Depot: Northallerton
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Northallerton | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2258 | on | 14/05/1941 | DAR | Darlington | on | 14/09/1942 | NLN | on | 28/03/1943 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 690 | on | 18/05/1942 | DAR | Darlington | on | 25/01/1943 | NLN | on | 21/08/1943 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1149 | on | 07/11/1938 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 28/03/1943 | NLN | on | 19/02/1944 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 687 | on | 28/02/1942 | DAR | Darlington | on | 21/08/1943 | NLN | on | 05/03/1945 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2388 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2391 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | on | 07/06/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2397 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | w/e | 13/08/1949 | BRI | Bridlington | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7324 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 51F | West Auckland | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7344 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 7346 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5645 | H | 12/1935 | KBY | Kirkby Stephen | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65658 | m/e | 03/1943 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | m/e | 08/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65674 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | on | 10/07/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5693 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 9423 | by | 01/01/1923 | EHL | East Hartlepool | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | w/e | 24/01/1948 | SUN | Sunderland |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9101 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54A | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8159 | on | 01/01/1948 | NLN | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2326 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 28/02/1948 | NLN | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65725 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | w/e | 31/07/1948 | NLN | m/e | 10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65081 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | KBY | Kirkby Stephen | w/e | 19/02/1949 | NLN | on | 30/01/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2345 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRI | Bridlington | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NLN | w/e | 14/01/1950 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62359 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | m/e | 12/1949 | NLN | w/e | 10/12/1949 | NLN | Northallerton |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62359 | m/e | 12/1949 | NLN | Northallerton | w/e | 10/12/1949 | NLN | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65030 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 51J | on | 18/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62347 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | SKN | Stockton | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 51J | w/e | 15/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65041 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 03/09/1950 | 51J | w/e | 10/09/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65075 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/09/1950 | 51J | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65075 | w/e | 10/09/1950 | 51J | Northallerton | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 51J | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65720 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | DAR | Darlington | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 51J | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65720 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 51J | Northallerton | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51J | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 68359 | on | 01/01/1948 | WHL | West Hartlepool | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51J | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 68359 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51J | Northallerton | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 51J | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67291 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 51F | West Auckland | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 51J | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67333 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 51J | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62373 | on | 01/01/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 51J | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 2372 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | WHL | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51J | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62373 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 51J | Northallerton | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51J | w/e | 23/02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67291 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 51J | Northallerton | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51J | w/e | 16/02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67333 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 51J | Northallerton | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51J | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65726 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 51J | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65726 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 51J | Northallerton | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 51J | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67331 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 51J | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67344 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 51J | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67331 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 51J | Northallerton | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 51J | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67344 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 51J | Northallerton | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 51J | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65038 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 51J | w/e | 30/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62388 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51J | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67342 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 51F | West Auckland | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51J | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69883 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | on | 09/11/1952 | 51J | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62388 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51J | Northallerton | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 51J | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67342 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 51J | Northallerton | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 51J | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | 69883 | on | 09/11/1952 | 51J | Northallerton | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 51J | on | 01/03/1953 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67312 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 51J | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 51J | Northallerton |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67312 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 51J | Northallerton | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 51J | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62388 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 54B | Tyne Dock | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 51J | on | 26/04/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67318 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 51F | West Auckland | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 51J | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62044 | on | 13/10/1949 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 17/05/1953 | 51J | on | 03/03/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67314 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 51J | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67345 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 51A | Darlington | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 51J | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65702 | on | 01/01/1948 | MID | Middlesbrough | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 51J | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 62359 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 51J | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67272 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 51J | w/e | 08/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64817 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51C | West Hartlepool | on | 19/09/1954 | 51J | on | 06/03/1955 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64910 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 51C | West Hartlepool | on | 19/09/1954 | 51J | on | 06/03/1955 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64978 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 19/09/1954 | 51J | on | 18/11/1956 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67278 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 51J | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65064 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 51J | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78010 | m/e | 12/1953 | 51F | West Auckland (New) | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51J | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78011 | m/e | 12/1953 | 51F | West Auckland (New) | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51J | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78012 | m/e | 01/1954 | 51F | West Auckland (New) | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51J | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78013 | m/e | 01/1954 | 51F | West Auckland (New) | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51J | 3w/e | 31/01/1958 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78014 | m/e | 02/1954 | 51F | West Auckland (New) | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 51J | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78015 | m/e | 02/1954 | 51F | West Auckland (New) | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 51J | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78016 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 51J | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46471 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 51F | West Auckland | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 51J | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62059 | on | 15/09/1957 | 51A | Darlington | on | 27/03/1960 | 51J | on | 21/08/1960 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62003 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 03/04/1960 | 51J | on | 03/03/1963 | 51A | Darlington |