Depot: Kirkby Stephen
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Kirkby Stephen | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 443 | on | 01/08/1929 | SHI | Shildon | on | 04/11/1929 | KBY | on | 06/01/1931 | SHI | Shildon |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2118 | m/e | 10/1901 | SHI | Shildon (New) | on | 06/01/1931 | KBY | on | 02/09/1940 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 444 | m/e | 03/1904 | SHI | Shildon (New) | on | 18/11/1931 | KBY | on | 31/12/1936 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 1613 | H | 12/1935 | KBY | m/e | 08/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 1961 | H | 12/1935 | KBY | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | Northallerton | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 7411 | S | 01/1936 | KBY | on | 01/01/1948 | CAM | Cambridge | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1032 | on | 07/01/1935 | DAR | Darlington | on | 31/12/1936 | KBY | on | 14/11/1940 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 715 | on | 14/12/1937 | DAR | Darlington | on | 02/09/1940 | KBY | on | 21/05/1941 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2118 | on | 02/09/1940 | DAR | Darlington | on | 14/11/1940 | KBY | on | 30/03/1942 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 444 | on | 31/12/1936 | DAR | Darlington | on | 21/05/1941 | KBY | on | 17/11/1941 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5028 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | on | 28/08/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5040 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | on | 15/09/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5047 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | on | 29/12/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5103 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5115 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | on | 26/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5655 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5669 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | m/e | 04/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5673 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50D | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5681 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | w/e | 30/04/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5684 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | on | 11/04/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5617 | on | 01/01/1948 | KBY | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5077 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 17/07/1948 | KBY | w/e | 21/08/1948 | AUK | West Auckland |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5089 | on | 25/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | w/e | 21/08/1948 | KBY | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65081 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 12/02/1949 | KBY | w/e | 19/02/1949 | NLN | Northallerton |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65100 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 19/02/1949 | KBY | w/e | 13/12/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65653 | on | 01/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 14/05/1950 | 51H | on | 30/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65695 | on | 01/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | on | 14/05/1950 | 51H | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46471 | m/e | 07/1951 (New) | 51H | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46474 | m/e | 08/1951 (New) | 51H | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46476 | m/e | 09/1951 (New) | 51H | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46478 | m/e | 09/1951 (New) | 51H | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46481 | m/e | 10/1951 (New) | 51H | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46480 | m/e | 09/1951 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 51H | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46477 | m/e | 09/1951 | 51A | Darlington (New) | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 51H | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65092 | on | 25/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 51H | on | 30/12/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78019 | m/e | 03/1954 (New) | 51H | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78016 | m/e | 03/1954 | 51F | West Auckland (New) | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 51H | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78017 | m/e | 03/1954 | 51F | West Auckland (New) | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 51H | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78018 | m/e | 03/1954 | 51F | West Auckland (New) | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 51H | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82026 | on | 12/11/1954 (New) | 51H | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82027 | on | 23/11/1954 (New) | 51H | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46470 | m/e | 07/1951 | 51F | West Auckland (New) | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 51H | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46472 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 51F | West Auckland | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 51H | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63355 | on | 14/09/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 03/04/1955 | 51H | on | 26/06/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63373 | on | 16/07/1950 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 03/04/1955 | 51H | on | 26/06/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43038 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43055 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43122 | on | 21/08/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43124 | on | 30/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43128 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 52C | Blaydon | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43130 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43101 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 51H | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76022 | m/e | 12/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates (New) | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51H | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76047 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 52C | Blaydon | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51H | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76048 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 52C | Blaydon | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51H | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76020 | m/e | 12/1952 | 51A | Darlington (New) | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 51H | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76023 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 51H | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76051 | m/e | 08/1956 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 51H | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76052 | m/e | 08/1956 | 50A | York (North) (New) | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 51H | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78013 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51J | Northallerton | 3w/e | 31/01/1958 | 51H | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78032 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 12D | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46422 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 12D | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43027 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 12D | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43103 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 12D | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43018 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 12D | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43023 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 12D | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43045 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 12D | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46449 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 12D | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46458 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 12D | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46442 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 12D | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12F | Workington |