Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 78 Week
» 11223 Month
» 111008 Year
» 1776384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Barrow in Furness


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Barrow in Furness Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2970 w/e 19/06/1937 BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 03/07/1937 11B w/e 25/09/1937 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2571       4w/e 22/06/1946 11B on 01/01/1948 11B Barrow in Furness
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7287       on 01/01/1948 11B w/e 22/06/1963 24L Carnforth
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7322       on 01/01/1948 11B w/e 25/11/1961 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7323       on 01/01/1948 11B w/e 12/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 1P 2-4-0 58021       on 01/01/1948 11B on 14/08/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4059       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 26/03/1955 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4120 4w/e 22/06/1946 1B Camden on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 23/02/1952 4B Northampton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4306       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 07/10/1950 12C Durran Hill (Carlisle)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4347       on 01/01/1948 11B w/e 29/06/1963 24D Lower Darwen
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4351       on 01/01/1948 11B w/e 06/04/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4361       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 29/01/1955 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4368       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 09/11/1957 55B Stourton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4487       on 01/01/1948 11B w/e 07/04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4594       on 01/01/1948 11B w/e 02/09/1961 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 10643       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 06/10/1951 10D Plodder Lane
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 10644       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 12/07/1952 10B Preston
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 67       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 04/12/1954 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 68       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 24/03/1951 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2321       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 03/12/1955 5A Crewe North
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2359       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 30/11/1957 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2386       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 22/03/1958 8E Brunswick
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2392       on 01/01/1948 11B w/e 20/08/1960 5D Stoke
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2393       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 12/07/1952 11C Oxenholme
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2427       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 14/08/1954 11B Barrow in Furness
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2430       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 10/08/1957 6H Bangor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2462       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 06/10/1951 9A Longsight
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2493       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 01/12/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2570       on 01/01/1948 11B w/e 18/06/1960 9C Macclesfield
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2571 4w/e 22/06/1946 11B Barrow in Furness on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 23/02/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2573       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 19/05/1956 2A Rugby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2581       on 01/01/1948 11B w/e 14/07/1962 68D Beattock
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2594       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 30/11/1957 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2602       on 01/01/1948 11B 4w/e 28/12/1957 2A Rugby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44086 on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 07/10/1950 11B w/e 18/06/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44387 on 01/01/1948 5B Crewe South 4w/e 07/10/1950 11B 4w/e 31/12/1955 9F Heaton Mersey
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58287       4w/e 24/02/1951 11B 4w/e 30/11/1957 6K Rhyl
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42376 on 01/01/1948 5D Stoke 4w/e 19/05/1951 11B w/e 02/01/1960 11A Barrow in Furness
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45141 4w/e 16/06/1951 12B Carlisle Canal 4w/e 17/07/1951 11B w/e 17/12/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41217       4w/e 06/10/1951 11B 4w/e 04/10/1958 9A Longsight
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58116       4w/e 23/02/1952 11B on 28/01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58257 4w/e 26/01/1952 3B Bushbury 4w/e 22/03/1952 11B w/e 05/11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58277       4w/e 22/03/1952 11B 8w/e 14/06/1952 3A Bescot
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58281       4w/e 22/03/1952 11B 8w/e 14/06/1952 2E Northampton
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58177       4w/e 22/03/1952 11B w/e 29/08/1959 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 46727 4w/e 31/12/1950 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 22/03/1952 11B m/e 12/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58303 4w/e 07/10/1950 9F Heaton Mersey 8w/e 14/06/1952 11B w/e 28/11/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 58330       8w/e 14/06/1952 11B m/e 02/1953 Withdrawn
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 58334 4w/e 31/03/1952 84G Shrewsbury 8w/e 14/06/1952 11B m/e 03/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40673 4w/e 17/07/1951 10B Preston 8w/e 29/11/1952 11B 3w/e 24/01/1953 10B Preston
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58139       4w/e 21/03/1953 11B on 30/11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58156       4w/e 21/03/1953 11B on 24/03/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42323 4w/e 20/05/1950 91M To London Midland Region 8w/e 11/07/1953 11B 4w/e 08/08/1953 5D Stoke
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42364 on 01/01/1948 5D Stoke 4w/e 08/08/1953 11B m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58273 4w/e 07/10/1950 3A Bescot 4w/e 31/10/1953 11B w/e 08/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58281 8w/e 14/06/1952 2E Northampton 4w/e 24/04/1954 11B 8w/e 19/06/1954 2B Nuneaton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42061 4w/e 06/09/1952 1E Bletchley 8w/e 19/06/1954 11B 4w/e 26/02/1955 2A Rugby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42427 on 01/01/1948 11B Barrow in Furness 4w/e 14/08/1954 11B 4w/e 25/02/1956 11A Carnforth
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58221 8w/e 11/07/1953 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 09/10/1954 11B w/e 07/11/1959 2A Rugby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47605 on 01/01/1948 11A Carnforth 4w/e 01/01/1955 11B w/e 13/05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42601 on 01/01/1948 11A Carnforth 4w/e 26/03/1955 11B 4w/e 23/04/1955 3B Bushbury
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45294 4w/e 03/10/1953 10C Patricroft 4w/e 08/10/1955 11B w/e 09/11/1963 9J Agecroft
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58217       4w/e 03/12/1955 11B w/e 10/10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44366 4w/e 27/02/1954 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 28/01/1956 11B w/e 12/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42332 on 01/01/1948 9B Stockport Edgeley 4w/e 28/01/1956 11B m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58293       4w/e 21/04/1956 11B 4w/e 30/11/1957 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42427 4w/e 25/02/1956 11A Carnforth 4w/e 21/04/1956 11B 4w/e 19/04/1958 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44443 on 01/01/1948 1C Watford m/e 16/06/1956 11B w/e 07/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44971 4w/e 17/07/1954 12A Carlisle Upperby m/e 16/06/1956 11B 4w/e 11/08/1956 6B Mold Junction
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45286 8w/e 11/07/1953 12A Carlisle Upperby m/e 16/06/1956 11B 4w/e 06/10/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45289 4w/e 05/09/1953 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) m/e 16/06/1956 11B 4w/e 06/10/1956 5A Crewe North
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45291 4w/e 21/04/1956 11A Carnforth m/e 16/06/1956 11B 4w/e 06/10/1956 11A Carnforth
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42320 4w/e 24/03/1956 2A Rugby 4w/e 11/08/1956 11B 4w/e 25/01/1958 9A Longsight
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45317 4w/e 26/02/1955 12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 11/08/1956 11B 4w/e 06/10/1956 12A Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43904 4w/e 08/08/1953 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 06/10/1956 11B on 27/06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58123       4w/e 06/10/1956 11B w/e 14/11/1959 8E Northwich
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58190       4w/e 18/05/1957 11B w/e 28/11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58171 5w/e 24/12/1949 18A Toton 4w/e 18/05/1957 11B 4w/e 28/12/1957 6K Rhyl
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47494 on 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 4w/e 10/08/1957 11B 4w/e 30/11/1957 3E Monument Lane
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42351 on 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 4w/e 10/08/1957 11B 4w/e 30/11/1957 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42560 on 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 4w/e 10/08/1957 11B 4w/e 30/11/1957 3D Aston
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44837 4w/e 06/10/1951 2A Rugby 4w/e 10/08/1957 11B w/e 25/11/1961 21D Aston
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40695 4w/e 10/08/1957 10B Preston 8w/e 05/10/1957 11B 4w/e 12/03/1960 67A Corkerhill
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43618 4w/e 23/02/1957 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 30/11/1957 11B 4w/e 19/04/1958 6K Rhyl
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47505 5w/e 24/12/1949 1A Willesden 4w/e 28/12/1957 11B w/e 02/12/1961 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47520 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 28/12/1957 11B w/e 21/01/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47531 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 28/12/1957 11B w/e 08/06/1963 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47675 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 28/12/1957 11B m/e 04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47676 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 28/12/1957 11B w/e 15/09/1962 12F Workington
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45072 4w/e 19/04/1958 2A Rugby 4w/e 12/07/1958 11A 4w/e 06/09/1958 24L Carnforth
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47503 4w/e 19/04/1958 11B Workington 4w/e 06/09/1958 11A w/e 14/03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47517 on 01/01/1948 13B Devons Road (Bow) 4w/e 06/09/1958 11A w/e 13/12/1958 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42427 4w/e 17/05/1958 11B Workington 4w/e 06/09/1958 11A on 07/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42233 4w/e 14/06/1958 11B Workington 4w/e 06/09/1958 11A w/e 22/10/1960 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47517 w/e 13/12/1958 26A Newton Heath w/e 14/03/1959 11A w/e 25/11/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42440 4w/e 22/03/1958 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 20/06/1959 11A w/e 18/06/1960 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42478 4w/e 04/10/1958 26F Patricroft w/e 20/06/1959 11A w/e 26/03/1960 2A Rugby
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42666 3w/e 24/01/1953 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/06/1959 11A w/e 29/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42119 4w/e 23/03/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/06/1959 11A on 21/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42120 4w/e 23/03/1957 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 20/06/1959 11A on 28/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42673 4w/e 24/03/1956 2A Rugby w/e 27/06/1959 11A w/e 12/12/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42397 8w/e 05/10/1957 9C Macclesfield w/e 04/07/1959 11A on 21/01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42372 w/e 29/08/1959 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 12/09/1959 11A w/e 17/10/1959 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42395 w/e 29/08/1959 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 12/09/1959 11A w/e 18/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42320 w/e 29/08/1959 91W To Western Region / GWR w/e 19/09/1959 11A w/e 22/10/1960 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47345 on 01/01/1948 9A Longsight w/e 07/11/1959 11A w/e 06/10/1962 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47356 w/e 24/01/1959 9A Longsight w/e 07/11/1959 11A w/e 25/11/1961 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47373 4w/e 03/12/1955 11A Carnforth w/e 07/11/1959 11A w/e 01/09/1962 12F Workington
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44537 w/e 24/10/1959 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 07/11/1959 11A on 08/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42432 on 01/01/1948 11A Carnforth w/e 07/11/1959 11A on 21/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42591 4w/e 06/09/1958 24L Carnforth w/e 07/11/1959 11A w/e 29/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44601 w/e 07/11/1959 5D Stoke w/e 28/11/1959 11A w/e 13/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58293 4w/e 17/05/1958 6K Rhyl w/e 05/12/1959 11A w/e 28/01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42376 4w/e 19/05/1951 11B Barrow in Furness w/e 02/01/1960 11A w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42673 w/e 12/12/1959 1A Willesden w/e 02/01/1960 11A on 14/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58287 4w/e 30/11/1957 6K Rhyl w/e 16/01/1960 11A w/e 01/10/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58160       w/e 06/02/1960 11A on 08/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47317 on 01/01/1948 11A Carnforth w/e 12/03/1960 11A w/e 07/07/1962 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45445 on 01/01/1948 4A Shrewsbury w/e 18/06/1960 12E w/e 26/06/1965 10J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45258 on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 09/07/1960 12E w/e 19/06/1965 10J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42420 w/e 12/09/1959 5D Stoke w/e 20/08/1960 12E w/e 19/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44186 w/e 18/06/1960 12H Stranraer w/e 17/09/1960 12E w/e 19/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44454 w/e 17/09/1960 12F Workington w/e 24/09/1960 12E w/e 18/08/1962 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58177 w/e 10/09/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 22/10/1960 12E w/e 29/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44439 w/e 07/11/1959 3D Aston w/e 12/11/1960 12E w/e 10/12/1960 12F Workington
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44676       w/e 07/01/1961 12E w/e 10/11/1962 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47520 w/e 21/01/1961 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 04/02/1961 12E w/e 10/03/1962 24L Carnforth
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58181 4w/e 14/06/1958 3A Bescot w/e 04/02/1961 12E on 14/07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42318 4w/e 21/02/1953 9C Macclesfield w/e 10/06/1961 12E w/e 08/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42340 w/e 05/11/1960 8E Northwich w/e 10/06/1961 12E w/e 09/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42347 w/e 07/11/1959 9C Macclesfield w/e 10/06/1961 12E w/e 15/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42355 on 01/01/1948 9C Macclesfield w/e 10/06/1961 12E w/e 25/11/1961 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44882 on 01/01/1948 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 17/06/1961 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42351 w/e 07/01/1961 1E Bletchley w/e 24/06/1961 12E w/e 25/11/1961 2E Northampton
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47648 w/e 24/06/1961 6A Chester (MR) w/e 22/07/1961 12E w/e 25/11/1961 5B Crewe South
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58120 w/e 01/04/1961 2A Rugby w/e 29/07/1961 12E w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58182 w/e 08/04/1961 2A Rugby w/e 29/07/1961 12E w/e 19/01/1963 15D Coalville
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2511       on 28/08/1961 (New) 12E w/e 22/10/1966 12D Workington
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2512       on 11/09/1961 (New) 12E on 13/05/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44345 w/e 07/11/1959 24L Carnforth w/e 16/09/1961 12E w/e 08/06/1963 9F Heaton Mersey
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2513       on 05/10/1961 (New) 12E w/e 21/01/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2514       on 16/10/1961 (New) 12E w/e 21/01/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2515       on 18/10/1961 (New) 12E on 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2516       on 10/11/1961 (New) 12E on 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2517       on 10/11/1961 (New) 12E w/e 21/01/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42415 w/e 21/01/1961 15C Leicester Midland w/e 25/11/1961 12E w/e 23/06/1962 24L Carnforth
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5719 w/e 06/08/1960 17A Derby w/e 30/12/1961 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5700 m/e 02/1961 98S   w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5701 on 01/09/1958 17A Derby (New) w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5702 on 29/09/1958 17A Derby (New) w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5703 on 20/10/1958 17A Derby (New) w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5704 on 05/11/1958 17A Derby (New) w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5705 on 05/12/1958 17A Derby (New) w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5706 on 05/12/1958 17A Derby (New) w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5707 on 19/12/1958 17A Derby (New) w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5708 on 10/01/1959 17A Derby (New) w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5709 on 10/01/1959 17A Derby (New) w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5710 on 14/02/1959 17A Derby (New) w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5711 on 14/02/1959 17A Derby (New) w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5712 w/e 02/07/1960 17A Derby w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5713 w/e 16/07/1960 17A Derby w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5714 w/e 22/10/1960 17A Derby w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5715 w/e 22/10/1960 17A Derby w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5716 w/e 13/08/1960 17A Derby w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 16/10/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5717 w/e 06/08/1960 17A Derby w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Diesel 28 Co-Bo D5718 w/e 06/08/1960 17A Derby w/e 03/02/1962 12E w/e 17/12/1966 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44447 on 01/01/1948 2B Bletchley w/e 12/05/1962 12E w/e 20/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45421 4w/e 04/10/1952 8A Edge Hill w/e 23/06/1962 12E w/e 10/11/1962 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42581 w/e 14/07/1962 68D Beattock w/e 11/08/1962 12E w/e 11/08/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46400 w/e 23/06/1962 31B March w/e 18/08/1962 12E w/e 18/09/1965 10A Carnforth
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47564 w/e 18/08/1962 12F Workington w/e 01/09/1962 12E w/e 11/05/1963 24C Lostock Hall
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44367 8w/e 11/07/1953 6K Rhyl w/e 06/10/1962 12E w/e 12/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78022 w/e 15/09/1962 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 12E w/e 11/05/1963 27B Aintree
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78023 w/e 15/09/1962 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 12E w/e 18/05/1963 27B Aintree
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78027 w/e 15/09/1962 31B March w/e 08/12/1962 12E w/e 11/05/1963 27A Bank Hall
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44439 w/e 10/12/1960 12F Workington w/e 20/04/1963 12E w/e 14/09/1963 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46504 w/e 30/03/1963 1A Willesden w/e 25/05/1963 12E w/e 10/10/1964 9M Bury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42335 w/e 18/05/1963 17C Rowsley w/e 22/06/1963 12E on 25/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42447 w/e 29/12/1962 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12E w/e 14/09/1963 9H Patricroft
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42634 w/e 29/12/1962 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12E w/e 20/07/1963 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42278 w/e 18/05/1963 12C Carlisle Canal w/e 22/06/1963 12E w/e 14/09/1963 9H Patricroft
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47305 4w/e 23/02/1957 27B Aintree w/e 04/04/1964 12C w/e 27/02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42697 w/e 30/04/1960 26A Newton Heath w/e 23/05/1964 12C w/e 08/01/1966 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46499 w/e 23/05/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 27/06/1964 12C w/e 02/10/1965 10A Carnforth
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46506 w/e 23/05/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 27/06/1964 12C w/e 10/10/1964 9M Bury
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45451 w/e 11/07/1964 10A Carnforth w/e 18/07/1964 12C w/e 18/09/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44200 w/e 02/11/1963 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 19/09/1964 12C w/e 03/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42657 w/e 20/06/1959 24E Blackpool Central w/e 19/09/1964 12C on 07/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42148       w/e 19/09/1964 12C on 19/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45182 w/e 14/11/1964 9E Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 16/01/1965 12C w/e 12/03/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45294 w/e 09/05/1964 10A Carnforth w/e 06/03/1965 12C w/e 17/12/1966 12D Workington
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45340 w/e 23/06/1962 24L Carnforth w/e 06/03/1965 12C w/e 18/09/1965 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47614 on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby w/e 03/04/1965 12C w/e 24/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42610 w/e 02/05/1964 16C Derby w/e 10/04/1965 12C on 23/04/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42134 w/e 18/11/1961 9F Heaton Mersey w/e 19/06/1965 12C w/e 17/12/1966 12E Tebay
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42267 w/e 12/06/1965 6A Chester (MR) w/e 26/06/1965 12C w/e 06/11/1965 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42581 w/e 11/08/1962 1A Willesden w/e 24/07/1965 12C w/e 30/10/1965 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42080 w/e 26/06/1965 5D Stoke w/e 24/07/1965 12C w/e 08/01/1966 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44086 w/e 18/06/1960 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 21/08/1965 12C w/e 13/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44350 m/e 16/06/1956 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 21/08/1965 12C w/e 25/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42233 w/e 26/06/1965 6A Chester (MR) w/e 21/08/1965 12C w/e 27/11/1965 8M Southport
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42236 w/e 06/02/1960 6A Chester (MR) w/e 21/08/1965 12C w/e 17/12/1966 12E Tebay
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44311 w/e 10/04/1965 9K Bolton w/e 27/11/1965 12C w/e 09/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44500 w/e 26/12/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 04/12/1965 12C w/e 09/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44394 w/e 18/09/1965 9L Buxton (LNWR) w/e 11/12/1965 12C w/e 02/07/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44310 w/e 08/05/1965 12D Workington w/e 03/01/1966 12C w/e 05/02/1966 Withdrawn
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12086 w/e 22/06/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/01/1966 12C w/e 29/01/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45012 w/e 22/06/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 23/04/1966 12C w/e 08/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42159 w/e 26/06/1965 9K Bolton w/e 07/05/1966 12C w/e 21/05/1966 9K Bolton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42252 w/e 21/08/1965 9K Bolton w/e 04/06/1966 12C w/e 17/12/1966 12E Tebay
Diesel 11 0-6-0 12086 w/e 29/01/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 02/07/1966 12C w/e 21/01/1967 12D Workington
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42115 w/e 18/04/1964 9D Newton Heath w/e 13/08/1966 12C on 12/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44691 w/e 03/04/1965 2B Oxley w/e 20/08/1966 12C w/e 17/12/1966 12D Workington
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2058 on 23/05/1959 52A Gateshead (New) w/e 19/11/1966 12C on 17/06/1975 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2059 on 29/05/1959 52A Gateshead (New) w/e 19/11/1966 12C on 05/07/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3412 w/e 05/11/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 26/11/1966 12C w/e 16/11/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 D2505 on 27/03/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) w/e 31/12/1966 12C on 19/08/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 D2504 on 22/02/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) w/e 07/01/1967 12C on 18/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 D2506 on 12/04/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) w/e 14/01/1967 12C on 25/11/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 D2501 w/e 25/05/1956 40B Immingham w/e 21/01/1967 12C on 18/02/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 D2507 on 30/04/1956 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) w/e 21/01/1967 12C on 25/03/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3202 w/e 19/11/1966 12D Workington w/e 21/01/1967 12C 5w/e 01/04/1972 67C Ayr
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 D2500 w/e 21/01/1967 10A Carnforth w/e 22/04/1967 12C on 13/05/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 D2502 w/e 21/01/1967 10A Carnforth w/e 22/04/1967 12C on 07/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 D2503 w/e 21/01/1967 10A Carnforth w/e 22/04/1967 12C on 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2513 w/e 21/01/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/04/1967 12C on 19/08/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2118 w/e 29/04/1967 16C Derby w/e 24/06/1967 12C on 18/06/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2511 w/e 22/10/1966 12D Workington w/e 24/06/1967 12C on 30/12/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 D2514 w/e 22/04/1967 12D Workington w/e 24/06/1967 12C on 05/08/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2124 w/e 29/04/1967 16C Derby w/e 01/07/1967 12C on 28/02/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2116 w/e 15/10/1966 16A Toton w/e 09/09/1967 12C on 09/10/1971 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2129 w/e 24/06/1967 16C Derby w/e 16/09/1967 12C w/e 07/12/1968 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2394 w/e 06/08/1966 9A Longsight w/e 07/10/1967 12C on 23/11/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3210 w/e 05/11/1966 10D Lostock Hall w/e 13/01/1968 12C on 13/11/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3008 w/e 05/11/1966 10A Carnforth w/e 10/08/1968 12C w/e 12/10/1968 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3200 w/e 04/03/1967 10A Carnforth w/e 10/08/1968 12C w/e 03/08/1974 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3286 4w/e 16/03/1963 66C Hamilton (West) w/e 10/08/1968 12C on 02/11/1980 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3566 w/e 14/01/1967 10A Carnforth w/e 10/08/1968 12C w/e 12/10/1968 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4139 on 11/07/1962 24L Carnforth (New) w/e 10/08/1968 12C w/e 31/10/1970 10D Lostock Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4140 on 02/08/1962 24L Carnforth (New) w/e 10/08/1968 12C w/e 03/08/1974 KM Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4141 on 08/08/1962 24L Carnforth (New) w/e 10/08/1968 12C w/e 03/01/1970 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4142 on 17/08/1962 24L Carnforth (New) w/e 10/08/1968 12C w/e 29/03/1969 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3283 w/e 04/03/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 03/01/1970 12C w/e 06/05/1972 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2392 w/e 18/05/1968 8J Allerton w/e 17/01/1970 12C w/e 28/03/1970 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D4152 w/e 11/05/1968 8J Allerton w/e 27/06/1970 12C w/e 11/10/1975 AN Allerton
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2199 w/e 07/03/1970 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 09/10/1971 12C on 18/06/1972 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3784 w/e 09/10/1971 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 08/01/1972 12C w/e 26/02/1972 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08926 w/e 14/01/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 03/08/1974 BW w/e 11/10/1975 WN Willesden