Depot: Barnsley
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Barnsley | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 56 | m/e | 09/1903 (New) | BRN | on | 09/05/1929 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 59 | m/e | 10/1903 (New) | BRN | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 68 | m/e | 11/1903 (New) | BRN | on | 06/10/1944 | MEX | Mexborough | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 87 | m/e | 11/1903 (New) | BRN | on | 26/06/1944 | ARD | Ardsley | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 91 | m/e | 11/1903 (New) | BRN | on | 17/11/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 137 | m/e | 01/1904 (New) | BRN | on | 23/09/1944 | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 142 | m/e | 03/1904 (New) | BRN | on | 21/09/1944 | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5070 | m/e | 11/1903 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend (New) | on | 03/05/1924 | BRN | on | 08/01/1930 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend |
Steam | U1 | 2-8-8-2T | 2395 | on | 26/06/1925 | DON | Doncaster | on | 21/08/1925 | BRN | on | 17/10/1925 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5138 | on | 17/02/1922 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 02/02/1928 | BRN | on | 10/10/1929 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5149 | on | 07/12/1926 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 05/09/1929 | BRN | on | 09/12/1939 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5071 | on | 29/06/1929 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 08/01/1930 | BRN | on | 07/06/1939 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5143 | on | 03/12/1929 | DON | Doncaster | on | 27/01/1930 | BRN | on | 17/11/1939 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5062 | on | 20/06/1931 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 25/01/1932 | BRN | on | 08/05/1937 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5213 | on | 05/04/1927 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 29/03/1932 | BRN | on | 13/07/1938 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5212 | m/e | 08/1909 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) (New) | on | 30/03/1932 | BRN | on | 12/03/1938 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5056 | on | 03/06/1929 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | on | 07/04/1933 | BRN | on | 06/03/1949 | GRA | Grantham |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5058 | on | 28/02/1929 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | on | 28/04/1934 | BRN | on | 11/07/1942 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5161 | on | 04/01/1913 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | m/e | 1935 | BRN | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5910 | m/e | 12/1935 | BRN | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | Barnsley | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 6053 | on | 24/11/1936 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 11/10/1937 | BRN | on | 28/02/1939 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5048 | on | 26/06/1936 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 10/11/1937 | BRN | on | 13/04/1943 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5039 | on | 18/06/1932 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 07/01/1939 | BRN | on | 07/12/1939 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5164 | on | 18/06/1932 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 19/02/1939 | BRN | on | 04/05/1939 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6192 | on | 02/01/1931 | CLK | Colwick | on | 11/03/1939 | BRN | on | 13/08/1943 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6261 | on | 28/06/1933 | DON | Doncaster | on | 03/05/1939 | BRN | on | 29/08/1943 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5011 | on | 07/06/1937 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 21/06/1939 | BRN | on | 02/11/1941 | MAR | March |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5102 | on | 30/01/1924 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 08/12/1939 | BRN | on | 13/12/1940 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5152 | on | 28/02/1934 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 06/12/1940 | BRN | on | 26/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6364 | on | 02/08/1935 | MAR | March | on | 22/10/1941 | BRN | on | 29/08/1943 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5153 | on | 18/06/1932 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 09/08/1943 | BRN | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5092 | on | 02/02/1924 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 31/08/1943 | BRN | on | 22/09/1944 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5962 | on | 14/03/1929 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 05/09/1943 | BRN | on | 23/09/1944 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5057 | on | 01/11/1945 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/04/1946 | BRN | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5092 | on | 22/09/1944 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/04/1946 | BRN | on | 23/05/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3214 | on | 23/09/1944 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/04/1946 | BRN | on | 16/05/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3216 | on | 21/09/1944 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/04/1946 | BRN | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3235 | on | 28/10/1945 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/04/1946 | BRN | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 5962 | on | 23/09/1944 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/04/1946 | BRN | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 6136 | on | 28/10/1945 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 14/04/1946 | BRN | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4718 | on | 13/01/1940 | GOR | Gorton | on | 20/10/1946 | BRN | on | 27/04/1947 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4735 | on | 30/04/1941 | GOR | Gorton | on | 20/10/1946 | BRN | on | 27/04/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2999 | on | 18/09/1936 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 20/10/1946 | BRN | on | 27/04/1947 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4972 | on | 30/03/1941 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 20/10/1946 | BRN | on | 27/04/1947 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4974 | on | 25/05/1944 | GOR | Gorton | on | 20/10/1946 | BRN | on | 27/04/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2784 | on | 01/09/1936 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 24/10/1946 | BRN | on | 28/05/1947 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2948 | on | 23/05/1944 | GOR | Gorton | on | 24/10/1946 | BRN | on | 27/04/1947 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4732 | on | 01/01/1944 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 27/10/1946 | BRN | on | 27/04/1947 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3216 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 05/09/1947 | BRN | on | 05/09/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3203 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 05/10/1947 | BRN | on | 06/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3204 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 05/10/1947 | BRN | on | 13/02/1949 | GRA | Grantham |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3220 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 05/10/1947 | BRN | on | 14/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3227 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 05/10/1947 | BRN | m/e | 08/1950 | 37A | Ardsley |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3233 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 05/10/1947 | BRN | on | 06/02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3235 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 05/10/1947 | BRN | on | 07/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3238 | on | 27/10/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 05/10/1947 | BRN | on | 06/02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 7409 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | on | 04/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 7411 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | w/e | 02/05/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 7434 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | w/e | 03/10/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9268 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9277 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | m/e | 30/11/1949 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9278 | m/e | 01/1936 | GOR | Gorton | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | on | 19/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9285 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9291 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | on | 04/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9303 | m/e | 01/1936 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | on | 19/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9320 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | on | 06/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9325 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | on | 24/09/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9334 | m/e | 12/1935 | BRN | Barnsley | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | on | 09/07/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9345 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | on | 25/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9348 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9355 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | on | 21/04/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9357 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 36B | Mexborough | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9365 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | on | 09/02/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9367 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | on | 04/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9368 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRN | w/e | 02/05/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | 4362 | m/e | 06/1937 | Withdrawn | w/e | 20/03/1948 (R) | BRN | |||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3201 | on | 28/09/1946 | GRA | Grantham | on | 13/02/1949 | BRN | w/e | 19/02/1949 | BRN | Barnsley |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3201 | on | 13/02/1949 | BRN | Barnsley | w/e | 19/02/1949 | BRN | on | 22/01/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3229 | on | 23/02/1947 | GRA | Grantham | on | 06/03/1949 | BRN | w/e | 12/03/1949 | BRN | Barnsley |
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | 3229 | on | 06/03/1949 | BRN | Barnsley | w/e | 12/03/1949 | BRN | on | 04/12/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3904 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 21/08/1949 | BRN | w/e | 27/08/1949 | BRN | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3913 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 21/08/1949 | BRN | w/e | 27/08/1949 | BRN | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3904 | on | 21/08/1949 | BRN | Barnsley | w/e | 27/08/1949 | BRN | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3913 | on | 21/08/1949 | BRN | Barnsley | w/e | 27/08/1949 | BRN | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 20F | Skipton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63623 | on | 27/10/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 27/11/1949 | BRN | w/e | 03/12/1949 | BRN | Barnsley |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64425 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | BRN | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63623 | on | 27/11/1949 | BRN | Barnsley | w/e | 03/12/1949 | BRN | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63697 | on | 27/10/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 08/01/1950 | BRN | w/e | 14/01/1950 | BRN | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63697 | on | 08/01/1950 | BRN | Barnsley | w/e | 14/01/1950 | BRN | on | 29/11/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63727 | on | 01/11/1912 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 26/02/1950 | 36D | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63883 | on | 08/12/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 26/02/1950 | 36D | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63727 | on | 26/02/1950 | 36D | Barnsley | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 36D | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63883 | on | 26/02/1950 | 36D | Barnsley | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 36D | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63625 | on | 10/09/1950 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | on | 03/12/1950 | 36D | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63656 | on | 10/09/1950 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | on | 03/12/1950 | 36D | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63625 | on | 03/12/1950 | 36D | Barnsley | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 36D | on | 16/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63656 | on | 03/12/1950 | 36D | Barnsley | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 36D | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63763 | on | 28/02/1929 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | on | 18/03/1951 | 36D | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63907 | on | 05/08/1921 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | on | 18/03/1951 | 36D | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63763 | on | 18/03/1951 | 36D | Barnsley | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36D | on | 29/11/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63907 | on | 18/03/1951 | 36D | Barnsley | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 36D | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64417 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 38A | Colwick | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 36D | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63669 | on | 26/05/1946 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 02/03/1952 | 36D | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63824 | on | 09/06/1939 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 02/03/1952 | 36D | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63669 | on | 02/03/1952 | 36D | Barnsley | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 36D | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63824 | on | 02/03/1952 | 36D | Barnsley | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 36D | on | 22/11/1959 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63718 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 36C | Frodingham | on | 17/08/1952 | 36D | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63726 | on | 12/05/1946 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 17/08/1952 | 36D | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63731 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 17/08/1952 | 36D | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 36D | Barnsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63718 | on | 17/08/1952 | 36D | Barnsley | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 36D | on | 29/11/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63726 | on | 17/08/1952 | 36D | Barnsley | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 36D | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63731 | on | 17/08/1952 | 36D | Barnsley | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 36D | on | 29/11/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64302 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 36D | on | 30/09/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64442 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 36D | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63704 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 36B | Mexborough | on | 13/02/1955 | 36D | on | 29/11/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64349 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | DON | Doncaster | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 36D | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63659 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 13/11/1955 | 36D | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63911 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | FRO | Frodingham | on | 13/11/1955 | 36D | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69300 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 36D | on | 03/08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69297 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 40B | Immingham | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 36D | on | 08/08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69354 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 34E | Neasden | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 36D | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69315 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEA | Neasden | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 36D | on | 03/06/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64902 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | on | 25/11/1956 | 36D | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63612 | on | 12/03/1944 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 25/11/1956 | 36D | on | 29/11/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 67423 | on | 01/01/1948 | GOR | Gorton | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 36D | on | 14/10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64296 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 36D | on | 07/07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64376 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 36D | on | 09/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64404 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 36A | Doncaster | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 36D | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64828 | on | 20/03/1955 | 36A | Doncaster | on | 02/06/1957 | 36D | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | C14 | 4-4-2T | 67445 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 39A | Gorton | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 36D | on | 22/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C14 | 4-4-2T | 67448 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 39A | Gorton | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 36D | on | 18/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C14 | 4-4-2T | 67447 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 39A | Gorton | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 36D | on | 02/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63802 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | IMM | Immingham | on | 02/02/1958 | 36D | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63836 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | IMM | Immingham | on | 02/02/1958 | 36D | on | 25/10/1959 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69332 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41G | on | 11/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69342 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41G | on | 06/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69343 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41G | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69370 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41G | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64403 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 41J | Langwith Junction | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 41G | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90052 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 38A | Colwick | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 41G | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90064 | on | 29/01/1956 | 38A | Colwick | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 41G | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90519 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 38A | Colwick | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 41G | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63632 | on | 02/07/1950 | 40E | Langwith Junction | on | 29/11/1959 | 41G | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63722 | on | 01/02/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction | on | 29/11/1959 | 41G | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63622 | on | 01/02/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction | on | 29/11/1959 | 41G | on | 03/01/1960 | 41F | Mexborough |