Depot: Malton
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Malton | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 695 | m/e | 04/1908 (New) | MAL | on | 01/12/1923 | WBY | Whitby | ||||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 692 | m/e | 03/1908 | WBY | Whitby (New) | m/e | 01/1924 | MAL | on | 09/06/1924 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1136 | on | 16/05/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 14/06/1927 | MAL | on | 03/10/1933 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 1888 | H | 12/1935 | MAL | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | J23 | 0-6-0 | 2453 | H | 12/1935 | MAL | ||||||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 647 | m/e | 12/1907 | SEL | Selby (New) | on | 28/03/1938 | MAL | on | 29/05/1939 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2735 | on | 19/03/1939 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 01/07/1939 | MAL | on | 29/09/1939 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 686 | m/e | 06/1938 | WBY | Whitby | on | 10/02/1940 | MAL | on | 11/07/1942 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 688 | on | 07/06/1938 | WBY | Whitby | on | 10/02/1940 | MAL | on | 04/06/1941 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 691 | on | 23/06/1928 | WBY | Whitby | on | 10/02/1940 | MAL | on | 06/10/1941 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 2116 | on | 23/06/1939 | YK | York (North) | on | 20/05/1940 | MAL | on | 28/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 692 | on | 02/05/1937 | WBY | Whitby | on | 21/05/1940 | MAL | on | 05/03/1942 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 694 | on | 30/05/1935 | SCA | Scarborough | on | 05/08/1940 | MAL | on | 31/07/1943 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 1501 | on | 24/10/1934 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 05/09/1940 | MAL | on | 05/03/1942 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 692 | on | 05/03/1942 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 31/07/1943 | MAL | on | 12/03/1945 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7155 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | on | 14/08/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7273 | H | 12/1935 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7275 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | on | 30/10/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7276 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | w/e | 07/01/1950 | SUN | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7284 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | w/e | 14/05/1949 | SBK | Starbeck | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7330 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | on | 08/12/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7349 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | on | 28/04/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65607 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | on | 27/12/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 5615 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | w/e | 21/01/1950 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 5628 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | m/e | 06/1949 | WBY | Whitby | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65636 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | ||||||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 5642 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | on | 28/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 68147 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | m/e | 02/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 8150 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50C | Selby | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68157 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAL | m/e | 12/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65640 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 01/05/1948 | MAL | on | 09/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7286 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 21/08/1948 | MAL | w/e | 04/09/1948 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | N4 | 0-6-2T | 5631 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 29/01/1949 | MAL | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7332 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 14/05/1949 | MAL | on | 12/04/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65118 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | m/e | 06/1949 | MAL | w/e | 02/07/1949 | MAL | Malton |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65118 | m/e | 06/1949 | MAL | Malton | w/e | 02/07/1949 | MAL | on | 13/05/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65039 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWD | Tweedmouth | w/e | 03/09/1949 | MAL | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | F1 | 2-4-2T | 5600 | m/e | 08/1932 | Withdrawn | w/e | 24/12/1949 (R) | MAL | |||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 5644 | m/e | 06/1938 | Withdrawn | w/e | 21/01/1950 (R) | MAL | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65656 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50F | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65708 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50F | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65714 | on | 01/01/1948 | CUD | Cudworth | w/e | 15/10/1950 | 50F | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65656 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50F | Malton | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50F | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65708 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 50F | Malton | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50F | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65714 | w/e | 15/10/1950 | 50F | Malton | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50F | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65671 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 50F | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65671 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 50F | Malton | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 50F | on | 27/09/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63270 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | NMN | on | 14/01/1951 | 50F | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50F | Malton | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 63270 | on | 14/01/1951 | 50F | Malton | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 50F | on | 11/03/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90485 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | TDK | Tyne Dock | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 50F | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90485 | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 50F | Malton | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 50F | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65723 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 50F | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64867 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 10/06/1951 | 50F | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64867 | on | 10/06/1951 | 50F | Malton | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50F | on | 24/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65648 | on | 01/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 50F | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65648 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 50F | Malton | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50F | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68161 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 50F | w/e | 31/08/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62731 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 50E | Scarborough | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 50F | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 50FPICK | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64928 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 26/10/1952 | 50F | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64928 | on | 26/10/1952 | 50F | Malton | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 50F | on | 21/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 07/06/1953 | 50F | on | 21/10/1956 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76021 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 50F | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65685 | on | 01/01/1948 | BOR | Borough Gardens | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 50F | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64938 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 18/04/1954 | 50F | on | 14/06/1959 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64947 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 25/04/1954 | 50F | on | 15/09/1957 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67293 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 50F | on | 04/04/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67289 | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50F | on | 03/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65827 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50F | on | 03/07/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65854 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50F | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65858 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50F | w/e | 04/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65859 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 50F | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67319 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 50F | on | 03/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67240 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 50G | Whitby | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50F | on | 16/04/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67315 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 50F | on | 11/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67325 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 52C | Blaydon | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 50F | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69861 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 50G | Whitby | on | 03/06/1956 | 50F | on | 20/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67346 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 51E | Stockton | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 50F | on | 11/02/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69877 | on | 21/10/1956 | 50A | York (North) | on | 03/03/1957 | 50F | on | 15/09/1957 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69890 | on | 10/06/1956 | 50G | Whitby | on | 30/06/1957 | 50F | on | 13/01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67311 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 50F | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 52F | Blyth (North) |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67248 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 50F | on | 17/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69886 | on | 25/09/1955 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 16/02/1958 | 50F | on | 21/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67342 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 54A | Sunderland | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 50F | on | 02/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82027 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50F | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82029 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50F | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41251 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50F | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41252 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50F | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41265 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50F | on | 10/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65885 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 50F | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 65888 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 50F | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41247 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50B | Neville Hill | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 50F | on | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42477 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50F | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42639 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50F | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64850 | on | 01/11/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 09/07/1961 | 50F | on | 25/02/1962 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82028 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50E | Scarborough | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50F | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82029 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50E | Scarborough | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50F | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46408 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 50F | on | 26/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46413 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 50F | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46481 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 50F | on | 14/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46473 | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 50F | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82027 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50E | Scarborough | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 50F | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 50A | York (North) |