Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 106 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3619 Week
» 23912 Month
» 201816 Year
» 1867192 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Merthyr Tydfil


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Merthyr Tydfil Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8736       4w/e 03/11/1945 68 4w/e 21/02/1959 87F Llanelly
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5793       4w/e 31/12/1949 MTHR 4w/e 14/08/1954 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5603 4w/e 31/12/1949 CED Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 20/05/1950 88D 4w/e 31/08/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5603 4w/e 20/05/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/08/1950 88D 4w/e 31/10/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5655 4w/e 03/11/1945 18 Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 31/08/1950 88D 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5623       4w/e 30/09/1950 88D 4w/e 31/10/1950 88E Abercynon
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5635       4w/e 30/09/1950 88D 4w/e 31/10/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5603 4w/e 31/08/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/10/1950 88D 4w/e 30/11/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5635 4w/e 30/09/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/10/1950 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88B Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5659       4w/e 31/10/1950 88D 4w/e 30/11/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5661 4w/e 01/12/1945 58 Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/10/1950 88D 4w/e 30/11/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5672       4w/e 31/10/1950 88D m/e 31/07/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6627       4w/e 31/10/1950 88D 4w/e 03/10/1953 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1629 on 01/09/1950 88A Cardiff Cathays (New) 4w/e 30/11/1950 88D 4w/e 31/12/1950 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5603 4w/e 31/10/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1950 88D 4w/e 31/12/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5659 4w/e 31/10/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1950 88D 4w/e 31/01/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5661 4w/e 31/10/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1950 88D 4w/e 31/01/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4690       4w/e 31/12/1950 88D m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5603 4w/e 30/11/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/12/1950 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5659 4w/e 30/11/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/01/1951 88D 4w/e 16/07/1955 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5660       4w/e 31/01/1951 88D 4w/e 28/02/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5660 4w/e 31/01/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/02/1951 88D 4w/e 03/10/1953 88E Abercynon
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4630 4w/e 05/11/1949 CED Cardiff East Dock 3w/e 19/05/1951 88D w/e 11/03/1959 73H Dover Marine
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8471       on 31/05/1951 (New) 88D 6w/e 30/06/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5666       6w/e 30/06/1951 88D 4w/e 31/03/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8465 4w/e 31/12/1950 87B Duffryn Yard 6w/e 30/06/1951 88D 4w/e 29/02/1952 88C Barry
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8471 on 31/05/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil (New) 6w/e 30/06/1951 88D 4w/e 31/01/1952 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5672 4w/e 31/10/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil m/e 31/07/1951 88D 4w/e 31/03/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4143       4w/e 31/12/1951 88D 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4152       4w/e 31/12/1951 88D 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5661 4w/e 30/11/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/01/1952 88D m/e 07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A 0-6-2T 379       4w/e 29/02/1952 88D 4w/e 03/10/1953 88E Abercynon
Steam A 0-6-2T 393       4w/e 29/02/1952 88D 4w/e 03/10/1953 88C Barry
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5666 6w/e 30/06/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/03/1952 88D 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5672 m/e 31/07/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 31/03/1952 88D 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4616       3w/e 17/05/1952 88D 4w/e 12/06/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5617 4w/e 31/01/1952 88A Cardiff Cathays 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D 6w/e 30/06/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5655 4w/e 31/08/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D 6w/e 30/06/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5666 4w/e 31/03/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D 6w/e 30/06/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5672 4w/e 31/03/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D 4w/e 04/10/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4684       6w/e 30/06/1952 88D 2w/e 12/07/1952 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5617 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1952 88D 4w/e 30/01/1954 88E Abercynon
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5655 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1952 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5666 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil 6w/e 30/06/1952 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5672 3w/e 17/05/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 04/10/1952 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5671 4w/e 08/08/1953 88F Treherbert 4w/e 05/09/1953 88D 4w/e 30/01/1960 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4101 4w/e 01/11/1952 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 03/10/1953 88D 4w/e 08/10/1955 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4160       4w/e 03/10/1953 88D 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4161       4w/e 03/10/1953 88D 4w/e 19/04/1958 84E Tyseley
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4163       4w/e 03/10/1953 88D 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4164       4w/e 03/10/1953 88D 4w/e 17/05/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5195 4w/e 05/09/1953 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/10/1953 88D 4w/e 26/12/1953 88F Treherbert
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6433 4w/e 18/05/1946 CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/10/1953 88D 4w/e 09/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6435       4w/e 03/10/1953 88D 4w/e 21/04/1956 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6436       4w/e 03/10/1953 88D 4w/e 03/12/1955 88E Abercynon
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4162       4w/e 26/12/1953 88D 4w/e 19/04/1958 84E Tyseley
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5660 4w/e 03/10/1953 88E Abercynon 4w/e 30/01/1954 88D 4w/e 30/01/1960 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam A 0-6-2T 378 4w/e 25/11/1953 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 22/05/1954 88D 4w/e 04/12/1954 88B Cardiff East Dock
Steam A 0-6-2T 376 4w/e 25/11/1953 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 19/06/1954 88D 4w/e 01/01/1955 88C Barry
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9747 4w/e 27/02/1954 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 09/10/1954 88D 4w/e 12/01/1963 88J Aberdare
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5615       4w/e 04/12/1954 88D 4w/e 04/10/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5681       4w/e 04/12/1954 88D 4w/e 26/03/1960 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6606 8w/e 26/03/1955 85C Hereford 4w/e 13/08/1955 88D 4w/e 03/11/1956 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9451 4w/e 31/08/1951 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 13/08/1955 88D m/e 07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5650 4w/e 04/10/1952 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 05/11/1955 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6436 4w/e 03/12/1955 88E Abercynon 4w/e 31/12/1955 88D 4w/e 16/06/1962 88H Tondu
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5632       4w/e 28/01/1956 88D 4w/e 25/02/1956 88F Treherbert
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6423       4w/e 24/03/1956 88D m/e 08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6427 m/e 16/06/1956 88E Abercynon 4w/e 14/07/1956 88D m/e 08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5677 4w/e 27/02/1954 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1956 88D 4w/e 06/10/1962 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5626 4w/e 18/06/1955 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 26/01/1957 88D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5728 4w/e 01/12/1945 126 Pontypool Road 4w/e 26/01/1957 88D 4w/e 22/02/1958 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6416 4w/e 20/04/1946 CVAYN   4w/e 23/02/1957 88D 4w/e 19/04/1958 88A Radyr
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3681 4w/e 20/05/1950 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 22/02/1958 88D 4w/e 31/10/1959 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5630 4w/e 25/01/1958 88E Abercynon 4w/e 17/05/1958 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88E Abercynon
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5670       4w/e 17/05/1958 88D 4w/e 26/12/1959 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 6416 4w/e 19/04/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 09/08/1958 88D m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9631       4w/e 01/11/1958 88D w/e 08/11/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9679 4w/e 30/11/1957 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 01/11/1958 88D m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9676       4w/e 29/11/1958 88D 6w/e 12/10/1964 88A Cardiff East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9776 4w/e 07/09/1957 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 29/11/1958 88D on 17/05/1964 2B Oxley
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5636 4w/e 21/04/1956 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 24/01/1959 88D 4w/e 26/03/1960 88C Barry
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4632 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C Barry 4w/e 18/04/1959 88D m/e 01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5622 4w/e 25/01/1958 88C Barry 4w/e 18/04/1959 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5610 4w/e 16/07/1955 88F Treherbert 4w/e 30/01/1960 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5660 4w/e 30/01/1954 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/01/1960 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5671 4w/e 05/09/1953 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/01/1960 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5674 4w/e 20/04/1946 CVCH   4w/e 30/01/1960 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5681 4w/e 04/12/1954 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 26/03/1960 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5618 4w/e 03/10/1959 88A Radyr 4w/e 13/08/1960 88D 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5603 4w/e 31/12/1950 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5605 4w/e 31/12/1949 RHY Rhymney 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D 7w/e 22/06/1964 88E Abercynon
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5610 4w/e 30/01/1960 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5618 4w/e 13/08/1960 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5622 4w/e 18/04/1959 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5636 4w/e 26/03/1960 88C Barry 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5650 4w/e 05/11/1955 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5652       4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5655 6w/e 30/06/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5660 4w/e 30/01/1960 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5662       4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5666 6w/e 30/06/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5671 4w/e 30/01/1960 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5672 4w/e 04/10/1952 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D 4w/e 15/12/1962 88B Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5674 4w/e 30/01/1960 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D 4w/e 04/11/1961 88F Treherbert
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5681 4w/e 26/03/1960 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5696       4w/e 28/01/1961 88D m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6629 4w/e 04/10/1958 86H Aberbeeg 4w/e 20/05/1961 88D on 22/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8723 4w/e 01/12/1945 16 Aberbeeg 4w/e 16/06/1962 88D 4w/e 09/02/1963 88J Aberdare
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6658       4w/e 06/10/1962 88D w/e 15/11/1964 88D Rhymney
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5677 4w/e 06/10/1962 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 15/12/1962 88D w/e 08/11/1964 88D Rhymney
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5687 4w/e 12/06/1958 88F Treherbert 4w/e 15/12/1962 88D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4635       4w/e 09/03/1963 88D on 17/05/1964 2A Tyseley
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6613 4w/e 03/10/1959 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 09/03/1963 88D 4w/e 04/05/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8723 4w/e 09/02/1963 88J Aberdare 4w/e 09/03/1963 88D 4w/e 04/05/1963 88J Aberdare
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5615 4w/e 09/09/1961 88E Abercynon 4w/e 01/06/1963 88D m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5651 4w/e 15/12/1962 88B Radyr 4w/e 01/06/1963 88D m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6612       4w/e 29/06/1963 88D m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6685 6w/e 30/06/1952 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 29/06/1963 88D 6w/e 13/04/1964 88E Abercynon
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6608       4w/e 27/07/1963 88D m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6613 4w/e 04/05/1963 87F Llanelly 4w/e 27/07/1963 88D 4w/e 02/11/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6655 4w/e 28/09/1963 87F Llanelly 4w/e 02/11/1963 88D m/e 03/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9649 on 04/06/1946 TDU Tondu (New) 4w/e 02/11/1963 88D w/e 08/11/1964 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3690 4w/e 19/05/1962 88C Barry 4w/e 30/11/1963 88D w/e 08/11/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3707 4w/e 10/09/1955 88E Abercynon 4w/e 30/11/1963 88D m/e 09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5602 4w/e 27/07/1963 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 30/11/1963 88D 4w/e 20/07/1964 88B Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5621       4w/e 30/11/1963 88D m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5609 4w/e 05/11/1960 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 28/12/1963 88D m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5670 4w/e 26/12/1959 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 28/12/1963 88D m/e 10/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6686       4w/e 25/01/1964 88D m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6691       4w/e 25/01/1964 88D 2w/e 11/04/1965 87F Llanelly
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6622 4w/e 05/11/1949 ABDR Aberdare 3w/e 04/05/1964 88D m/e 12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5659 3w/e 04/05/1964 88F Treherbert 7w/e 22/06/1964 88D on 25/04/1965 2C Stourbridge Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4675 3w/e 04/05/1964 88C Barry 6w/e 12/10/1964 88D w/e 08/11/1964 87F Llanelly