Depot: Northwich
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Northwich | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5908 | m/e | 11/1935 | NTH | on | 01/01/1948 | STP | Heaton Mersey | ||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 5457 | m/e | 12/1935 | NTH | on | 01/01/1948 | CHR | Chester Northgate | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5902 | m/e | 12/1935 | NTH | on | 01/01/1948 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5904 | m/e | 12/1935 | NTH | on | 01/01/1948 | STP | Heaton Mersey | ||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 6057 | m/e | 01/1936 | NTH | on | 01/01/1948 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 5837 | m/e | 01/1936 | NTH | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 2650 | on | 01/01/1948 | NTH | w/e | 10/02/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 2652 | on | 01/01/1948 | NTH | w/e | 08/05/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 2655 | on | 01/01/1948 | NTH | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 9G | Northwich | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9262 | on | 01/01/1948 | NTH | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9293 | m/e | 12/1935 | GOR | Gorton | on | 01/01/1948 | NTH | w/e | 02/09/1950 | 6D | Chester Northgate |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9335 | on | 01/01/1948 | NTH | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9349 | on | 01/01/1948 | NTH | w/e | 07/02/1948 | WRK | |||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 4367 | m/e | 06/1939 | Withdrawn | w/e | 10/01/1948 (R) | NTH | |||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 5153 | m/e | 11/1935 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | w/e | 24/01/1948 | NTH | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4453 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | NTH | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 67433 | on | 01/01/1948 | WRX | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 23/10/1948 | NTH | m/e | 30/04/1950 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 62658 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | Brunswick | w/e | 23/10/1948 | NTH | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69308 | on | 01/01/1948 | GOR | Gorton | m/e | 30/11/1949 | NTH | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44494 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 07/01/1950 | NTH | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48045 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 13D | Shoeburyness | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48046 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 13D | Shoeburyness | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48555 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 13D | Shoeburyness | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48706 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48718 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8756 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44494 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | NTH | Northwich | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48135 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 13D | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48717 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 13D | w/e | 01/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48667 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 03/06/1950 | 9G | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48667 | w/e | 03/06/1950 | 9G | Northwich | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 9G | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48613 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 9G | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48258 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 9G | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64376 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 9G | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48254 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 9G | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48011 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 1A | Willesden | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 9G | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48340 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 1A | Willesden | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 9G | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48605 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 9G | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48011 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 9G | Northwich | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 9G | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48340 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 9G | Northwich | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 9G | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 62655 | on | 01/01/1948 | NTH | Northwich | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 9G | w/e | 22/08/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 62651 | on | 01/01/1948 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 9G | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48254 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 9G | Northwich | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 9G | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 16D | Nottingham |
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 62651 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 9G | Northwich | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 9G | on | 09/03/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48296 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 9G | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64901 | on | 30/04/1941 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | on | 01/04/1951 | 9G | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64954 | on | 22/05/1950 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | on | 01/04/1951 | 9G | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64901 | on | 01/04/1951 | 9G | Northwich | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 9G | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64954 | on | 01/04/1951 | 9G | Northwich | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 9G | on | 12/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 65131 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 10F | Lower Ince | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 9G | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49435 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9G | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42061 | on | 08/12/1950 | 5D | Stoke (New) | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 9G | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49144 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 9G | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49405 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 9G | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49405 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 9G | Northwich | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 9G | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48046 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 9G | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48046 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 9G | Northwich | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 9G | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44341 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 9G | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48711 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 9G | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48680 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 9G | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48711 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 9G | Northwich | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 9G | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 62669 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 9G | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64288 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 9G | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44456 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 9G | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48736 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5B | Crewe South | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43538 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43651 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44117 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44155 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44456 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 9G | Northwich | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 10G | Skipton |
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 62659 | on | 01/01/1948 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 9G | w/e | 27/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49094 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 9G | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48155 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 9G | w/e | 17/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48521 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 9G | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 62656 | on | 01/01/1948 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 9G | w/e | 29/01/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48445 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 9G | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48426 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 2E | Northampton | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 9G | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 62653 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | Brunswick | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 9G | w/e | 08/10/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 62658 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | NTH | Northwich | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 9G | w/e | 13/08/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49304 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 9G | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42566 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 9G | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48742 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 9G | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 62665 | on | 01/01/1948 | IMM | Immingham | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 9G | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 62661 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 9G | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 62664 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 9G | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48292 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 9G | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69255 | on | 01/01/1948 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 9G | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48630 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9G | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 62662 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9G | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48506 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 9G | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48368 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 9G | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43207 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 9G | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42467 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 9G | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42575 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 9G | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48556 | w/e | 05/08/1950 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 9G | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44341 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 9G | w/e | 16/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48135 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 9G | w/e | 11/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48296 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 9G | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48693 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 9G | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48203 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 9G | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42440 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 5D | Stoke | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9G | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42449 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5D | Stoke | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9G | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42542 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 9G | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44688 | on | 31/08/1950 | 27A | Bank Hall (New) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8E | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48139 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 9G | Gorton | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 8E | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48709 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 9G | Gorton | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 8E | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48017 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 8E | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48462 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 8E | w/e | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48297 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 8E | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42393 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 11D | Tebay | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 8E | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42574 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 8E | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42576 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 8E | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42359 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8E | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42365 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8E | on | 08/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48764 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58120 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 8E | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58123 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 8E | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78038 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 8E | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78057 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 8E | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48465 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 8E | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48632 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 8E | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48166 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8E | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48250 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8E | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48683 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8E | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48039 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 8E | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48479 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 8E | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48511 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 8E | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48268 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 8E | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42362 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 8E | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42422 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 8E | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58120 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 8E | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42303 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 8E | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42340 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 8E | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9C | Macclesfield |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78055 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8E | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48631 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 8E | w/e | 24/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48248 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 8E | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48255 | 3w/e | 24/12/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 8E | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42340 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9C | Macclesfield | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 8E | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12E | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42369 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 8E | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12G | Oxenholme |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48045 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 8E | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48166 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 8E | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78019 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 8E | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40086 | on | 23/04/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 8E | w/e | 12/08/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48118 | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 8E | w/e | 11/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48740 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 8E | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48727 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 8E | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48716 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 8E | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48333 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 8E | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9M | Bury |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48615 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 8E | w/e | 05/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46472 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 8E | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46503 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 8E | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46517 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 8E | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48702 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 8E | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48640 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 8E | w/e | 13/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48639 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 8E | w/e | 03/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77011 | on | 15/09/1963 | 55B | Stourton | on | 01/11/1964 | 8E | on | 05/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77014 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 55B | Stourton | on | 01/11/1964 | 8E | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48735 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 8E | w/e | 14/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48221 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48374 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 8E | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48305 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8E | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48057 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 8E | w/e | 13/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48398 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 8E | w/e | 02/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48408 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 8E | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46487 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 8E | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46405 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8K | Bank Hall | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 8E | m/e | 12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46414 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 8K | Bank Hall | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 8E | w/e | 11/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48151 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 8E | w/e | 13/01/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48100 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 8E | w/e | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48215 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 8E | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48334 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 8E | w/e | 27/01/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48643 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 8E | w/e | 10/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46440 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 8E | w/e | 25/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48545 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 25/06/1966 | 8E | w/e | 18/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48271 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 8E | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48272 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 16G | Westhouses | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 8E | w/e | 02/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48681 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 16F | Burton | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 8E | w/e | 22/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48699 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46520 | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 8E | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48304 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8E | w/e | 02/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46503 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 8E | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46516 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 8E | m/e | 05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48685 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 8E | w/e | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48063 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 8E | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48036 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 8E | w/e | 09/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48632 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 8E | w/e | 02/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48347 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 8E | w/e | 29/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48212 | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 8E | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48421 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 8E | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48363 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 8E | w/e | 18/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48650 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 8E | w/e | 19/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48617 | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8E | w/e | 02/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48722 | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8E | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48727 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8E | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48750 | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8E | w/e | 20/01/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48085 | w/e | 03/12/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 8E | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48340 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8E | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48493 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 03/02/1968 | 8E | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 8C | Speke Junction |