Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 775 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6306 Week
» 31140 Month
» 65472 Year
» 1730848 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Kidderminster


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Kidderminster Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4629       8w/e 23/03/1946 KDR 4w/e 16/05/1959 85D Kidderminster
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6306 on 01/01/1934 32 St Philips Marsh 8w/e 23/03/1946 KDR 4w/e 20/04/1946 WOS Worcester
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5303 4w/e 01/12/1945 85 Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 20/04/1946 KDR m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2281       4w/e 30/10/1948 KDR 4w/e 05/11/1949 HFD Hereford
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4614       4w/e 30/10/1948 KDR 4w/e 26/12/1953 85D Kidderminster
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6382 on 01/01/1934 172 Westbury 4w/e 30/10/1948 KDR 4w/e 03/10/1953 85A Worcester
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4599       4w/e 05/11/1949 KDR 6w/e 30/06/1951 85A Worcester
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4100 4w/e 05/11/1949 VVOS   4w/e 03/12/1949 KDR 4w/e 13/07/1957 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4518       4w/e 31/12/1949 KDR 4w/e 20/05/1950 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4596       3w/e 19/05/1951 85D 8w/e 20/04/1957 85A Worcester
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5518       3w/e 19/05/1951 85D 4w/e 09/10/1954 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 2021 0-6-0PT 2101       4w/e 30/09/1951 85D 4w/e 16/05/1953 85A Worcester
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4641 3w/e 19/05/1951 85C Hereford 4w/e 21/03/1953 85D 4w/e 08/10/1960 85A Worcester
Steam 2021 0-6-0PT 2144 4w/e 24/01/1953 85A Worcester 4w/e 16/05/1953 85D 4w/e 24/04/1954 85A Worcester
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2207       4w/e 16/05/1953 85D 4w/e 24/03/1956 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7301 4w/e 18/04/1953 85A Worcester 4w/e 16/05/1953 85D 4w/e 30/01/1954 85C Hereford
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8731 4w/e 30/04/1951 85C Hereford 4w/e 16/05/1953 85D 4w/e 08/10/1955 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4614 4w/e 30/10/1948 KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 26/12/1953 85D 4w/e 05/11/1955 85A Worcester
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4114       4w/e 09/10/1954 85D 8w/e 26/03/1955 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5394 on 01/01/1934 85 Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 29/01/1955 85D m/e 01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6679 4w/e 30/09/1950 86F Tondu 8w/e 26/03/1955 85D w/e 01/02/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1661       on 31/03/1955 (New) 85D 4w/e 02/11/1957 85A Worcester
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82008 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C Barry 4w/e 10/09/1955 85D 4w/e 07/09/1957 85A Worcester
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6334 4w/e 13/08/1955 85A Worcester 4w/e 08/10/1955 85D m/e 16/06/1956 85A Worcester
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6382 4w/e 03/10/1953 85A Worcester 4w/e 08/10/1955 85D 4w/e 04/10/1958 85C Hereford
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4614 4w/e 05/11/1955 85A Worcester 4w/e 28/01/1956 85D 4w/e 14/07/1956 85A Worcester
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4114 8w/e 26/03/1955 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 25/02/1956 85D m/e 16/06/1956 83G Penzance
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6326 4w/e 16/07/1955 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 24/03/1956 85D 8w/e 20/04/1957 85C Hereford
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6690 4w/e 01/11/1952 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 21/04/1956 85D m/e 16/06/1956 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4114 m/e 16/06/1956 83G Penzance 4w/e 14/07/1956 85D m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5518 4w/e 09/10/1954 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 11/08/1956 85D 4w/e 05/11/1960 83B Taunton
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4139 4w/e 21/02/1953 82A Bristol Bath Road 8w/e 20/04/1957 85D 4w/e 13/07/1957 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6314 4w/e 06/11/1954 85C Hereford 8w/e 20/04/1957 85D m/e 05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6340 8w/e 20/04/1957 85A Worcester 4w/e 18/05/1957 85D 4w/e 15/06/1957 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5355 4w/e 13/07/1957 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 05/10/1957 85D m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82008 4w/e 07/09/1957 85A Worcester 4w/e 30/11/1957 85D 4w/e 25/01/1958 85A Worcester
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4175 4w/e 22/02/1958 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 17/05/1958 85D w/e 15/08/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4625 4w/e 30/04/1952 85A Worcester 4w/e 12/06/1958 85D 4w/e 09/08/1958 85A Worcester
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7777 4w/e 28/01/1956 85A Worcester 4w/e 12/06/1958 85D 4w/e 01/11/1958 85A Worcester
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6669 4w/e 12/06/1958 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 14/06/1958 85D 4w/e 08/09/1962 88B Radyr
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6367 4w/e 09/08/1958 84E Tyseley 4w/e 06/09/1958 85D 4w/e 04/10/1958 85A Worcester
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6832 4w/e 04/10/1958 83E St Blazey 4w/e 01/11/1958 85D 4w/e 28/11/1959 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4109 4w/e 08/10/1955 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 29/11/1958 85D 4w/e 21/03/1959 85A Worcester
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1417 4w/e 18/05/1946 OSY Oswestry 4w/e 29/11/1958 85D m/e 02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 1457 4w/e 18/04/1953 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 29/11/1958 85D m/e 02/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5396 4w/e 22/02/1958 85A Worcester 4w/e 29/11/1958 85D 4w/e 27/12/1958 85A Worcester
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5333 4w/e 24/01/1959 85C Hereford 4w/e 21/02/1959 85D m/e 05/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8701 7w/e 31/08/1952 85C Hereford 4w/e 21/02/1959 85D 4w/e 18/04/1959 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5396 4w/e 27/12/1958 85A Worcester 4w/e 21/03/1959 85D 4w/e 16/05/1959 85A Worcester
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4629 8w/e 23/03/1946 KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 16/05/1959 85D 4w/e 12/01/1963 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82030 4w/e 16/05/1959 85A Worcester 4w/e 13/06/1959 85D 4w/e 11/07/1959 85A Worcester
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6388 4w/e 01/11/1958 81E Didcot 4w/e 11/07/1959 85D m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5791 4w/e 13/07/1957 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 31/10/1959 85D m/e 04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6368 4w/e 30/01/1960 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 18/06/1960 85D 4w/e 13/08/1960 85A Worcester
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6128       4w/e 13/08/1960 85D 4w/e 24/03/1962 81B Slough
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6144 4w/e 30/01/1960 81C Southall 4w/e 13/08/1960 85D 4w/e 19/05/1962 81F Oxford
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40085 4w/e 30/01/1960 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 10/09/1960 84G 4w/e 03/12/1960 84D Leamington
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4129 4w/e 18/06/1960 83C Exeter 4w/e 08/10/1960 84G m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4641 4w/e 08/10/1960 85A Worcester 4w/e 05/11/1960 84G m/e 05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5151 3w/e 19/05/1951 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 05/11/1960 84G m/e 08/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3997 4w/e 03/12/1960 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 31/12/1960 84G w/e 22/04/1967 2F Bescot
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4147 4w/e 10/09/1960 81F Oxford 4w/e 22/04/1961 84G w/e 15/08/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3607       4w/e 17/06/1961 84G w/e 15/08/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3619 4w/e 30/09/1951 84D Leamington 4w/e 19/05/1962 84G w/e 15/08/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5153 4w/e 21/03/1959 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 08/09/1962 84G w/e 15/08/1964 2L Leamington
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4173 on 28/10/1949 STB Stourbridge Junction (New) 4w/e 06/10/1962 84G w/e 15/08/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6364 4w/e 05/11/1960 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/10/1962 84G w/e 22/02/1964 2L Leamington
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6317 4w/e 28/01/1961 84C Banbury on 15/06/1963 84G m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6395 4w/e 06/10/1962 87F Llanelly on 01/12/1963 2P w/e 15/08/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6394 4w/e 05/10/1957 85B Gloucester Horton Road w/e 07/12/1963 2P m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6364 w/e 22/02/1964 2L Leamington w/e 08/08/1964 2P w/e 15/08/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction