Depot: Rose Grove
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Rose Grove | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13278 | w/e | 19/05/1934 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 03/11/1934 | 24B | w/e | 25/05/1935 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13279 | w/e | 19/05/1934 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 03/11/1934 | 24B | w/e | 25/05/1935 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2384 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24B | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2435 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24B | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2555 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24B | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2212 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24B | on | 01/01/1948 | 30C | Ardrossan | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8312 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8319 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8339 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8408 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8435 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8456 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8458 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8459 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8463 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8470 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8471 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 20G | Hellifield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8475 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 17C | Coalville | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8523 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8524 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8525 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8710 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8711 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8713 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8714 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8715 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8718 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 12529 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11410 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11497 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51492 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | m/e | 07/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12183 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12220 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12262 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12268 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12278 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 23C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12309 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7386 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7575 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 19/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7576 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9549 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9610 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12841 | m/e | 07/1941 | LMS | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | on | 13/03/1948 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 52873 | m/e | 10/1941 | LMS | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | on | 08/05/1948 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12886 | m/e | 07/1941 | LMS | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | Aintree | |
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12906 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 52913 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12916 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12945 | m/e | 07/1941 | LMS | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | Aintree | |
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 52952 | m/e | 07/1941 | LMS | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 23B | Aintree | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10653 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 04/02/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10654 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 28/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2438 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | on | 25/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2439 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2475 | on | 30/12/1936 | 10C | Patricroft (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2546 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24A | Accrington | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2547 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 04/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2555 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24B | Rose Grove | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2558 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 23C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2635 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8448 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 24B | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8769 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 24B | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8491 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 24B | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42706 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42733 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 23B | Aintree | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24B | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2821 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 23B | Aintree | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8007 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 24B | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52334 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 24B | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12102 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 24B | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52216 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 24B | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | 1987 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13A | Plaistow | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 24B | on | 19/02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11336 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 24B | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90557 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24B | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90171 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24B | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90420 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24B | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52268 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 24B | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90122 | 3w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24B | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90557 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24B | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90171 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24B | w/e | 03/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90420 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24B | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12159 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24B | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52268 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4038 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 24B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44221 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 24B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44544 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 24B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4038 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44221 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44544 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44464 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 24B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42765 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 24B | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42828 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 24B | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42898 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 24B | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42765 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 24B | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 28B | Fleetwood |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42828 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 24B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42898 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 24B | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90143 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24B | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79226 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24B | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90143 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 24B | w/e | 30/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79226 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 24B | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42733 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 24B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42187 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 24B | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50647 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 24B | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50652 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 24B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50652 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 24B | on | 13/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50764 | w/e | 09/09/1950 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 24B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52527 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52319 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52579 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 23C | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52369 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52527 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52319 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52579 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | w/e | 04/10/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52369 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | w/e | 16/06/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50764 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24B | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42796 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24B | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42898 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24B | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50651 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 24B | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50655 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 24B | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50651 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 24B | w/e | 17/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50655 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 24B | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45061 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45209 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45226 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24B | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90267 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 24B | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52580 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 24B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52580 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 24B | w/e | 10/02/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50656 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 24B | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52459 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 24B | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52529 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24B | w/e | 02/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42439 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 24B | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90181 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 24B | w/e | 08/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90621 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 24B | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50648 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 24B | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52138 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 24B | w/e | 06/03/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42706 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | on | 30/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42716 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42828 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42869 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42898 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44940 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45205 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45209 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24B | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 24H | Hellifield |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50648 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 24B | w/e | 19/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42717 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 64A | St Margarets | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 24B | on | 17/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47577 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24B | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 24G | Skipton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47586 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24B | w/e | 19/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42474 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24B | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84012 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 24B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84015 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 24B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45228 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 24B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45229 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 24B | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50655 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 24B | w/e | 11/08/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84010 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 24B | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84011 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 24B | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52179 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 24B | w/e | 06/08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44780 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 24B | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44948 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 24B | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 24H | Hellifield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44949 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 24B | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52095 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 24B | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52526 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 24B | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52413 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 56F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 24B | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42637 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 24B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 2C | Warwick |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42280 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 24B | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3782 | on | 05/09/1959 (New) | 24B | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3783 | on | 05/09/1959 (New) | 24B | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90374 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 24B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45216 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 24B | w/e | 12/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44889 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 24B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44894 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 24B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52290 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 24B | w/e | 19/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42703 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 24B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42728 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 24B | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42901 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 24B | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90374 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | w/e | 28/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47562 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47571 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | w/e | 13/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47201 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42295 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | w/e | 04/05/1963 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42110 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 12H | Tebay |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44689 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44692 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45068 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43436 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 71H | Templecombe (S&D) | on | 14/07/1961 | 24B | w/e | 30/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43734 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | on | 14/07/1961 | 24B | w/e | 22/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47333 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | on | 14/07/1961 | 24B | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90295 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 24B | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42634 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 24B | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90576 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 24B | w/e | 23/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90584 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 24B | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90266 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 24B | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90398 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 24B | w/e | 04/04/1964 | 9P | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90327 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24B | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90164 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24B | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90219 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24B | w/e | 16/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90724 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24B | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47660 | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 24B | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90297 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 24B | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47383 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 12C | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24B | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47647 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24B | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42926 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 10F | on | 17/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90658 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 10F | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90681 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 10F | w/e | 03/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42727 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 10F | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47631 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 10F | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47344 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 12F | Workington | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 10F | w/e | 05/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90040 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 10F | w/e | 31/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45218 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 10F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90291 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 10F | w/e | 06/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90388 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 10F | w/e | 11/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90389 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 10F | w/e | 31/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90271 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 10F | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90289 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 10F | w/e | 21/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47468 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 10F | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47631 | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10F | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47211 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10F | w/e | 28/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42841 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 10F | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90222 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 10F | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90261 | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 10F | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90448 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9J | Agecroft | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 10F | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44894 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 10F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45196 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 10F | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90123 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 10F | w/e | 27/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90541 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 10F | w/e | 08/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90725 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 10F | w/e | 07/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45210 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 10F | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45026 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 10F | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45077 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 10F | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45397 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90080 | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 10F | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90367 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 10F | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90364 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 10F | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90207 | on | 20/05/1962 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 10F | w/e | 22/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90346 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 10F | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90306 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 10F | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48323 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10F | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48373 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10F | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48448 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10F | w/e | 27/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48668 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10F | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48446 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 10F | w/e | 24/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48260 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 10F | w/e | 20/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48348 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48435 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 10F | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48218 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10F | w/e | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48223 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10F | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48257 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10F | w/e | 20/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48262 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10F | w/e | 20/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48447 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10F | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48506 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10F | w/e | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48451 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10F | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48558 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 10F | w/e | 09/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44932 | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10F | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 16B | Annesley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45215 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10F | w/e | 07/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45234 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 10F | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44870 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 10F | w/e | 17/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44909 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 10F | w/e | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48024 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10F | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48053 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10F | w/e | 18/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48057 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10F | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48081 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10F | w/e | 23/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48154 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10F | w/e | 22/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48386 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10F | w/e | 26/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48062 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 10F | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48668 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 10F | w/e | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48141 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 10F | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48223 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 10F | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48310 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 10F | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48400 | on | 06/09/1964 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 10F | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48423 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48441 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 10F | w/e | 06/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44690 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44932 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45262 | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44848 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 10F | w/e | 17/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48211 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10F | w/e | 18/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48079 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 10F | w/e | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48550 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 10F | w/e | 30/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48757 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 10F | w/e | 16/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45339 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 10F | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45343 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 10F | w/e | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45382 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 10F | w/e | 29/06/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45111 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 10F | w/e | 28/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45275 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 10F | w/e | 21/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48247 | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48712 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 10F | w/e | 10/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48393 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48666 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48730 | on | 06/09/1964 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48468 | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10F | w/e | 02/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48544 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10F | w/e | 02/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48556 | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10F | w/e | 19/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48061 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 10F | w/e | 23/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48375 | w/e | 03/12/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 10F | w/e | 16/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48384 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 10F | w/e | 25/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48400 | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 23/09/1967 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48451 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 23/09/1967 | 10F | w/e | 04/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48519 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48062 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48167 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48410 | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45350 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44899 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10F | w/e | 20/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45447 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48340 | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 10F | w/e | 30/03/1968 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48727 | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45096 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48115 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10F | w/e | 06/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48191 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 17E | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48278 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48493 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48715 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48752 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48340 | w/e | 30/03/1968 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48665 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48773 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10F | w/e | 10/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45156 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9H | Patricroft | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10F | w/e | 10/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45287 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 9H | Patricroft | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 10F | w/e | 03/08/1968 | Withdrawn |