Depot: Newton Heath
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Newton Heath | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13280 | on | 07/02/1934 (New) | 26A | w/e | 12/05/1934 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13282 | on | 08/02/1934 (New) | 26A | w/e | 12/05/1934 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13281 | on | 12/02/1934 (New) | 26A | w/e | 12/05/1934 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13284 | on | 07/03/1934 (New) | 26A | w/e | 12/05/1934 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13283 | on | 09/03/1934 (New) | 26A | w/e | 12/05/1934 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2976 | on | 24/01/1934 | 5B | Crewe South (New) | by | 31/12/1934 | 26A | w/e | 25/05/1935 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13277 | on | 23/01/1934 | 5B | Crewe South (New) | by | 31/12/1934 | 26A | w/e | 25/05/1935 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11459 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 26A | m/e | 02/1938 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2700 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 26A | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4466 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 26A | on | 01/01/1948 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 690 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 26A | on | 01/01/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5671 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 26A | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11486 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26A | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12265 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26A | ||||||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12266 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26A | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12313 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26A | ||||||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12345 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26A | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12403 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26A | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2618 | on | 09/07/1938 | 26A | on | 10/04/1957 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2476 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 26A | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2477 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 26A | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8460 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8462 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8756 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | Northwich | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8759 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 15B | Kettering | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8760 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8761 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8762 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8763 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8765 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 12437 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 12517 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 99C | Crewe Works | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52518 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 11222 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 11234 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 27A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11425 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 27C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11379 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51438 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 04/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11424 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11472 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 23/04/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11470 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 08/10/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11436 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 12/03/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11404 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51400 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 12/11/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11510 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 26G | Belle Vue | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11488 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 24F | Fleetwood | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11496 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 99H | Horwich Works | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4311 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4543 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4544 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52578 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12120 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12124 | y/e | 1940 | 91M | To London Midland Region | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12132 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 18A | Toton | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12136 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 18A | Toton | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12138 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12156 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 07/03/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12207 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | Bury | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52229 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12239 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12266 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26A | Newton Heath | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 13/12/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12279 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12300 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12343 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12345 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26A | Newton Heath | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12355 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12358 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26B | Agecroft | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12443 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 26E | Bacup | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12466 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7586 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9510 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9511 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9512 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9520 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9533 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9554 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9556 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 08/03/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9560 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 21/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9565 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9607 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9608 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9636 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 16/08/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9637 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9639 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9642 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9650 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9651 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 29/12/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9652 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9653 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 04/08/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9654 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9655 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 14/03/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9656 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9657 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50736 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50738 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10818 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 6418 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 6419 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2700 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 26A | Newton Heath | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2701 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 9G | Gorton | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2702 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2703 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2704 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2705 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2706 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2707 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2708 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2709 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2710 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 9G | Gorton | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2711 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2713 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2714 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 29/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2750 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 9G | Gorton | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2766 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2789 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2820 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2871 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2901 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 64A | St Margarets | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 13 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 14 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 15 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 04/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 63 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 08/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 65 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 07/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2477 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 26A | Newton Heath | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2486 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 17C | Rowsley | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2491 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2492 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2549 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2551 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2619 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 26E | Bacup | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2620 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 26E | Bacup | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2621 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 27C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2622 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2623 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 22/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2624 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2625 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2626 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2630 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2278 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 24H | Hellifield | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2279 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 14D | Neasden | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2280 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2281 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2282 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 14D | Neasden | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2283 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 14D | Neasden | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2284 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 14D | Neasden | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2285 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2286 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2287 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2288 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 28/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2289 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2290 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 27C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 582 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 23A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 584 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 588 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4781 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4782 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4888 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4889 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4890 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4891 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4893 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4894 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4895 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4933 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4934 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4940 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4951 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4987 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5079 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5102 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5103 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 26F | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5105 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 27C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5202 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5203 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5222 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5224 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5232 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5233 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5234 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5635 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 17A | Derby | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5642 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 09/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5661 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5700 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5701 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 23/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5706 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | on | 28/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5710 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5711 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5712 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5717 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 23C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5719 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8437 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 26A | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8733 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8173 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 26A | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8372 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 26A | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8686 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 26A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 5219 | m/e | 12/1930 | Withdrawn | w/e | 10/04/1948 (R) | 26A | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5223 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8389 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 26A | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9529 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 26A | on | 14/01/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9546 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 26A | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9559 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 26A | m/e | 04/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11358 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 26A | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11457 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 26A | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5671 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 26A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5710 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 26A | on | 06/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 682 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 26A | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 26E | Bacup |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8425 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26A | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48769 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4311 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4543 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26A | w/e | 02/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49611 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 26A | w/e | 20/08/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49612 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 26A | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48705 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8707 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49531 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 26A | on | 07/10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49541 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 23B | Aintree | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 26A | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 23B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49574 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 26A | on | 04/08/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49625 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 26A | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49545 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 26A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25D | Mirfield |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49516 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 26A | on | 28/07/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49558 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 26A | on | 28/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90525 | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 26A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90706 | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 26A | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 24H | Hellifield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90708 | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 26A | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11338 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 26A | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11458 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 26A | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12102 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26A | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52569 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26A | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8318 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11338 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 28B | Fleetwood |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11458 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | w/e | 16/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12102 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52569 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8120 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 26A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8318 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 26A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48714 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 26A | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26G | Belle Vue |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48715 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 26A | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26G | Belle Vue |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52461 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 23B | Aintree | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10765 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 23C | Southport | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 26A | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48726 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48730 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48752 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42715 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 26A | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42878 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 26A | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 62A | Thornton Junction |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12558 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52137 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 26A | on | 26/06/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52139 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 26A | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48735 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48739 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48754 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12304 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 26A | w/e | 24/01/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10855 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 23C | Southport | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52094 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52455 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 26A | w/e | 21/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51429 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 99H | Horwich Works |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45210 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52583 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 26A | w/e | 18/08/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42550 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42635 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49536 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49580 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49583 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5104 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45220 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49536 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49580 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49583 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | on | 23/08/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5104 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45220 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42845 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 20G | Hellifield | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49673 | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 26A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49674 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 26A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61223 | on | 02/11/1947 | GOR | Gorton | on | 02/07/1950 | 26A | on | 11/08/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50859 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 26A | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61326 | on | 08/06/1948 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 11/08/1950 | 26A | on | 24/09/1950 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48722 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48727 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48761 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48720 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48751 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48755 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48768 | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48720 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48751 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48755 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48768 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 682 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 26E | Bacup | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 691 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26E | Bacup | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49660 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49661 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45336 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45211 | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 27A | Polmadie | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49660 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49661 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 682 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 691 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45211 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45225 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45336 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | w/e | 14/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48110 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 1A | Willesden | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48188 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 1A | Willesden | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26G | Belle Vue |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48706 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | Northwich | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48718 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | Northwich | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48756 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | Northwich | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44696 | on | 30/11/1950 (New) | 26A | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44697 | on | 30/11/1950 (New) | 26A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48036 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48110 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48518 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48706 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48718 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48756 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48725 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48766 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 70843 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77000 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77005 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77015 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77026 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77064 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77079 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90561 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90568 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90589 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78521 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | w/e | 18/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78542 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90715 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | w/e | 09/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49570 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | on | 20/08/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49580 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | on | 24/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45702 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | w/e | 27/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77196 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | on | 06/01/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77196 | on | 06/01/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 26A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45068 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77196 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48713 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 26A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45216 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 26A | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48713 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45216 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 26A | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50818 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90226 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26A | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90390 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50818 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26A | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44778 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90245 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50757 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24E | Blackpool Central | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90245 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26A | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50757 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40676 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26A | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45396 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 65F | Grangemouth |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40676 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90226 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90390 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90533 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26A | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90558 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26A | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90360 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | RED | Redhill | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90641 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | RED | Redhill | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90669 | on | 16/07/1947 | WD | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 26F | Patricroft | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90552 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90389 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90289 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90523 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 91X | To Scottish Region | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90530 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 91X | To Scottish Region | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90219 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90222 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90248 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | STM | St Margarets | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90265 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90291 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 64A | St Margarets | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90376 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90675 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 91X | To Scottish Region | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90523 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90530 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90552 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26G | Belle Vue |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90219 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90222 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90248 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90265 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90289 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90291 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90376 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90389 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90675 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44697 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52102 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52358 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51338 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 28B | Fleetwood | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51338 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52102 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 26A | w/e | 24/01/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52358 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 26A | w/e | 15/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90226 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 26A | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90390 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 26A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49557 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26A | on | 19/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49591 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26A | on | 06/12/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52334 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26A | w/e | 01/01/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52389 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26A | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44697 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 27A | Bank Hall | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26A | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52390 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 26A | w/e | 25/08/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52165 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26A | w/e | 06/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40680 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 682 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80049 | on | 24/10/1952 (New) | 26A | on | 08/11/1952 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80050 | on | 06/11/1952 (New) | 26A | on | 15/09/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80049 | on | 24/10/1952 | 26A | Newton Heath (New) | on | 08/11/1952 | 26A | on | 15/09/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80051 | on | 21/11/1952 (New) | 26A | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80052 | on | 05/12/1952 (New) | 26A | on | 15/09/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80053 | on | 22/12/1952 (New) | 26A | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51447 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 25D | Mirfield | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26A | w/e | 26/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52089 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | Normanton | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26A | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52159 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26D | Bury | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26A | m/e | 06/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52559 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 20C | Royston | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26A | w/e | 31/01/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44927 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52089 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 26A | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52108 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 26A | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49508 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 26A | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51496 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 99H | Horwich Works | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26A | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52360 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26A | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42708 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42871 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26A | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42878 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 62A | Thornton Junction | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52212 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 26A | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45063 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 26A | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44697 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 26A | w/e | 18/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52271 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 26A | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90576 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90283 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEA | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49666 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | on | 28/04/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49667 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | on | 16/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46410 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46411 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | w/e | 14/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52300 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 26A | w/e | 07/01/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52328 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 26A | w/e | 23/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42901 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 64A | St Margarets | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 26A | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42726 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42727 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42728 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42732 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42733 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52317 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 26A | w/e | 04/06/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45284 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 26A | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51336 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 26A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42651 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 26A | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46487 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 26A | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 9P | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44040 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 26A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44291 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 26A | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40014 | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 26A | on | 07/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40062 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 26A | w/e | 03/12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51390 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 26A | w/e | 07/07/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51381 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26A | w/e | 23/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51488 | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26A | w/e | 10/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49511 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26A | on | 16/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49515 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 23B | Aintree | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26A | on | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52108 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 26A | w/e | 24/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13089 | on | 04/12/1954 | 8C | Speke Junction (New) | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80046 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80060 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | on | 29/02/1960 | 63B | Stirling |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80061 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 65J | Fort William |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80093 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90163 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 26A | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46437 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 26A | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44022 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | w/e | 30/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43756 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 24H | Hellifield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90316 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 26F | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90122 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90126 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90140 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90552 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90142 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90197 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44119 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 19E | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 24G | Skipton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44486 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58128 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 17B | Burton | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47440 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | w/e | 19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44803 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | m/e | 06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44845 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45031 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90236 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49552 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 26A | on | 01/09/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49624 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 26A | on | 27/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45076 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 26A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45101 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 26A | w/e | 16/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45341 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 26A | w/e | 07/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45435 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 26A | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42450 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42451 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42461 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42568 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42660 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26A | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42063 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52278 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 26A | m/e | 08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52141 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52275 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 99H | Horwich Works |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52341 | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | w/e | 19/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47301 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 21C | Bromsgrove | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47303 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | Bromsgrove | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47305 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | Bromsgrove | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47425 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21C | Bromsgrove | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44893 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51307 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26A | w/e | 23/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51343 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26A | w/e | 30/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51338 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26A | w/e | 20/07/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51371 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26A | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52270 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26A | w/e | 21/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45290 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 15D | Bedford | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26A | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51481 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 26A | w/e | 26/10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52431 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 26A | w/e | 21/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45154 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 26A | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45156 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 26A | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51415 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 26A | w/e | 25/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3372 | on | 10/08/1957 (New) | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3373 | on | 15/08/1957 (New) | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3374 | on | 16/08/1957 (New) | 26A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80044 | on | 11/02/1956 | 15D | Bedford | on | 27/11/1957 | 26A | on | 14/03/1960 | 67A | Corkerhill |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51371 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26A | w/e | 25/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51497 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26A | w/e | 16/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49592 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26A | on | 16/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52140 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 26A | w/e | 16/07/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52322 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 26A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52366 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 26A | w/e | 12/04/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90584 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 26A | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 24H | Hellifield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90675 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 26A | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52161 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 99H | Horwich Works | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 26A | w/e | 01/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42618 | on | 10/04/1957 | 26C | Bolton | on | 07/06/1958 | 26A | on | 01/09/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90589 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26A | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90271 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26A | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52230 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26A | w/e | 22/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52275 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 99H | Horwich Works | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26A | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92015 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 26A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92016 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 26A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92017 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 26A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92161 | on | 31/12/1957 | 18B | Westhouses (New) | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 26A | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92162 | on | 31/12/1957 | 18B | Westhouses (New) | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 26A | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42787 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42853 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44892 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45503 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 26A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42618 | on | 07/06/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath | on | 01/09/1958 | 26A | on | 05/10/1958 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42451 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 26A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45509 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 26A | on | 12/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90289 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 26A | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51457 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 26A | on | 21/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48115 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 26A | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48148 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 26A | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48372 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 26A | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48491 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 26A | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48553 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 26A | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48716 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 26A | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48720 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 26A | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47217 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 26A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48745 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 26A | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26F | Patricroft |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3588 | on | 28/11/1958 (New) | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3589 | on | 02/12/1958 (New) | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3590 | on | 10/12/1958 (New) | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47493 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 26A | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47517 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 11A | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 26A | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 11A | Barrow in Furness |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3591 | on | 17/12/1958 (New) | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3592 | on | 03/01/1959 (New) | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90328 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 26A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26F | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44894 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 26A | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47546 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 26A | w/e | 07/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47547 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 26A | w/e | 07/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42548 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 26A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42549 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 26A | w/e | 18/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42852 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 26A | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42785 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 26A | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45614 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 26A | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42568 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 91X | To Scottish Region | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 26A | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 14D | Neasden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3784 | on | 12/09/1959 (New) | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3785 | on | 19/09/1959 (New) | 26A | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3779 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 26A | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3842 | on | 27/06/1959 | 26F | Patricroft (New) | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3843 | on | 04/07/1959 | 26F | Patricroft (New) | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3844 | on | 11/07/1959 | 26F | Patricroft (New) | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3845 | on | 01/08/1959 | 26F | Patricroft (New) | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42619 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 26A | on | 30/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70045 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 26A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70048 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 26A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49544 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26A | on | 13/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49618 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26A | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42620 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26A | on | 19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42280 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26A | on | 07/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3868 | on | 05/02/1960 (New) | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70049 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 26A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90561 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 26A | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90570 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 26A | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42696 | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 66B | Motherwell | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 26A | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 65J | Fort William |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42697 | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 67D | Ardrossan | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 26A | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42698 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 26A | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45500 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 26A | on | 11/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45539 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 26A | on | 16/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45515 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 26A | w/e | 09/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47284 | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 26A | w/e | 19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42651 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 26A | on | 19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42697 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 26A | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44746 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 26A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45339 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 26A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46106 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 26A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46137 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 26A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45601 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 26A | on | 26/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45652 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45679 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 26A | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44431 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 24H | Hellifield | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 26A | w/e | 26/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47576 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 26A | w/e | 24/09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44746 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 26A | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46106 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 26A | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46137 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 26A | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44746 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 26A | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47582 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 26A | on | 08/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2858 | on | 21/12/1960 (New) | 26A | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 27A | Bank Hall | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47640 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56B | Ardsley | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 26A | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70014 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 26A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70015 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 26A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45255 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 26A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42485 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 26A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45585 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 26A | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45622 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 26A | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45636 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 26A | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45650 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 26A | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45712 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 26A | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45615 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 26A | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45628 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 26A | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84025 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 26A | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84026 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 26A | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84027 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 75A | Brighton | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 26A | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45522 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 26A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46133 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 26A | w/e | 23/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46139 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 26A | w/e | 13/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46140 | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 26A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46142 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 26A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D141 | on | 17/11/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 26A | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45602 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 26A | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | D155 | on | 16/02/1962 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 26A | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45578 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 26A | on | 30/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45623 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 26A | on | 25/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45737 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 26A | on | 30/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43952 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26A | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44221 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26A | w/e | 02/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47300 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26A | w/e | 10/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42614 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26A | on | 16/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42632 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26A | on | 15/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42640 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26A | on | 26/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92015 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 26A | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92016 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 26A | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92017 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 26A | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90328 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26A | w/e | 09/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90530 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26A | w/e | 18/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90548 | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26A | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90589 | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26A | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90248 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26A | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90390 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26A | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90399 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26A | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90568 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 26A | w/e | 18/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90183 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 26A | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90371 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 26A | w/e | 25/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90331 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 26A | w/e | 30/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48515 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 26A | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48618 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 26A | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47408 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 20/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44676 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 04/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44817 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44818 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44822 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45118 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45246 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45368 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45437 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45590 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45654 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45664 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45716 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42379 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 26A | on | 01/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45103 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 26A | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45195 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 26A | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2869 | on | 04/12/1961 | 27A | Bank Hall (New) | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2864 | on | 25/10/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam (New) | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 26A | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2865 | on | 01/11/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam (New) | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 26A | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45057 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 26A | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45073 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 26A | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45109 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 26A | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45380 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 26A | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45388 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 26A | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42686 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 14E | Bedford | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 26A | on | 16/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46523 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 26A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47230 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 26A | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92208 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | on | 06/10/1963 | 9D | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92233 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 06/10/1963 | 9D | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92249 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | on | 06/10/1963 | 9D | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2866 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42492 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9D | on | 12/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2865 | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 9D | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 50D | Goole |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2867 | on | 17/11/1961 | 27A | Bank Hall (New) | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9D | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47656 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 9D | w/e | 25/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48106 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9D | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9M | Bury |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48523 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9D | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9M | Bury |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44460 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9D | w/e | 31/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48539 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 9D | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44481 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 9D | w/e | 28/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47660 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 9D | w/e | 01/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42464 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 9D | on | 14/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42054 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 9D | on | 04/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47480 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 9D | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92010 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 9D | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90123 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90525 | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | w/e | 18/04/1964 (R) | 9D | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90398 | w/e | 04/04/1964 | 9P | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90708 | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | w/e | 18/04/1964 (R) | 9D | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90718 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46449 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 9P | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46452 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 9P | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46485 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42115 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42079 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43979 | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | on | 14/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48331 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 26/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48391 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 18/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48533 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 18/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48765 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90346 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90697 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90516 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90520 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44092 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | w/e | 05/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45568 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | on | 25/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42656 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92077 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42660 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42087 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45017 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 27C | Southport | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45083 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 27C | Southport | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 16/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45150 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45154 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45271 | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 23/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45343 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45381 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9M | Bury |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45592 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | on | 26/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45653 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 10B | Blackpool Central | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | on | 03/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45705 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 24E | Blackpool Central | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | on | 06/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92022 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 15C | Kettering | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92080 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92081 | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 12/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48318 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48321 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 22/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48372 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 17/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48397 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48612 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48708 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48758 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 23/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48775 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45104 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9M | Bury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45451 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48756 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 9D | w/e | 07/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2224 | on | 30/09/1955 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9D | on | 13/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2225 | on | 15/10/1955 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9D | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2226 | on | 30/10/1955 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9D | on | 13/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2227 | on | 20/11/1955 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9D | on | 13/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2228 | on | 27/11/1955 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9D | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48136 | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9D | w/e | 11/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48426 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9D | w/e | 11/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48464 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9D | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45564 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9D | on | 18/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48532 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9H | Patricroft | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 9D | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46472 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 9D | w/e | 16/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45252 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 9D | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 9M | Bury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45409 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 9D | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45558 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 9D | on | 15/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90520 | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 9D | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92018 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 9D | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92110 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 9D | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92114 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 9D | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92159 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 9D | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92026 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 9D | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45580 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 9D | on | 12/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2859 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9D | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92050 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9D | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92051 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9D | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92052 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9D | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92076 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9D | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44247 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9D | w/e | 04/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92056 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 9D | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48318 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9D | m/e | 10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44544 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9D | w/e | 03/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45593 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 9H | Patricroft | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 9D | on | 28/03/1965 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45600 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 9D | on | 18/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46513 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 9D | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46514 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 9D | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46406 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9D | w/e | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46412 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9D | w/e | 06/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46501 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 9M | Bury | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9D | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45604 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 24/04/1965 | 9D | on | 17/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 01 | 0-4-0 | D2954 | on | 19/02/1956 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 9D | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 6J | Holyhead |
Diesel | 01 | 0-4-0 | D2955 | on | 19/02/1956 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 9D | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 6J | Holyhead |
Diesel | 01 | 0-4-0 | D2956 | on | 30/03/1956 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 9D | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 36A | Doncaster |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3699 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 02/07/1966 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48543 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 12/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48557 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 08/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42700 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42715 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42831 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42905 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9D | on | 17/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42938 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9D | on | 25/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48744 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47681 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 07/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44696 | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 13/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44822 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 21/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44926 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 9H | Patricroft | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44949 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 9H | Patricroft | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45026 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 9H | Patricroft | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 09/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45077 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 9H | Patricroft | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 14/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45133 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45382 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45420 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42542 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 9D | on | 17/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45291 | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 9D | w/e | 23/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44861 | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 9D | m/e | 11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44938 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 9D | w/e | 14/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45206 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70017 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9D | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70021 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9D | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70034 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9D | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70044 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9D | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92031 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16G | Westhouses | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9D | w/e | 07/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92071 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9D | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48174 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9D | w/e | 29/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48602 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9D | w/e | 08/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44846 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 9D | w/e | 13/01/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42844 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 9D | on | 28/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45632 | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 9D | on | 09/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48171 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9D | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48369 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9D | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47362 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9D | w/e | 06/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42283 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9D | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42676 | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 9D | on | 25/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45654 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 9D | on | 25/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 12024 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 9D | on | 16/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3772 | on | 13/06/1959 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley (New) | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47520 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 9D | w/e | 27/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47388 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 9D | w/e | 17/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47383 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 9D | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47631 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 9D | m/e | 06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45205 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 9D | w/e | 29/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45234 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 9D | w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48691 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 26/02/1966 | 9D | w/e | 19/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70000 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 9D | on | 28/05/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48046 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 16G | Westhouses | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48536 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48010 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 9D | w/e | 20/01/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44736 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9D | w/e | 23/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44893 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9D | m/e | 11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45411 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9D | m/e | 06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3988 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9D | w/e | 02/07/1966 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12095 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48471 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 89A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9D | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48026 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9D | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48742 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 9D | w/e | 02/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47202 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 9D | w/e | 17/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46490 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46505 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48200 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46504 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 9D | w/e | 15/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46506 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46436 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48197 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 9D | w/e | 30/03/1968 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46417 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 9D | w/e | 18/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2207 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 31B | March | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 9D | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2214 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 9D | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2234 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 9D | on | 13/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92247 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 84C | Banbury | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 9D | w/e | 08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46443 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 9D | w/e | 25/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46448 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3860 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3686 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12050 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12051 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 16G | Westhouses | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12081 | w/e | 11/06/1966 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12098 | on | 23/02/1952 | 16A | Nottingham (New) | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48620 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45222 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 9D | w/e | 11/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12060 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48612 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3335 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 07/01/1967 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12033 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 07/01/1967 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48655 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 9D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48090 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 25/03/1967 | 9D | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48368 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48335 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 9D | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48345 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 9D | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48373 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 9D | w/e | 22/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44809 | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45330 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48369 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48132 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 9D | w/e | 22/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48678 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44780 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44962 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 9D | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45268 | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45310 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | Carnforth |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2858 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44884 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44910 | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45254 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 9D | m/e | 05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44735 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44851 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9D | m/e | 04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2373 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 20/04/1968 | 9D | on | 11/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2389 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 20/04/1968 | 9D | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2391 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 20/04/1968 | 9D | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48356 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48529 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48665 | w/e | 04/03/1967 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48687 | w/e | 28/01/1967 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | w/e | 25/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48746 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | w/e | 25/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45200 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10A | Carnforth |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08017 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | on | 01/08/1973 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3588 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | 2w/e | 05/04/1975 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3589 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | 2w/e | 24/07/1976 | BS | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3590 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | on | 09/03/1987 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3592 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | on | 07/12/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3686 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | on | 06/01/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3695 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | w/e | 04/08/1973 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3765 | on | 02/05/1959 | 9A | Longsight (New) | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | DY | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3767 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | w/e | 12/01/1974 | WN | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3793 | w/e | 14/04/1973 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | on | 27/04/1988 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3842 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | on | 31/08/2005 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3843 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3844 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | on | 10/06/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3845 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | w/e | 12/01/1974 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3927 | 4w/e | 27/11/1971 | 91M | To London Midland Region | w/e | 12/05/1973 | NH | w/e | 03/11/1973 | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3109 | w/e | 22/07/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | NH | on | 02/11/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3197 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | NH | on | 16/08/1981 | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3283 | 2w/e | 05/08/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 08/12/1973 | NH | m/e | 10/1976 | AN | Allerton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08068 | w/e | 27/05/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 06/04/1974 | NH | w/e | 13/04/1974 | LO | Longsight |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08703 | w/e | 28/09/1974 | LO | Longsight | w/e | 12/10/1974 | NH | w/e | 09/11/1974 | TO | Toton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08016 | w/e | 22/12/1973 | TO | Toton | w/e | 09/11/1974 | NH | on | 18/05/1980 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08605 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 9A | Longsight | 2w/e | 05/04/1975 | NH | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | DY | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08569 | 2w/e | 07/10/1972 | 9A | Longsight | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | NH |