Depot: Redhill
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Redhill | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1630 | q/e | 12/1935 | RED | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1637 | q/e | 12/1935 | RED | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1800 | q/e | 12/1935 | RED | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 2398 | q/e | 12/1935 | RED | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1406 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1587 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | P | 02/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 1728 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | m/e | 05/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 1729 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1815 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1816 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1817 | q/e | 12/1935 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1818 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1843 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | AFD | Ashford | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1849 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1851 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1852 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1858 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1863 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 70B | Feltham | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1864 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 70B | Feltham | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1895 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1896 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1897 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 3w/e | 09/05/1955 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1898 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 3w/e | 09/05/1955 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1899 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Small Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2435 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | m/e | 05/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2450 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2507 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 75B | Redhill | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2517 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2541 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75G | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2560 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 70A | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2568 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75B | Redhill | ||||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 2586 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2592 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | P | 02/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 533 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 537 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 538 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 539 | m/e | 12/1938 | BM | Bournemouth (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 545 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | P | 02/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 546 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | P | 02/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 547 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1587 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | P | 02/01/1948 | RED | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | HIT | Hither Green |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2592 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | P | 02/01/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 545 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | P | 02/01/1948 | RED | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | HOR | Horsham |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 546 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | P | 02/01/1948 | RED | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | HOR | Horsham |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1859 | on | 01/01/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | RED | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1862 | on | 01/01/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1273 | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RED | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 2346 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RED | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 2347 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RED | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2590 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 2350 | on | 01/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | RED | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 3B | Three Bridges |
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 2351 | on | 01/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | RED | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 70811 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | RED | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 6B | Mold Junction | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77296 | on | 06/07/1947 | WD | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78666 | on | 15/07/1947 | WD | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | RED | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | |
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | 32071 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | RED | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | 2072 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | RED | w/e | 01/12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2561 | on | 01/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | RED | m/e | 06/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1817 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | RED | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | BAT | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2540 | on | 01/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | RED | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31848 | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | 3B | Bushbury | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | RED | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | 32073 | P | 02/01/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | RED | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32449 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | RED | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77007 | on | 07/11/1947 | WD | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | RED | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | HIT | Hither Green | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31843 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | RED | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31844 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | RED | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31831 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | RED | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31904 | 6w/e | 12/12/1949 | BTN | Brighton | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 75B | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31900 | P | 02/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 75B | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31900 | 3w/e | 10/06/1950 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 75B | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32512 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 75B | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32512 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 75B | Redhill | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 75B | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31488 | on | 01/01/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75B | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31490 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | TON | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75B | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32568 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75B | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71D | Fratton |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32571 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75B | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75G | Eastbourne |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32593 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | EBN | Eastbourne | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75B | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75G | Eastbourne |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31309 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | STL | St Leonards | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75B | m/e | 06/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31310 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | STL | St Leonards | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31860 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 74A | Ashford | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31861 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 74A | Ashford | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90354 | on | 24/07/1947 | WD | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31899 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 75B | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31900 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 75B | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31899 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31900 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31866 | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31867 | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31868 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31869 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31866 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31867 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75B | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31868 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75B | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31869 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75B | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31899 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31900 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32448 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75B | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32451 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75B | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 1577 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | 5w/e | 16/09/1955 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31586 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31591 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31631 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31638 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30835 | m/e | 03/1943 | FEL | Feltham | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30836 | m/e | 03/1943 | FEL | Feltham | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30837 | m/e | 03/1943 | FEL | Feltham | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75B | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31894 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75B | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31895 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75B | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31896 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75B | 3w/e | 09/05/1955 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 31491 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 75B | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32507 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 75B | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31311 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75B | w/e | 06/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80018 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 75G | Eastbourne | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 75B | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80019 | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 75G | Eastbourne | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 75B | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31307 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 75B | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31638 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75B | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31735 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75B | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31739 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75B | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31749 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75B | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31805 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75B | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 71D | Fratton |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31856 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 75B | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31862 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 75B | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31864 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 70B | Feltham | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 75B | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31863 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 74A | Ashford | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 75B | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32571 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 75E | Three Bridges | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 75B | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31550 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 75B | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31551 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 75B | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31899 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 75B | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31900 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 75B | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30245 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30022 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 75B | 4w/e | 30/12/1953 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30123 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30377 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42068 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 74B | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42077 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 74C | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31551 | 4w/e | 10/12/1953 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 30/12/1953 | 75B | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31610 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75B | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 72C | Yeovil Town |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31611 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75B | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 70F | Fratton |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31612 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75B | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31614 | on | 01/01/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75B | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31615 | on | 01/01/1948 | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 75B | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31075 | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 75B | 5w/e | 12/08/1955 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31591 | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 75B | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31263 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 09/05/1955 | 75B | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76058 | m/e | 06/1955 (New) | 75B | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76059 | m/e | 06/1955 (New) | 75B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72B | Salisbury | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31319 | 5w/e | 24/08/1953 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75B | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76060 | m/e | 07/1955 (New) | 75B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72B | Salisbury | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76061 | m/e | 07/1955 (New) | 75B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76062 | m/e | 07/1955 (New) | 75B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31817 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 75B | w/e | 12/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76009 | m/e | 02/1953 | 71A | Eastleigh (New) | 7w/e | 27/08/1956 | 75B | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76014 | m/e | 05/1953 | 71A | Eastleigh (New) | 7w/e | 27/08/1956 | 75B | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31861 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75B | w/e | 05/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31870 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75B | w/e | 05/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31871 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75B | m/e | 11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31872 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75B | w/e | 26/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30847 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 72B | Salisbury | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75B | 4w/e | 24/06/1963 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31850 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75B | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31851 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75B | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31852 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75B | w/e | 15/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31616 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 70C | Guildford | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 75B | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31799 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70C | Guildford | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 75B | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31807 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70C | Guildford | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 75B | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30914 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 75B | w/e | 22/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30915 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 75B | on | 23/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30916 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 75B | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31819 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75B | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31820 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75B | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32552 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75B | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32553 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75B | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30924 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 75B | w/e | 13/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30911 | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 04/01/1962 | 75B | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30930 | 4w/e | 04/01/1962 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 75B | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31400 | m/e | 08/12/1961 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 75B | w/e | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31411 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 75B | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31824 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 75B | w/e | 20/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31825 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 75B | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31410 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75B | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31412 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75B | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31823 | w/e | 15/09/1963 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 (R) | 75B | |||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31827 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75B | w/e | 14/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31797 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 14/10/1963 | 75B | w/e | 05/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80031 | on | 02/02/1952 | 75A | Brighton (New) | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | on | 20/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80032 | on | 04/03/1952 | 75A | Brighton (New) | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80033 | on | 18/03/1952 | 75A | Brighton (New) | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80034 | 4w/e | 19/08/1963 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80068 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80084 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | on | 13/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80085 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80088 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | on | 13/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80089 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80094 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80138 | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 15/03/1965 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80139 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 15/03/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80140 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80141 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80142 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70E | Salisbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80144 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70E | Salisbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80145 | on | 16/10/1956 | 75A | Brighton (New) | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70E | Salisbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80149 | on | 13/12/1956 | 75A | Brighton (New) | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | on | 07/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80151 | on | 18/01/1957 | 75A | Brighton (New) | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70E | Salisbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80152 | on | 06/02/1957 | 75A | Brighton (New) | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70E | Salisbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80153 | on | 25/02/1957 | 75A | Brighton (New) | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | on | 07/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31828 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | w/e | 06/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31831 | 4w/e | 22/10/1962 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31873 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 30531 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 25/05/1964 | 75B | w/e | 19/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 30543 | m/e | 06/01/1964 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 25/05/1964 | 75B | w/e | 20/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80011 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70D | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80019 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 08/06/1965 | 70F | Bournemouth |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31405 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31816 | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 22/06/1964 | 75B | 4w/e | 18/01/1965 | 70C | Guildford |