Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 77 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 77 Week
» 11222 Month
» 111007 Year
» 1776383 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Kirkby in Ashfield


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Kirkby in Ashfield Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3894       on 01/01/1948 16C on 03/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3895       on 01/01/1948 16C on 23/06/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3907       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 11/07/1959 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4005       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4021       on 01/01/1948 16C 8w/e 19/06/1954 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8000       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 17/05/1958 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8006       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 30/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8007       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 26/03/1955 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8009       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 22/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8027       on 01/01/1948 16C 3w/e 14/01/1950 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8029       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 09/01/1960 41D Canklow
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8036       on 01/01/1948 16C 5w/e 24/12/1949 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8074       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 09/09/1950 12B Carlisle Canal
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8092       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 30/04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8096       on 01/01/1948 16C m/e 11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8097       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 24/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8098       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 18/02/1967 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8100       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 02/04/1966 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8101       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 14/02/1959 21A Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8104       on 01/01/1948 16C on 17/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8108       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 09/08/1952 16D Mansfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8109       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 23/05/1959 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8114 m/e 03/1939 2C Northampton (New) on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 05/12/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8139       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 28/11/1953 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8166       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 15/11/1958 8D Widnes
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8193       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 19/12/1959 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8214       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 11/02/1961 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8215       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 23/01/1960 18C Hasland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8223       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 23/11/1963 10C Fleetwood
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8224       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 23/11/1963 10C Fleetwood
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8225       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 17/09/1966 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8267       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 03/09/1966 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8268       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 11/04/1959 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8270       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 07/03/1959 17A Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8272       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 22/03/1952 16D Mansfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8283       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 09/09/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8378       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 23/05/1959 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8379       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 05/12/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8382       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 17/05/1958 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8383       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 15/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8392       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 12/01/1963 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8393       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 07/11/1959 17A Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8409       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 04/10/1952 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8413       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 23/11/1963 10C Fleetwood
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8421       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 09/05/1964 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8442       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 22/03/1952 16D Mansfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8530       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 28/01/1956 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8552       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 21/11/1964 15E Coalville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8608       on 01/01/1948 16C 3w/e 24/01/1953 20C Royston
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8616       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 12/07/1958 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8641       on 01/01/1948 16C 3w/e 14/01/1950 20B Stourton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3494       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 24/03/1951 16D Mansfield
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3773       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 11/08/1951 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4082       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 28/01/1956 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4113       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 27/02/1954 17B Burton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4140       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 28/01/1956 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4202       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 07/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4205       on 01/01/1948 16C 8w/e 19/06/1954 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4206       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 06/10/1956 19C Canklow
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4268       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 02/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4415       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 18/04/1953 16C Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4463       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 30/01/1954 21A Saltley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4472       on 01/01/1948 16C w/e 25/05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4589       on 01/01/1948 16C 4w/e 06/10/1956 17A Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48003 on 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 07/10/1950 16C w/e 05/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43242 3w/e 14/01/1950 18A Toton 4w/e 07/10/1950 16C w/e 10/01/1959 21A Saltley
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43287 on 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 07/10/1950 16C on 19/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43305 on 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 07/10/1950 16C 4w/e 18/05/1957 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43997 2w/e 17/06/1950 16D Mansfield 4w/e 24/03/1951 16C 8w/e 05/10/1957 18C Hasland
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43379 on 01/01/1948 18B Westhouses 4w/e 19/05/1951 16C 4w/e 11/08/1951 17A Derby
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43779 on 01/01/1948 17C Coalville 4w/e 08/09/1951 16C on 06/03/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43773 4w/e 11/08/1951 17A Derby 4w/e 08/09/1951 16C 4w/e 08/02/1958 39A Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43970 4w/e 02/12/1950 18C Hasland 4w/e 22/03/1952 16C 4w/e 18/05/1957 18B Westhouses
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44313 on 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 18/04/1953 16C 8w/e 11/07/1953 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44415 on 01/01/1948 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 18/04/1953 16C 8w/e 11/07/1953 16D Mansfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43874       4w/e 28/11/1953 16C 4w/e 02/01/1954 16D Mansfield
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44230 4w/e 08/08/1953 16D Mansfield 4w/e 02/01/1954 16C 4w/e 30/01/1954 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48770 4w/e 23/02/1952 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 30/01/1954 16C w/e 23/05/1959 17C Rowsley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44205 8w/e 19/06/1954 14A Cricklewood East 4w/e 17/07/1954 16C 4w/e 28/01/1956 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48139 4w/e 14/08/1954 20D Normanton 4w/e 09/10/1954 16C 4w/e 13/08/1955 18B Westhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48395 on 01/01/1948 20D Normanton 4w/e 09/10/1954 16C 4w/e 06/10/1956 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48334 on 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 26/03/1955 16C w/e 02/04/1966 8E Northwich
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44023 4w/e 04/12/1954 17A Derby 4w/e 21/05/1955 16C w/e 25/07/1959 27E Walton on the Hill
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44224 4w/e 04/12/1954 17A Derby 4w/e 21/05/1955 16C 4w/e 28/01/1956 18A Toton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43859 4w/e 02/12/1950 17A Derby 4w/e 13/08/1955 16C 4w/e 28/12/1957 15A Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48008 4w/e 26/03/1955 16A Nottingham 4w/e 25/02/1956 16B w/e 23/05/1959 17C Rowsley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43969 4w/e 07/10/1950 18A Toton m/e 16/06/1956 16B 4w/e 11/08/1956 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44082 4w/e 28/01/1956 18A Toton m/e 16/06/1956 16B 4w/e 11/08/1956 19C Canklow
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44088 4w/e 31/10/1953 18A Toton m/e 16/06/1956 16B 8w/e 05/10/1957 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48102 on 01/01/1948 18B Westhouses 4w/e 11/08/1956 16B w/e 21/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48395 4w/e 06/10/1956 18A Toton 4w/e 17/05/1958 16B w/e 18/02/1967 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48673 4w/e 19/05/1956 18A Toton 4w/e 17/05/1958 16B w/e 14/01/1967 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48376 4w/e 31/12/1950 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 12/07/1958 16B w/e 07/02/1959 14A Cricklewood East
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48528 4w/e 18/04/1953 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 12/07/1958 16B w/e 27/03/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43885 4w/e 28/01/1956 17C Coalville w/e 10/01/1959 16B on 15/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43923 4w/e 08/10/1955 17C Coalville w/e 10/01/1959 16B w/e 20/06/1959 14B Kentish Town
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43933 4w/e 08/10/1955 17C Coalville w/e 10/01/1959 16B w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48177 on 01/01/1948 15D Bedford w/e 10/01/1959 16B w/e 07/02/1959 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44190 4w/e 08/10/1955 17C Coalville w/e 10/01/1959 16B w/e 20/06/1959 16A Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44418 8w/e 05/10/1957 17C Coalville w/e 10/01/1959 16B w/e 20/06/1959 16A Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48447 8w/e 19/06/1954 16D Mansfield w/e 11/04/1959 16B w/e 09/01/1960 18C Hasland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48063 4w/e 23/02/1957 17D Rowsley w/e 23/05/1959 16B w/e 12/12/1964 15E Coalville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48317 w/e 11/04/1959 17C Rowsley w/e 23/05/1959 16B w/e 18/02/1967 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48432 8w/e 19/06/1954 17D Rowsley w/e 23/05/1959 16B w/e 27/01/1962 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48192 4w/e 01/12/1956 17D Rowsley w/e 11/07/1959 16B w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48177 w/e 07/02/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 25/07/1959 16B w/e 09/12/1961 21A Saltley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43907 w/e 11/07/1959 27E Walton on the Hill w/e 01/08/1959 16B on 19/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48011 4w/e 01/01/1955 19C Canklow w/e 09/01/1960 16B w/e 22/09/1962 16D Annesley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44418 w/e 20/06/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 09/01/1960 16B m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48447 w/e 09/01/1960 18C Hasland w/e 23/01/1960 16B w/e 13/02/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48215 w/e 23/01/1960 18C Hasland w/e 12/03/1960 16B w/e 02/04/1966 8E Northwich
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43923 w/e 16/01/1960 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B on 08/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43972 w/e 11/07/1959 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 12/05/1962 9G Gorton
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 41712 w/e 07/03/1959 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 41844 4w/e 03/11/1956 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48001 4w/e 30/01/1954 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 09/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48088 on 01/01/1948 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 27/04/1963 17C Rowsley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48119 on 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 12/11/1966 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48156 on 01/01/1948 28A Motherwell w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 28/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48219 w/e 11/07/1959 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 21/11/1964 15E Coalville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48272 4w/e 22/03/1952 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 12/02/1966 16G Westhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48277 4w/e 31/12/1950 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 16/04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48282 4w/e 28/12/1957 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48405 on 01/01/1948 21A Saltley w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 23/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48442 4w/e 22/03/1952 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 11/02/1961 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48541 4w/e 01/12/1956 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 18/06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48621 on 01/01/1948 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 30/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48643 on 01/01/1948 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 02/04/1966 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48701 on 01/01/1948 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 07/11/1964 9G Gorton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44252 w/e 10/01/1959 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 04/05/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44416 on 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham w/e 09/04/1960 16B m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46501 4w/e 28/11/1953 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 18/06/1960 24G Skipton
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40050 w/e 28/11/1959 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B on 03/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40054 w/e 14/11/1959 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B on 18/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40073 w/e 17/10/1959 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B on 18/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40079 8w/e 29/11/1952 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B on 21/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40115 w/e 28/03/1959 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B on 21/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40146 4w/e 25/02/1956 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 04/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40156 w/e 17/10/1959 16C Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B on 28/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40168 4w/e 08/08/1953 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B on 28/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40175 4w/e 03/10/1953 16D Mansfield w/e 09/04/1960 16B on 28/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40185 w/e 10/10/1959 2B Nuneaton w/e 09/04/1960 16B w/e 16/07/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40182 w/e 10/01/1959 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 21/05/1960 16B on 28/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78013 3w/e 31/01/1958 51H Kirkby Stephen w/e 18/06/1960 16B w/e 23/03/1963 16A Nottingham
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40165 w/e 10/01/1959 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 05/11/1960 16B on 28/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48105 w/e 07/02/1959 21A Saltley w/e 07/01/1961 16B w/e 21/11/1964 15E Coalville
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48342 4w/e 12/07/1958 21A Saltley w/e 07/01/1961 16B w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40124 4w/e 04/11/1950 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 25/02/1961 16B on 02/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40088 4w/e 26/02/1955 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 04/03/1961 16B w/e 21/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40092 w/e 23/01/1960 15E Leicester (G.C.) w/e 04/03/1961 16B w/e 18/03/1961 15E Leicester (G.C.)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40142 on 01/01/1948 22C Bath Green Park (S&D) w/e 11/04/1961 16B on 22/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40089 3w/e 11/12/1948 19D Heaton Mersey w/e 29/04/1961 16B w/e 04/08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40094 4w/e 27/01/1951 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 29/04/1961 16B on 07/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48214 w/e 11/02/1961 18A Toton w/e 24/06/1961 16B w/e 16/11/1963 16C Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48442 w/e 11/02/1961 18A Toton w/e 24/06/1961 16B w/e 18/02/1967 9L Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40090 w/e 18/06/1960 27C Southport w/e 08/07/1961 16B w/e 02/12/1961 27C Southport
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40191 on 01/01/1948 24C Lostock Hall w/e 23/09/1961 16B w/e 25/11/1961 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40195 on 01/01/1948 25G Farnley Junction w/e 23/09/1961 16B w/e 25/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42618 on 05/10/1958 14D Neasden on 13/11/1961 16B on 12/03/1964 16B Annesley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42629 4w/e 04/10/1958 14D Neasden w/e 18/11/1961 16B on 24/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42222 5w/e 24/04/1954 34E Neasden w/e 18/11/1961 16B w/e 25/05/1963 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42231 4w/e 19/02/1955 34E Neasden w/e 18/11/1961 16B on 22/06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42232 5w/e 23/04/1955 34E Neasden w/e 18/11/1961 16B w/e 31/10/1964 12E Tebay
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42080 w/e 05/12/1959 14D Neasden w/e 18/11/1961 16B w/e 25/05/1963 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42089 w/e 05/12/1959 14D Neasden w/e 18/11/1961 16B on 24/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44091 w/e 06/12/1958 21A Saltley w/e 16/12/1961 16B w/e 08/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48432 w/e 27/01/1962 18A Toton w/e 24/02/1962 16B w/e 14/09/1963 16G Westhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48143 w/e 27/01/1962 18A Toton w/e 03/03/1962 16B w/e 30/05/1964 16D Nottingham
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42486 4w/e 09/08/1958 17C Rowsley w/e 17/03/1962 16B w/e 28/04/1962 17C Rowsley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43975 w/e 20/01/1962 16A Nottingham w/e 08/12/1962 16B w/e 28/12/1963 16D Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43870 w/e 07/11/1959 16A Nottingham w/e 09/03/1963 16B on 02/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43888 4w/e 08/10/1955 16A Nottingham w/e 09/03/1963 16B w/e 28/12/1963 16D Nottingham
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48364 w/e 23/05/1959 17C Rowsley w/e 20/04/1963 16B w/e 17/09/1966 5D Stoke
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48346 w/e 08/12/1962 26F Patricroft w/e 25/05/1963 16B w/e 16/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42218 w/e 23/06/1962 1A Willesden w/e 25/05/1963 16B on 24/10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42221 w/e 11/08/1962 1A Willesden w/e 25/05/1963 16B on 12/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43977 w/e 01/06/1963 18A Toton w/e 22/06/1963 16B on 09/11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48103 w/e 25/05/1963 17A Derby w/e 22/06/1963 16B w/e 16/11/1963 16C Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44040 w/e 13/10/1962 21A Saltley w/e 22/06/1963 16B w/e 28/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44578 w/e 07/04/1962 14E Bedford w/e 22/06/1963 16B w/e 15/02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44168 w/e 12/01/1963 16A Nottingham w/e 06/07/1963 16B m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42587 w/e 04/03/1961 16A Nottingham w/e 06/07/1963 16B w/e 14/11/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44203 w/e 07/04/1962 14E Bedford w/e 03/08/1963 16B w/e 14/09/1963 15C Kettering
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44574 m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn w/e 05/10/1963 (R) 16E      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92052 w/e 17/08/1963 15A Wellingborough w/e 26/10/1963 16E w/e 10/10/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92077 w/e 17/08/1963 15A Wellingborough w/e 26/10/1963 16E w/e 20/06/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92020 on 21/03/1955 15A Wellingborough (New) w/e 02/11/1963 16E w/e 26/09/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44213 w/e 10/02/1962 18A Toton w/e 09/11/1963 16E m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44441 w/e 08/12/1962 18A Toton w/e 09/11/1963 16E m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44572 w/e 16/02/1963 18A Toton w/e 09/11/1963 16E w/e 19/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92026 w/e 03/08/1963 15B Kettering w/e 23/11/1963 16E w/e 03/10/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92110 w/e 29/09/1962 15C Leicester Midland w/e 23/11/1963 16E w/e 26/09/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92111 w/e 26/03/1960 15C Leicester Midland w/e 23/11/1963 16E w/e 26/09/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90125 w/e 14/09/1963 10D Lostock Hall w/e 21/12/1963 16E w/e 18/04/1964 10D Lostock Hall
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90187 w/e 25/03/1961 24L Carnforth w/e 21/12/1963 16E w/e 18/04/1964 10A Carnforth
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90205 4w/e 27/03/1954 26D Bury w/e 21/12/1963 16E w/e 25/01/1964 9M Bury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90408 8w/e 14/06/1952 26D Bury w/e 21/12/1963 16E w/e 28/03/1964 9M Bury
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48401 w/e 07/01/1961 16A Nottingham w/e 28/12/1963 16E w/e 02/05/1964 16D Nottingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90570 w/e 02/02/1963 2F Woodford Halse w/e 01/02/1964 16E w/e 18/04/1964 1G Woodford Halse
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90669 w/e 19/01/1963 2F Woodford Halse w/e 01/02/1964 16E w/e 18/04/1964 1G Woodford Halse
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44250 4w/e 23/02/1957 17E Heaton Mersey w/e 08/02/1964 16E w/e 08/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44514 w/e 06/07/1963 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 08/02/1964 16E w/e 26/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90589 w/e 19/01/1963 2F Woodford Halse w/e 15/02/1964 16E w/e 18/04/1964 1G Woodford Halse
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44379 4w/e 05/09/1953 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 15/02/1964 16E on 26/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48727 w/e 27/07/1963 2F Woodford Halse w/e 29/02/1964 16E w/e 28/03/1964 5B Crewe South
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43888 w/e 28/12/1963 16D Nottingham w/e 07/03/1964 16E on 26/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48069 w/e 15/02/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 11/04/1964 16E w/e 07/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48082 w/e 15/02/1964 15B Wellingborough w/e 11/04/1964 16E w/e 18/04/1964 15B Wellingborough
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48627 w/e 16/07/1960 15A Wellingborough w/e 18/04/1964 16E w/e 02/05/1964 16C Derby
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92008 w/e 13/07/1963 17C Rowsley w/e 02/05/1964 16E w/e 05/12/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92018 w/e 24/03/1962 17C Rowsley w/e 02/05/1964 16E w/e 26/09/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92050 w/e 21/11/1959 17C Rowsley w/e 02/05/1964 16E w/e 10/10/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92051 w/e 21/11/1959 17C Rowsley w/e 02/05/1964 16E w/e 10/10/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92056 w/e 22/09/1962 17C Rowsley w/e 02/05/1964 16E w/e 24/10/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92076 w/e 26/10/1963 16J Rowsley w/e 02/05/1964 16E w/e 10/10/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92114 w/e 14/04/1962 17C Rowsley w/e 02/05/1964 16E w/e 26/09/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92127 w/e 20/07/1963 17C Rowsley w/e 02/05/1964 16E w/e 10/10/1964 8C Speke Junction
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92159 w/e 08/02/1964 16J Rowsley w/e 02/05/1964 16E w/e 26/09/1964 9D Newton Heath
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44248 w/e 07/03/1964 16F Burton w/e 27/06/1964 16E w/e 26/09/1964 Withdrawn
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 D94 on 06/04/1961 17A Derby (New) w/e 08/08/1964 16E w/e 21/11/1964 16D Nottingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44139 w/e 30/05/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 08/08/1964 16E w/e 06/02/1965 2F Bescot
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44215 w/e 25/04/1964 16A Toton w/e 08/08/1964 16E w/e 20/02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42181 w/e 02/05/1964 16C Derby w/e 22/08/1964 16E w/e 05/09/1964 16C Derby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42053 w/e 02/05/1964 16C Derby w/e 05/09/1964 16E w/e 31/10/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48185 w/e 23/06/1962 16A Nottingham w/e 12/09/1964 16E w/e 27/03/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48186 w/e 02/05/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 12/09/1964 16E w/e 17/09/1966 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48254 w/e 14/03/1964 16D Nottingham w/e 12/09/1964 16E w/e 12/12/1964 16F Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48614 on 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham w/e 12/09/1964 16E w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48675 on 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham w/e 12/09/1964 16E w/e 05/12/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44023 w/e 16/11/1963 16F Burton w/e 26/09/1964 16E w/e 05/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44376 w/e 08/08/1964 16F Burton w/e 26/09/1964 16E w/e 19/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44401 w/e 07/03/1964 16F Burton w/e 26/09/1964 16E w/e 19/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44591 4w/e 02/01/1954 17B Burton w/e 26/09/1964 16E w/e 28/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43918 w/e 23/05/1964 16F Burton w/e 10/10/1964 16E on 27/02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44429 w/e 08/02/1964 16F Burton w/e 10/10/1964 16E w/e 08/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44334 w/e 27/06/1964 15E Coalville w/e 19/12/1964 16E w/e 19/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44414 w/e 19/09/1964 15E Coalville w/e 19/12/1964 16E w/e 08/05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48201 4w/e 24/02/1951 18A Toton w/e 26/12/1964 16E w/e 12/11/1966 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48361 on 01/01/1948 18A Toton w/e 26/12/1964 16E w/e 27/03/1965 15A Leicester Midland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48303 w/e 06/03/1965 8A Edge Hill w/e 13/03/1965 16E w/e 30/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48678 w/e 02/05/1964 16F Burton w/e 13/03/1965 16E w/e 12/02/1966 16G Westhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48694 w/e 23/05/1959 17B Burton w/e 13/03/1965 16E w/e 12/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44043 w/e 19/12/1964 16G Westhouses w/e 13/03/1965 16E m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43982 w/e 24/10/1964 16G Westhouses w/e 03/04/1965 16E on 26/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48063 w/e 12/12/1964 15E Coalville w/e 08/05/1965 16E w/e 18/02/1967 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48105 w/e 21/11/1964 15E Coalville w/e 08/05/1965 16E w/e 04/02/1967 2B Oxley
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92032 4w/e 15/06/1957 38B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 24/07/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92072 4w/e 16/03/1957 38B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E on 30/01/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92075 w/e 12/10/1963 16B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 02/04/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92093 4w/e 16/03/1957 38B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 15/01/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92095 on 31/03/1957 38B Annesley (New) w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 28/05/1966 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 92154 w/e 15/02/1964 16B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 24/07/1965 8C Speke Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48024 w/e 08/05/1965 16B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 24/07/1965 10F Rose Grove
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48053 w/e 08/05/1965 16B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 24/07/1965 10F Rose Grove
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48166 w/e 25/05/1963 16D Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 24/07/1965 9L Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48168 w/e 22/09/1962 16D Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 24/07/1965 9H Patricroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48293 w/e 22/09/1962 16D Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 24/07/1965 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48304 w/e 22/09/1962 16D Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 12/11/1966 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48356 w/e 08/05/1965 16B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 24/07/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48363 w/e 12/12/1964 16B Annesley w/e 03/07/1965 16E w/e 24/07/1965 8L Aintree
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48270 w/e 07/03/1959 17A Derby w/e 16/10/1965 16E w/e 18/12/1965 16C Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48284 w/e 19/09/1964 16C Derby w/e 16/10/1965 16E w/e 30/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48362 w/e 16/05/1964 16C Derby w/e 16/10/1965 16E w/e 24/09/1966 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48627 w/e 02/05/1964 16C Derby w/e 16/10/1965 16E w/e 05/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48635 w/e 26/09/1964 16C Derby w/e 16/10/1965 16E w/e 25/12/1965 16F Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48045 w/e 10/04/1965 16G Westhouses w/e 23/10/1965 16E w/e 12/11/1966 8A Edge Hill
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48124 w/e 07/08/1965 16G Westhouses w/e 23/10/1965 16E w/e 12/11/1966 8A Edge Hill
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44665 w/e 12/05/1962 16D Annesley w/e 23/10/1965 16E w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44835 w/e 10/10/1964 16B Annesley w/e 23/10/1965 16E w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44847 w/e 11/07/1964 16B Annesley w/e 23/10/1965 16E w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45190 w/e 14/08/1965 16B Annesley w/e 23/10/1965 16E w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45333 w/e 24/10/1964 16B Annesley w/e 23/10/1965 16E w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45406 w/e 10/10/1964 16B Annesley w/e 23/10/1965 16E w/e 18/12/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44848 w/e 11/07/1964 16B Annesley w/e 25/12/1965 16E w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3181 w/e 06/11/1965 16D Nottingham w/e 12/02/1966 16E w/e 12/11/1966 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12069 w/e 21/08/1965 16D Nottingham w/e 12/02/1966 16E w/e 10/12/1966 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3696 w/e 04/08/1962 16A Nottingham w/e 19/03/1966 16E w/e 14/10/1967 16F Burton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48492 w/e 26/06/1965 15A Leicester Midland w/e 11/06/1966 16E w/e 18/02/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48128 w/e 05/05/1962 17B Burton w/e 18/06/1966 16E w/e 10/12/1966 2E Saltley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48194 w/e 21/04/1962 17B Burton w/e 18/06/1966 16E w/e 17/09/1966 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48142 w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 16/07/1966 16E w/e 26/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48282 w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 16/07/1966 16E w/e 12/11/1966 9H Patricroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48279 w/e 25/12/1965 40E Colwick w/e 17/12/1966 16E w/e 18/02/1967 8L Aintree