Depot: Mold Junction
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Mold Junction | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4304 | on | 21/09/1930 | W5 | Northampton | on | 22/10/1930 | W37 | on | 09/05/1936 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9215 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6B | m/e | 12/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9219 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6B | on | 01/01/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9222 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6B | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2975 | w/e | 03/05/1941 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 08/11/1941 | 6B | w/e | 10/05/1958 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2979 | w/e | 12/10/1940 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 08/11/1941 | 6B | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2978 | w/e | 17/01/1942 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 02/05/1942 | 6B | w/e | 14/11/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2945 | w/e | 07/11/1942 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 26/12/1942 | 6B | w/e | 20/05/1944 | 7B | Bangor |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2965 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 26/12/1942 | 6B | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2976 | w/e | 05/04/1941 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 30/01/1943 | 6B | w/e | 28/08/1943 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2954 | w/e | 26/10/1940 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 12/06/1943 | 6B | w/e | 02/02/1946 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2953 | w/e | 21/02/1942 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/07/1943 | 6B | w/e | 28/06/1947 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2947 | w/e | 15/08/1942 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 21/08/1943 | 6B | w/e | 15/06/1946 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2945 | w/e | 08/07/1944 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 09/09/1944 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2954 | w/e | 12/06/1943 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 02/02/1946 | 6B | w/e | 28/06/1947 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5301 | m/e | 01/1937 | 3E | Monument Lane (New) | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 6B | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2976 | w/e | 13/09/1947 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 25/10/1947 | 6B | w/e | 03/08/1957 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4065 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4073 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4367 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6K | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4493 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7353 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7371 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7372 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7615 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7646 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 99C | Crewe Works | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7650 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 19/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7656 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9052 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9047 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9072 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9120 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9383 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | m/e | 05/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8950 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9077 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9105 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4B | Northampton | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9112 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9115 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9143 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9447 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 2F | Market Harborough | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9166 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9220 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9228 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9235 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 11/02/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9251 | m/e | 01/1948 | Withdrawn | on | 01/01/1948 (R) | 6B | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9261 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 3D | Aston | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9280 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 17/09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9291 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5C | Stafford | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9316 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9322 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4800 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5286 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5288 | m/e | 12/1936 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5328 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5383 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5385 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8555 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 6B | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 13D | Shoeburyness |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8744 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 6B | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8750 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 6B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8717 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 6B | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 19D | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9057 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 6B | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5132 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 6B | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9059 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 6B | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9055 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 6B | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8127 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 6B | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 19D | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 25315 | m/e | 09/1936 | Withdrawn | w/e | 24/07/1948 (R) | 6B | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45402 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 6B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49158 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 6B | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2959 | w/e | 02/05/1942 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 6B | w/e | 09/02/1957 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49284 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 6B | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48017 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 6B | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8142 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 6B | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48017 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 6B | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8142 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 6B | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48527 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 6B | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 19D | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9081 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 6B | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49118 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 6B | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48467 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 6B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48682 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 6B | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 19D | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8342 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 6B | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8444 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 6B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 18B | Westhouses |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48447 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 6B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48452 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 6B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8458 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8459 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 6B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48470 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 6B | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 19C | Canklow |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9009 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48966 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49378 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49229 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49257 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48770 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9009 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48966 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | w/e | 18/02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49229 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49257 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48770 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 6B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48094 | 3w/e | 24/12/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6B | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48246 | 3w/e | 24/12/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6B | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48446 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6B | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8477 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6B | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90718 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 6B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6B | Mold Junction | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90194 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90718 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90317 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | RED | Redhill | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 6B | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90566 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 6B | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90267 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 6B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90702 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 6B | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42982 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 02/02/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42971 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 09/02/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90423 | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90567 | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90432 | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90007 | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90235 | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90449 | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90674 | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42971 | w/e | 09/02/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42982 | w/e | 02/02/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45001 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 8C | Speke Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45130 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90423 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90147 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90178 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90187 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90212 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90242 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90606 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90147 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90157 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90178 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90187 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90212 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90242 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90606 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45095 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42965 | w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 14/02/1953 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48259 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6B | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42973 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 20/06/1953 | 6B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48510 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6B | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42940 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6B | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42941 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 8C | Speke Junction | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6B | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43904 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 23C | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 6B | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43908 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 13A | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 6B | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44164 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 6B | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42950 | w/e | 21/02/1942 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 12/09/1953 | 6B | w/e | 21/11/1953 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43836 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6B | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48106 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6B | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48247 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44117 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | Northwich | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6B | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90227 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90237 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 2F | Market Harborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90257 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90667 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 2F | Market Harborough |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44366 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48174 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 6B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45325 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48749 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6B | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45247 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44032 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6B | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90173 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6B | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44307 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5F | Uttoxeter | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6B | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45055 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45028 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45043 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45345 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 6J | Holyhead | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42964 | w/e | 14/01/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 09/06/1956 | 6B | w/e | 09/02/1957 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44971 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45002 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6B | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45142 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6B | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90532 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 2E | Northampton | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6B | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90423 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 2E | Northampton | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6B | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47608 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6B | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42976 | w/e | 25/10/1947 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 03/08/1957 | 6B | w/e | 17/08/1957 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42967 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6B | w/e | 10/08/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42976 | w/e | 03/08/1957 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 17/08/1957 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42960 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 31/08/1957 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45130 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48428 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 6B | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48633 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45403 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6B | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11126 | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 6B | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42981 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 6B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11124 | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6B | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48259 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 6B | w/e | 26/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47269 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 6B | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44917 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42944 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 6B | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48166 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6B | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48175 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6B | w/e | 19/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48697 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48749 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48753 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48771 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6B | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90532 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6B | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90227 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6B | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44935 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 6B | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 8K | Bank Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45042 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 6B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48054 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48074 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48261 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6B | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48323 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6B | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48754 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44445 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 6B | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3832 | on | 01/01/1960 (New) | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3833 | on | 01/01/1960 (New) | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45031 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45225 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45501 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45511 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45546 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45548 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47410 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 6B | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75013 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75014 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75031 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40076 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40078 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47673 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 6B | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90147 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6B | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48166 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 6B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75028 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 11B | Workington | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 6B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75033 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 11B | Workington | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 6B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75053 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75054 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48697 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6B | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45070 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45072 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6B | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45276 | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45390 | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44359 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 6B | w/e | 27/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44595 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 6B | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44842 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 6B | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42924 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6B | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42925 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6B | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48697 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 6B | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42950 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 6B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42982 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 6B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45438 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 6B | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45438 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42772 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6B | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42853 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6B | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48046 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 6B | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48667 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 6B | w/e | 19/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44842 | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 6B | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75028 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75034 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48253 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48348 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6B | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44971 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45028 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6B | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 12020 | w/e | 16/10/1954 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44986 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 6B | on | 07/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48455 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 6B | w/e | 28/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48045 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6B | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48139 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6B | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45235 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6B | w/e | 15/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45237 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6B | w/e | 25/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48500 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6B | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45027 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6B | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48655 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48090 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47350 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44661 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45197 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45289 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45348 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45369 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6B | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44450 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 6B | w/e | 08/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45353 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 6B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42950 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42951 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42960 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42964 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42968 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | w/e | 05/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42970 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42978 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48094 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 6B | w/e | 25/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48131 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 6B | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42952 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 6B | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45042 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45043 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45353 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 6B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45438 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 6B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44897 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48762 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 6B | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42964 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 6B | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48368 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 6B | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48551 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 6B | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48729 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 6B | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48269 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48632 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6B | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48723 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45395 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6B | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45272 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 6B | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45283 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 6B | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45422 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 6B | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48173 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 6B | w/e | 31/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48287 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 6B | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48411 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 6B | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45116 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45277 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 6B | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47598 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48120 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6B | w/e | 15/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48697 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6B | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44762 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6B | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44764 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6B | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44775 | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6B | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45369 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48427 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 6B | w/e | 07/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48656 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 6B | w/e | 07/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48122 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 6B | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48345 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48754 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45111 | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6B | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45298 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 6B | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45111 | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48287 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6B | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48411 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48632 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48697 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 6B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |