Depot: Nuneaton
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Nuneaton | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9450 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 2D | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9010 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2D | on | 01/01/1948 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2956 | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2D | w/e | 13/11/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2960 | w/e | 27/02/1937 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2D | w/e | 13/11/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2966 | w/e | 13/10/1934 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2D | w/e | 04/02/1939 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2977 | w/e | 01/04/1936 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2D | w/e | 05/07/1947 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2973 | w/e | 28/01/1939 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 29/04/1939 | 2D | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2947 | w/e | 10/02/1940 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 29/03/1941 | 2D | w/e | 15/08/1942 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2981 | w/e | 05/11/1938 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 29/03/1941 | 2D | w/e | 05/03/1949 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2974 | w/e | 05/03/1938 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 10/05/1941 | 2D | w/e | 21/02/1942 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2968 | w/e | 10/05/1941 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 22/11/1941 | 2D | w/e | 21/02/1942 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2959 | w/e | 15/07/1935 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 02/05/1942 | 2D | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2964 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 02/05/1942 | 2D | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2960 | w/e | 13/11/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/06/1942 | 2D | w/e | 19/09/1942 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2958 | w/e | 26/04/1947 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 06/12/1947 | 2D | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12107 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 16A | Nottingham | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12141 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52294 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12321 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 27/02/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12322 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7285 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7286 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7367 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7594 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9345 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 4D | Abergavenny | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8896 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8911 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2F | Coventry | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9342 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9351 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9346 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9150 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9352 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9366 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9068 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 19/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9080 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 8D | Widnes | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9082 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9114 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5C | Stafford | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9400 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2A | Rugby | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9412 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 03/06/1950 | RA | |||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9428 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9429 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9430 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 2C | Northampton | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9432 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9435 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 9G | Northwich | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9436 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9437 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9439 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9181 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 2E | Warwick | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9190 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9191 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9264 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9268 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9318 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2777 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2781 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2783 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2814 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2888 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2932 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2941 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 18 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 143 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 7B | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 201 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 202 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 204 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 205 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 206 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 208 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 430 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 433 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 447 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 464 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 508 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 14/07/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 81 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2D | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8924 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2E | Warwick | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 2D | on | 11/12/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2813 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8902 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 2D | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8931 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 2D | m/e | 06/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9116 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 2D | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 109 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2E | Warwick | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2D | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 135 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2E | Warwick | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2D | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2960 | w/e | 19/09/1942 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 2D | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2974 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 2D | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9395 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 2D | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9414 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 2D | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 433 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 2D | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 528 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 2D | w/e | 13/12/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40438 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 2D | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49451 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 28543 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 2D | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 7B | Bangor |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49424 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9106 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2D | w/e | 29/04/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9162 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2D | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9211 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2D | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42933 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 2D | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9058 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2D | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8310 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 2D | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9058 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 2D | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9283 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 2D | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9296 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 2D | m/e | 05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9421 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2D | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43020 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 2D | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43021 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 2D | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49419 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 2D | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9368 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2F | Coventry | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 2D | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49400 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 2D | w/e | 15/07/1950 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9444 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 2D | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49438 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 2D | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12429 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 2D | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49209 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 2D | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48953 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 2D | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48953 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2D | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49381 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 2D | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 413 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2D | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41234 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 2D | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41235 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 2D | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41236 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 2D | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41237 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 2D | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49014 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 2D | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48345 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 2D | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48716 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 2D | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48723 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 2D | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52465 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 2D | w/e | 02/07/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49339 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2D | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | TESTS | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48435 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 2D | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48449 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 2D | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1H | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8456 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 2D | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40127 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2D | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48020 | 3w/e | 24/12/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 2D | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48061 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 2D | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 15B | Kettering |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48077 | 3w/e | 24/12/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 2D | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46446 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 2D | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 2D | Coventry | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49405 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 2D | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49397 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 2D | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49434 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 2D | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 11A | Carnforth |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42944 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 2D | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9444 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 2D | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49186 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 2B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9396 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49396 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 2B | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49293 | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 2E | Warwick | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 2B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58272 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40137 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58272 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 2B | m/e | 06/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40137 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43027 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43027 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 2B | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42817 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 2B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42852 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 2B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42854 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 2B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42891 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 2B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43023 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42817 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42852 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42854 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42891 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49212 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 2B | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49212 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 2B | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 2C | Warwick |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40109 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 2B | w/e | 24/03/1951 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43011 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49002 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49002 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 2B | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40433 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 7D | Rhyl | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 2B | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9120 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9120 | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2C | Warwick |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40676 | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 2B | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40676 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49430 | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49172 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49339 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | TESTS | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49339 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2B | w/e | 25/12/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49430 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49172 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2B | w/e | 10/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49212 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 2C | Warwick | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2B | on | 21/04/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42851 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42854 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2B | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43011 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 11D | Tebay |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40589 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 7D | Rhyl |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41239 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40413 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5C | Stafford | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52449 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 2B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40047 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40068 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40677 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40049 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40053 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40066 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40135 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40204 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 2B | on | 21/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40677 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48320 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40143 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2B | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40583 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40683 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40087 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43786 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2B | on | 26/10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49342 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 1A | Willesden | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2B | w/e | 14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49111 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2B | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49112 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2B | m/e | 31/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40087 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2B | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40109 | w/e | 24/03/1951 | 1A | Willesden | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2B | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48479 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 2A | Rugby | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 2B | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40093 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 5F | Uttoxeter | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 2B | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49142 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 2B | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42951 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 09/05/1953 | 2B | w/e | 06/06/1953 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58221 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 2B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42810 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 3D | Aston | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 2B | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48343 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 2B | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48372 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 2B | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41211 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 10D | Plodder Lane | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 2B | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41213 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 2B | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48751 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43002 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2B | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43003 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2B | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43005 | on | 27/10/1950 | 31A | Cambridge | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2B | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48154 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 2B | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40003 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 2B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40104 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 2B | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48658 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 2B | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58281 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 2B | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82020 | on | 29/09/1954 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2B | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82021 | on | 06/10/1954 | 72A | Exmouth Junction (New) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2B | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48154 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2B | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49120 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2C | Warwick | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2B | on | 05/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42964 | w/e | 19/09/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 30/10/1954 | 2B | w/e | 08/01/1955 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48679 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 2B | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49009 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 2B | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48312 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 2B | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43034 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 2B | on | 03/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43035 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 2B | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41230 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 2B | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49377 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 2B | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49314 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 2B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40073 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 2B | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52201 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 12D | Workington | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2B | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41244 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2B | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6D | Chester Northgate |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41231 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 7D | Rhyl | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 2B | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6D | Chester Northgate |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48398 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 2B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48686 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40207 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 2B | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48456 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41226 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 2E | Northampton | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 2B | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41322 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 2B | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41323 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 2B | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48258 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 2B | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40157 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 2B | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47491 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 5F | Uttoxeter | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 2B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40104 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 2B | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40122 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 2B | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 2C | Warwick |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40138 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 2B | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44157 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 2B | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40156 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 2B | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48526 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 2B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43308 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 2B | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44292 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | Tebay | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 2B | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43615 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 2B | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43618 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 2B | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49430 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 5C | Stafford | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 2B | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48623 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 2B | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49144 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2B | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47499 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 2B | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43000 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 2B | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43001 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43024 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 2B | on | 27/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44593 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2B | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49144 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2B | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49440 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 2B | w/e | 24/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43020 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 2B | on | 08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43005 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 12D | Workington | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 2B | on | 06/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43007 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 2B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40135 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2B | w/e | 24/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40157 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2B | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49415 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 2D | Coventry | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 2B | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49425 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 2D | Coventry | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 2B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49431 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2D | Coventry | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 2B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49441 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 2F | Coventry | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 2B | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49270 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 2B | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46446 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 2D | Coventry | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 2B | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46423 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 2B | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43026 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 12C | Workington | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 2B | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 11B | Workington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48251 | 3w/e | 24/12/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 2B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76020 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 2B | w/e | 06/06/1959 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43022 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 06/06/1959 | 2B | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42926 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 2B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48111 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48263 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48287 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48289 | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48291 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42811 | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42853 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42933 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42935 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42939 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48504 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 2B | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40185 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 2B | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43052 | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 2B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49079 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 2B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49134 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 2B | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43052 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 2B | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | D2911 | on | 15/12/1959 (New) | 2B | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | D2911 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 2B | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | D2912 | on | 28/12/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill (New) | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 2B | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | D2913 | on | 31/12/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill (New) | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 2B | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48754 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2B | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40077 | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 2B | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40081 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 24L | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 2B | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 24L | Carnforth | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48632 | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 2B | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40129 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 2B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48188 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 2B | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40180 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 2B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44110 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 2B | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44239 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 2B | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40010 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 2B | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40051 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 2B | on | 22/04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48054 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48074 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2B | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48166 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2B | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48264 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48753 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2B | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43009 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 2B | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 12H | Tebay | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49439 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 2B | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42772 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2B | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42924 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2B | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42925 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2B | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42944 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2B | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42811 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46420 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 2B | w/e | 16/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42810 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 2B | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45533 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 2B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45537 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 2B | w/e | 09/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45541 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 2B | w/e | 09/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45548 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 2B | w/e | 09/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45538 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 2B | w/e | 22/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42951 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42953 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 2B | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42955 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 2B | w/e | 11/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42975 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 2B | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42977 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 2B | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42978 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40087 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 2B | w/e | 24/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40207 | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 2B | w/e | 10/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3089 | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 2B | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 21E | Monument Lane |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12099 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 2B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40104 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 2B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47294 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | Loan-N.C.B. | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 2B | w/e | 07/07/1962 | Wolverton Works | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47385 | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 21E | Monument Lane | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 2B | w/e | 07/07/1962 | Wolverton Works | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47396 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 2B | w/e | 16/03/1963 | Wolverton Works | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47653 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 2B | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49373 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 2B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43977 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 2B | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45542 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 2B | w/e | 09/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43006 | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 2B | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 12F | Workington |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78034 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 2B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42945 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 2B | w/e | 11/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42960 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42965 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 2B | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42976 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 2B | on | 20/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42954 | w/e | 20/09/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42964 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46447 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 2B | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45599 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 2B | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45603 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 2B | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45624 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 2B | on | 23/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45669 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 2B | on | 01/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42773 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42786 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4111 | on | 15/12/1961 (New) | 2B | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1F | Rugby | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4112 | on | 22/12/1961 (New) | 2B | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1F | Rugby | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49277 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 2B | w/e | 17/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42854 | w/e | 21/03/1959 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43007 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43021 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43052 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43112 | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43113 | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 2B | on | 03/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43115 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2E | Northampton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42885 | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49045 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 2B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42852 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42859 | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42870 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42935 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48365 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 2B | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48736 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 2B | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42849 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42886 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42941 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42944 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 2B | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48326 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 2B | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42946 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 11/1964 | 2K | Bushbury |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42950 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42958 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42967 | w/e | 10/08/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 12/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42968 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42969 | w/e | 17/02/1940 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42970 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42971 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42973 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | on | 09/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42981 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42982 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 1963 | 5E | Alsager |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48206 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48526 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42947 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42956 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 2B | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42962 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2B | on | 15/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47478 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | Wolverton Works | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2B | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 5C | Stafford | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47479 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | Wolverton Works | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2B | w/e | 04/08/1962 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45724 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2B | w/e | 03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4144 | on | 31/08/1962 (New) | 2B | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 1F | Rugby | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75033 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 2B | on | 19/05/1963 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45723 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 2B | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45643 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 2B | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 55C | Farnley Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3053 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 21F | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2B | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 1F | Rugby |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75030 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2B | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75052 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2B | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48154 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 2B | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48074 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45599 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 2B | on | 15/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75016 | m/e | 01/1952 | 27C | Southport (New) | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 2B | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75018 | m/e | 03/1952 | 27C | Southport (New) | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75045 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 2B | w/e | 23/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75063 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 2B | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47478 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 2B | w/e | 11/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42980 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 2B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46495 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 2B | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75036 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 2B | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42950 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 5E | w/e | 12/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42951 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 5E | w/e | 11/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42964 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 5E | w/e | 11/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42970 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 5E | on | 24/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42978 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 5E | w/e | 12/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42971 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 5E | on | 19/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42954 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 02/1964 | 5E | w/e | 08/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45027 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5E | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 2J | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45056 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5E | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 1F | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48650 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 5E | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48386 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 5E | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73032 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 5E | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73073 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 5E | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45723 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 5E | on | 22/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73045 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 5E | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73159 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 5E | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47653 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 5E | w/e | 24/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46430 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 5E | w/e | 09/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46459 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 5E | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73004 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73039 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5E | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73040 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5E | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73048 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 2D | Banbury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46520 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73033 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 5E | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73038 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 5E | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73096 | on | 01/11/1964 | 2B | Oxley | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 5E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48718 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 24/04/1965 | 5E | w/e | 23/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48445 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44771 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44831 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44866 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45001 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45065 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5E | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45113 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5E | w/e | 03/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45448 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5E | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45310 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 2J | Aston | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45405 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 2J | Aston | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48534 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 5E | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48610 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 5E | w/e | 07/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48247 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 1H | Northampton | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78003 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5E | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78018 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5E | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78019 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5E | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78039 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5E | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78059 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78063 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5E | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46512 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46519 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48713 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 5E | w/e | 05/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75050 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75018 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 5E | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | Stoke |