Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 827 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6227 Week
» 24279 Month
» 257199 Year
» 1922575 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Shrewsbury


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Shrewsbury Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4332       on 01/01/1934 134 m/e 02/1936 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 4362       on 01/01/1934 134 m/e 08/1937 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5397       on 01/01/1934 134 m/e 07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6320       on 01/01/1934 134 4w/e 01/12/1956 82D Westbury
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6342       on 01/01/1934 134 8w/e 11/07/1953 84E Tyseley
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6399       on 01/01/1934 134 4w/e 27/12/1958 84E Tyseley
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7317       on 01/01/1934 134 4w/e 07/09/1946 OXY Oxley
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5032       on 05/06/1934 (New) SALOP m/e 11/1951 84A Stafford Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 4000 on 01/08/1931 PDN Old Oak Common on 22/06/1934 SALOP on 11/05/1937 SRD Stafford Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 4078 on 17/12/1932 PDN Old Oak Common on 10/07/1935 4A on 01/11/1935 LDR Landore
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5053       on 06/06/1936 (New) 4A on 25/10/1937 SRD Stafford Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5061       on 11/06/1937 (New) 4A m/e 10/1938 SRD Stafford Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5064 m/e 09/1937 SRD Stafford Road m/e 10/1937 4A on 05/10/1950 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5293       m/e 12/1937 (New) 4A on 01/01/1948 12B Carlisle Upperby
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5086 on 11/12/1937 SRD Stafford Road m/e 02/1938 4A on 29/11/1939 SRD Stafford Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 4000 m/e 03/1938 TYS Tyseley m/e 04/1938 4A on 04/05/1939 SRD Stafford Road
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2948 w/e 22/01/1938 8C Speke Junction w/e 04/06/1938 4A w/e 13/08/1938 8A Edge Hill
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2963 w/e 24/09/1938 4D Abergavenny w/e 08/10/1938 4A w/e 26/11/1938 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2983 w/e 24/09/1938 4D Abergavenny w/e 08/10/1938 4A w/e 26/11/1938 5B Crewe South
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 2961 w/e 02/07/1938 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 29/10/1938 4A w/e 26/11/1938 5B Crewe South
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5061 m/e 10/1938 SRD Stafford Road m/e 11/1938 4A on 16/04/1943 SRD Stafford Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5015 on 26/12/1935 LA Laira on 11/12/1938 4A on 28/06/1940 PDN Old Oak Common
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5021 on 29/08/1937 LA Laira on 17/12/1938 4A on 25/11/1940 SRD Stafford Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5073 m/e 12/1938 SRD Stafford Road m/e 02/1939 4A on 20/03/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5088       on 07/03/1939 SALOP on 08/03/1942 SRD Stafford Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5097       on 17/07/1939 (New) 4A on 01/02/1941 SRD Stafford Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 4076 m/e 10/1938 NA Newton Abbot on 17/06/1940 4A on 24/07/1942 PDN Old Oak Common
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5097 on 01/02/1941 SRD Stafford Road m/e 03/1941 4A on 02/06/1959 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5021 on 25/11/1940 SRD Stafford Road on 05/04/1941 4A on 20/05/1942 SRD Stafford Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5015 on 28/06/1940 PDN Old Oak Common on 23/05/1942 4A on 16/10/1945 SRD Stafford Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5086 on 29/11/1939 SRD Stafford Road on 03/08/1942 4A on 26/09/1950 To Store
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5061 on 16/04/1943 SRD Stafford Road on 22/04/1943 4A on 07/03/1950 To Store
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5021 on 20/05/1942 SRD Stafford Road on 08/09/1945 4A on 29/06/1948 LA Laira
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6963       4w/e 01/12/1945 134 4w/e 31/12/1951 84C Banbury
Steam Castle 4-6-0 7006       on 28/06/1946 (New) 4A m/e 06/1948 CDF Cardiff Canton
Steam Star 4-6-0 4040       4w/e 07/09/1946 SALOP m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1725       on 01/01/1948 4A m/e 08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8165 4w/e 22/06/1946 12A Carlisle Kingmoor on 01/01/1948 4A 3w/e 14/01/1950 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8307       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 30/12/1961 87F Llanelly
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8308       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 25/01/1958 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8327       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 09/09/1950 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8328       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 03/10/1959 87F Llanelly
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8347       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 18/04/1959 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8369       on 01/01/1948 4A w/e 19/09/1964 1H Northampton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8373       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 07/10/1950 4A Bletchley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8375       on 01/01/1948 4A 2w/e 17/06/1950 3A Bescot
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8454       on 01/01/1948 4A on 05/07/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8474       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 16/06/1962 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8556       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 11/08/1956 9G Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8613       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 07/09/1957 18A Toton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8631       on 01/01/1948 4A w/e 01/10/1960 8E Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8674       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 21/02/1953 1A Willesden
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8688       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 07/10/1950 4A Bletchley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8689       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 09/09/1950 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8736       on 01/01/1948 4A 5w/e 16/07/1949 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8743       on 01/01/1948 4A 3w/e 11/12/1948 21A Saltley
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3394       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 09/08/1958 5B Crewe South
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3573 m/e 01/1948 Withdrawn on 01/01/1948 (R) 4A      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3581       on 01/01/1948 4A on 09/07/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3600       on 01/01/1948 4A on 07/05/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3618       on 01/01/1948 4A 3w/e 11/12/1948 8B Warrington Dallam
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3679       on 01/01/1948 4A w/e 21/02/1959 17B Burton
Steam 27 0-6-0 12525       on 01/01/1948 4A 8w/e 14/06/1952 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Sentinel 0-4-0T 7181       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 13/12/1952 39A Gorton
Steam 264 0-4-0ST 16027       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 04/11/1950 10B Preston
Steam 11 0-6-0 52103       on 01/01/1948 4A m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 11 0-6-0 12105       on 01/01/1948 4A 5w/e 16/07/1949 10B Preston
Steam 11 0-6-0 12119       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 30/11/1957 6K Rhyl
Steam 11 0-6-0 12233       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 27/01/1951 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 11 0-6-0 52374       on 01/01/1948 4A on 18/09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam 11 0-6-0 12414       on 01/01/1948 4A w/e 08/12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 11 0-6-0 12428       on 01/01/1948 4A w/e 15/09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 11 0-6-0 12429       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 06/11/1954 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam 11 0-6-0 52457 4w/e 22/06/1946 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street on 01/01/1948 4A on 08/05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9028       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 04/12/1954 85C Hereford
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9046       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 01/01/1955 85C Hereford
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8945       on 01/01/1948 4A m/e 31/03/1959 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8895       on 01/01/1948 4A 2w/e 17/06/1950 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9138       on 01/01/1948 4A w/e 15/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam G2 0-8-0 9445       on 01/01/1948 4A 3w/e 11/12/1948 2F Coventry
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 6601       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 16/05/1953 2A Rugby
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 5       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 04/10/1958 1A Willesden
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 29/11/1958 84K Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 48       on 01/01/1948 4A 8w/e 29/11/1952 1A Willesden
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 58       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 06/09/1958 84K Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5180       on 01/01/1948 4A 8w/e 09/09/1951 64A St Margarets
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5190       on 01/01/1948 4A w/e 10/10/1964 16B Annesley
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5245       on 01/01/1948 4A 8w/e 09/09/1951 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5281 m/e 11/1936 14B Kentish Town (New) on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 03/10/1953 68A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5283 m/e 11/1936 22A Bristol Barrow Road (New) on 01/01/1948 4A w/e 19/09/1964 6B Mold Junction
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5292 m/e 12/1936 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (New) on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 17/07/1951 7C Holyhead
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5318       on 01/01/1948 4A 8w/e 09/09/1951 64A St Margarets
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5330       on 01/01/1948 4A 8w/e 09/09/1951 62C Dunfermline Upper
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5384       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 06/10/1951 62B Dundee Tay Bridge
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5406       on 01/01/1948 4A w/e 10/10/1964 16B Annesley
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5445       on 01/01/1948 4A w/e 18/06/1960 12E Barrow in Furness
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5492       on 01/01/1948 4A 4w/e 21/10/1961 66B Motherwell
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5050 m/e 11/1942 LA Laira m/e 09/1948 4A on 16/09/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Steam G1 0-8-0 9353 on 01/01/1948 10C Patricroft 3w/e 11/12/1948 4A m/e 12/1949 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49276 on 01/01/1948 4D Abergavenny 3w/e 11/12/1948 4A m/e 12/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48207 on 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 5w/e 16/07/1949 4A 4w/e 09/09/1950 4A Bletchley
Steam G2 0-8-0 49448 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 2w/e 17/06/1950 4A 6w/e 30/06/1951 86K Abergavenny
Steam Castle 4-6-0 4083 on 21/02/1950 98S   on 15/07/1950 84G on 16/11/1950 84A Stafford Road
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 77012       4w/e 31/08/1950 84G 4w/e 24/02/1951 26C Bolton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 77015       4w/e 31/08/1950 84G 4w/e 02/12/1950 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 78521       4w/e 31/08/1950 84G 4w/e 31/12/1950 26A Newton Heath
Steam Castle 4-6-0 7035       m/e 09/1950 (New) 84G m/e 09/1953 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 70843       4w/e 30/09/1950 84G 4w/e 31/12/1950 26A Newton Heath
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 77026       4w/e 30/09/1950 84G 4w/e 31/12/1950 26A Newton Heath
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90589       4w/e 30/09/1950 84G 4w/e 31/12/1950 26A Newton Heath
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 78542       4w/e 30/09/1950 84G 4w/e 31/12/1950 26A Newton Heath
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90715       4w/e 30/09/1950 84G 4w/e 31/12/1950 26A Newton Heath
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 58926       4w/e 30/09/1950 84G 4w/e 22/05/1954 86K Abergavenny
Steam County 4-6-0 1024       4w/e 30/11/1950 84G 4w/e 31/03/1951 83D Laira
Steam County 4-6-0 1025       4w/e 30/11/1950 84G w/e 23/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48172 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1950 84G 4w/e 16/07/1960 87G Carmarthen
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48309 on 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 4w/e 30/11/1950 84G 4w/e 10/09/1955 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48344 on 01/01/1948 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 30/11/1950 84G 4w/e 02/11/1957 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48354 on 01/01/1948 20B Stourton 4w/e 30/11/1950 84G w/e 19/09/1964 1H Northampton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48438 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1950 84G 4w/e 18/04/1959 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48660 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 30/11/1950 84G 8w/e 26/03/1955 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48730 on 01/01/1948 25A Wakefield 4w/e 30/11/1950 84G 4w/e 31/12/1950 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48732 on 01/01/1948 25A Wakefield 4w/e 30/11/1950 84G 4w/e 31/12/1950 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7810       4w/e 31/12/1950 84G 4w/e 30/01/1954 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48110 4w/e 02/12/1950 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 31/12/1950 84G 4w/e 15/12/1962 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48468 on 01/01/1948 26C Bolton 4w/e 31/12/1950 84G 4w/e 27/01/1962 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48760 on 01/01/1948 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 31/12/1950 84G 4w/e 25/01/1958 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48707 on 01/01/1948 23B Aintree 4w/e 31/01/1951 84G 4w/e 28/02/1951 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2206 4w/e 31/01/1951 84E Tyseley 4w/e 31/03/1951 84G 4w/e 13/08/1955 85A Worcester
Steam County 4-6-0 1003 4w/e 28/02/1951 83D Laira 3w/e 19/05/1951 84G 4w/e 28/01/1961 83D Laira
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6624       3w/e 19/05/1951 84G w/e 06/09/1952 84D Leamington
Steam Sentinel 0-4-0T 47180 on 01/01/1948 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) m/e 31/07/1951 84G m/e 31/08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2823 4w/e 31/08/1950 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 30/09/1951 84G 4w/e 04/10/1952 84C Banbury
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75000 m/e 05/1951 82C Swindon (New) 4w/e 30/09/1951 84G 4w/e 26/12/1953 82C Swindon
Steam County 4-6-0 1004 4w/e 20/05/1950 83G Penzance 4w/e 31/12/1951 84G 4w/e 21/02/1953 84A Stafford Road
Steam County 4-6-0 1013 4w/e 30/09/1951 83G Penzance 4w/e 31/12/1951 84G on 08/09/1963 82C Swindon
Steam County 4-6-0 1017       4w/e 31/12/1951 84G 4w/e 31/12/1960 83D Laira
Steam County 4-6-0 1018 4w/e 28/02/1951 83G Penzance 4w/e 31/12/1951 84G 4w/e 24/01/1953 84A Stafford Road
Steam County 4-6-0 1019 4w/e 28/02/1951 83G Penzance 4w/e 31/12/1951 84G 4w/e 24/01/1953 84A Stafford Road
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48707 4w/e 28/02/1951 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 31/12/1951 84G 4w/e 05/09/1959 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48739 4w/e 31/12/1950 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 31/12/1951 84G w/e 19/09/1964 1H Northampton
Steam G2A 0-8-0 48893 on 01/01/1948 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 31/12/1951 84G 4w/e 21/03/1953 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49260 on 01/01/1948 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 31/12/1951 84G m/e 30/04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2203 4w/e 31/12/1951 84E Tyseley 4w/e 31/01/1952 84G 4w/e 29/02/1952 84E Tyseley
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3782 4w/e 31/01/1952 84H Wellington 4w/e 29/02/1952 84G w/e 18/07/1964 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 58334       4w/e 29/02/1952 84G 4w/e 31/03/1952 84G Shrewsbury
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 58346       4w/e 29/02/1952 84G m/e 03/1952 Withdrawn
Steam G1 0-8-0 49118 4w/e 06/10/1951 2A Rugby 4w/e 29/02/1952 84G 4w/e 30/04/1952 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3203 4w/e 30/11/1946 CNYD Croes Newydd 4w/e 31/03/1952 84G 7w/e 31/08/1952 89A Oswestry
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 58334 4w/e 29/02/1952 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 31/03/1952 84G 8w/e 14/06/1952 11B Barrow in Furness
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 58360       4w/e 31/03/1952 84G m/e 04/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5634       4w/e 30/04/1952 84G 4w/e 27/02/1954 84A Stafford Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9740       4w/e 30/04/1952 84G 4w/e 25/02/1956 84K Chester West
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75006       4w/e 30/04/1952 84G 4w/e 03/10/1953 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam G1 0-8-0 49118 4w/e 29/02/1952 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/04/1952 84G 4w/e 29/11/1952 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58203 3w/e 11/12/1948 17A Derby 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G 6w/e 30/06/1952 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58207       3w/e 17/05/1952 84G 6w/e 30/06/1952 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 1357 0-6-0 58241 4w/e 19/04/1952 18A Toton 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G 6w/e 30/06/1952 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58258       3w/e 17/05/1952 84G 6w/e 30/06/1952 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43822 4w/e 19/04/1952 21B Bournville 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G 6w/e 30/06/1952 85C Hereford
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43277 4w/e 19/04/1952 21B Bournville 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G 6w/e 30/06/1952 85C Hereford
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43491 on 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G 6w/e 30/06/1952 85C Hereford
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43621 on 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G 6w/e 30/06/1952 85C Hereford
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49157 4w/e 23/02/1952 8D Widnes 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G 4w/e 07/09/1957 86G Pontypool Road
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5300 4w/e 30/11/1950 84B Oxley 6w/e 30/06/1952 84G 4w/e 04/10/1952 84B Oxley
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58203 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G Shrewsbury 6w/e 30/06/1952 84G 8w/e 16/07/1955 10C Patricroft
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58207 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G Shrewsbury 6w/e 30/06/1952 84G m/e 30/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 1357 0-6-0 58241 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G Shrewsbury 6w/e 30/06/1952 84G m/e 30/06/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58258 3w/e 17/05/1952 84G Shrewsbury 6w/e 30/06/1952 84G m/e 12/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2822 4w/e 31/01/1951 84K Chester West 7w/e 31/08/1952 84G 4w/e 21/03/1953 84K Chester West
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5967       7w/e 31/08/1952 84G 4w/e 29/11/1952 84C Banbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6929       7w/e 31/08/1952 84G 4w/e 29/11/1952 84C Banbury
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2233 2w/e 12/07/1952 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 04/10/1952 84G 4w/e 27/12/1952 89C Machynlleth
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3203 7w/e 31/08/1952 89A Oswestry 4w/e 04/10/1952 84G 4w/e 01/11/1952 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3820       4w/e 01/11/1952 84G 4w/e 30/01/1954 84K Chester West
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7828 4w/e 30/04/1951 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 01/11/1952 84G 4w/e 20/05/1961 89B Croes Newydd
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7829 4w/e 30/04/1951 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 01/11/1952 84G 4w/e 21/03/1953 87G Carmarthen
Steam County 4-6-0 1016 4w/e 01/11/1952 83D Laira 4w/e 29/11/1952 84G on 09/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2832       4w/e 29/11/1952 84G 8w/e 26/03/1955 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48738 4w/e 30/11/1950 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 29/11/1952 84G 4w/e 27/12/1952 84G Shrewsbury
Steam 3100/5100 2-6-2T 5112 4w/e 31/12/1949 GLO Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 27/12/1952 84G 4w/e 21/02/1953 84E Tyseley
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6683 3w/e 19/05/1951 84K Chester West 4w/e 27/12/1952 84G 4w/e 16/05/1953 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6698       4w/e 27/12/1952 84G 4w/e 16/05/1953 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48738 4w/e 29/11/1952 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 27/12/1952 84G w/e 19/09/1964 1H Northampton
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6956 4w/e 31/12/1950 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 24/01/1953 84G 4w/e 27/03/1954 84A Stafford Road
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7811 2w/e 12/07/1952 84B Oxley 4w/e 24/01/1953 84G 4w/e 07/10/1961 89B Croes Newydd
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90069 4w/e 31/08/1951 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 21/02/1953 84G 4w/e 06/11/1954 86G Pontypool Road
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90563       4w/e 21/02/1953 84G 4w/e 03/10/1953 84D Leamington
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90323 4w/e 01/11/1952 86J Aberdare 4w/e 21/03/1953 84G 4w/e 16/05/1953 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90716       4w/e 21/03/1953 84G 4w/e 23/04/1955 84C Banbury
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2841 4w/e 21/03/1953 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 18/04/1953 84G 4w/e 26/12/1953 84B Oxley
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3865 3w/e 19/05/1951 82C Swindon 4w/e 18/04/1953 84G 4w/e 25/11/1953 84B Oxley
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90701 4w/e 21/02/1953 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 18/04/1953 84G 4w/e 25/01/1958 86G Pontypool Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5091 on 30/06/1947 SDN Swindon m/e 05/1953 84G on 03/02/1954 82C Swindon
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2232 6w/e 30/06/1951 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 16/05/1953 84G 4w/e 24/03/1956 89C Machynlleth
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3861 4w/e 27/12/1952 85C Hereford 4w/e 16/05/1953 84G 4w/e 26/12/1953 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4105 4w/e 16/05/1953 81F Oxford 8w/e 11/07/1953 84G 4w/e 03/12/1955 88A Cardiff Cathays
Steam 2F 0-6-0 58194 4w/e 06/09/1952 15B Kettering 8w/e 11/07/1953 84G m/e 02/1956 Withdrawn
Steam Sentinel 0-4-0T 47183 4w/e 06/10/1951 5B Crewe South 8w/e 11/07/1953 84G m/e 09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 48893 4w/e 21/03/1953 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 8w/e 11/07/1953 84G m/e 31/10/1954 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90527 4w/e 21/02/1953 25G Farnley Junction 4w/e 08/08/1953 84G 4w/e 03/10/1953 25G Farnley Junction
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5962       4w/e 05/09/1953 84G 4w/e 30/01/1954 84K Chester West
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90466 8w/e 11/07/1953 84B Oxley 4w/e 05/09/1953 84G 4w/e 03/10/1953 84D Leamington
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2244       4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 24/03/1956 89C Machynlleth
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73012 m/e 08/1951 20A Holbeck (MR) (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 01/12/1956 82C Swindon
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73013 m/e 08/1951 19B Sheffield Millhouses (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 16/07/1955 84K Chester West
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73014 m/e 09/1951 19B Sheffield Millhouses (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 13/08/1955 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73015 m/e 09/1951 19B Sheffield Millhouses (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 24/03/1956 17A Derby
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73017 m/e 09/1951 16A Nottingham (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G m/e 16/06/1956 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73018 m/e 09/1951 16A Nottingham (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 01/12/1956 82C Swindon
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73025       4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 17/07/1954 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73026       4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 17/07/1954 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73033 m/e 08/1953 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 03/11/1956 84B Oxley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73034 m/e 08/1953 68A Carlisle Kingmoor (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 03/11/1956 84B Oxley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73035 m/e 08/1953 66A Polmadie (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 03/11/1956 84B Oxley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73036 m/e 08/1953 68A Carlisle Kingmoor (New) 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 03/11/1956 84E Tyseley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73037       4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 03/11/1956 84E Tyseley
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90010 4w/e 31/08/1951 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 27/03/1954 84D Leamington
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90483 4w/e 31/08/1951 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 03/10/1953 84G 4w/e 24/04/1954 84D Leamington
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43822 6w/e 30/06/1952 85C Hereford 4w/e 31/10/1953 84G w/e 28/02/1959 3A Bescot
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43277 6w/e 30/06/1952 85C Hereford 4w/e 31/10/1953 84G on 22/02/1959 15C Leicester Midland
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43491 6w/e 30/06/1952 85C Hereford 4w/e 31/10/1953 84G on 01/02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43621 6w/e 30/06/1952 85C Hereford 4w/e 31/10/1953 84G w/e 21/02/1959 17B Burton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90356 4w/e 05/09/1953 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 31/10/1953 84G 4w/e 25/01/1958 81C Southall
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90261       4w/e 31/10/1953 84G 4w/e 14/07/1956 84D Leamington
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5328 4w/e 03/10/1953 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 25/11/1953 84G 4w/e 25/01/1958 82C Swindon
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6339 4w/e 03/10/1953 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 25/11/1953 84G 4w/e 09/10/1954 84J Croes Newydd
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7821 on 30/11/1950 89A Oswestry (New) 4w/e 25/11/1953 84G 4w/e 26/12/1953 84E Tyseley
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5312 on 01/01/1934 194 Stafford Road 4w/e 30/01/1954 84G 4w/e 24/04/1954 85A Worcester
Steam 1142 0-6-0 58162       4w/e 30/01/1954 84G on 06/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7797       4w/e 27/02/1954 84G 4w/e 09/10/1954 84B Oxley
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6317 4w/e 26/12/1953 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 27/03/1954 84G 4w/e 19/04/1958 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7309 4w/e 16/05/1953 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 27/03/1954 84G m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90466 4w/e 03/10/1953 84D Leamington 4w/e 27/03/1954 84G 4w/e 16/07/1955 84C Banbury
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5091 on 03/02/1954 82C Swindon m/e 04/1954 84G m/e 09/1955 84K Chester West
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2822 4w/e 21/03/1953 84K Chester West 4w/e 24/04/1954 84G 4w/e 09/10/1954 84C Banbury
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90563 4w/e 03/10/1953 84D Leamington 4w/e 24/04/1954 84G 4w/e 06/11/1954 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6338 4w/e 26/12/1953 85C Hereford 4w/e 19/06/1954 84G 4w/e 09/10/1954 84J Croes Newydd
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 58900 4w/e 27/03/1954 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 19/06/1954 84G m/e 10/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2826 2w/e 12/07/1952 84E Tyseley 4w/e 09/10/1954 84G 8w/e 26/03/1955 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6858       4w/e 09/10/1954 84G 4w/e 16/07/1955 87F Llanelly
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73020 4w/e 03/10/1953 84K Chester West 4w/e 09/10/1954 84G 4w/e 01/12/1956 82C Swindon
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73024 4w/e 03/10/1953 84K Chester West 4w/e 09/10/1954 84G 4w/e 14/07/1956 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4915       4w/e 06/11/1954 84G 4w/e 21/05/1955 84E Tyseley
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4937 4w/e 30/10/1948 LDR Landore 4w/e 06/11/1954 84G 4w/e 16/07/1955 87E Landore
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5331 on 01/01/1934 114 Oxley 4w/e 06/11/1954 84G on 10/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5690       4w/e 06/11/1954 84G 4w/e 21/05/1960 86F Tondu
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5986       4w/e 06/11/1954 84G 4w/e 16/07/1955 84E Tyseley
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6944 4w/e 05/11/1949 PDN Old Oak Common 4w/e 06/11/1954 84G 4w/e 08/10/1960 88A Cardiff Canton
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49345 on 01/01/1948 2D Nuneaton 4w/e 04/12/1954 84G m/e 31/01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49243 on 01/01/1948 4D Abergavenny 4w/e 04/12/1954 84G w/e 23/05/1959 8A Edge Hill
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13111       on 25/03/1955 (New) 84G w/e 29/05/1965 1F Rugby
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5319 on 01/01/1934 Sw Wks Swindon Works 8w/e 26/03/1955 84G 4w/e 16/07/1955 84K Chester West
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49051 4w/e 04/12/1954 85C Hereford 8w/e 26/03/1955 84G m/e 28/02/1957 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49028 4w/e 04/12/1954 85C Hereford 8w/e 26/03/1955 84G w/e 03/03/1956 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13114       on 19/04/1955 (New) 84G 4w/e 05/11/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13115       on 25/04/1955 (New) 84G 4w/e 16/07/1955 84F Stourbridge Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13116       on 29/04/1955 (New) 84G 4w/e 13/06/1959 84F Stourbridge Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13112 on 01/04/1955 84F Stourbridge Junction (New) 4w/e 21/05/1955 84G 4w/e 16/07/1955 84F Stourbridge Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13113 on 13/04/1955 84F Stourbridge Junction (New) 4w/e 21/05/1955 84G 4w/e 16/07/1955 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7912 4w/e 31/08/1950 84E Tyseley 4w/e 21/05/1955 84G 4w/e 16/07/1955 84E Tyseley
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7913 4w/e 31/08/1950 84E Tyseley 4w/e 21/05/1955 84G 4w/e 16/07/1955 84E Tyseley
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82030 on 21/12/1954 88C Barry (New) 4w/e 21/05/1955 84G 4w/e 31/12/1955 85A Worcester
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82031 8w/e 26/03/1955 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 21/05/1955 84G 4w/e 24/01/1959 84K Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5634 4w/e 27/02/1954 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 18/06/1955 84G 4w/e 21/05/1960 88C Barry
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4915 4w/e 21/05/1955 84E Tyseley 4w/e 16/07/1955 84G 4w/e 01/11/1958 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6980 4w/e 21/05/1955 84E Tyseley 4w/e 16/07/1955 84G 4w/e 18/04/1959 84B Oxley
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7908       4w/e 16/07/1955 84G 4w/e 08/10/1955 84E Tyseley
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6942 4w/e 31/12/1950 84B Oxley 4w/e 10/09/1955 84G 4w/e 29/12/1956 83E St Blazey
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48402 4w/e 13/08/1955 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 10/09/1955 84G 4w/e 14/06/1958 6E Chester West
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48660 8w/e 26/03/1955 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 10/09/1955 84G 4w/e 24/02/1962 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48724 4w/e 30/11/1950 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 10/09/1955 84G 4w/e 08/09/1962 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam Sentinel 0-4-0T 47181 4w/e 21/05/1955 5B Crewe South 4w/e 10/09/1955 84G m/e 30/11/1956 Withdrawn
Steam County 4-6-0 1026 4w/e 27/03/1954 84K Chester West 4w/e 08/10/1955 84G m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5986 4w/e 16/07/1955 84E Tyseley 4w/e 08/10/1955 84G 4w/e 07/09/1957 82C Swindon
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7824 4w/e 01/01/1955 83D Laira 4w/e 08/10/1955 84G 4w/e 29/12/1956 83D Laira
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82038 on 04/05/1955 83A Newton Abbot (New) 4w/e 08/10/1955 84G 4w/e 03/12/1955 85A Worcester
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 58926 4w/e 22/05/1954 86K Abergavenny 4w/e 08/10/1955 84G m/e 31/10/1958 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90176       4w/e 05/11/1955 84G 4w/e 02/11/1957 84G Shrewsbury
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13192       on 18/11/1955 (New) 84G 4w/e 31/12/1955 84E Tyseley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13193       on 22/11/1955 (New) 84G on 16/09/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 13194       on 24/11/1955 (New) 84G w/e 04/04/1970 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82000 4w/e 03/10/1953 88F Treherbert 4w/e 03/12/1955 84G 4w/e 24/01/1959 84K Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82007 4w/e 16/07/1955 88F Treherbert 4w/e 03/12/1955 84G 4w/e 12/06/1958 84H Wellington
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6620 4w/e 03/10/1953 84E Tyseley 4w/e 28/01/1956 84G m/e 16/06/1956 87H Neyland
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5347 on 01/01/1934 167 Neyland 4w/e 25/02/1956 84G m/e 04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5379 4w/e 29/01/1955 85A Worcester 4w/e 25/02/1956 84G m/e 16/06/1956 84B Oxley
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6378 on 01/01/1934 Sw Wks Swindon Works 4w/e 25/02/1956 84G m/e 16/06/1956 89C Machynlleth
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 9318 4w/e 29/01/1955 85A Worcester 4w/e 25/02/1956 84G m/e 16/06/1956 87H Neyland
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 2854 4w/e 31/12/1949 OXY Oxley 4w/e 24/03/1956 84G 4w/e 21/04/1956 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9740 4w/e 25/02/1956 84K Chester West 4w/e 24/03/1956 84G m/e 16/06/1956 82C Swindon
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73001 m/e 05/1951 17A Derby (New) 4w/e 24/03/1956 84G 4w/e 01/12/1956 82C Swindon
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5968 4w/e 28/02/1951 83D Laira 4w/e 21/04/1956 84G 4w/e 04/11/1961 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9470 8w/e 26/03/1955 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 21/04/1956 84G 4w/e 16/07/1960 84A Stafford Road
Steam G2 0-8-0 49424 on 01/01/1948 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 21/04/1956 84G 4w/e 22/03/1958 8C Speke Junction
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5004 on 21/12/1935 PDN Old Oak Common m/e 06/1956 84G on 20/09/1957 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73125       m/e 07/1956 (New) 84G 4w/e 06/09/1958 26F Patricroft
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73017 m/e 16/06/1956 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 14/07/1956 84G 4w/e 01/12/1956 82C Swindon
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90010 4w/e 27/03/1954 84D Leamington 4w/e 14/07/1956 84G 4w/e 25/01/1958 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5362 4w/e 06/10/1956 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 03/11/1956 84G m/e 07/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 9308 4w/e 11/08/1956 84E Tyseley 4w/e 03/11/1956 84G m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 68164 on 01/01/1948 WRX Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956 84G 4w/e 07/09/1957 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9472 on 30/04/1952 87F Llanelly (New) 4w/e 23/02/1957 84G 4w/e 15/12/1962 88C Barry
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6681 4w/e 26/12/1953 84F Stourbridge Junction 8w/e 20/04/1957 84G 4w/e 01/11/1958 85A Worcester
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6928       8w/e 20/04/1957 84G 4w/e 13/07/1957 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam G2A 0-8-0 49088 4w/e 18/05/1957 84B Oxley 4w/e 15/06/1957 84G w/e 16/11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4904 4w/e 09/10/1954 84E Tyseley 4w/e 13/07/1957 84G 4w/e 11/07/1959 83D Laira
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5355 8w/e 26/03/1955 85C Hereford 4w/e 13/07/1957 84G 4w/e 05/10/1957 85D Kidderminster
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5791       4w/e 13/07/1957 84G 4w/e 31/10/1959 85D Kidderminster
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6357 4w/e 24/04/1954 85A Worcester 4w/e 13/07/1957 84G 4w/e 25/01/1958 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6395 4w/e 06/10/1956 85A Worcester 4w/e 13/07/1957 84G 4w/e 18/06/1960 89C Machynlleth
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6964 4w/e 25/11/1953 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 13/07/1957 84G w/e 07/11/1964 2A Tyseley
Steam Unclassified 0-4-0ST 1142       4w/e 13/07/1957 84G m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90148 4w/e 24/04/1954 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 13/07/1957 84G 4w/e 22/03/1958 84C Banbury
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9401 5w/e 19/01/1957 30A Stratford 4w/e 07/09/1957 84G 4w/e 02/11/1957 85A Worcester
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4913 4w/e 26/01/1957 84B Oxley 4w/e 02/11/1957 84G 4w/e 30/11/1957 84B Oxley
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48444 m/e 16/06/1956 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 02/11/1957 84G 4w/e 25/01/1958 86G Pontypool Road
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90176 4w/e 05/11/1955 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 02/11/1957 84G 4w/e 25/01/1958 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9498 on 31/03/1955 84E Tyseley (New) 4w/e 30/11/1957 84G on 14/07/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5958 4w/e 06/10/1956 84B Oxley 4w/e 25/01/1958 84G 4w/e 01/11/1958 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8449 m/e 06/1954 84B Oxley (New) 4w/e 25/01/1958 84G m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73036 4w/e 03/11/1956 84E Tyseley 4w/e 25/01/1958 84G w/e 25/09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73037 4w/e 03/11/1956 84E Tyseley 4w/e 25/01/1958 84G 4w/e 21/04/1962 87F Llanelly
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6357 4w/e 25/01/1958 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 22/02/1958 84G 4w/e 17/05/1958 84E Tyseley
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75024 4w/e 26/12/1953 89A Oswestry 4w/e 22/02/1958 84G 4w/e 27/12/1958 81F Oxford
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5038 on 21/06/1935 PDN Old Oak Common (New) on 20/03/1958 84G on 19/05/1962 81F Oxford
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2274 4w/e 29/11/1952 85C Hereford 4w/e 22/03/1958 84G 4w/e 21/03/1959 87G Carmarthen
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4968 4w/e 25/01/1958 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 22/03/1958 84G 4w/e 31/10/1959 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6998       4w/e 22/03/1958 84G 4w/e 28/01/1961 81A Old Oak Common
Steam G2A 0-8-0 48921 on 01/01/1948 4E Tredegar 4w/e 22/03/1958 84G m/e 30/04/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5095 on 18/01/1957 86C Cardiff Canton on 12/06/1958 84G on 24/06/1958 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam County 4-6-0 1022 4w/e 28/02/1951 83G Penzance 4w/e 14/06/1958 84G 4w/e 08/08/1959 85C Hereford
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5977 4w/e 08/10/1955 85C Hereford 4w/e 14/06/1958 84G 4w/e 01/11/1958 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5998 4w/e 12/06/1958 85C Hereford 4w/e 14/06/1958 84G 4w/e 30/11/1963 86G Pontypool Road
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6916 4w/e 01/12/1945 215 Worcester 4w/e 14/06/1958 84G w/e 20/06/1964 2D Banbury
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73034 4w/e 03/11/1956 84B Oxley 4w/e 14/06/1958 84G w/e 30/04/1966 9J Agecroft
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73035 4w/e 03/11/1956 84B Oxley 4w/e 14/06/1958 84G w/e 24/07/1965 9H Patricroft
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5319 4w/e 05/11/1955 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 09/08/1958 84G m/e 11/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7921 4w/e 26/12/1953 84K Chester West 4w/e 06/09/1958 84G 4w/e 11/07/1959 83D Laira
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 7922 3w/e 19/05/1951 84K Chester West 4w/e 06/09/1958 84G 4w/e 08/09/1962 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73090 on 08/10/1955 10C Patricroft (New) 4w/e 06/09/1958 84G w/e 23/01/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73091 m/e 10/1955 10C Patricroft (New) 4w/e 06/09/1958 84G 4w/e 07/10/1961 85C Gloucester Barnwood
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73092       4w/e 06/09/1958 84G 4w/e 07/10/1961 85C Gloucester Barnwood
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73093       4w/e 06/09/1958 84G 4w/e 07/10/1961 85C Gloucester Barnwood
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73094 m/e 11/1955 10C Patricroft (New) 4w/e 06/09/1958 84G 4w/e 07/10/1961 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73095 m/e 11/1955 10C Patricroft (New) 4w/e 06/09/1958 84G w/e 28/08/1965 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73096 m/e 11/1955 10C Patricroft (New) 4w/e 06/09/1958 84G 4w/e 14/07/1962 85C Gloucester Barnwood
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73097 m/e 12/1955 10C Patricroft (New) 4w/e 06/09/1958 84G w/e 24/07/1965 9H Patricroft
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5001 on 22/01/1958 81A Old Oak Common on 26/09/1958 84G on 02/08/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7817       4w/e 04/10/1958 84G 4w/e 01/11/1958 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2210       4w/e 01/11/1958 84G 4w/e 28/11/1959 81D Reading (W.R.)
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2289 4w/e 25/01/1958 81F Oxford 4w/e 01/11/1958 84G 4w/e 31/10/1959 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3400 4w/e 25/01/1958 88A Radyr 4w/e 01/11/1958 84G 4w/e 19/05/1962 88B Radyr
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5651 4w/e 05/10/1957 84E Tyseley 4w/e 01/11/1958 84G 4w/e 27/12/1958 84K Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6303 on 01/01/1934 22 Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 01/11/1958 84G m/e 04/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4912 4w/e 27/03/1954 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 29/11/1958 84G 4w/e 18/04/1959 84B Oxley
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6926 4w/e 12/06/1958 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 29/11/1958 84G 4w/e 13/06/1959 84A Stafford Road
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6956 4w/e 27/03/1954 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 29/11/1958 84G 4w/e 25/02/1961 81F Oxford
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48460 m/e 16/06/1956 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 29/11/1958 84G 4w/e 03/10/1959 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3769 4w/e 01/11/1958 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 24/01/1959 84G on 30/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4693 4w/e 01/11/1958 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 24/01/1959 84G 4w/e 27/01/1962 86F Aberbeeg
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7336 on 01/01/1934 101 Old Oak Common 4w/e 24/01/1959 84G m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6698 4w/e 16/05/1953 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 21/02/1959 84G 4w/e 18/06/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42320 4w/e 22/03/1958 11A Carnforth 4w/e 21/02/1959 84G w/e 29/08/1959 91W To Western Region / GWR
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42362 4w/e 22/03/1958 5D Stoke 4w/e 21/02/1959 84G w/e 29/08/1959 91W To Western Region / GWR
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42372 on 01/01/1948 1A Willesden 4w/e 21/02/1959 84G w/e 29/08/1959 91W To Western Region / GWR
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42395 on 01/01/1948 9A Longsight 4w/e 21/02/1959 84G w/e 29/08/1959 91W To Western Region / GWR
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42418 4w/e 20/04/1957 5D Stoke 4w/e 21/02/1959 84G w/e 29/08/1959 91W To Western Region / GWR
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42420 4w/e 24/03/1956 5D Stoke 4w/e 21/02/1959 84G w/e 29/08/1959 91W To Western Region / GWR
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45281 4w/e 03/10/1953 68A Carlisle Kingmoor 4w/e 21/02/1959 84G w/e 29/08/1959 91W To Western Region / GWR
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4212       4w/e 21/03/1959 84G m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4918 4w/e 12/06/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 21/03/1959 84G 4w/e 13/06/1959 84A Stafford Road
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73025 4w/e 04/10/1958 6E Chester West w/e 11/04/1959 84G w/e 23/01/1965 2B Oxley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73026 4w/e 06/09/1958 6E Chester West w/e 11/04/1959 84G w/e 24/10/1964 2L Leamington
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5324 4w/e 01/11/1958 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 18/04/1959 84G m/e 09/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82004 4w/e 11/08/1956 84H Wellington 4w/e 13/06/1959 84G 4w/e 05/09/1959 84H Wellington
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82009 4w/e 08/09/1956 84H Wellington 4w/e 13/06/1959 84G 4w/e 05/09/1959 84H Wellington
Steam Castle 4-6-0 4081 on 02/12/1958 82A Bristol Bath Road on 18/06/1959 84G on 15/07/1959 82A Bristol Bath Road
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3207 4w/e 29/11/1958 84K Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 11/07/1959 84G 4w/e 18/06/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48347 4w/e 18/04/1959 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 11/07/1959 84G 4w/e 30/12/1961 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5971 4w/e 31/12/1950 85A Worcester 4w/e 08/08/1959 84G 4w/e 15/12/1962 81C Southall
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9463 4w/e 29/11/1958 81B Slough 4w/e 08/08/1959 84G on 14/07/1963 81A Old Oak Common
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5564 8w/e 20/04/1957 86G Pontypool Road 4w/e 05/09/1959 84G 4w/e 30/01/1960 83E St Blazey
Steam 28xx 2-8-0 3836 4w/e 13/06/1959 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 03/10/1959 84G 4w/e 30/11/1963 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5167 4w/e 18/06/1955 84H Wellington 4w/e 03/10/1959 84G 4w/e 30/01/1960 84E Tyseley
Steam County 4-6-0 1022 4w/e 08/08/1959 85C Hereford 4w/e 31/10/1959 84G on 05/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5110       4w/e 31/10/1959 84G 4w/e 28/11/1959 85A Worcester
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48737 4w/e 05/09/1959 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959 84G 4w/e 30/12/1961 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48768 4w/e 05/09/1959 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/10/1959 84G w/e 20/06/1964 5D Stoke
Steam Castle 4-6-0 7015 on 28/05/1959 84A Stafford Road on 04/11/1959 84G on 07/09/1962 To Store
Steam 45xx 2-6-2T 4564 4w/e 18/04/1959 83G Penzance 4w/e 26/12/1959 84G 4w/e 28/09/1963 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4644       4w/e 26/12/1959 84G 4w/e 30/01/1960 81A Old Oak Common
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5942 4w/e 03/10/1959 81F Oxford 4w/e 26/12/1959 84G w/e 22/06/1963 84E Tyseley
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6922 4w/e 09/10/1954 81F Oxford 4w/e 26/12/1959 84G w/e 07/11/1964 2A Tyseley
Steam Unclassified 0-4-0ST 1143       4w/e 26/12/1959 84G on 16/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82020 4w/e 03/11/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 30/01/1960 84G 4w/e 26/03/1960 89C Machynlleth
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82021 4w/e 03/11/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 30/01/1960 84G 4w/e 26/03/1960 89C Machynlleth
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5070 on 18/03/1940 SRD Stafford Road on 10/02/1960 84G on 07/09/1962 To Store
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6904 4w/e 05/09/1959 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 27/02/1960 84G 4w/e 08/10/1960 84F Stourbridge Junction
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40110 4w/e 30/01/1960 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 27/02/1960 84G on 23/04/1961 6A Chester (MR)
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4957 4w/e 27/02/1960 83B Taunton 4w/e 26/03/1960 84G 4w/e 21/05/1960 82D Westbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6949 4w/e 30/01/1960 83B Taunton 4w/e 26/03/1960 84G m/e 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40126 4w/e 30/01/1960 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 26/03/1960 84G 4w/e 16/07/1960 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40205 4w/e 30/01/1960 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 26/03/1960 84G on 23/04/1961 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41240 4w/e 03/10/1953 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 26/03/1960 84G 4w/e 23/04/1960 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 4080 on 13/05/1959 83A Newton Abbot on 22/04/1960 84G on 02/08/1960 86C Cardiff Canton
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4946 4w/e 30/01/1960 8313   4w/e 23/04/1960 84G m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73021 w/e 11/04/1959 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 23/04/1960 84G 4w/e 21/05/1960 87F Llanelly
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73024 w/e 11/04/1959 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 23/04/1960 84G 4w/e 14/07/1962 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73049 5w/e 12/08/1955 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 23/04/1960 84G 4w/e 16/06/1962 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5059 on 02/04/1958 84A Stafford Road on 17/05/1960 84G on 22/06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2214 4w/e 06/11/1954 81E Didcot 4w/e 21/05/1960 84G 4w/e 10/09/1960 89C Machynlleth
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2222 4w/e 27/12/1952 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 21/05/1960 84G 4w/e 18/06/1960 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2276       4w/e 21/05/1960 84G 4w/e 17/06/1961 89C Machynlleth
Steam Grange 4-6-0 6858 4w/e 23/04/1960 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 21/05/1960 84G 4w/e 16/07/1960 84F Stourbridge Junction
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3748 4w/e 18/06/1960 84E Tyseley 4w/e 16/07/1960 84G 4w/e 09/09/1961 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam Castle 4-6-0 7025 m/e 08/1949 PDN Old Oak Common (New) on 02/08/1960 84G on 06/10/1962 85A Worcester
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3205 4w/e 08/10/1955 85A Worcester 4w/e 13/08/1960 84G 4w/e 22/04/1961 89C Machynlleth
Steam Castle 4-6-0 5095 on 24/06/1958 86C Cardiff Canton on 08/09/1960 84G on 16/08/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3970 4w/e 16/07/1960 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 08/10/1960 89A w/e 19/06/1971 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6374 4w/e 08/10/1960 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 05/11/1960 89A m/e 08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 74xx 0-6-0PT 7431       4w/e 05/11/1960 89A 4w/e 25/02/1961 89B Croes Newydd
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9741 4w/e 15/06/1957 84H Wellington 4w/e 05/11/1960 89A 4w/e 03/12/1960 84H Wellington
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40086 4w/e 30/01/1960 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 05/11/1960 89A on 23/04/1961 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6342 4w/e 01/11/1958 89A Oswestry 4w/e 03/12/1960 89A m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2251 0-6-0 2214 4w/e 10/09/1960 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 31/12/1960 89A 5w/e 31/08/1963 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48418 w/e 11/04/1959 84E Tyseley 4w/e 31/12/1960 89A m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam County 4-6-0 1017 4w/e 31/12/1960 83D Laira 4w/e 28/01/1961 89A on 19/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6915 4w/e 04/10/1958 81E Didcot 4w/e 25/02/1961 89A w/e 18/07/1964 2D Banbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5991 4w/e 31/08/1950 84B Oxley 4w/e 22/04/1961 89A m/e 07/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6934 4w/e 16/07/1960 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 22/04/1961 89A w/e 24/10/1964 2D Banbury
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82005 w/e 09/04/1960 6A Chester (MR) on 23/04/1961 89A 4w/e 15/07/1961 89C Machynlleth
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82032 w/e 09/04/1960 6A Chester (MR) on 23/04/1961 89A 4w/e 12/08/1961 89C Machynlleth
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3205 4w/e 22/04/1961 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 17/06/1961 89A 4w/e 12/01/1963 86C Hereford
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6380 w/e 14/05/1960 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 17/06/1961 89A 4w/e 30/11/1963 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5538 4w/e 17/06/1961 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 15/07/1961 89A m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 5555 4w/e 17/06/1961 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 15/07/1961 89A 4w/e 07/10/1961 83C Exeter
Steam 2251 0-6-0 3204 on 17/02/1960 85A Worcester 4w/e 12/08/1961 89A 4w/e 12/01/1963 86C Hereford
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7300 4w/e 27/02/1960 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 07/10/1961 89A m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7314 4w/e 18/06/1960 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 07/10/1961 89A 4w/e 08/09/1962 89B Croes Newydd
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45572 4w/e 05/11/1955 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 07/10/1961 89A w/e 04/01/1964 1A Willesden
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45577 4w/e 06/09/1952 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 07/10/1961 89A on 05/09/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45651 3w/e 24/01/1953 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 07/10/1961 89A on 23/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45660 on 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 07/10/1961 89A w/e 18/07/1964 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45662 on 01/01/1948 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 07/10/1961 89A on 23/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45699 on 01/01/1948 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 07/10/1961 89A on 21/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82002 on 23/04/1961 82G Templecombe (S&D) 4w/e 04/11/1961 89A 4w/e 06/10/1962 86C Hereford
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82032 4w/e 12/08/1961 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 02/12/1961 89A w/e 27/06/1964 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 82036 on 23/04/1961 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 02/12/1961 89A 4w/e 14/07/1962 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48436 4w/e 07/10/1961 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 30/12/1961 89A w/e 11/02/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48471 4w/e 07/10/1961 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 30/12/1961 89A w/e 28/05/1966 9D Newton Heath
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48404 4w/e 09/09/1961 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 24/02/1962 89A m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4617 4w/e 30/11/1950 84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 24/03/1962 89A m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41202 4w/e 24/03/1962 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 21/04/1962 89A w/e 01/02/1964 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41203 4w/e 24/03/1962 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 21/04/1962 89A m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1632 on 23/01/1951 85B Gloucester Horton Road (New) 4w/e 19/05/1962 89A 4w/e 14/07/1962 89B Croes Newydd
Steam Castle 4-6-0 4090 on 17/04/1962 98S   on 14/07/1962 89A on 07/09/1962 To Store
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4924 4w/e 05/11/1960 83C Exeter 4w/e 14/07/1962 89A 4w/e 03/11/1962 82C Swindon
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4944 4w/e 01/11/1958 83C Exeter 4w/e 14/07/1962 89A 4w/e 11/08/1962 81C Southall
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80078 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford on 15/07/1962 89A w/e 23/02/1963 89B Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80096 w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury on 15/07/1962 89A 2w/e 17/11/1962 89B Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80100 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford on 15/07/1962 89A on 24/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80101 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford on 15/07/1962 89A 4w/e 08/09/1962 89C Machynlleth
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80135 w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury on 15/07/1962 89A 4w/e 09/02/1963 89D Oswestry
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80136 w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury on 15/07/1962 89A 4w/e 09/02/1963 89D Oswestry
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80098 on 15/07/1962 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 08/09/1962 89A 2w/e 17/11/1962 89B Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80105 on 15/07/1962 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 08/09/1962 89A 4w/e 06/10/1962 89C Machynlleth
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80131 on 15/07/1962 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 08/09/1962 89A 4w/e 09/02/1963 89D Oswestry
Steam County 4-6-0 1019 4w/e 16/06/1962 82C Swindon 4w/e 06/10/1962 89A w/e 16/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam County 4-6-0 1023 4w/e 25/03/1961 82C Swindon 4w/e 06/10/1962 89A w/e 02/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41240 4w/e 10/09/1960 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 06/10/1962 89A m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam County 4-6-0 1002 4w/e 25/02/1961 81E Didcot 4w/e 03/11/1962 89A on 09/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5962 4w/e 08/09/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 03/11/1962 89A 2w/e 17/11/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6375 4w/e 14/07/1962 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 03/11/1962 89A 4w/e 29/06/1963 87G Carmarthen
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 7314 4w/e 08/09/1962 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 03/11/1962 89A m/e 02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3709 4w/e 16/06/1962 82C Swindon 2w/e 17/11/1962 89A w/e 06/11/1965 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5994 4w/e 12/08/1961 83C Exeter 4w/e 15/12/1962 89A w/e 09/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80070 on 15/07/1962 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 15/12/1962 89A w/e 23/02/1963 89B Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80102 on 15/07/1962 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 15/12/1962 89A w/e 27/06/1964 6H Bangor
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80132 on 15/07/1962 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 15/12/1962 89A 4w/e 09/02/1963 89D Oswestry
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41209 4w/e 03/11/1962 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 15/12/1962 89A w/e 17/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48757 w/e 15/09/1962 5B Crewe South w/e 26/01/1963 89A w/e 16/03/1963 5B Crewe South
Steam County 4-6-0 1008 4w/e 06/10/1962 87H Neyland 4w/e 09/02/1963 89A w/e 02/03/1963 89A Shrewsbury
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7800 4w/e 06/09/1958 89A Oswestry 4w/e 09/02/1963 89A m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7801 4w/e 06/09/1958 89A Oswestry 4w/e 09/02/1963 89A m/e 07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7809 4w/e 18/04/1959 89A Oswestry 4w/e 09/02/1963 89A w/e 13/04/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7812 4w/e 02/12/1961 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 09/02/1963 89A m/e 11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7819       4w/e 09/02/1963 89A w/e 09/03/1963 89C Machynlleth
Steam County 4-6-0 1008 4w/e 09/02/1963 89A Shrewsbury w/e 02/03/1963 89A on 08/09/1963 82C Swindon
Steam County 4-6-0 1027 4w/e 07/10/1961 87H Neyland w/e 02/03/1963 89A on 08/09/1963 82C Swindon
Steam County 4-6-0 1014 4w/e 07/10/1961 87H Neyland 4w/e 09/03/1963 89A w/e 30/03/1963 89A Shrewsbury
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80070 w/e 23/02/1963 89B Croes Newydd w/e 09/03/1963 89A w/e 01/05/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46524 4w/e 21/03/1959 89A Oswestry 4w/e 09/03/1963 89A w/e 20/02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46525 4w/e 06/10/1962 89D Oswestry 4w/e 09/03/1963 89A w/e 12/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73024 4w/e 06/10/1962 85C Gloucester Barnwood on 18/03/1963 89A on 09/09/1963 83E Yeovil Town
Steam County 4-6-0 1014 4w/e 09/03/1963 89A Shrewsbury w/e 30/03/1963 89A on 08/09/1963 82C Swindon
Steam Modified Hall 4-6-0 6994 4w/e 24/02/1962 81C Southall w/e 30/03/1963 89A w/e 20/06/1964 2B Oxley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73003 4w/e 25/01/1958 22A Bristol Barrow Road w/e 30/03/1963 89A on 08/09/1963 83E Yeovil Town
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1663 2w/e 17/11/1962 89D Oswestry w/e 06/04/1963 89A w/e 04/05/1963 89B Croes Newydd
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7820 4w/e 08/09/1962 88L Cardiff East Dock on 15/05/1963 89A w/e 31/10/1964 2B Oxley
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3754       on 14/07/1963 89A w/e 13/11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9641       on 14/07/1963 89A w/e 07/11/1964 2C Stourbridge Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41207 m/e 16/06/1956 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 27/07/1963 89A on 11/08/1963 89A Shrewsbury
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41304 4w/e 13/08/1960 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 27/07/1963 89A on 11/08/1963 89A Shrewsbury
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41207 4w/e 27/07/1963 89A Shrewsbury on 11/08/1963 89A w/e 21/08/1965 10J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41304 4w/e 27/07/1963 89A Shrewsbury on 11/08/1963 89A w/e 07/08/1965 8K Bank Hall
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3956 4w/e 18/06/1960 84E Tyseley w/e 31/08/1963 89A w/e 02/11/1963 5B Crewe South
Steam Hall 4-6-0 4933 w/e 22/06/1963 84E Tyseley w/e 14/09/1963 6D m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Hall 4-6-0 5942 w/e 22/06/1963 84E Tyseley w/e 14/09/1963 6D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48020 w/e 28/09/1963 6C Croes Newydd w/e 05/10/1963 6D w/e 19/09/1964 1H Northampton
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48269 w/e 28/09/1963 6C Croes Newydd w/e 05/10/1963 6D w/e 20/06/1964 6B Mold Junction
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6903 4w/e 21/02/1959 86G Pontypool Road w/e 25/01/1964 6D w/e 18/07/1964 2D Banbury
Steam Hall 4-6-0 6907 4w/e 08/10/1955 84B Oxley w/e 25/01/1964 6D w/e 20/06/1964 2D Banbury
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45272 4w/e 04/12/1954 21A Saltley w/e 18/04/1964 6D w/e 20/06/1964 5A Crewe North
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73050 6w/e 13/04/1964 87F Llanelly w/e 25/04/1964 6D w/e 30/04/1966 9J Agecroft
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73094 on 07/02/1964 Withdrawn w/e 23/05/1964 (R) 6D w/e 24/07/1965 9H Patricroft
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41202 w/e 01/02/1964 6C Croes Newydd w/e 13/06/1964 6D w/e 20/06/1964 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73045 w/e 30/06/1962 2F Woodford Halse w/e 20/06/1964 6D w/e 19/09/1964 5E Nuneaton
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73070 w/e 07/03/1964 1E Bletchley w/e 20/06/1964 6D w/e 30/04/1966 9K Bolton
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73047 5w/e 12/08/1955 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) on 12/07/1964 6D w/e 05/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73053 w/e 03/08/1963 2F Woodford Halse w/e 18/07/1964 6D w/e 24/07/1965 9H Patricroft
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73167 w/e 14/09/1963 70B Feltham w/e 15/08/1964 6D w/e 07/08/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 6P 4-6-0 45660 w/e 18/07/1964 6A Chester (MR) w/e 05/09/1964 6D w/e 12/09/1964 55A Holbeck (MR)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75014 w/e 20/06/1964 2A Tyseley w/e 19/09/1964 6D w/e 31/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75053 w/e 21/09/1963 5D Stoke w/e 19/09/1964 6D w/e 10/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75055 w/e 25/05/1963 1E Bletchley w/e 19/09/1964 6D w/e 10/10/1964 1E Bletchley
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75063 w/e 25/05/1963 2B Nuneaton w/e 19/09/1964 6D w/e 28/05/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80048 4w/e 06/10/1956 6A Chester (MR) w/e 19/09/1964 6D on 17/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80102 w/e 27/06/1964 6H Bangor w/e 19/09/1964 6D w/e 01/05/1965 70D Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80135 4w/e 09/02/1963 89D Oswestry w/e 19/09/1964 6D on 24/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80136 w/e 27/06/1964 6F Machynlleth w/e 19/09/1964 6D on 24/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75038 m/e 08/1953 1E Bletchley (New) w/e 10/10/1964 6D w/e 25/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7802 w/e 14/09/1963 6F Machynlleth w/e 23/01/1965 6D m/e 11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7803 w/e 09/03/1963 89C Machynlleth w/e 23/01/1965 6D m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7819 w/e 09/03/1963 89C Machynlleth w/e 23/01/1965 6D m/e 11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7822 w/e 14/12/1963 6F Machynlleth w/e 23/01/1965 6D m/e 11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7827 w/e 14/12/1963 6F Machynlleth w/e 23/01/1965 6D m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7828 w/e 09/03/1963 89C Machynlleth w/e 23/01/1965 6D m/e 10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48122 w/e 28/11/1964 6E Oswestry w/e 23/01/1965 6D w/e 07/08/1965 6B Mold Junction
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48345 w/e 28/11/1964 6E Oswestry w/e 23/01/1965 6D w/e 07/08/1965 6B Mold Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46510 on 09/12/1952 89A Oswestry (New) w/e 23/01/1965 6D m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46511 on 12/12/1952 89A Oswestry (New) w/e 23/01/1965 6D m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46512 on 16/12/1952 89A Oswestry (New) w/e 23/01/1965 6D w/e 06/02/1965 1A Willesden
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46519 w/e 09/03/1963 89C Machynlleth w/e 27/02/1965 6D w/e 02/10/1965 5E Nuneaton
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73025 w/e 23/01/1965 2B Oxley w/e 06/03/1965 6D w/e 30/04/1966 9J Agecroft
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73090 w/e 23/01/1965 2B Oxley w/e 06/03/1965 6D w/e 09/10/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73000 w/e 16/01/1965 2B Oxley w/e 03/04/1965 6D w/e 30/04/1966 9J Agecroft
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73067 w/e 16/01/1965 2B Oxley w/e 03/04/1965 6D w/e 30/04/1966 9J Agecroft
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73071 w/e 16/01/1965 2B Oxley w/e 03/04/1965 6D w/e 24/07/1965 9H Patricroft
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75016 w/e 25/05/1963 2B Nuneaton w/e 19/06/1965 6D w/e 11/03/1967 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80072 on 08/09/1963 2L Leamington w/e 19/06/1965 6D on 24/07/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46512 w/e 06/02/1965 1A Willesden w/e 26/06/1965 6D w/e 02/10/1965 5E Nuneaton
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73038 w/e 06/03/1965 5E Nuneaton w/e 24/07/1965 6D m/e 09/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7820 w/e 31/10/1964 2B Oxley w/e 02/10/1965 6D m/e 11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Manor 4-6-0 7821 w/e 07/11/1964 2B Oxley w/e 02/10/1965 6D m/e 11/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78035 w/e 03/04/1965 1A Willesden w/e 02/10/1965 6D m/e 12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78038 w/e 25/05/1963 1A Willesden w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 20/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78058 w/e 19/06/1965 1A Willesden w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 10/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78060 w/e 25/05/1963 1A Willesden w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 08/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44814 w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44821 w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44966 w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 17/09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44981 w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 14/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45045 w/e 02/03/1963 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 27/11/1965 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45132 w/e 20/06/1964 6J Holyhead w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 04/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45143 w/e 10/10/1964 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 11/12/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45145 w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45185 w/e 22/06/1963 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 02/10/1965 6D m/e 06/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45311 w/e 05/05/1962 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 29/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45348 w/e 11/05/1963 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 02/10/1965 6D w/e 13/08/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45058 w/e 06/03/1965 2J Aston w/e 16/10/1965 6D w/e 08/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45430 w/e 22/11/1958 3D Aston w/e 16/10/1965 6D m/e 09/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75006 w/e 17/07/1965 2A Tyseley w/e 06/11/1965 6D w/e 11/03/1967 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44775 w/e 19/06/1965 6B Mold Junction w/e 11/12/1965 6D w/e 10/12/1966 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75020 w/e 16/01/1965 5D Stoke w/e 03/01/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 8L Aintree
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78003 w/e 02/10/1965 5E Nuneaton w/e 15/01/1966 6D w/e 17/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75004 4w/e 03/11/1962 89C Machynlleth w/e 29/01/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75012 w/e 05/03/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 19/03/1966 6D w/e 16/07/1966 6D Shrewsbury
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75021 w/e 09/03/1963 89B Croes Newydd w/e 19/03/1966 6D w/e 16/07/1966 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78018 w/e 02/10/1965 5E Nuneaton w/e 23/04/1966 6D w/e 12/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78039 w/e 02/10/1965 5E Nuneaton w/e 23/04/1966 6D w/e 01/10/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78063 w/e 02/10/1965 5E Nuneaton w/e 23/04/1966 6D w/e 10/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44800 on 01/01/1948 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44897 w/e 21/09/1963 6B Mold Junction w/e 23/04/1966 6D w/e 18/03/1967 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8718 m/e 07/1966 Withdrawn w/e 16/07/1966 (R) 6D      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75012 w/e 19/03/1966 6D Shrewsbury w/e 16/07/1966 6D w/e 28/01/1967 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75029 w/e 19/06/1965 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 03/09/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45310 w/e 04/06/1966 6J Holyhead w/e 10/09/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 5B Crewe South
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44711 w/e 22/06/1963 6J Holyhead w/e 17/09/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44777 w/e 16/04/1966 2B Oxley w/e 17/09/1966 6D w/e 18/03/1967 8A Edge Hill
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44780 w/e 02/10/1965 2A Tyseley w/e 17/09/1966 6D w/e 18/03/1967 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44942 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 17/09/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44971 w/e 23/07/1966 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 17/09/1966 6D w/e 01/04/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45134 w/e 02/10/1965 2A Tyseley w/e 17/09/1966 6D w/e 10/12/1966 10A Carnforth
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45149 w/e 10/03/1962 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 17/09/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 10D Lostock Hall
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45279 w/e 02/11/1963 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 17/09/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45287 w/e 02/10/1965 2A Tyseley w/e 17/09/1966 6D w/e 18/03/1967 8A Edge Hill
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45447 w/e 19/06/1965 6J Holyhead w/e 17/09/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45493 w/e 02/10/1965 2D Banbury w/e 17/09/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 12A Carlisle Kingmoor
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78017 w/e 28/04/1962 5D Stoke w/e 08/10/1966 6D w/e 10/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78036 w/e 25/05/1963 5B Crewe South w/e 12/11/1966 6D w/e 03/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 44661 w/e 02/10/1965 2A Tyseley w/e 12/11/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45051 w/e 02/10/1965 2A Tyseley w/e 12/11/1966 6D w/e 19/11/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 45052 w/e 02/10/1965 2A Tyseley w/e 12/11/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 6A Chester (MR)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3049 w/e 15/10/1966 2E Saltley w/e 10/12/1966 6D w/e 19/06/1971 5A Crewe Diesel
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75009 w/e 16/07/1966 6F Machynlleth w/e 10/12/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75013 w/e 19/06/1965 6F Machynlleth w/e 10/12/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75055 w/e 19/06/1965 6F Machynlleth w/e 10/12/1966 6D w/e 11/03/1967 6C Croes Newydd
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46446 w/e 25/05/1963 89C Machynlleth w/e 10/12/1966 6D w/e 17/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46508 w/e 06/08/1966 6F Machynlleth w/e 10/12/1966 6D w/e 17/12/1966 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75033 w/e 21/05/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 21/01/1967 6D w/e 11/03/1967 6C Croes Newydd
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75047 w/e 10/12/1966 6C Croes Newydd w/e 21/01/1967 6D w/e 11/03/1967 6C Croes Newydd
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3035 on 28/11/1953 84B Oxley (New) w/e 11/03/1967 6D w/e 19/06/1971 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3039 on 28/11/1953 84B Oxley (New) w/e 11/03/1967 6D w/e 25/03/1967 2B Oxley
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3028 4w/e 16/07/1960 84B Oxley w/e 25/03/1967 6D w/e 19/06/1971 5A Crewe Diesel
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3510 4w/e 30/09/1967 Hookagate PAD   w/e 12/10/1968 6D w/e 19/06/1971 5A Crewe Diesel