Depot: Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Sheffield Grimesthorpe | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1267 | m/e | 12/1880 | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 3 | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1268 | m/e | 12/1880 | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 3 | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1269 | m/e | 12/1880 | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 3 | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1255 | m/e | 12/1880 | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 18 | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1256 | m/e | 12/1880 | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 18 | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1257 | m/e | 12/1880 | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 20 | Buxton (MR) | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1259 | m/e | 12/1880 | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 20 | Buxton (MR) | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1260 | m/e | 12/1880 | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1632 | m/e | 06/1883 (New) | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 29 | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1635 | m/e | 08/1883 (New) | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 29 | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1642 | m/e | 02/1884 (New) | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 29 | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1643 | m/e | 02/1884 (New) | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 29 | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1644 | m/e | 03/1884 (New) | 25 | m/e | 04/1892 | 29 | Manningham | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1262 | m/e | 12/1880 | 29 | Manningham | m/e | 04/1892 | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 29 | Manningham |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1263 | m/e | 12/1880 | 29 | Manningham | m/e | 04/1892 | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 29I | Ilkley |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1260 | m/e | 12/1880 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 04/1892 | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 29 | Manningham |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1261 | m/e | 12/1880 | 29 | Manningham | m/e | 04/1892 | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 29 | Manningham |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2259 | m/e | 02/1895 (New) | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2240 | m/e | 02/1895 (New) | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2241 | m/e | 02/1895 (New) | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2242 | m/e | 03/1895 (New) | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2243 | m/e | 03/1895 (New) | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2244 | m/e | 03/1895 (New) | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2245 | m/e | 03/1895 (New) | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2246 | m/e | 03/1895 (New) | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2247 | m/e | 03/1895 (New) | 25 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1542 | m/e | 04/1892 | 29 | Manningham | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2238 | m/e | 02/1895 | 18M | Mansfield (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2259 | m/e | 02/1895 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2240 | m/e | 02/1895 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2241 | m/e | 02/1895 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2242 | m/e | 03/1895 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2243 | m/e | 03/1895 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2244 | m/e | 03/1895 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2245 | m/e | 03/1895 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2246 | m/e | 03/1895 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2247 | m/e | 03/1895 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1542 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | m/e | 05/1908 | 28 | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2238 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2259 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2240 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2241 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2242 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2243 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2244 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2245 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2246 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 2247 | m/e | 01/1899 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1391 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | m/e | 04/1914 | 3 | Saltley |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1392 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1393 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1394 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1395 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1396 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1397 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | m/e | 04/1914 | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1398 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1399 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1400 | m/e | 12/1902 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 1232 | 05/1908 | M&GN | M&GN Joint Railway | 04/1914 | 25 | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | |||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1255 | m/e | 05/1908 | 3 | Saltley | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1256 | m/e | 05/1908 | 29 | Manningham | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1258 | m/e | 12/1902 | 18M | Mansfield | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1261 | m/e | 05/1908 | 18 | Nottingham | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 18 | Nottingham |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1250 | m/e | 05/1908 | 3 | Saltley | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1392 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1393 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1394 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1395 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1396 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1398 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1399 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1400 | m/e | 05/1908 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 1232 | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 12/1921 | 25 | 5w/e | 31/01/1926 | Withdrawn | |||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1255 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | m/e | 03/1930 | 29 | Manningham |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1256 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | 4w/e | 01/12/1928 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1258 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1250 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | m/e | 03/1930 | 2 | Burton |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1372 | m/e | 04/1914 | 16 | Kentish Town | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | 4w/e | 25/01/1930 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1392 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1393 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1394 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1395 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1396 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1398 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1399 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1400 | m/e | 04/1914 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1258 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1332 | m/e | 12/1921 | 2 | Burton | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | 4w/e | 05/09/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1333 | m/e | 12/1921 | 2 | Burton | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | 4w/e | 26/12/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1351 | m/e | 12/1921 | 29 | Manningham | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | 4w/e | 25/02/1933 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1352 | m/e | 12/1921 | 29 | Manningham | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | 4w/e | 26/12/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1392 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1393 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1394 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1395 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1396 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1398 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1399 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | 4w/e | 03/10/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1400 | m/e | 12/1921 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 1258 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | 4w/e | 27/02/1937 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1266 | m/e | 03/1930 | 30 | Skipton | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | 4w/e | 18/05/1935 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1358 | m/e | 03/1930 | 29 | Manningham | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | m/e | 11/1945 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1368 | m/e | 03/1930 | M10 | Leicester Midland | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | m/e | 11/1945 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1392 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | 4w/e | 31/12/1938 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1393 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | 4w/e | 09/09/1944 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1394 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | 4w/e | 30/12/1939 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1395 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | m/e | 11/1945 | 20C | Royston |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1396 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | m/e | 11/1945 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1398 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | 4w/e | 01/12/1934 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1400 | m/e | 03/1930 | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | 4w/e | 09/10/1937 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1426 | m/e | 03/1930 | M16 | Kentish Town | m/e | 09/1933 | 25 | m/e | 11/1945 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9555 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 19A | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9589 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 19A | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3835 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 19A | on | 01/01/1948 | 17C | Coalville | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 515 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 19A | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8003 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 19A | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8004 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 19A | on | 01/01/1948 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8005 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 19A | on | 01/01/1948 | 20G | Hellifield | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2796 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 19A | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 757 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 19A | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5089 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 19A | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3844 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4006 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 324 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8017 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8105 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 20G | Hellifield | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8116 | m/e | 04/1939 | 5B | Crewe South (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 18C | Hasland |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8216 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8219 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8284 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8314 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 15A | Wellingborough | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8642 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3775 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 26/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3241 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3334 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 10/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3468 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3595 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 09/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3596 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3605 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3607 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 09/06/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3636 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3661 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 27/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3662 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 08/08/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3683 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 06/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3715 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 15/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3731 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 03/07/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3749 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 08/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3755 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 26/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3772 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 25/03/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4165 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4211 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 18B | Westhouses | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4212 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4284 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 18B | Westhouses | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4285 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 18B | Westhouses | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4334 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 17D | Rowsley | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4355 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4418 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4426 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4437 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4550 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 20C | Royston | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4568 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41D | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4572 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4573 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7513 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 09/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7545 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7624 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | m/e | 09/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1768 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 31/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1855 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 20F | Skipton | ||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1857 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | on | 08/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7235 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 7236 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 17B | Burton | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2761 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2769 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2797 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2904 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 401 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 728 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 05/07/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 729 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | m/e | 06/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4858 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4921 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5262 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 17B | Burton | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5407 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | 2099 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | 2109 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8189 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20G | Hellifield | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 19A | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4802 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 19A | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8134 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 19A | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8354 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 19A | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4971 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 19A | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1781 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20F | Skipton | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 19A | m/e | 07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 22969 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 19A | on | 08/09/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 23002 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 19A | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8179 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 19A | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 545 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 19A | on | 18/12/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3335 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20G | Hellifield | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 19A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3604 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 19A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43193 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16D | Mansfield | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 19A | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43193 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 19A | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 16D | Mansfield |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3335 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 19A | on | 22/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3604 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 19A | on | 05/12/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3463 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 19A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 19C | Canklow |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5088 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 19A | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44556 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 19A | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 17D | Rowsley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48007 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 19A | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43037 | on | 15/06/1949 (New) | 19A | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 19C | Canklow | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45263 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 19A | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43038 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 (New) | 19A | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44665 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 (New) | 19A | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44804 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 19A | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44843 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 19A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45263 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 19A | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42761 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 16B | Spital Bridge | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 19A | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45056 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 19A | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7432 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 19A | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7432 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42761 | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19A | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 16B | Spital Bridge |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7563 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 41660 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 19C | Canklow |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44944 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 19C | Canklow |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44845 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19E | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26G | Belle Vue |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45225 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44477 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44477 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 19A | on | 07/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45128 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42769 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 19A | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45062 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45335 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58192 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 19A | m/e | 12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42769 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45238 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 19A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43114 | on | 09/05/1951 (New) | 19A | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43115 | on | 19/05/1951 (New) | 19A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 41661 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 19A | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 41661 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 19A | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40411 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 19A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45272 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 19A | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42904 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 19A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40411 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 19A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 15D | Bedford |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48765 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 19A | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48765 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 19A | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58175 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 19A | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47238 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 19A | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 19C | Canklow |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44020 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 15C | Leicester Midland | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48447 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48452 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45062 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45238 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45335 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44004 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 16D | Mansfield | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 18B | Westhouses |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48447 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 19A | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 16D | Mansfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48452 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43800 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 19A | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43225 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 19A | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43800 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 19A | on | 04/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43225 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 19C | Canklow |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41190 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41191 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43856 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 18B | Westhouses |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43341 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 19A | on | 25/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44171 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 20D | Normanton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44174 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17D | Rowsley | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43882 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18B | Westhouses | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 19A | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44287 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 19A | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44457 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 19A | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43882 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 19A | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44287 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44457 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 19A | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47228 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 19A | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44275 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 19A | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48144 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 19A | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 19C | Canklow |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48216 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 19A | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 19C | Canklow |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42904 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 19A | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44855 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 19A | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43252 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 19A | on | 18/06/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45059 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 19A | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43332 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20C | Royston | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 19A | on | 10/05/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43388 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 19A | on | 12/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43012 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 19A | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 15B | Kettering |
Steam | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 58244 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 19A | m/e | 06/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78025 | m/e | 06/1954 (New) | 19A | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45238 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 19A | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45447 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 19A | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42797 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 19A | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43781 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 20B | Stourton | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 19A | on | 26/11/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47636 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 19A | on | 09/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43254 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18B | Westhouses | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42794 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 19A | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44265 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43243 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 19A | on | 30/07/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13251 | on | 25/05/1955 (New) | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13252 | on | 01/06/1955 (New) | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13253 | on | 01/06/1955 (New) | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13254 | on | 01/06/1955 (New) | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43637 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43181 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 19A | on | 13/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43325 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 19A | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43669 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48144 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 19A | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48452 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 15A | Wellingborough | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 19A | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44039 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 19A | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 55F | Manningham |
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 41795 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 17A | Derby | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 19A | m/e | 05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43745 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 19A | m/e | 11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44547 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 20F | Skipton | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 19A | m/e | 09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13288 | on | 10/12/1956 (New) | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13289 | on | 10/12/1956 (New) | 19A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13291 | on | 21/12/1956 (New) | 19A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 16A | Nottingham | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13292 | on | 27/12/1956 (New) | 19A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13293 | on | 28/12/1956 (New) | 19A | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13086 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 19A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44087 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 19A | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43872 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 19A | on | 26/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44535 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 15B | Kettering | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 19A | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48178 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 19A | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43174 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15D | Bedford | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41B | on | 20/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43203 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 21B | Bournville | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41B | on | 01/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43307 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 14A | Cricklewood East | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41B | on | 30/07/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43361 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41B | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43395 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41B | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43406 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 17B | Burton | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41B | on | 20/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43431 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16D | Mansfield | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41B | on | 20/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92189 | on | 21/03/1958 | 36B | Mexborough (New) | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 41B | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43222 | on | 01/01/1948 | 15D | Bedford | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 41B | on | 27/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73000 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41B | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73043 | m/e | 10/1953 | 10C | Patricroft (New) | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41B | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43634 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16D | Mansfield | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41B | on | 02/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3129 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3662 | on | 20/06/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13289 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13293 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3574 | on | 01/08/1958 | 18A | Toton (New) | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3575 | on | 13/08/1958 | 18A | Toton (New) | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44036 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41B | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43751 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 18A | Toton | on | 30/11/1958 | 41B | on | 26/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58165 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 41B | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73074 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 41B | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73156 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 41B | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48037 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 41B | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48178 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 41B | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43234 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 41B | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43361 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 41B | on | 15/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43395 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 41B | on | 11/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43159 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 41B | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13127 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 41B | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43111 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 41B | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43146 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 41B | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 34E | New England |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44097 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41B | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44518 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41B | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47625 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41B | on | 09/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48216 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 41B | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 41835 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 41B | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 41D | Canklow |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68497 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 41F | Mexborough | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 41B | on | 19/09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68569 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 41J | Langwith Junction | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 41B | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90418 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 41J | Langwith Junction | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 41B | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 41J | Langwith Junction |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4029 | on | 03/06/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4028 | on | 27/05/1960 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4030 | on | 08/07/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4035 | on | 17/10/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4036 | on | 26/10/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4037 | on | 29/10/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4038 | on | 05/11/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4039 | on | 17/11/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4040 | on | 19/11/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4041 | on | 25/11/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4042 | on | 26/11/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4043 | on | 03/12/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4044 | on | 09/12/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4046 | on | 17/12/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4047 | on | 22/12/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4048 | on | 30/12/1960 (New) | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43160 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43089 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 31B | March | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 41B | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 34E | New England |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43161 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 40E | Colwick |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13336 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3698 | on | 07/05/1959 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3727 | on | 22/12/1959 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 41B | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |