Depot: Barnstaple Junction
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Barnstaple Junction | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4391 | on | 01/01/1934 | BPL | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | TN | Taunton | ||||
Steam | El Radials | 0-6-2T | 2094 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | PLY | Plymouth Friary | ||||
Steam | El Radials | 0-6-2T | 2095 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 72D | Plymouth Friary | ||||
Steam | El Radials | 0-6-2T | 2096 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | 2w/e | 07/07/1955 | 72D | Plymouth Friary | ||||
Steam | El Radials | 0-6-2T | 2608 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | w/e | 11/05/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | El Radials | 0-6-2T | 2610 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | m/e | 04/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | El Radials | 0-6-2T | 2696 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | w/e | 07/01/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 247 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 250 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | w/e | 31/08/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 670 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 36 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 72C | Yeovil Town | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 23 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | SAL | Salisbury | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 42 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 44 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 321 | on | 01/01/1948 | BPL | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31842 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | BPL | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30251 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 72E | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30252 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 72E | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30251 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 72E | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30252 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 72E | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30253 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 72E | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 255 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 72E | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30251 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72E | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30252 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72E | w/e | 07/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30253 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72E | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 255 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72E | w/e | 10/09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30256 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72E | w/e | 23/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31840 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 72E | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31841 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 72E | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31842 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 72E | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30245 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 72E | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30717 | 6w/e | 12/12/1949 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 30/07/1952 | 72E | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | Greyhounds | 4-4-0 | 30717 | 4w/e | 30/07/1952 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 72E | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30254 | on | 01/01/1948 | FEL | Feltham | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 72E | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31843 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 72E | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30247 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 72E | w/e | 14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31844 | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 71D | Fratton | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 72E | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31845 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 72E | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41298 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 72E | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30253 | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 72E | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31842 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 72E | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41295 | m/e | 30/06/1952 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 72E | on | 16/07/1961 | 83H | Plymouth Friary |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31842 | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 72E | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41297 | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 72E | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30671 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 72E | w/e | 11/07/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41296 | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 72E | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 71J | Highbridge |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41294 | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 74A | Ashford | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 72E | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41314 | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 72E | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30033 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72E | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30375 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 71A | Eastleigh | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72E | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41312 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 72E | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41313 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 72E | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30023 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 72E | on | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41290 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 72E | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 83E | Yeovil Town | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41310 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 83H | Plymouth Friary | on | 10/07/1961 | 72E | 4w/e | 01/04/1963 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30670 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72B | Salisbury | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 72E | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41214 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 83H | Plymouth Friary | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 72E | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 83G | Templecombe (S&D) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41216 | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 72E | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41210 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh | on | 24/03/1963 | 72E | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41213 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh | on | 24/03/1963 | 72E | 4w/e | 31/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41223 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 75A | Brighton | on | 24/03/1963 | 72E | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41224 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 71A | Eastleigh | on | 24/03/1963 | 72E | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41230 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 75A | Brighton | on | 24/03/1963 | 72E | on | 08/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41276 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 75A | Brighton | on | 24/03/1963 | 72E | 4w/e | 31/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41283 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 75A | Brighton | on | 24/03/1963 | 72E | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 83E | Yeovil Town |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4666 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 72E | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41245 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 83F | 4w/e | 31/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41208 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 83F | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41248 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 83F | w/e | 09/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41249 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 83F | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3522 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 83F | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 83A | Newton Abbot |