e 28/12/1957 14B on 22/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40580 4w/e 10/08/1957 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 28/12/1957 14B w/e 11/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40582 4w/e 23/02/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 28/12/1957 14B w/e 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40420 4w/e 03/11/1956 6K Rhyl 4w/e 28/12/1957 14B w/e 22/11/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40421 4w/e 06/10/1956 3C Ryecroft (Walsall) 4w/e 28/12/1957 14B 4w/e 04/10/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70042 on 09/04/1953 30A Stratford (New) 4w/e 14/06/1958 14B 4w/e 12/07/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45561 4w/e 26/01/1957 17F Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 12/07/1958 14B w/e 25/07/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45618 on 01/01/1948 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 12/07/1958 14B w/e 21/11/1959 17A Derby
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45622 4w/e 03/11/1956 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 12/07/1958 14B 4w/e 04/10/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45628 4w/e 03/11/1956 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 12/07/1958 14B w/e 03/10/1959 14D Neasden
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45652 4w/e 01/12/1956 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 12/07/1958 14B w/e 16/01/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44381 4w/e 22/03/1958 14E   4w/e 09/08/1958 14B w/e 04/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43971 on 01/01/1948 15D Bedford 4w/e 06/09/1958 14B w/e 10/01/1959 14C St Albans
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44043 4w/e 21/02/1953 15D Bedford 4w/e 06/09/1958 14B w/e 10/01/1959 14C St Albans
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46103 on 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 11/10/1958 14B w/e 01/11/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46133 on 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) w/e 18/10/1958 14B w/e 01/11/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42334 4w/e 17/05/1958 14D Neasden w/e 01/11/1958 14B w/e 19/05/1962 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42338 4w/e 17/05/1958 14D Neasden w/e 01/11/1958 14B w/e 26/05/1962 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42342 4w/e 17/05/1958 14D Neasden w/e 01/11/1958 14B w/e 02/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46103 w/e 01/11/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 29/11/1958 14B w/e 17/06/1961 21A Saltley
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46133 w/e 01/11/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 29/11/1958 14B w/e 16/09/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45622 4w/e 04/10/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 06/12/1958 14B w/e 01/07/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44821 4w/e 14/06/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 13/12/1958 14B w/e 17/03/1962 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40030 8w/e 19/06/1954 14A Cricklewood East w/e 10/01/1959 14B on 29/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46130 8w/e 05/10/1957 8A Edge Hill w/e 07/02/1959 14B w/e 18/04/1959 8A Edge Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44235 4w/e 26/01/1952 21A Saltley w/e 14/02/1959 14B w/e 25/08/1962 15A Wellingborough
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46148 w/e 10/01/1959 9A Longsight w/e 14/02/1959 14B w/e 11/04/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44294 on 01/01/1948 18C Hasland w/e 07/03/1959 14B w/e 25/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47449 on 01/01/1948 17C Coalville w/e 28/03/1959 14B w/e 04/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44409 on 01/01/1948 17A Derby w/e 25/04/1959 14B w/e 16/01/1960 18A Toton
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46158 8w/e 16/07/1955 9A Longsight w/e 25/04/1959 14B w/e 13/06/1959 9A Longsight
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46154 on 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North w/e 09/05/1959 14B w/e 13/06/1959 1B Camden
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43923 w/e 10/01/1959 16B Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 20/06/1959 14B w/e 05/12/1959 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44572 on 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 20/06/1959 14B w/e 25/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45575 w/e 30/05/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 20/06/1959 14B w/e 16/12/1961 17A Derby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42157 w/e 01/11/1958 14D Neasden w/e 29/08/1959 14B w/e 06/02/1960 14D Neasden
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40025 w/e 11/07/1959 14E Bedford w/e 19/09/1959 14B on 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45614 w/e 11/07/1959 26A Newton Heath w/e 19/09/1959 14B w/e 05/03/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46130 w/e 18/04/1959 8A Edge Hill w/e 19/09/1959 14B w/e 19/12/1959 55A Holbeck (MR)
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46132 4w/e 29/01/1955 8A Edge Hill w/e 19/09/1959 14B w/e 14/10/1961 21A Saltley
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46142 4w/e 08/10/1955 8A Edge Hill w/e 19/09/1959 14B w/e 16/09/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46160 on 01/01/1948 9A Longsight w/e 19/09/1959 14B w/e 17/06/1961 21A Saltley
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40203 4w/e 07/10/1950 8E Brunswick w/e 26/09/1959 14B w/e 21/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46123 on 01/01/1948 1B Camden w/e 26/09/1959 14B w/e 17/06/1961 21A Saltley
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46140 8w/e 19/06/1954 9A Longsight w/e 26/09/1959 14B w/e 07/11/1959 16A Nottingham
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47203 4w/e 19/04/1958 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 24/10/1959 14B m/e 08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40020 w/e 31/01/1959 14E Bedford w/e 24/10/1959 14B w/e 28/11/1959 14E Bedford
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40012 w/e 12/09/1959 14E Bedford w/e 07/11/1959 14B w/e 28/11/1959 14E Bedford
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45561 w/e 25/07/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 07/11/1959 14B w/e 20/01/1962 17B Burton
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46139 on 01/01/1948 1B Camden w/e 07/11/1959 14B w/e 16/09/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46162 8w/e 29/11/1952 1B Camden w/e 07/11/1959 14B w/e 17/06/1961 21A Saltley
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45585 w/e 03/10/1959 14D Neasden w/e 21/11/1959 14B w/e 16/01/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45628 w/e 03/10/1959 14D Neasden w/e 21/11/1959 14B w/e 15/07/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45712 w/e 03/10/1959 14D Neasden w/e 21/11/1959 14B w/e 01/07/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45522 2w/e 17/06/1950 1B Camden w/e 28/11/1959 14B w/e 16/09/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40064 8w/e 19/06/1954 1A Willesden w/e 05/12/1959 14B on 22/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40053 4w/e 29/01/1955 1A Willesden w/e 12/12/1959 14B w/e 26/11/1960 14E Bedford
Steam 7P 4-6-0 46140 w/e 07/11/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 19/12/1959 14B w/e 16/09/1961 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42336 on 07/11/1959 2F Woodford Halse on 01/02/1960 14B on 08/09/1960 14B Kentish Town
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40022 on 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town w/e 06/02/1960 14B w/e 09/04/1960 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40024 on 01/01/1948 14C St Albans w/e 06/02/1960 14B w/e 25/06/1960 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40037 4w/e 01/12/1956 14C St Albans w/e 06/02/1960 14B on 22/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42300 on 01/01/1948 14C St Albans w/e 06/02/1960 14B w/e 20/02/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42302 on 01/01/1948 14C St Albans w/e 06/02/1960 14B on 20/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42335 w/e 07/11/1959 2F Woodford Halse w/e 06/02/1960 14B w/e 07/07/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42349 w/e 07/11/1959 2F Woodford Halse w/e 06/02/1960 14B on 22/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42595 w/e 01/11/1958 14D Neasden w/e 06/02/1960 14B w/e 07/07/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44984 m/e 16/06/1956 15D Bedford w/e 06/02/1960 14B w/e 17/03/1962 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45614 w/e 05/03/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 19/03/1960 14B w/e 16/12/1961 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47442 w/e 24/10/1959 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 02/04/1960 14B w/e 04/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45267 m/e 16/06/1956 15D Bedford w/e 30/04/1960 14B w/e 15/09/1962 16D Annesley
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45342 4w/e 28/01/1956 15D Bedford w/e 30/04/1960 14B w/e 18/06/1960 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45652 w/e 16/01/1960 15C Leicester Midland w/e 30/04/1960 14B w/e 18/06/1960 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42588 4w/e 04/10/1958 14D Neasden w/e 21/05/1960 14B w/e 16/09/1961 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43859 4w/e 06/09/1958 16A Nottingham w/e 18/06/1960 14B w/e 03/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44138 w/e 09/05/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 18/06/1960 14B w/e 28/10/1961 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44433 on 01/01/1948 17B Burton w/e 09/07/1960 14B w/e 24/09/1960 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44476 w/e 28/05/1960 17B Burton w/e 09/07/1960 14B w/e 08/10/1960 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47261 w/e 16/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 16/07/1960 14B w/e 30/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40031 w/e 09/04/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 16/07/1960 14B w/e 01/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40024 w/e 25/06/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 13/08/1960 14B w/e 03/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42336 on 01/02/1960 14B Kentish Town on 08/09/1960 14B on 02/11/1960 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42336 on 08/09/1960 14B Kentish Town on 02/11/1960 14B on 26/06/1961 To Store
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44688 w/e 21/11/1959 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 12/11/1960 14B w/e 22/09/1962 2F Woodford Halse
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47223 w/e 30/05/1959 14A Cricklewood East w/e 17/12/1960 14B w/e 04/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40022 w/e 09/04/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 18/02/1961 14B w/e 18/08/1962 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40029 w/e 16/04/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 18/02/1961 14B on 22/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40033 w/e 09/04/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 18/02/1961 14B on 23/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40038 w/e 16/04/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 18/02/1961 14B on 22/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47485 w/e 06/02/1960 15C Leicester Midland w/e 04/03/1961 14B w/e 17/03/1962 14E Bedford
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47611 w/e 07/02/1959 27F Brunswick w/e 11/04/1961 14B w/e 25/11/1961 99C Crewe Works
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47642 w/e 16/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 08/07/1961 14B w/e 19/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47554 w/e 16/01/1960 14A Cricklewood East w/e 15/07/1961 14B m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45622 w/e 01/07/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 15/07/1961 14B w/e 23/03/1963 17B Burton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42617 w/e 25/02/1961 14D Neasden w/e 05/08/1961 14B w/e 28/07/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45628 w/e 15/07/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 23/09/1961 14B w/e 08/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45712 w/e 01/07/1961 26A Newton Heath w/e 23/09/1961 14B w/e 20/01/1962 17B Burton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47502 w/e 06/02/1960 15C Leicester Midland w/e 18/11/1961 14B w/e 28/07/1962 9G Gorton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42333 w/e 09/12/1961 17A Derby w/e 27/01/1962 14B w/e 26/05/1962 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42336 on 26/06/1961 98S   on 29/01/1962 14B on 02/07/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42339 w/e 09/12/1961 17A Derby w/e 10/02/1962 14B w/e 07/07/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47213 w/e 31/10/1959 14A Cricklewood East w/e 17/02/1962 14B w/e 03/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40026 w/e 16/01/1960 14E Bedford w/e 28/04/1962 14B w/e 01/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84005 w/e 17/03/1962 14D Neasden w/e 07/07/1962 14B w/e 19/01/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84008 w/e 24/06/1961 14D Neasden w/e 07/07/1962 14B w/e 29/12/1962 15C Leicester Midland
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84029 w/e 20/01/1962 14D Neasden w/e 07/07/1962 14B w/e 19/01/1963 15A Wellingborough
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44717 4w/e 24/03/1951 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 21/07/1962 14B w/e 15/09/1962 16D Annesley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42336 on 02/07/1962 17C Rowsley on 16/09/1962 14B on 18/10/1962 Withdrawn