Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 588 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5059 Week
» 16105 Month
» 16105 Year
» 1681481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Preston


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Preston Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2962 w/e 13/10/1934 5B Crewe South w/e 09/03/1935 10B w/e 20/04/1935 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13273 w/e 09/07/1934 27A Polmadie w/e 15/06/1935 10B w/e 16/11/1935 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13272 w/e 27/04/1935 28C Carstairs w/e 06/07/1935 10B w/e 16/11/1935 3D Aston
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 13274 w/e 09/07/1934 27A Polmadie w/e 13/07/1935 10B w/e 16/11/1935 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5091       4w/e 22/06/1946 10B on 01/01/1948 10B Preston
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7291       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 04/10/1958 9A Longsight
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7293       on 01/01/1948 10B 3w/e 11/12/1948 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7296       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 05/09/1953 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7319       on 01/01/1948 10B 3w/e 11/12/1948 12E Moor Row
Steam 2P 4-4-0 356       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 23/03/1957 17A Derby
Steam 2P 2-4-2T 6762       on 01/01/1948 10B w/e 16/02/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 10639       on 01/01/1948 10B w/e 17/05/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50676       on 01/01/1948 10B m/e 03/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50793       on 01/01/1948 10B m/e 02/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 11218       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 04/11/1950 3E Monument Lane
Steam 25 0-6-0 12016       on 01/01/1948 10B on 20/10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 25 0-6-0 12034       on 01/01/1948 10B m/e 08/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 25 0-6-0 12051       on 01/01/1948 10B w/e 04/02/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 28 0-6-0 52618       on 01/01/1948 10B on 15/05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 27 0-6-0 12341       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 29/12/1956 26A Newton Heath
Steam 28 0-6-0 12619       on 01/01/1948 10B 8w/e 14/06/1952 6K Rhyl
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9348       on 01/01/1948 10B 3w/e 11/12/1948 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam G1 0-8-0 9102       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 16/07/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9119       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 28/12/1957 5C Stafford
Steam G2 0-8-0 9417       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 08/09/1951 2D Coventry
Steam G2 0-8-0 9419       on 01/01/1948 10B w/e 07/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2 0-8-0 9420       on 01/01/1948 10B w/e 07/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2 0-8-0 9421       on 01/01/1948 10B 2w/e 17/06/1950 10C Patricroft
Steam G2 0-8-0 9442       on 01/01/1948 10B 3w/e 14/01/1950 2F Coventry
Steam G2 0-8-0 9451       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 02/12/1950 8C Speke Junction
Steam G1 0-8-0 9231       on 01/01/1948 10B m/e 02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam G1 0-8-0 9250       on 01/01/1948 10B on 10/04/1948 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9299       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 16/07/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5091 4w/e 22/06/1946 10B Preston on 01/01/1948 10B w/e 19/11/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5142       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 06/10/1956 6B Mold Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5185       on 01/01/1948 10B 3w/e 11/12/1948 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5345       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 10/09/1955 6J Holyhead
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5373       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 30/01/1954 8A Edge Hill
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5502       on 01/01/1948 10B 2w/e 17/06/1950 5A Crewe North
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5505       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 17/07/1951 10B Preston
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5513       on 01/01/1948 10B 3w/e 14/01/1950 5A Crewe North
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5515       on 01/01/1948 10B w/e 02/04/1960 26A Newton Heath
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5516       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5519       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 24/02/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5524       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 24/02/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5536       on 01/01/1948 10B 3w/e 11/12/1948 9A Longsight
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5537       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5544       on 01/01/1948 10B 4w/e 04/10/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46428       on 04/12/1948 (New) 10B 4w/e 07/10/1950 10B Preston
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46429       on 04/12/1948 (New) 10B 4w/e 04/12/1954 5D Stoke
Steam 27 0-6-0 52393 on 01/01/1948 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 3w/e 11/12/1948 10B 4w/e 25/02/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49088 on 01/01/1948 2D Nuneaton 3w/e 11/12/1948 10B 4w/e 07/10/1950 8A Edge Hill
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46430       on 11/12/1948 (New) 10B 4w/e 24/03/1951 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 5522 on 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 3w/e 11/12/1948 10B 2w/e 17/06/1950 1B Camden
Steam 27 0-6-0 12105 on 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury 5w/e 16/07/1949 10B 4w/e 11/08/1951 10C Patricroft
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45333 on 01/01/1948 11A Carnforth 5w/e 16/07/1949 10B 4w/e 07/10/1950 8A Edge Hill
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40397 on 01/01/1948 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 24/12/1949 10B w/e 03/03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49104 5w/e 16/07/1949 2F Coventry 3w/e 14/01/1950 10B w/e 01/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45742 on 01/01/1948 3B Bushbury 3w/e 14/01/1950 10B 2w/e 17/06/1950 3B Bushbury
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44892 on 01/01/1948 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 2w/e 17/06/1950 10B 4w/e 16/06/1951 12B Carlisle Canal
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45599 on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 2w/e 17/06/1950 10B 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45547 on 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 09/09/1950 10B 4w/e 04/11/1950 5A Crewe North
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46428 on 04/12/1948 10B Preston (New) 4w/e 07/10/1950 10B 4w/e 24/03/1951 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50678 on 01/01/1948 23C Southport 4w/e 04/11/1950 10B w/e 26/12/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 264 0-4-0ST 56027 on 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury 4w/e 04/11/1950 10B 4w/e 26/01/1957 99C Crewe Works
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49160 2w/e 17/06/1950 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 04/11/1950 10B w/e 14/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49391 on 01/01/1948 2B Bletchley 4w/e 24/02/1951 10B w/e 17/01/1959 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49196 on 01/01/1948 3B Bushbury 4w/e 24/02/1951 10B w/e 09/09/1961 24L Carnforth
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45332 4w/e 24/02/1951 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 24/03/1951 10B w/e 11/04/1961 2E Northampton
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45519 4w/e 24/02/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 24/03/1951 10B 4w/e 09/10/1954 9A Longsight
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45524 4w/e 24/02/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 24/03/1951 10B 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45096 on 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 16/06/1951 10B w/e 18/04/1959 26F Patricroft
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40673 4w/e 02/12/1950 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 17/07/1951 10B 8w/e 29/11/1952 11B Barrow in Furness
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45593 on 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 4w/e 17/07/1951 10B 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45673 on 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 17/07/1951 10B 4w/e 04/10/1952 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45505 on 01/01/1948 10B Preston 4w/e 17/07/1951 10B 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 28 0-6-0 52598 4w/e 04/11/1950 10C Patricroft 4w/e 11/08/1951 10B 4w/e 29/12/1951 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2 0-8-0 49396 4w/e 07/10/1950 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 08/09/1951 10B w/e 07/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40524 on 01/01/1948 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951 10B m/e 07/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46430 4w/e 06/10/1951 7B Bangor 4w/e 29/12/1951 10B 4w/e 12/07/1952 6K Rhyl
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50643 4w/e 06/10/1951 10D Plodder Lane 8w/e 14/06/1952 10B 4w/e 28/11/1953 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50643       8w/e 14/06/1952 10B 4w/e 28/11/1953 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 5 2-4-2T 50644 on 01/01/1948 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 12/07/1952 10B 4w/e 21/03/1953 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 50644       4w/e 12/07/1952 10B 4w/e 21/03/1953 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45235 2w/e 17/06/1950 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 12/07/1952 10B 4w/e 04/10/1952 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45630 on 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North 4w/e 12/07/1952 10B 4w/e 04/10/1952 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45516 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 12/07/1952 10B 4w/e 04/10/1952 5A Crewe North
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45537 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 12/07/1952 10B 4w/e 04/10/1952 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45582 on 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 06/09/1952 10B w/e 09/09/1961 24L Carnforth
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40410 on 01/01/1948 16B Spital Bridge 8w/e 29/11/1952 10B m/e 02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46430 4w/e 12/07/1952 6K Rhyl 8w/e 29/11/1952 10B 4w/e 17/07/1954 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40003 4w/e 27/01/1951 9B Stockport Edgeley 8w/e 29/11/1952 10B 4w/e 21/02/1953 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40673 8w/e 29/11/1952 11B Barrow in Furness 3w/e 24/01/1953 10B 4w/e 23/03/1957 5A Crewe North
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47451 on 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 3w/e 24/01/1953 10B 4w/e 05/09/1953 5D Stoke
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47659       4w/e 21/02/1953 10B w/e 29/11/1958 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49149 on 01/01/1948 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 21/03/1953 10B 8w/e 11/07/1953 10D Plodder Lane
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45518 on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 8w/e 11/07/1953 10B w/e 06/02/1960 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45550 on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 8w/e 11/07/1953 10B w/e 20/06/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47269 4w/e 16/05/1953 5D Stoke 4w/e 08/08/1953 10B 4w/e 05/09/1953 2A Rugby
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 51218 4w/e 31/12/1950 5B Crewe South 4w/e 08/08/1953 10B 4w/e 31/10/1953 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47360 on 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 4w/e 05/09/1953 10B w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47413 on 01/01/1948 3B Bushbury 4w/e 05/09/1953 10B w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47472 8w/e 14/06/1952 5D Stoke 4w/e 05/09/1953 10B w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 47008       m/e 12/1953 (New) 10B w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40420 on 01/01/1948 2C Northampton 8w/e 19/06/1954 10B 4w/e 03/11/1956 6K Rhyl
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45505 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby 8w/e 19/06/1954 10B 4w/e 09/10/1954 9A Longsight
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45508 4w/e 06/10/1951 12A Carlisle Upperby 8w/e 19/06/1954 10B 4w/e 08/09/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78030       m/e 09/1954 (New) 10B 4w/e 21/04/1956 5A Crewe North
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46430 4w/e 17/07/1954 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 09/10/1954 10B 4w/e 04/12/1954 5D Stoke
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78036       on 13/11/1954 (New) 10B w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78037       on 13/11/1954 (New) 10B w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40694 on 01/01/1948 12D Workington 4w/e 21/05/1955 10B w/e 07/05/1960 21B Bescot
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45587 4w/e 11/08/1951 9A Longsight 4w/e 21/05/1955 10B 4w/e 08/10/1955 9A Longsight
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45520 on 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 21/05/1955 10B 4w/e 08/10/1955 9A Longsight
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49335 2w/e 17/06/1950 10C Patricroft 4w/e 21/04/1956 10B 4w/e 11/08/1956 10C Patricroft
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40671 on 01/01/1948 7A Llandudno Junction 4w/e 03/11/1956 10B 4w/e 23/03/1957 10C Patricroft
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45519 4w/e 08/09/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 03/11/1956 10B 4w/e 01/12/1956 9A Longsight
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45623 on 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 26/01/1957 10B 4w/e 23/02/1957 8A Edge Hill
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40695 8w/e 16/07/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 10/08/1957 10B 8w/e 05/10/1957 11B Barrow in Furness
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40699 on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 10/08/1957 10B 8w/e 05/10/1957 10C Patricroft
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45454 4w/e 16/06/1951 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 10/08/1957 10B w/e 11/04/1961 2E Northampton
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45538 on 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 10/08/1957 10B w/e 20/06/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40657 8w/e 16/07/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 30/11/1957 10B w/e 10/12/1960 1C Watford
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 47005 on 31/10/1953 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) 4w/e 28/12/1957 10B 4w/e 25/01/1958 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49357 on 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 25/01/1958 10B 4w/e 04/10/1958 8D Widnes
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78035 4w/e 19/05/1956 8D Widnes 4w/e 19/04/1958 24K 4w/e 17/05/1958 8D Widnes
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40677 4w/e 27/02/1954 2E Northampton 4w/e 14/06/1958 24K w/e 28/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40683 4w/e 21/02/1953 2E Northampton 4w/e 14/06/1958 24K w/e 10/12/1960 1C Watford
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3579       on 25/09/1958 (New) 24K w/e 18/10/1958 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3580       on 01/10/1958 (New) 24K w/e 25/10/1958 11B Workington
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13089 4w/e 01/12/1956 5B Crewe South 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K w/e 01/11/1958 5B Crewe South
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13172 on 07/09/1955 5B Crewe South (New) 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3368 on 11/07/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) (New) 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3369 on 26/07/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) (New) 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3371 on 07/08/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) (New) 4w/e 04/10/1958 24K w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3581       on 07/10/1958 (New) 24K w/e 25/10/1958 24K Preston
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3581 on 07/10/1958 24K Preston (New) w/e 25/10/1958 24K w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42463 4w/e 23/03/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/11/1958 24K w/e 14/02/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42616 on 01/01/1948 3D Aston w/e 08/11/1958 24K w/e 15/11/1958 3D Aston
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45340 3w/e 14/01/1950 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse w/e 08/11/1958 24K w/e 07/11/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42579 on 01/01/1948 3E Monument Lane w/e 15/11/1958 24K w/e 14/02/1959 1A Willesden
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45542 on 01/01/1948 5A Crewe North w/e 15/11/1958 24K w/e 22/07/1961 2B Nuneaton
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45543 4w/e 09/10/1954 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 15/11/1958 24K w/e 17/01/1959 9A Longsight
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3763       on 18/04/1959 (New) 24K w/e 30/05/1959 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47392 w/e 06/12/1958 9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 02/05/1959 24K w/e 20/06/1959 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44682 2w/e 17/06/1950 5A Crewe North (New) w/e 20/06/1959 24K w/e 23/04/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45248 4w/e 10/09/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 20/06/1959 24K w/e 23/04/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45451 on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 20/06/1959 24K w/e 07/11/1959 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45348 4w/e 04/10/1958 5A Crewe North w/e 15/08/1959 24K w/e 12/09/1959 5A Crewe North
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3846 on 08/08/1959 26F Patricroft (New) w/e 05/09/1959 24K w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44827 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A Longsight w/e 12/09/1959 24K w/e 23/04/1960 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45150 8w/e 05/10/1957 9A Longsight w/e 12/09/1959 24K w/e 09/09/1961 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45302 4w/e 14/06/1958 9A Longsight w/e 12/09/1959 24K w/e 23/04/1960 6H Bangor
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45735 3w/e 11/12/1948 1B Camden w/e 12/09/1959 24K w/e 17/09/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46154 w/e 13/06/1959 1B Camden w/e 12/09/1959 24K w/e 17/09/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46161 w/e 20/06/1959 1B Camden w/e 12/09/1959 24K w/e 04/03/1961 21C Bushbury
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46163 w/e 20/06/1959 1B Camden w/e 12/09/1959 24K w/e 02/04/1960 6J Holyhead
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46168 on 01/01/1948 1B Camden w/e 12/09/1959 24K w/e 09/09/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46126 4w/e 22/02/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/11/1959 24K w/e 17/09/1960 8A Edge Hill
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46136 4w/e 20/04/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/11/1959 24K w/e 17/09/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46165 4w/e 03/11/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/11/1959 24K w/e 09/09/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46167 4w/e 03/11/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 07/11/1959 24K w/e 17/09/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45502 4w/e 21/02/1953 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 21/11/1959 24K w/e 23/04/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45507 4w/e 04/10/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 21/11/1959 24K w/e 09/01/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45508 4w/e 08/09/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 21/11/1959 24K w/e 23/04/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46108 w/e 06/12/1958 9A Longsight w/e 28/11/1959 24K w/e 23/01/1960 9A Longsight
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46170 w/e 28/11/1959 5A Crewe North w/e 05/12/1959 24K w/e 23/01/1960 5A Crewe North
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42945 w/e 09/09/1944 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1960 24K w/e 09/09/1961 2B Nuneaton
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42960 w/e 31/08/1957 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1960 24K w/e 09/09/1961 2B Nuneaton
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42965 w/e 14/02/1953 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1960 24K w/e 09/09/1961 2B Nuneaton
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 42976 w/e 17/08/1957 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1960 24K w/e 09/09/1961 2B Nuneaton
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44807 4w/e 04/10/1958 3E Monument Lane w/e 18/06/1960 24K w/e 17/09/1960 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45315 8w/e 11/07/1953 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 18/06/1960 24K w/e 09/09/1961 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45351 2w/e 17/06/1950 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 18/06/1960 24K w/e 09/07/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45414 w/e 25/06/1960 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 09/07/1960 24K w/e 09/09/1961 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58177 w/e 29/08/1959 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 27/08/1960 24K w/e 10/09/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58182 w/e 15/08/1959 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 27/08/1960 24K w/e 10/09/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90212 w/e 09/01/1960 24L Carnforth w/e 27/08/1960 24K w/e 10/09/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90702 w/e 02/04/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 27/08/1960 24K w/e 10/09/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45140 4w/e 26/01/1952 12A Carlisle Upperby w/e 27/08/1960 24K w/e 10/09/1960 8C Speke Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45188 w/e 18/06/1960 21E Monument Lane w/e 27/08/1960 24K w/e 10/09/1960 21E Monument Lane
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46449 w/e 30/04/1960 12D Kirkby Stephen w/e 17/09/1960 24K w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40087 8w/e 29/11/1952 2B Nuneaton w/e 10/12/1960 24K w/e 11/02/1961 2B Nuneaton
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40106 w/e 09/04/1960 6A Chester (MR) w/e 10/12/1960 24K w/e 13/05/1961 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45024 w/e 18/06/1960 2A Rugby w/e 10/12/1960 24K w/e 09/09/1961 5B Crewe South
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 51232 w/e 14/02/1959 27A Bank Hall w/e 31/12/1960 24K w/e 07/01/1961 27A Bank Hall
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 51253 on 01/01/1948 23A Bank Hall w/e 28/01/1961 24K w/e 25/03/1961 27A Bank Hall
Steam G1 0-8-0 49135 w/e 07/11/1959 2B Nuneaton w/e 28/01/1961 24K w/e 16/09/1961 24C Lostock Hall
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45297 w/e 15/11/1958 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 25/03/1961 24K w/e 09/09/1961 5B Crewe South
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45340 w/e 07/11/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 15/04/1961 24K w/e 01/07/1961 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46161 w/e 04/03/1961 21C Bushbury w/e 10/06/1961 24K w/e 09/09/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46167 w/e 04/03/1961 21C Bushbury w/e 10/06/1961 24K w/e 09/09/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44936 on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 17/06/1961 24K w/e 01/07/1961 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 45002 w/e 10/06/1961 24L Carnforth w/e 15/07/1961 24K w/e 09/09/1961 5B Crewe South