Depot: Normanton
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Normanton | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 700 | 0-6-0 | 22863 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 20D | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 20B | Stourton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4240 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 20D | on | 01/01/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4299 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 20D | on | 01/01/1948 | 20F | Skipton | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 22927 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 20D | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 20B | Stourton | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 22951 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 20D | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 20C | Royston | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 2988 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 20D | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 20C | Royston | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4304 | on | 09/05/1936 | 5B | Crewe South | on | 17/12/1938 | 20D | on | 29/04/1944 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3903 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3913 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 20G | Hellifield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8084 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8123 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 20D | Normanton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8130 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8131 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8146 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 20C | Royston | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8159 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8160 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8164 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 18B | Westhouses |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8266 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8271 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8274 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8352 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8357 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8394 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8395 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8396 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8670 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 20C | Royston | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8702 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3301 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 20E | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3497 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | on | 03/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3514 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3639 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3656 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | on | 29/03/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3714 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | on | 18/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3742 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 20E | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | 50901 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | on | 20/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4098 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 55D | Royston | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4099 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 55D | Royston | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4153 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 20G | Hellifield | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4179 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 20B | Stourton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4216 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4217 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 15D | Bedford | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4290 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 19C | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4335 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 20B | Stourton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4336 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4337 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4338 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4562 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 20B | Stourton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4570 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 20E | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4586 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 20B | Stourton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4603 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4604 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | on | 20/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12089 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12095 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 20C | Royston | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7334 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 8C | Speke Junction | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 50D | Starbeck |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7335 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7405 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 56F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1793 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 13/10/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1844 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10621 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 20E | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8001 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 20D | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 179 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21B | Bournville | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 20D | on | 27/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 510 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 20D | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3314 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 30/05/1948 | 20D | w/e | 05/06/1948 | NMN | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48123 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20D | Normanton | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7239 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3878 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 20E | Manningham | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 20D | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 20B | Stourton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4151 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 20E | Manningham | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 20D | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 3270 | on | 19/03/1928 | HAV | Haverton Hill | on | 14/11/1948 | 20D | w/e | 20/11/1948 | NMN | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3378 | on | 07/10/1939 | SEL | Selby | on | 14/11/1948 | 20D | w/e | 20/11/1948 | NMN | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48507 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 20D | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48508 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 20D | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40498 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 11/06/1949 | 20D | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 16D | Mansfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4153 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 20G | Hellifield | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 20D | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 20B | Stourton |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40630 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16D | Mansfield | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 20D | on | 04/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3509 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 20E | Manningham | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 20D | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3509 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 20D | Normanton | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 20D | on | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40406 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 20D | m/e | 01/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43851 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 20D | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 20B | Stourton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43852 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 20D | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48202 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 20D | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40147 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 20D | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48202 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 20D | Normanton | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40147 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 20D | Normanton | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 20D | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48076 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18B | Westhouses | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 20D | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48076 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 20D | Normanton | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40075 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 20D | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40075 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 20D | on | 08/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 41661 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 20D | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 20F | Skipton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43321 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 20D | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43852 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 20D | on | 04/05/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68238 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20D | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68292 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20D | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68294 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20D | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68238 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 20D | w/e | 10/09/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68292 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 20D | w/e | 16/10/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68294 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20D | Normanton | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 20D | w/e | 10/11/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48467 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 20D | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 41661 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 20B | Stourton | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 20D | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 20B | Stourton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40147 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 20D | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 20E | Manningham |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42141 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 20D | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 20E | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43183 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 20D | on | 27/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43449 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 20D | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 14E | Bedford |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44170 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 20D | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44171 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 20D | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48313 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 20D | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40552 | w/e | 05/08/1950 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 20/02/1954 | 20D | w/e | 28/05/1955 | 20E | Manningham |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48055 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 20D | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48139 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 20D | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44458 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 20D | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47446 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 20D | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68701 | on | 01/01/1948 | BID | Bidston | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 20D | on | 05/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 41518 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18C | Hasland | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 20D | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42377 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20E | Manningham | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 20D | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44408 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 20D | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47607 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 20D | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47635 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 20D | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43321 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 20D | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 1528 | 0-4-0T | 41534 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 20D | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43114 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 20D | w/e | 25/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43116 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 20D | on | 22/05/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90334 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90337 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90357 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90362 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90607 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90610 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 25A | Wakefield | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90617 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90363 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90637 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | on | 12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90652 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 25A | Wakefield | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | on | 11/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90673 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | w/e | 16/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90722 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 55E | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3381 | on | 12/09/1957 (New) | 55E | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 55D | Royston | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73160 | m/e | 01/1957 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73161 | m/e | 02/1957 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90012 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | w/e | 24/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90021 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | on | 12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90309 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90487 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | on | 26/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43074 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55E | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 55F | Manningham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90247 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 55E | on | 12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90682 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 55E | on | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68726 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55E | on | 20/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2269 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 55E | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2270 | on | 04/03/1958 | 55B | Stourton (New) | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 55E | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3380 | on | 06/09/1957 | 55D | Royston (New) | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 55E | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73167 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 50E | Scarborough | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 55E | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68275 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 55E | on | 08/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90661 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 55E | w/e | 23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90664 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90318 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90249 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 55E | w/e | 23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90254 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 55E | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 55D | Royston |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2162 | on | 21/09/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 55E | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 52E | Percy Main |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2323 | on | 05/04/1961 (New) | 55E | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | 56A | Knottingley | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2324 | on | 26/04/1961 (New) | 55E | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | 56A | Knottingley | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40082 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 55E | on | 27/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42702 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 55F | Manningham | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 55E | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 67C | Ayr |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42762 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20E | Manningham | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 55E | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42770 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 20E | Manningham | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 55E | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40181 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 55E | on | 30/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42149 | on | 07/05/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge (New) | on | 25/02/1962 | 55E | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42083 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 55E | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42795 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 55C | Farnley Junction | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 55E | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42865 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 55E | on | 23/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44457 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 56A | Wakefield | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 55E | w/e | 23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90377 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 55E | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90395 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44170 | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 55E | on | 14/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44400 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20E | Manningham | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 55E | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90650 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 55E | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90699 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2262 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 55E | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90345 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90254 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 56A | Wakefield |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2249 | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 52E | Percy Main | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 55E | 4w/e | 01/01/1966 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90243 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 55D | Royston | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 55E | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43043 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 55E | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43098 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55E | m/e | 06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43099 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55E | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 55F | Manningham |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43125 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53E | Goole | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55E | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 55F | Manningham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90465 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 56B | Ardsley | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 55E | on | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90644 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 56B | Ardsley | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 55E | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90481 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 56B | Ardsley | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 55E | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43141 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 56B | Ardsley | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 55E | m/e | 11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3876 | on | 01/04/1960 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 55E | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43129 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 55E | m/e | 07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63344 | on | 07/06/1964 | 55H | Neville Hill | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | on | 02/10/1966 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63387 | on | 03/10/1965 | 55H | Neville Hill | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | on | 02/10/1966 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63420 | on | 02/12/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | on | 02/10/1966 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63426 | on | 02/12/1962 | 55H | Neville Hill | on | 12/06/1966 | 55E | on | 02/10/1966 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90054 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55E | on | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90337 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55E | on | 09/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90503 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55E | on | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90721 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90318 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90332 | on | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 (R) | 55E | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90362 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90605 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90615 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | on | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90642 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90650 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 55D | Royston | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43140 | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 55B | Stourton | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55E | m/e | 06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12113 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42138 | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 55F | Manningham | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42085 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55F | Manningham | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 55E | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42093 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 55F | Manningham | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 55E | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90430 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90076 | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90351 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | on | 22/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90360 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90236 | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90611 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | on | 17/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90405 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | on | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43084 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43125 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42574 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42252 | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 56F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42189 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42073 | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 56F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44824 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44854 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44857 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44990 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 56A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | m/e | 10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45075 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 55E | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | Withdrawn |