Depot: Market Harborough
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Market Harborough | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44388 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 2F | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58135 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 2F | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49431 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 2F | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2D | Coventry |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49444 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 2F | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49446 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 2F | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49447 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 2F | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42446 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 2F | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90237 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 2F | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90667 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 2F | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 65158 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 2F | w/e | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43977 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 15F | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland |