Depot: Leicester (G.C.)
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Leicester (G.C.) | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | 364 | on | 17/09/1920 | LEI | m/e | 05/1923 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | 365 | on | 17/09/1920 | LEI | on | 17/05/1933 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | 259 | on | 04/03/1921 | LEI | on | 28/11/1932 | LIN | Lincoln | ||||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | 258 | on | 08/04/1921 | LEI | on | 17/05/1933 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 33 | on | 05/08/1922 | LEI | on | 19/07/1924 | ANN | Annesley | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 31 | on | 29/09/1922 | LEI | on | 10/03/1923 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 32 | on | 29/09/1922 | LEI | on | 19/07/1924 | ANN | Annesley | ||||
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 440 | on | 17/02/1922 | ANN | Annesley | on | 19/07/1924 | LEI | on | 14/11/1924 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 279 | on | 03/02/1922 | ANN | Annesley | on | 19/07/1924 | LEI | on | 06/10/1924 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 32 | on | 19/07/1924 | ANN | Annesley | on | 15/11/1924 | LEI | on | 24/02/1925 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5446 | on | 06/12/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 02/03/1925 | LEI | on | 08/06/1925 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5032 | on | 24/02/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 08/06/1925 | LEI | on | 07/10/1927 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5034 | on | 05/05/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 08/06/1925 | LEI | on | 30/11/1925 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1287 | on | 23/06/1927 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 22/07/1927 | LEI | on | 14/03/1935 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2710 | on | 19/08/1929 | ANN | Annesley | on | 23/08/1929 | LEI | on | 14/08/1943 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | 5364 | m/e | 05/1923 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 28/01/1932 | LEI | on | 27/05/1933 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2704 | on | 03/10/1930 | ANN | Annesley | on | 13/03/1932 | LEI | on | 04/04/1932 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2975 | on | 10/03/1932 | ANN | Annesley (New) | on | 04/04/1932 | LEI | on | 02/03/1941 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5774 | m/e | 11/1935 | LEI | m/e | 01/1939 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2971 | on | 28/04/1936 | CLK | Colwick | on | 05/05/1938 | LEI | on | 14/09/1940 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4830 | on | 18/05/1939 (New) | LEI | on | 16/12/1939 | NEA | Neasden | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4845 | on | 27/06/1939 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 15/08/1939 | LEI | on | 16/12/1939 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 4474 | on | 25/02/1939 | GOR | Gorton | on | 19/08/1939 | LEI | on | 02/12/1939 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | 2562 | on | 30/04/1938 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 24/08/1939 | LEI | on | 03/12/1939 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | 5196 | on | 03/03/1940 | CLK | Colwick | on | 26/05/1940 | LEI | on | 05/05/1946 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | 5195 | on | 03/03/1940 | CLK | Colwick | on | 05/04/1943 | LEI | on | 04/07/1943 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | 5195 | on | 04/07/1943 | CLK | Colwick | on | 16/01/1944 | LEI | on | 20/10/1946 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1128 | on | 14/02/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall (New) | on | 04/05/1947 | LEI | on | 13/02/1949 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1086 | on | 14/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 01/06/1947 | LEI | on | 06/02/1949 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1110 | on | 20/12/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall (New) | on | 01/06/1947 | LEI | on | 22/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1111 | on | 24/12/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall (New) | on | 01/06/1947 | LEI | on | 21/11/1948 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1130 | on | 24/02/1947 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 01/06/1947 | LEI | on | 06/02/1949 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1122 | on | 28/01/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall (New) | on | 04/06/1947 | LEI | on | 08/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1123 | on | 30/01/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall (New) | on | 04/06/1947 | LEI | on | 01/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1192 | on | 16/05/1947 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 06/06/1947 | LEI | on | 06/02/1949 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1227 | on | 21/08/1947 (New) | LEI | on | 02/11/1947 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1223 | on | 24/08/1947 (New) | LEI | on | 02/11/1947 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1225 | on | 28/08/1947 (New) | LEI | on | 02/11/1947 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1228 | on | 28/08/1947 (New) | LEI | on | 02/11/1947 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1185 | on | 09/07/1947 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 02/11/1947 | LEI | on | 11/11/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1186 | on | 16/07/1947 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 02/11/1947 | LEI | on | 15/02/1953 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1187 | on | 29/07/1947 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 02/11/1947 | LEI | on | 26/12/1954 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1188 | on | 29/07/1947 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 02/11/1947 | LEI | on | 07/12/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | 5007 | on | 01/01/1948 | LEI | w/e | 19/06/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | 5009 | on | 01/01/1948 | LEI | w/e | 14/08/1948 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 5015 | on | 01/01/1948 | LEI | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 5018 | on | 01/01/1948 | LEI | w/e | 11/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 5019 | on | 01/01/1948 | LEI | w/e | 11/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 5021 | on | 01/01/1948 | LEI | m/e | 11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 5022 | on | 01/01/1948 | LEI | w/e | 14/12/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 5023 | on | 01/01/1948 | LEI | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8491 | m/e | 12/1935 | BOS | Boston | on | 01/01/1948 | LEI | m/e | 30/11/1949 | STR | Stratford |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1298 | on | 11/03/1948 (New) | LEI | on | 03/10/1959 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1299 | on | 12/03/1948 (New) | LEI | on | 17/11/1957 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 4375 | m/e | 12/1939 | Withdrawn | w/e | 19/06/1948 (R) | LEI | |||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 4386 | m/e | 03/1939 | Withdrawn | w/e | 19/06/1948 (R) | LEI | w/e | 11/12/1948 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | |
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | 5495 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 14/08/1948 | LEI | on | 09/08/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61087 | on | 27/04/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 14/11/1948 | LEI | w/e | 20/11/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61107 | on | 13/12/1946 | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) (New) | on | 14/11/1948 | LEI | w/e | 20/11/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61141 | on | 16/06/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 14/11/1948 | LEI | w/e | 20/11/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61087 | on | 14/11/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 20/11/1948 | LEI | on | 06/02/1949 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61107 | on | 14/11/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 20/11/1948 | LEI | on | 27/02/1949 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61141 | on | 14/11/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 20/11/1948 | LEI | on | 05/02/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1282 | on | 28/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick (New) | on | 21/11/1948 | LEI | w/e | 27/11/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1282 | on | 21/11/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 27/11/1948 | LEI | on | 15/05/1949 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | 5009 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 11/12/1948 | LEI | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60048 | on | 31/10/1935 | DON | Doncaster | on | 06/02/1949 | LEI | w/e | 12/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60049 | on | 06/12/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 06/02/1949 | LEI | w/e | 12/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60054 | on | 11/10/1942 | NWE | New England | on | 06/02/1949 | LEI | w/e | 12/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60061 | on | 10/10/1942 | NWE | New England | on | 06/02/1949 | LEI | w/e | 12/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60053 | on | 26/12/1944 | NWE | New England | on | 07/02/1949 | LEI | w/e | 12/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60048 | on | 06/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 12/02/1949 | LEI | on | 15/11/1953 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60049 | on | 06/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 12/02/1949 | LEI | on | 26/06/1955 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60053 | on | 07/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 12/02/1949 | LEI | on | 22/05/1949 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60054 | on | 06/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 12/02/1949 | LEI | on | 10/06/1956 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60061 | on | 06/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 12/02/1949 | LEI | on | 04/06/1950 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60090 | on | 11/04/1944 | NWE | New England | on | 16/02/1949 | LEI | w/e | 19/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60090 | on | 16/02/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 19/02/1949 | LEI | on | 16/05/1949 | GRA | Grantham |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61088 | on | 27/04/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 13/03/1949 | LEI | w/e | 19/03/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61108 | on | 08/05/1947 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 13/03/1949 | LEI | w/e | 19/03/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61088 | on | 13/03/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 19/03/1949 | LEI | on | 03/04/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61108 | on | 13/03/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 19/03/1949 | LEI | on | 13/09/1953 | 64A | St Margarets |
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | 65482 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 02/04/1949 | LEI | w/e | 14/01/1950 | CLX | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61106 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | GOR | Gorton | on | 15/05/1949 | LEI | w/e | 21/05/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60102 | on | 11/10/1944 | GRA | Grantham | on | 16/05/1949 | LEI | w/e | 21/05/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60102 | on | 16/05/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 21/05/1949 | LEI | on | 04/07/1954 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61106 | on | 15/05/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 21/05/1949 | LEI | on | 12/10/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60052 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | DON | Doncaster | on | 22/05/1949 | LEI | w/e | 28/05/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60052 | on | 22/05/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 28/05/1949 | LEI | on | 04/07/1954 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64212 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 11/06/1949 | LEI | w/e | 05/11/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64224 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 11/06/1949 | LEI | w/e | 05/11/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 5018 | w/e | 11/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 05/11/1949 | LEI | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J2 | 0-6-0 | 5019 | w/e | 11/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 05/11/1949 | LEI | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61283 | on | 02/02/1948 | CLK | Colwick (New) | on | 06/11/1949 | LEI | w/e | 12/11/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61283 | on | 06/11/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 12/11/1949 | LEI | on | 18/12/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68981 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 03/12/1949 | LEI | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61283 | on | 18/12/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 05/02/1950 | 38C | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61283 | on | 05/02/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 38C | on | 12/03/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61088 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/03/1950 | 38C | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61092 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 12/03/1950 | 38C | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61141 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 38A | Colwick | on | 12/03/1950 | 38C | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61088 | on | 12/03/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 38C | on | 18/11/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61092 | on | 12/03/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 38C | on | 19/12/1954 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61141 | on | 12/03/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 38C | on | 11/11/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64230 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 38C | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64231 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 38C | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60103 | on | 05/12/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 04/06/1950 | 38C | on | 15/11/1953 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60104 | on | 05/02/1943 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 04/06/1950 | 38C | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60107 | on | 19/05/1946 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 04/06/1950 | 38C | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60104 | on | 04/06/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 38C | on | 04/07/1954 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60107 | on | 04/06/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 38C | on | 27/07/1952 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64230 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 38C | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64231 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 38C | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60059 | on | 24/09/1944 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 18/03/1951 | 38C | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60059 | on | 18/03/1951 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38C | on | 07/04/1957 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | 65485 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38C | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | 65485 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38C | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61078 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick | on | 27/01/1952 | 38C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61367 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 38A | Colwick | on | 27/01/1952 | 38C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61078 | on | 27/01/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 38C | on | 11/05/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61367 | on | 27/01/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 38C | on | 27/04/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61078 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 06/07/1952 | 38C | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61078 | on | 06/07/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 38C | on | 14/09/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61385 | on | 25/10/1951 | 37A | Ardsley (New) | on | 27/07/1952 | 38C | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61385 | on | 27/07/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 38C | on | 10/08/1952 | 37A | Ardsley |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60107 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 10/08/1952 | 38C | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60871 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 10/08/1952 | 38C | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60107 | on | 10/08/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 38C | on | 15/09/1957 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60871 | on | 10/08/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 38C | on | 14/09/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68839 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 38C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 68839 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 38C | w/e | 12/04/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61369 | on | 16/05/1950 | 38A | Colwick (New) | on | 12/10/1952 | 38C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61369 | on | 12/10/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38C | on | 03/10/1959 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61111 | on | 14/09/1952 | 38A | Colwick | on | 07/12/1952 | 38C | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61111 | on | 07/12/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 38C | on | 28/01/1953 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61380 | on | 22/08/1951 | 38A | Colwick (New) | on | 25/01/1953 | 38C | on | 17/03/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61106 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38A | Colwick | on | 15/02/1953 | 38C | on | 28/02/1954 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60831 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | on | 15/03/1953 | 38C | on | 17/05/1953 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60890 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 15/03/1953 | 38C | on | 26/04/1953 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60820 | on | 08/02/1953 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 17/05/1953 | 38C | on | 10/06/1956 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60863 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 17/05/1953 | 38C | on | 16/05/1957 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60044 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | on | 15/11/1953 | 38C | on | 27/03/1955 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61381 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 28/02/1954 | 38C | on | 07/11/1954 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60878 | on | 02/09/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 28/02/1954 | 38C | on | 02/11/1958 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61028 | on | 30/05/1947 | NEA | Neasden (New) | on | 04/07/1954 | 38C | on | 21/11/1954 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61163 | on | 23/06/1947 | NEA | Neasden | on | 04/07/1954 | 38C | on | 19/12/1954 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61009 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 34E | Neasden | on | 25/07/1954 | 38C | on | 05/12/1954 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64375 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 38C | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64438 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 38C | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60102 | on | 04/07/1954 | 34E | Neasden | on | 21/11/1954 | 38C | on | 01/09/1957 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60052 | on | 04/07/1954 | 34E | Neasden | on | 05/12/1954 | 38C | on | 28/08/1955 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61201 | on | 20/09/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 19/12/1954 | 38C | on | 20/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61272 | on | 20/09/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 19/12/1954 | 38C | on | 20/02/1955 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60104 | on | 04/07/1954 | 34E | Neasden | on | 26/12/1954 | 38C | on | 01/09/1957 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61381 | on | 07/11/1954 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 20/02/1955 | 38C | on | 11/05/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60111 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | NEA | Neasden | on | 27/03/1955 | 38C | on | 15/09/1957 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60106 | on | 02/05/1954 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 28/08/1955 | 38C | on | 05/09/1957 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64338 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 38A | Colwick | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 38C | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60049 | on | 26/06/1955 | 34A | Kings Cross | on | 23/10/1955 | 38C | on | 15/09/1957 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61008 | on | 23/10/1955 | 34A | Kings Cross | on | 10/06/1956 | 38C | on | 26/09/1959 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64453 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 38C | on | 07/10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 60039 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 35B | Grantham | on | 07/10/1956 | 38C | on | 07/04/1957 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61063 | on | 21/10/1956 | 38A | Colwick | on | 11/11/1956 | 38C | on | 06/03/1960 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61269 | on | 27/09/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 11/11/1956 | 38C | on | 03/10/1959 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61283 | on | 20/02/1955 | 38A | Colwick | on | 15/11/1956 | 38C | on | 09/12/1956 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61376 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 38A | Colwick | on | 10/12/1956 | 38C | on | 05/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69800 | on | 23/10/1955 | 38A | Colwick | on | 15/06/1957 | 38C | on | 26/01/1958 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60879 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 16/06/1957 | 38C | on | 06/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60831 | on | 28/06/1953 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 01/09/1957 | 38C | on | 06/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60842 | on | 11/08/1957 | 35B | Grantham | on | 15/09/1957 | 38C | on | 06/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60854 | on | 16/06/1957 | 35B | Grantham | on | 15/09/1957 | 38C | on | 11/03/1958 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60863 | on | 16/05/1957 | 35B | Grantham | on | 15/09/1957 | 38C | w/e | 28/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60911 | on | 16/06/1957 | 35B | Grantham | on | 15/09/1957 | 38C | on | 06/09/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67786 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 38C | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 32D | Yarmouth South Town |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64364 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 38C | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 40D | Tuxford |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64183 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 38C | on | 08/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64256 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 38C | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60815 | on | 09/10/1955 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 17/11/1957 | 38C | on | 08/12/1957 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61106 | on | 28/02/1954 | 38A | Colwick | on | 08/12/1957 | 38C | on | 04/11/1959 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60828 | on | 02/10/1955 | 34A | Kings Cross | on | 11/03/1958 | 15E | on | 02/11/1958 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47203 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 15E | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61085 | on | 26/06/1955 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 01/06/1958 | 15E | on | 07/11/1959 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61188 | on | 27/05/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 01/06/1958 | 15E | on | 07/09/1958 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44821 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 14B | Kentish Town | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 15E | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45186 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 15E | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 69800 | on | 08/06/1958 | 16D | Annesley | on | 15/06/1958 | 15E | on | 11/01/1959 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44664 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 15E | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44841 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 15E | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44842 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 15E | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61201 | on | 20/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick | on | 26/10/1958 | 15E | on | 29/08/1959 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45215 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 15E | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61137 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | on | 14/12/1958 | 15E | on | 18/03/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40165 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 15D | Bedford | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 15E | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40167 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 15E | on | 28/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40182 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 15E | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61028 | on | 21/11/1954 | 34E | Neasden | on | 12/02/1959 | 15E | on | 02/07/1959 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61161 | on | 16/05/1947 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 30/05/1959 | 15E | on | 25/07/1959 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61265 | on | 27/06/1954 | 39A | Gorton | on | 30/05/1959 | 15E | on | 20/07/1959 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60815 | on | 08/12/1957 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 25/07/1959 | 15E | w/e | 05/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60915 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 25/07/1959 | 15E | on | 06/09/1959 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60890 | on | 26/04/1953 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 15/08/1959 | 15E | w/e | 05/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73010 | m/e | 08/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) (New) | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 15E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73045 | m/e | 11/1953 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) (New) | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 15E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73053 | m/e | 06/1954 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) (New) | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 15E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73066 | m/e | 10/1954 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) (New) | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 15E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73069 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 15E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45223 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 15E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61136 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 34E | Neasden | on | 28/09/1959 | 15E | on | 16/11/1959 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61116 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 34E | Neasden | on | 03/10/1959 | 15E | on | 07/11/1959 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45116 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 15E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45234 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 15E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47442 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 15E | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44932 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 15E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45450 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 15E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44932 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45116 | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45223 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45234 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45450 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 15E | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40092 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 15E | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67781 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 39A | Gorton | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 15E | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67782 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 39A | Gorton | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 15E | w/e | 18/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3785 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 15E | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42437 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 15E | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42453 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 15E | on | 16/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42556 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 15E | on | 27/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44691 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 15E | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44819 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 15E | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44830 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 15E | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 16C | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44847 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 15E | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 16B | Annesley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45342 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 15E | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61116 | on | 07/11/1959 | 14D | Neasden | on | 17/09/1960 | 15E | on | 24/09/1960 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61192 | on | 27/06/1954 | 38E | Woodford Halse | on | 24/09/1960 | 15E | on | 12/03/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61063 | on | 06/03/1960 | 14D | Neasden | on | 30/09/1960 | 15E | on | 17/03/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61085 | on | 07/11/1959 | 2F | Woodford Halse | on | 06/10/1960 | 15E | on | 27/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40092 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 15E | on | 20/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61265 | on | 20/07/1959 | 9G | Gorton | on | 31/07/1961 | 15E | on | 19/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61077 | on | 18/05/1947 | NEA | Neasden | on | 13/11/1961 | 15E | on | 21/03/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61187 | on | 09/01/1960 | 14D | Neasden | on | 13/11/1961 | 15E | on | 17/03/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61206 | on | 05/07/1953 | 34E | Neasden | on | 13/11/1961 | 15E | on | 17/03/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44690 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 15E | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 16C | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44821 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 15E | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44848 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 15E | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 16B | Annesley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44984 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 15E | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 14E | Bedford |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45223 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 15E | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45262 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 15E | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45277 | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 15E | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46106 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 15E | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61381 | on | 11/05/1962 | 9G | Gorton | on | 17/05/1962 | 15E | on | 19/07/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46118 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 15E | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73066 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 15E | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73069 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 15E | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73156 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 15E | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73159 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 15E | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45238 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 15E | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45335 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 15E | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45342 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 15E | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 16B | Annesley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45416 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 14E | Bedford | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 15E | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 16B | Annesley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44667 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 15E | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44777 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 15E | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44691 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 10/08/1963 | 15E | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44984 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 15D | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 16B | Annesley |