Depot: Ryecroft (Walsall)
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Ryecroft (Walsall) | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1239 | m/e | 12/1921 | 24 | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | m/e | 03/1930 | W9 | m/e | 09/1933 | M14 | Bedford |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1275 | m/e | 12/1921 | 28 | Holbeck (MR) | m/e | 03/1930 | W9 | m/e | 09/1933 | 30 | Skipton |
Steam | 1282 | 2-4-0 | 20157 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 3C | ||||||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6643 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 3C | on | 01/01/1948 | 7B | Bangor | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8531 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 3C | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6713 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 3C | m/e | 09/1946 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2982 | w/e | 25/04/1936 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 11/07/1936 | 3C | w/e | 02/01/1937 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2984 | w/e | 06/06/1936 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 11/07/1936 | 3C | w/e | 02/01/1937 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3786 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3410 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3502 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4069 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4115 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4339 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5E | Alsager | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4345 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 11D | Tebay | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4454 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4488 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12438 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 6K | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9031 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | m/e | 05/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9040 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | m/e | 04/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9048 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 5C | Stafford | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9003 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9056 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | m/e | 08/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9015 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9349 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9350 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9388 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9364 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | m/e | 12/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9222 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6B | Mold Junction | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 29/09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9236 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | on | 13/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9248 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 3D | Aston | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9283 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9325 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 12/11/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6661 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | m/e | 06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6679 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | m/e | 02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6757 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 11 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 17 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2E | Warwick | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 19 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 42 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 45 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3D | Aston | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 69 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2E | Warwick | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2444 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2448 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2452 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2466 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2562 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 5C | Stafford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2586 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2604 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2627 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2660 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 7B | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 413 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5C | Stafford | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 462 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | w/e | 28/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 501 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4873 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5308 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5395 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9198 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 3C | on | 29/05/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6712 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7413 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 413 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3C | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9066 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 3C | w/e | 02/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9326 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 3C | w/e | 01/08/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9195 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 3C | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9211 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 3C | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9193 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3C | m/e | 11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2482 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2488 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45069 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3C | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4078 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4352 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 3C | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4360 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 3C | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | 58333 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 3C | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | 58341 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 3C | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | 58349 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 3C | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | 58348 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 3C | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4937 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 3C | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 25344 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 3C | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58122 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3C | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 22978 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3C | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58122 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 3C | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 22978 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 3C | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58116 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 48904 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 3C | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49285 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 3C | m/e | 07/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9300 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 3C | w/e | 24/11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49133 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 3C | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49135 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 3C | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49213 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 3C | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 157 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 3C | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58420 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3C | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58420 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 3C | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 7D | Rhyl |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49058 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 3C | m/e | 03/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48966 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 3C | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49100 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 3C | m/e | 05/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49324 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 3C | w/e | 04/03/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49373 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49258 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 3C | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43787 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18A | Toton | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 3C | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43633 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18A | Toton | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 3C | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43787 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 3C | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43633 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 3C | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49401 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 3C | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49208 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 3C | m/e | 02/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49171 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 3C | m/e | 02/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45069 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3C | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45069 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3C | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58123 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 3C | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41279 | m/e | 10/1950 (New) | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58283 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 3C | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58302 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 3C | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42469 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 3C | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48943 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 3C | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58283 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58302 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3C | w/e | 07/07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48943 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42469 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3C | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40047 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 3C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49241 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 3C | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40006 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49241 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 3C | w/e | 20/09/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58279 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40068 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58279 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40068 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3C | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9239 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 3C | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49301 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40073 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49301 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40073 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40531 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4B | Northampton | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3C | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49020 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48907 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48907 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3C | w/e | 28/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40531 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 3C | m/e | 08/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40068 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48905 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48917 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 3C | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49092 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3C | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40073 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 46712 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3C | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 2C | Warwick |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40080 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40084 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40108 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3C | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40079 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40096 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40149 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 20E | Manningham |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40155 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 14B | Kentish Town | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 20E | Manningham |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40173 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 23C | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48922 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 5C | Stafford | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40085 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40180 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 5E | Alsager | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 3C | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58122 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49162 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 3C | w/e | 16/05/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42538 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42578 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45307 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44448 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5D | Stoke | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49107 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3C | w/e | 23/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49108 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3C | on | 07/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40206 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 1A | Willesden | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3C | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40401 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3C | m/e | 08/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13021 | on | 16/05/1953 (New) | 3C | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58125 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 3A | Bescot | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 3C | on | 30/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49354 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 3C | w/e | 03/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47296 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49271 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 3C | w/e | 02/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 41902 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 23C | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3C | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44444 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45195 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 3C | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | Bletchley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13091 | on | 04/12/1954 (New) | 3C | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41213 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42441 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41214 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 3C | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58169 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40122 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 3C | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45416 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 3A | Bescot | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 3C | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58203 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | w/e | 25/01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44512 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58174 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40080 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41223 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41224 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45344 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48932 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 3C | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45403 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 3C | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40129 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 3C | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40421 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 3C | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40010 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 3C | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 1C | Watford |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12056 | w/e | 10/12/1955 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 02/02/1957 | 3C | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41324 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49387 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41212 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41220 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41320 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41324 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45067 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45113 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45307 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | Bletchley | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45328 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45419 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49278 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3D | Aston | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49343 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 8D | Widnes | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49114 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5C | Stafford | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49249 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40673 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40692 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58181 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45344 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42560 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 3C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 3A | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3780 | on | 22/08/1959 | 24D | Lower Darwen (New) | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 21F | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3781 | on | 29/08/1959 | 24D | Lower Darwen (New) | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 21F | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3053 | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 21F | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3802 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3866 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6J | Holyhead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3088 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3090 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3111 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3112 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3115 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3116 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3867 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 12004 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 12013 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 2B | Oxley | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12056 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12077 | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12087 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12091 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12093 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 2F | Bescot | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 2G | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15105 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 2G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15106 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 2G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 2F | Bescot |