Depot: Monument Lane
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Monument Lane | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | 8261 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 3E | m/e | 05/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2980 | w/e | 07/03/1936 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 25/04/1936 | 3E | w/e | 20/03/1937 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2982 | w/e | 07/03/1936 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 25/04/1936 | 3E | w/e | 11/07/1936 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2973 | w/e | 16/11/1935 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 3E | w/e | 20/03/1937 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5301 | m/e | 01/1937 (New) | 3E | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 6B | Mold Junction | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2973 | w/e | 20/03/1937 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 12/06/1937 | 3E | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2980 | w/e | 20/03/1937 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 12/06/1937 | 3E | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5297 | m/e | 12/1937 (New) | 3E | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5433 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 3E | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5434 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 3E | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4057 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 2E | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4514 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | Aston | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4592 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 6878 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | on | 28/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 46922 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | m/e | 07/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2450 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2451 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2488 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2489 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 3D | Aston | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2567 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2579 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 24K | Preston | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2659 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2262 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2263 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2264 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2265 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1111 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1116 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1153 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2A | Rugby | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 21B | Bournville |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1154 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 1172 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5495 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 46920 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 3E | on | 01/05/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 46876 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 3E | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4361 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3E | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2677 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 3E | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2267 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 3E | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 46924 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 3E | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4365 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3E | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4019 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 3E | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 10D | Plodder Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5418 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 3E | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 46931 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 3E | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 28616 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 3E | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5310 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 3E | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4506 | on | 01/01/1948 | SC | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 3E | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58908 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 3E | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58927 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 3E | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 6900 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 3E | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 6900 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3E | w/e | 28/02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45069 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 3E | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41166 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 3E | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45429 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 3E | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5493 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 3E | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41115 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3E | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41122 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3E | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41151 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5C | Stafford | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3E | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41115 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 3E | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41122 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 3E | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41151 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 3E | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42674 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 3E | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 46906 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 3E | m/e | 05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58928 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 3E | on | 27/01/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43231 | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 17A | Derby | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 3E | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43231 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 3E | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42469 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3E | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44829 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3E | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45015 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3E | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45390 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3E | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42469 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3E | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44829 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3E | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45015 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3E | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45390 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3E | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46427 | on | 04/12/1948 | 3A | Bescot (New) | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46427 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 3E | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51218 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3E | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58286 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3B | Bushbury | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 3E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58286 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 3E | w/e | 08/10/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58900 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 3E | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58900 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44360 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44360 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3E | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41122 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3E | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40900 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3E | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40933 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3E | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45051 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41090 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40926 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40936 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41090 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40926 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3E | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40936 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3E | w/e | 28/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45051 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40933 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58908 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 3E | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40933 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42538 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44490 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 3E | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58932 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44512 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3E | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 46899 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 7B | Bangor | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3E | m/e | 07/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58185 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 3E | w/e | 30/12/1961 | 21B | Bescot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44942 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3E | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58932 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3E | m/e | 06/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40045 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 3E | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40018 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 3E | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40018 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 3E | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58117 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 3E | on | 24/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40129 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 3E | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41163 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 3E | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41167 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 3E | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42419 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3E | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42420 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3E | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42421 | on | 01/01/1948 | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3E | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42422 | on | 01/01/1948 | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3E | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40108 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3E | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40118 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6K | Rhyl | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 3E | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43187 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 3E | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41223 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 3E | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41224 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 3E | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41320 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 3E | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44059 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 3E | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58220 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 3E | w/e | 15/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42489 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3E | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42552 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3E | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42601 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3E | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42658 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3E | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58306 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 2D | Coventry | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 3E | w/e | 23/02/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45034 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 3E | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45308 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 3E | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42601 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 3E | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45257 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 3E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45429 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 3E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43240 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 3E | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41119 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3E | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41167 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3E | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45071 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3E | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21C | Bushbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45150 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 3E | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44807 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5D | Stoke | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44840 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 9A | Longsight | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3E | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45308 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3E | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21C | Bushbury |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47474 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3E | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47494 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3E | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47561 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3E | w/e | 20/08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40129 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3E | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42601 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 3E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44115 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5E | Alsager |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44444 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3E | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42674 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41168 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3E | w/e | 08/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42488 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 3E | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44807 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45038 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3E | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45052 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3E | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43973 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 3E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5E | Alsager |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45301 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 3E | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58271 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 3E | m/e | 06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58135 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 3E | on | 06/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44760 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 3E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44766 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 3E | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45113 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 3E | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45065 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 3E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40129 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 3E | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44686 | on | 30/04/1951 | 9A | Longsight (New) | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 21E | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44842 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 21E | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45111 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 21E | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45180 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 21E | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45134 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 21E | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45188 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 21E | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47385 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 21E | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45188 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 21E | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58123 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 21E | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 21B | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3839 | on | 02/01/1960 | 24L | Carnforth (New) | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 21E | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3840 | on | 16/01/1960 | 24L | Carnforth (New) | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 21E | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 12004 | w/e | 13/11/1954 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 21E | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 21B | Bescot |
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 12012 | w/e | 16/10/1954 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 21E | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 21B | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3841 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 21E | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12092 | on | 11/08/1951 | 3A | Bescot (New) | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 21E | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47341 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 21E | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 21D | Aston |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2387 | on | 29/03/1961 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (New) | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 21E | w/e | 07/01/1967 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40108 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 21E | w/e | 25/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5146 | on | 10/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden (New) | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 21E | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44897 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 21E | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45071 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21C | Bushbury | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 21E | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45051 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 21E | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44910 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 21E | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 21B | Bescot |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2396 | on | 23/08/1961 (New) | 21E | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 2B | Oxley | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12071 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 21E | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42069 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 21E | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 5C | Stafford |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2386 | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 21E | w/e | 07/01/1967 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42544 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 21E | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3089 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 21E | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2395 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 21C | Bushbury | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 21E | w/e | 07/01/1967 | 2A | Tyseley |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12049 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 2H | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3956 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 2H | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 2A | Tyseley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3034 | on | 28/11/1953 | 84B | Oxley (New) | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 2H | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48726 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 2H | w/e | 17/09/1966 | Withdrawn |