Depot: Oswestry
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Oswestry | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2386 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | OSY | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | BCN | Brecon | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2424 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | OSY | on | 07/1946 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2522 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | OSY | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BCN | Brecon | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2559 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | OSY | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BCN | Brecon | ||||
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3264 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | OSY | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | ABH | Aberystwyth | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2468 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | OSY | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | MCH | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2514 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BCN | Brecon | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | OSY | on | 10/1940 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2556 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BCN | Brecon | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | OSY | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | BCN | Brecon |
Steam | 15 | 0-6-0 | 849 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | OSY | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | MCH | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2574 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | OSY | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BCN | Brecon | ||||
Steam | 15 | 0-6-0 | 895 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | MCH | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | OSY | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2342 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | OSY | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BCN | Brecon | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2353 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | OSY | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | MCH | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2401 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | BCN | Brecon | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | OSY | m/e | 01/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2455 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | BCN | Brecon | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | OSY | on | 10/1940 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2520 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | OSY | on | 10/1940 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2339 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | BCN | Brecon | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | OSY | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2386 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | BCN | Brecon | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | OSY | m/e | 12/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | 3252 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | OSY | m/e | 08/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 15 | 0-6-0 | 849 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | MCH | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | OSY | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 15 | 0-6-0 | 864 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | OSY | m/e | 11/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7802 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | OSY | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | MCH | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7808 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | OSY | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2449 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | OSY | m/e | 01/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4817 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | OSY | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2408 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 89A | m/e | 01/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2409 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | OSW | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 89A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89B | Brecon | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7820 | on | 30/11/1950 (New) | 89A | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 89C | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7821 | on | 30/11/1950 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | 9089 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 89A | m/e | 07/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7822 | on | 31/12/1950 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 84K | Chester West | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2407 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 89A | m/e | 01/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1635 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 89A | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1636 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 89A | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1635 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 89A | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1636 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 89A | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2090 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 89A | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2090 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 89A | Oswestry | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 89A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5700 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 89A | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5700 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 89A | m/e | 03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2068 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 89A | m/e | 01/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9008 | on | 13/02/1952 | 98S | on | 06/06/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9010 | on | 13/02/1952 | 98S | on | 06/06/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9016 | on | 14/10/1951 | 98S | on | 06/06/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9008 | on | 06/06/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 89A | on | 06/10/1952 | To Store | |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9010 | on | 06/06/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 89A | on | 25/10/1952 | To Store | |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9016 | on | 06/06/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 89A | on | 06/10/1952 | To Store | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3203 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 89A | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3203 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4546 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 89A | m/e | 01/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6383 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7820 | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 84K | Chester West |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46503 | on | 05/11/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46504 | on | 19/11/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46505 | on | 21/11/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46506 | on | 27/11/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46507 | on | 28/11/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46503 | on | 05/11/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 89A | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46504 | on | 19/11/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 89A | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46505 | on | 21/11/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 89A | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46506 | on | 27/11/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46507 | on | 28/11/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46508 | on | 02/12/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46509 | on | 05/12/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46510 | on | 09/12/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46511 | on | 12/12/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46512 | on | 16/12/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46513 | on | 19/12/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46514 | on | 23/12/1952 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5401 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | m/e | 02/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5405 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | m/e | 10/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78000 | m/e | 12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78001 | m/e | 12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78002 | m/e | 12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46508 | on | 02/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 89B | Brecon |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46509 | on | 05/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46510 | on | 09/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46511 | on | 12/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46512 | on | 16/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46513 | on | 19/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46514 | on | 23/12/1952 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 89A | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46515 | on | 06/01/1953 (New) | 89A | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46516 | on | 13/01/1953 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 89B | Brecon | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46517 | on | 22/01/1953 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 89B | Brecon | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46518 | on | 27/01/1953 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 89B | Brecon | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46519 | on | 03/02/1953 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46520 | on | 09/02/1953 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46521 | on | 19/02/1953 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 89B | Brecon | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78008 | m/e | 03/1953 (New) | 89A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46522 | on | 03/03/1953 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 89B | Brecon | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46523 | on | 05/03/1953 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 89B | Brecon | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46524 | on | 11/03/1953 (New) | 89A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 89B | Brecon | ||||
Steam | 15 | 0-6-0 | 873 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 89A | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78009 | m/e | 04/1953 (New) | 89A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2323 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 89A | m/e | 06/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 15 | 0-6-0 | 844 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 89A | m/e | 08/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2538 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 89A | m/e | 05/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5726 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 89A | m/e | 10/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 15 | 0-6-0 | 873 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 89A | m/e | 03/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 15 | 0-6-0 | 895 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 89A | m/e | 10/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2219 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 89A | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75006 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 89A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75023 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 89A | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75024 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 89A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1603 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 89A | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75005 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 89A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2516 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 89A | m/e | 05/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9010 | on | 23/10/1953 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 89A | on | 09/04/1956 | To Store | |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9026 | on | 03/05/1953 | 98S | on | 05/07/1954 | 89A | on | 09/10/1954 | To Store | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2286 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 89A | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9027 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 89A | on | 09/04/1956 | To Store | |||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7410 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 89A | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46523 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 89A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3207 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 89A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3201 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 89A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3202 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | MCH | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 89A | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2239 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2261 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2275 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2285 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 89A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 89C | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2289 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9681 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1602 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87H | Neyland | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 89A | m/e | 09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6335 | on | 01/01/1934 | 87 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 89C | Machynlleth | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75028 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 83D | Laira | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46507 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9005 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 89A | m/e | 07/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9018 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75002 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3789 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46526 | on | 25/03/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 89A | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75026 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 89A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6E | Chester West |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5400 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 89A | m/e | 04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4560 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 89A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 89C | Machynlleth | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1423 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 89A | m/e | 01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5422 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 89A | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46527 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5386 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 89A | m/e | 10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4578 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 89A | m/e | 08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4580 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 89A | m/e | 06/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3204 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3209 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4564 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4595 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 89A | m/e | 12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7800 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7801 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7807 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 89A | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7822 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 89A | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7827 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 89A | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6342 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2236 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2294 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2202 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4564 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1458 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 89A | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4588 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 83G | Penzance | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3600 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6404 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 89A | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46524 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7809 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1447 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 81B | Slough |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7810 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 89A | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1628 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7803 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | MCH | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9018 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 89A | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1636 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7794 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 89B | Brecon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3770 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 89A | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46506 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46516 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 89A | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46518 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 89A | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 89D | Oswestry |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46519 | on | 03/02/1953 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 89A | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46520 | on | 09/02/1953 | 89A | Oswestry (New) | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 89A | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46521 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 89A | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46522 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2289 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46401 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 89A | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46508 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 89B | Brecon | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41204 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4E | Tredegar | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 84H | Wellington |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2287 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | BCN | Brecon | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 89A | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1438 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 89A | on | 09/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5421 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 89A | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9629 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 89A | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1668 | on | 31/05/1955 | 83B | Taunton (New) | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 89A | m/e | 01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3214 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 89D | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 87H | Neyland | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7812 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 89D | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 89B | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7417 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | MCH | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 89D | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2251 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 89D | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7434 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 89D | on | 22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1440 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 89D | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1638 | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 89D | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7446 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 89D | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46525 | on | 07/03/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 89D | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46526 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 89D | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46527 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 89D | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1663 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 89D | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1666 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 89D | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3208 | on | 07/09/1962 | 98S | on | 17/12/1962 | 89D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80131 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89D | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80132 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89D | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80135 | on | 15/07/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89D | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80136 | on | 15/07/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 89D | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84000 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 89D | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84004 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 89D | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78029 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 89D | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46518 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 89A | Oswestry | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 89D | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80097 | on | 15/07/1962 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | on | 14/07/1963 | 89D | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 6F | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3200 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 89D | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 83G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41285 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 84D | Leamington | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 89D | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3821 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 84C | Banbury | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 6E | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3825 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 84C | Banbury | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 6E | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3850 | on | 01/12/1963 | 2D | Banbury | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 6E | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3855 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 84C | Banbury | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 6E | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48122 | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 6E | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48345 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 6E | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury |