Type |
Class |
Wheels |
Number |
|
Date to Previous Shed |
Code |
Previous Shed |
|
Date to Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Code |
|
Date to Next Shed |
Code |
Next Shed |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
2951 |
on |
17/11/1933 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby (New) |
w/e |
13/07/1935 |
10A |
w/e |
05/10/1935 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
13252 |
on |
21/12/1933 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor (New) |
w/e |
13/07/1935 |
10A |
w/e |
05/10/1935 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
12023 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
10A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
12053 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
10A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
Coal Engine Saddle Tank |
0-6-0ST |
27477 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
10A |
m/e |
10/1939 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Coal Engine Saddle Tank |
0-6-0ST |
27484 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
10A |
m/e |
01/1946 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Coal Engine Saddle Tank |
0-6-0ST |
27492 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
10A |
m/e |
06/1939 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
7476 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
10A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7C |
Holyhead |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
8598 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
10A |
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
25730 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
10A |
m/e |
12/1936 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
25756 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
10A |
m/e |
12/1938 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
2974 |
w/e |
16/11/1935 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
13/11/1937 |
10A |
w/e |
05/03/1938 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
2979 |
w/e |
09/11/1935 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
13/11/1937 |
10A |
w/e |
05/03/1938 |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5294 |
|
|
|
|
m/e |
12/1937 (New) |
10A |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9A |
Longsight |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
2961 |
w/e |
03/07/1937 |
3D |
Aston |
w/e |
02/07/1938 |
10A |
w/e |
29/10/1938 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
2981 |
w/e |
25/09/1937 |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
02/07/1938 |
10A |
w/e |
05/11/1938 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
2984 |
w/e |
25/09/1937 |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
02/07/1938 |
10A |
w/e |
03/12/1938 |
2A |
Rugby |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
12021 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
27/08/1955 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
12022 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
10C |
Patricroft |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
12023 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
12024 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
22/05/1954 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
12032 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
12045 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
10C |
Patricroft |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
12053 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
25A |
Wakefield |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
12063 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
12064 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
10B |
Preston |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12172 |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
7D |
Rhyl |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52208 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12269 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
9043 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9029 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
1A |
Willesden |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9014 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
10B |
Preston |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9053 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9023 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
11A |
Carnforth |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9026 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
9030 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
23/06/1951 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9024 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
8930 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
3A |
Bescot |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9149 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9090 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
on |
16/12/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9124 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
3B |
Bushbury |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9125 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
1C |
Watford |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9129 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
11A |
Carnforth |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
9134 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
10B |
Preston |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9141 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
10B |
Preston |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
9422 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
2B |
Bletchley |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
9424 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
9159 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9176 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
2w/e |
14/01/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9192 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
10B |
Preston |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
9197 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9207 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
4w/e |
16/07/1949 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
9221 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9257 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9306 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9310 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
4A |
Bletchley |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9311 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
10/10/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7885 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7888 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
on |
04/12/1948 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
7896 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
on |
04/11/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2303 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
2B |
Bletchley |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2379 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2455 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2456 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2465 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2539 |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
1C |
Watford |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2563 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
10C |
Patricroft |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2572 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
on |
11/01/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2588 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
397 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
10B |
Preston |
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
561 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4892 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
10B |
Preston |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5019 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
10C |
Patricroft |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5030 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
5B |
Crewe South |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5141 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
12B |
Carlisle Canal |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5413 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5425 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
10C |
Patricroft |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5449 |
|
|
|
|
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2348 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5E |
Alsager |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
2B |
Bletchley |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9331 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
w/e |
24/01/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
28559 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
12D |
Workington |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
8962 |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
9190 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
10C |
Patricroft |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9341 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
23/03/1957 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12140 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
10A |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12233 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12250 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12269 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
7B |
Bangor |
Steam |
Precursor |
4-4-0 |
5235 |
m/e |
04/1935 |
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
10/04/1948 (R) |
10A |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5070 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
28594 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
9208 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
9263 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9018 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20B |
Stourton |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
12/08/1950 |
4A |
Bletchley |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9023 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
11A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
9259 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
52023 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49264 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
13/01/1951 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
2442 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
10A |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
10C |
Patricroft |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42610 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
10A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
48929 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
10A |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
48929 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
10A |
w/e |
29/07/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49306 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
10A |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42465 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
|
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
10A |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45045 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49352 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12341 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10B |
Preston |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
10A |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
47881 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
21/07/1951 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
49092 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
03/03/1951 |
3A |
Bescot |
Steam |
568 |
0-6-0 |
52051 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10B |
Preston |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
04/02/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
103 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
8E |
Brunswick |
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40144 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9394 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
9402 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
28525 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
21/04/1951 |
8D |
Widnes |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42454 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10C |
Patricroft |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
10A |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
5D |
Stoke |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45313 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7C |
Holyhead |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
10A |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45495 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
7C |
Holyhead |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
10A |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
10C |
Patricroft |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
9346 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
3B |
Bushbury |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42453 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
10A |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
10C |
Patricroft |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52107 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
10A |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
7D |
Rhyl |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
49032 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
10A |
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49378 |
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49228 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49378 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49228 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
21/01/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52126 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
10A |
m/e |
05/1951 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49381 |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
47884 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
28616 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
20/05/1950 |
5D |
Stoke |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49081 |
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
08/04/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
23/09/1950 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49268 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
22/04/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42266 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
10A |
8w/e |
17/04/1954 |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
48895 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
27/05/1950 |
10A |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
58398 |
w/e |
27/05/1950 |
8D |
Widnes |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
10A |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
49050 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3A |
Bescot |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
10A |
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
48895 |
w/e |
27/05/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
18/08/1962 |
21C |
Bushbury |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49160 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3A |
Bescot |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
10B |
Preston |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45235 |
w/e |
13/05/1950 |
11A |
Carnforth |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
10A |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
10B |
Preston |
Steam |
1185 |
0-8-2T |
47877 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
12/08/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
21/02/1953 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9034 |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
5C |
Stafford |
w/e |
19/08/1950 |
10A |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49018 |
w/e |
12/08/1950 |
4A |
Bletchley |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
10A |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9034 |
w/e |
19/08/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49018 |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
10A |
on |
05/09/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44708 |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
10B |
Preston |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
10A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45026 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
10C |
Patricroft |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
10A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45289 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
10A |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44708 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
5B |
Crewe South |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45026 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45289 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
10A |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
58368 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
3B |
Bushbury |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
10A |
m/e |
06/1951 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49393 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
1C |
Watford |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
10A |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49163 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
10A |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49393 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
22/06/1957 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49163 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
08/12/1951 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45313 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
06/02/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49408 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
10A |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
58398 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
16/02/1952 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
58418 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
10A |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49401 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
10A |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49436 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
10A |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
58418 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
7D |
Rhyl |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49401 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
02/01/1960 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49436 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9007 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2B |
Bletchley |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49288 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
15A |
Wellingborough |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49322 |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9007 |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49253 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
15/03/1952 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49288 |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49322 |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
10/03/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46428 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
10B |
Preston |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
10F |
Lower Ince |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46430 |
on |
11/12/1948 |
10B |
Preston (New) |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
7D |
Rhyl |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45454 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45454 |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
10B |
Preston |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49025 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9385 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
4A |
Bletchley |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49144 |
w/e |
01/09/1951 |
4A |
Bletchley |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49025 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
5B |
Crewe South |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
9385 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
21/12/1957 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49154 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2B |
Bletchley |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46430 |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
7D |
Rhyl |
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
10B |
Preston |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
58396 |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
12D |
Workington |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
10A |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
8D |
Widnes |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52598 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
10B |
Preston |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
09/08/1952 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45408 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10C |
Patricroft |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
10A |
w/e |
05/08/1961 |
5D |
Stoke |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45249 |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
10C |
Patricroft |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
10A |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45425 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
10C |
Patricroft |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
10A |
w/e |
21/10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
58377 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
10A |
w/e |
21/06/1952 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46428 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
10F |
Lower Ince |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
6K |
Rhyl |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65144 |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
10F |
Lower Ince |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65148 |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
on |
10/12/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65151 |
on |
24/03/1952 |
|
Withdrawn |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 (R) |
10A |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65159 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
w/e |
21/12/1957 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65162 |
m/e |
01/1936 |
NTH |
Northwich |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
on |
13/12/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65164 |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
10F |
Lower Ince |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65170 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65173 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
on |
14/12/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65175 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
m/e |
03/1958 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65176 |
m/e |
12/1935 |
WIG |
Lower Ince |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
on |
07/12/1956 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65189 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
w/e |
22/09/1952 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65196 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
8E |
Brunswick |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65199 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65203 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
15/12/1956 |
51A |
Darlington |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52107 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
7D |
Rhyl |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
10A |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
898 |
0-6-0 |
52551 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
6H |
Bangor |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52107 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
10A |
w/e |
07/03/1953 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46432 |
|
|
|
|
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
6K |
Rhyl |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52322 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2D |
Nuneaton |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52118 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
10A |
on |
04/09/1954 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45055 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10C |
Patricroft |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45235 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
10B |
Preston |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
5A |
Crewe North |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52449 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
10A |
m/e |
10/1957 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46489 |
|
|
|
|
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
12D |
Workington |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42663 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
6H |
Bangor |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
10A |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
5D |
Stoke |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42666 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
5A |
Crewe North |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
10A |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
40003 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
10B |
Preston |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
10A |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52143 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
10C |
Patricroft |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
10A |
w/e |
26/10/1957 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42462 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
9A |
Longsight |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
10A |
w/e |
04/02/1961 |
65C |
Parkhead |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45289 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
10A |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42121 |
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
1C |
Watford |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
10A |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
8E |
Brunswick |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46434 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
6K |
Rhyl |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
10A |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45004 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
10A |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
1E |
Bletchley |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45135 |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
10A |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
27C |
Southport |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45314 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
10A |
m/e |
10/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49155 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
10A |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46448 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
12D |
Workington |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
10A |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42423 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
27B |
Greenock Ladyburn |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
10A |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46448 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
10A |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52366 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
10A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49144 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
10A |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49203 |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
10A |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49315 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
10A |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46428 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
6K |
Rhyl |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
10A |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
21B |
Bescot |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45347 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
10A |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49093 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
10A |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
1E |
Bletchley |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44827 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
5A |
Crewe North |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
10A |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
5B |
Crewe South |
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
58203 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
10C |
Patricroft |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
10A |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52393 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
10A |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65131 |
w/e |
14/04/1951 |
9G |
Northwich |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
10A |
on |
28/03/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49007 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
10A |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46422 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
8D |
Widnes |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
10A |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
12D |
Kirkby Stephen |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49073 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8D |
Widnes |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
10A |
w/e |
11/01/1958 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46459 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
10A |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
48915 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1C |
Watford |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
10A |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49145 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1C |
Watford |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
10A |
w/e |
04/01/1958 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49323 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1C |
Watford |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
10A |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42465 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
10A |
on |
13/02/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45057 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
10A |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
898 |
0-6-0 |
52551 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
6H |
Bangor |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
10A |
w/e |
23/03/1957 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65138 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
8D |
Widnes |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
10A |
on |
08/08/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65140 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
10A |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65146 |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
10A |
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65156 |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
10A |
w/e |
15/02/1958 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65170 |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
10A |
w/e |
28/06/1958 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49025 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
5B |
Crewe South |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
10A |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42571 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
10A |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
2A |
Rugby |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42463 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
10A |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
24K |
Preston |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42235 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
10A |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
6H |
Bangor |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42119 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
5D |
Stoke |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
10A |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42120 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
10A |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49267 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
10B |
Preston |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
10A |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3367 |
|
|
|
|
on |
11/07/1957 (New) |
10A |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3368 |
|
|
|
|
on |
11/07/1957 (New) |
10A |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
24K |
Preston |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3369 |
|
|
|
|
on |
26/07/1957 (New) |
10A |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
24K |
Preston |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3370 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/08/1957 (New) |
10A |
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3371 |
|
|
|
|
on |
07/08/1957 (New) |
10A |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
24K |
Preston |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
13291 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
16A |
Nottingham |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
10A |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
5B |
Crewe South |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
13292 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
10A |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
5B |
Crewe South |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42471 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5E |
Alsager |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
10A |
on |
07/10/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52230 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7B |
Bangor |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
10A |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
52269 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
7B |
Bangor |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
10A |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
26E |
Lees (Oldham) |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49049 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
10A |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49321 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2C |
Northampton |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
10A |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42571 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
2A |
Rugby |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
10A |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44069 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
9A |
Longsight |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
12/10/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44280 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44303 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
8F |
m/e |
09/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49422 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
02/09/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46423 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
6K |
Rhyl |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
49139 |
w/e |
17/09/1955 |
|
Withdrawn |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 (R) |
8F |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44438 |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
12/03/1960 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49020 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
48905 |
w/e |
13/10/1951 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
8F |
on |
06/06/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12071 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
5B |
Crewe South |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12099 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
5B |
Crewe South |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12102 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
1A |
Willesden |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
5G |
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45092 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
6J |
Holyhead |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
02/04/1960 |
5B |
Crewe South |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49150 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
8D |
Widnes |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49079 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
08/11/1958 (R) |
8F |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65177 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65192 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
8F |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49438 |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
11A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
14/02/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49009 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90667 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
2F |
Market Harborough |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
8F |
m/e |
04/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90509 |
|
|
|
|
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45017 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
11A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
02/05/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
27C |
Southport |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45019 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
11A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
02/05/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
13/05/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44758 |
w/e |
31/01/1948 |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
9A |
Longsight |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45373 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12003 |
w/e |
18/10/1958 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12019 |
w/e |
11/12/1954 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
26/07/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
5B |
Crewe South |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49008 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
48942 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
49134 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
TESTS |
|
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49143 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
11A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49451 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65198 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
8D |
Widnes |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
26/08/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42235 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
6H |
Bangor |
w/e |
05/09/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
56A |
Wakefield |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45108 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
11/12/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45109 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45372 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
26/11/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44355 |
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
w/e |
24/10/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
6H |
Bangor |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44537 |
w/e |
03/01/1948 |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
w/e |
24/10/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44780 |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
9A |
Longsight |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45340 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
24K |
Preston |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
15/04/1961 |
24K |
Preston |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45431 |
w/e |
27/06/1959 |
24L |
Carnforth |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
J10 |
0-6-0 |
65157 |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
8D |
Widnes |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
26/08/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58120 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
8E |
Northwich |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
8E |
Northwich |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58123 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
8E |
Northwich |
w/e |
21/11/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
29/10/1960 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49141 |
w/e |
24/10/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
12/12/1959 (R) |
8F |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46447 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
12D |
Workington |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
8F |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3836 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/01/1960 (New) |
8F |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3837 |
|
|
|
|
on |
02/01/1960 (New) |
8F |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49191 |
w/e |
15/11/1958 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
w/e |
02/01/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
43973 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
5E |
Alsager |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
8F |
on |
09/07/1960 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47392 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47659 |
w/e |
29/11/1958 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
8D |
Widnes |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47669 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1B |
Camden |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47671 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1B |
Camden |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42303 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
8E |
Northwich |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42317 |
w/e |
17/10/1959 |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
06/05/1961 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47270 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
08/09/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47281 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46448 |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
w/e |
12/03/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
21B |
Bescot |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90702 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
w/e |
02/04/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
24K |
Preston |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90317 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90173 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90214 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
OXY |
Oxley |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
18B |
Westhouses |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90257 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
8F |
m/e |
07/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90686 |
4w/e |
07/08/1948 |
CHR |
Chester West |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
9G |
Gorton |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78017 |
5w/e |
24/04/1954 |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
6K |
Rhyl |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78019 |
m/e |
03/1954 |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen (New) |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
8E |
Northwich |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42564 |
w/e |
26/03/1960 |
2A |
Rugby |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
5D |
Stoke |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45092 |
w/e |
02/04/1960 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12003 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
19/08/1961 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49447 |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
2F |
Market Harborough |
w/e |
09/07/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49444 |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
2F |
Market Harborough |
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
58120 |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
8E |
Northwich |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
01/04/1961 |
2A |
Rugby |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44445 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
28/10/1961 |
24L |
Carnforth |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46470 |
5w/e |
22/01/1955 |
51H |
Kirkby Stephen |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
21D |
Aston |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45394 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
24L |
Carnforth |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42303 |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
8E |
Northwich |
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
27/10/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45388 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
1E |
Bletchley |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
8F |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47444 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
07/05/1966 |
8L |
Aintree |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47520 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
04/02/1961 |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49344 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49122 |
w/e |
22/07/1950 |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49164 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49352 |
w/e |
01/10/1960 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
04/03/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47659 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
8D |
Widnes |
w/e |
18/03/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
08/04/1961 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49142 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
11/04/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42607 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
15/04/1961 |
8F |
on |
01/02/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44076 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2C |
Northampton |
w/e |
22/04/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44121 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
16/01/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44125 |
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
24G |
Skipton |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12031 |
w/e |
30/10/1954 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
8F |
on |
30/12/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12032 |
w/e |
23/10/1954 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
8F |
on |
16/12/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46422 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
12D |
Kirkby Stephen |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12003 |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
19/08/1961 |
8F |
on |
18/11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45408 |
w/e |
05/08/1961 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
19/08/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
26/11/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49002 |
w/e |
28/01/1961 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49104 |
w/e |
14/11/1959 |
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
09/09/1961 (R) |
8F |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46161 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
24K |
Preston |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
5A |
Crewe North |
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46165 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
24K |
Preston |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
5A |
Crewe North |
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46167 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
24K |
Preston |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
30/06/1962 |
5A |
Crewe North |
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46168 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
24K |
Preston |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
8F |
on |
02/05/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
45521 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
8F |
on |
28/09/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42462 |
4w/e |
11/02/1961 |
65C |
Parkhead |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
8F |
on |
14/05/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47517 |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
w/e |
25/11/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45024 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
9A |
Longsight |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45281 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
8F |
m/e |
11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45024 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
8F |
w/e |
13/05/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
76022 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
21D |
Aston |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
76051 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
21D |
Aston |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42426 |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
9K |
Bolton |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42664 |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
56F |
Low Moor |
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
49431 |
w/e |
15/11/1958 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
49314 |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
2B |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
01/12/1962 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42327 |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
5C |
Stafford |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44110 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
21D |
Aston |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44301 |
w/e |
22/07/1961 |
21D |
Aston |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
8F |
m/e |
04/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44444 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
21D |
Aston |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
8F |
m/e |
09/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44492 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
3D |
Aston |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44514 |
w/e |
10/02/1962 |
21D |
Aston |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44517 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
5D |
Stoke |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90585 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
84C |
Banbury |
on |
15/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
9G |
Gorton |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90148 |
4w/e |
24/02/1962 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
on |
15/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90261 |
4w/e |
24/02/1962 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
on |
15/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
26B |
Agecroft |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90268 |
4w/e |
24/02/1962 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
on |
15/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
26B |
Agecroft |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90440 |
on |
06/08/1950 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90493 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
65D |
Dawsholm |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
36C |
Frodingham |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47314 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47493 |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
04/09/1965 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42751 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
9G |
Gorton |
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42777 |
w/e |
13/06/1960 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42894 |
w/e |
17/06/1961 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
15/08/1964 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45073 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45140 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
8F |
m/e |
09/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45055 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
27C |
Southport |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45070 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45188 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
6J |
Holyhead |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45278 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
6J |
Holyhead |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
10/06/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46128 |
w/e |
26/05/1962 |
5A |
Crewe North |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
8F |
on |
01/05/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
47603 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
06/10/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44246 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
10/11/1962 |
8F |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90140 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
8D |
Widnes |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
08/06/1963 |
26B |
Agecroft |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90423 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
8D |
Widnes |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
40E |
Colwick |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90157 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
8D |
Widnes |
w/e |
23/03/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90192 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
8D |
Widnes |
w/e |
23/03/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
04/05/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45380 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
27/07/1963 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44041 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
20F |
Skipton |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90585 |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
9G |
Gorton |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
8F |
m/e |
03/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90242 |
w/e |
23/03/1963 |
9G |
Gorton |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
16/11/1963 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90686 |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
9G |
Gorton |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44864 |
w/e |
08/10/1960 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45069 |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45181 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
24L |
Carnforth |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45244 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45312 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45329 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
24L |
Carnforth |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45375 |
w/e |
19/08/1961 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
27C |
Southport |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45413 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
26F |
Patricroft |
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46110 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90147 |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
8F |
m/e |
04/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90125 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
27B |
Aintree |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90535 |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
27B |
Aintree |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90173 |
w/e |
09/04/1960 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
11/07/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44302 |
w/e |
15/07/1961 |
21B |
Bescot |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
21/03/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44348 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
21B |
Bescot |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
21/03/1964 |
12D |
Workington |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44823 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
26B |
Agecroft |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
20/11/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
45531 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45296 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
26F |
Patricroft |
w/e |
26/10/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45385 |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
26F |
Patricroft |
w/e |
26/10/1963 |
8F |
m/e |
10/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44486 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44395 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
8F |
m/e |
12/1963 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44536 |
w/e |
24/10/1959 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
29/02/1964 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44548 |
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42601 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
6H |
Bangor |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
8F |
on |
03/04/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75011 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75039 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75041 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75042 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75044 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75051 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75057 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75059 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90183 |
w/e |
12/01/1963 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
29/05/1965 |
36C |
Frodingham |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75017 |
m/e |
01/1952 |
27C |
Southport (New) |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75019 |
m/e |
03/1952 |
27C |
Southport (New) |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42948 |
w/e |
24/11/1962 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
05/1965 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42977 |
w/e |
15/12/1962 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
8F |
w/e |
05/1965 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42959 |
w/e |
24/11/1962 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
21/12/1963 |
8F |
on |
25/12/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44041 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
10G |
Skipton |
w/e |
11/01/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
04/04/1964 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75058 |
w/e |
22/09/1962 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
25/01/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44486 |
w/e |
30/11/1963 |
10G |
Skipton |
w/e |
25/01/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
04/04/1964 |
9G |
Gorton |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42174 |
w/e |
03/08/1963 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
w/e |
25/01/1964 |
8F |
on |
07/08/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42560 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
w/e |
08/02/1964 |
8F |
on |
18/04/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90316 |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
9K |
Bolton |
w/e |
29/02/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
40E |
Colwick |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78037 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
24G |
Skipton |
w/e |
21/03/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78020 |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78027 |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78057 |
w/e |
11/05/1963 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78061 |
on |
13/10/1956 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) (New) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
78062 |
on |
20/10/1956 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) (New) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46419 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
26E |
Lees (Oldham) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
22/01/1966 |
8L |
Aintree |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46484 |
w/e |
09/06/1962 |
26E |
Lees (Oldham) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46486 |
w/e |
09/06/1962 |
26E |
Lees (Oldham) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
14/08/1965 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46487 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
9P |
Lees (Oldham) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
19/02/1966 |
8E |
Northwich |
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42730 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42734 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
42878 |
w/e |
22/02/1964 |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
9G |
Gorton |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42494 |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42554 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
9K |
Bolton |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42555 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
9K |
Bolton |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42589 |
w/e |
11/05/1963 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
on |
12/09/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42631 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
on |
12/09/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42634 |
w/e |
20/07/1963 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
on |
09/01/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42647 |
w/e |
26/10/1963 |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42680 |
w/e |
03/08/1963 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
10A |
Carnforth |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45218 |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
75015 |
w/e |
14/12/1963 |
8L |
Aintree |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
10G |
Skipton |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90369 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
10A |
Carnforth |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
36A |
Doncaster |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90669 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
1G |
Woodford Halse |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
36E |
Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42963 |
w/e |
24/11/1962 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
05/1964 |
8F |
on |
16/07/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42968 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
w/e |
05/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
05/1965 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46402 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46440 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46447 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46499 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46506 |
w/e |
07/12/1963 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
46115 |
w/e |
15/07/1961 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42952 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8L |
Aintree |
w/e |
07/1964 |
8F |
on |
12/09/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42953 |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
07/1964 |
8F |
on |
15/01/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42956 |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
8L |
Aintree |
w/e |
07/1964 |
8F |
on |
19/09/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42960 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8L |
Aintree |
w/e |
07/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
05/1965 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42961 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
8L |
Aintree |
w/e |
07/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
05/1965 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90724 |
w/e |
25/01/1964 |
9K |
Bolton |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
8L |
Aintree |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90561 |
w/e |
11/07/1964 |
8L |
Aintree |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90283 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
27B |
Aintree |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
36C |
Frodingham |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90399 |
w/e |
11/07/1964 |
8L |
Aintree |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90687 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
27B |
Aintree |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
22/08/1964 |
8L |
Aintree |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42954 |
w/e |
02/1964 |
5E |
Nuneaton |
w/e |
08/1964 |
8F |
on |
11/02/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12024 |
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90697 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
41D |
Canklow |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46503 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
8E |
Northwich |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46517 |
w/e |
25/05/1963 |
8E |
Northwich |
w/e |
08/08/1964 |
8F |
m/e |
12/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42558 |
w/e |
15/04/1961 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
8F |
on |
17/04/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42295 |
w/e |
04/05/1963 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
14/08/1965 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42460 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
26C |
Bolton |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42565 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
26C |
Bolton |
w/e |
26/09/1964 |
8F |
on |
28/11/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42670 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
8F |
on |
05/12/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90632 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
26B |
Agecroft |
w/e |
17/10/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
8L |
Aintree |
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
90725 |
w/e |
21/03/1964 |
9J |
Agecroft |
w/e |
17/10/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42587 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
w/e |
14/11/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12023 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
8F |
on |
23/12/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12070 |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
8F |
on |
30/09/1969 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12075 |
w/e |
23/12/1961 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
8F |
on |
13/11/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12076 |
w/e |
24/02/1962 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
8F |
on |
12/12/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12078 |
w/e |
10/03/1962 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
8F |
on |
17/01/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12100 |
w/e |
31/03/1962 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
8F |
on |
31/03/1969 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12102 |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
5G |
|
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
8F |
on |
17/01/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42084 |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
56F |
Low Moor |
on |
29/11/1964 |
8F |
on |
05/12/1964 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48114 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
01/04/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48125 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
18A |
Toton |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
28/10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48187 |
w/e |
30/05/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
07/01/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48379 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16C |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48494 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
01/04/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48675 |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
44500 |
w/e |
28/12/1963 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
8F |
w/e |
04/12/1965 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48278 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
w/e |
02/01/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9H |
Patricroft |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48261 |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
9L |
Buxton (LNWR) |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48275 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
w/e |
09/01/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44930 |
w/e |
05/09/1964 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44935 |
w/e |
21/11/1964 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
30/01/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45375 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
27C |
Southport |
w/e |
13/02/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44658 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44918 |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
16A |
Nottingham |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45221 |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
16D |
Nottingham |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44779 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
9M |
Bury |
w/e |
20/03/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42374 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
w/e |
01/05/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
11/09/1965 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42369 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
9G |
Gorton |
w/e |
08/05/1965 |
8F |
on |
15/05/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42343 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
w/e |
22/05/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
04/09/1965 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48221 |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
8E |
Northwich |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48764 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
8E |
Northwich |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9K |
Bolton |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48715 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
8L |
Aintree |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42102 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
8F |
on |
17/12/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42577 |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
8F |
on |
14/01/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42611 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
12E |
Tebay |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44873 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
8F |
m/e |
11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45091 |
w/e |
08/05/1965 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45128 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45321 |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42665 |
w/e |
15/02/1964 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
8M |
Southport |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45305 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
42968 |
w/e |
05/1965 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
w/e |
12/1965 |
8F |
on |
31/12/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44678 |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
22/01/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44679 |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
22/01/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
23/09/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2557 |
4w/e |
10/05/1958 |
32B |
Ipswich |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
8F |
on |
15/04/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2558 |
on |
11/10/1956 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe (New) |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
8F |
on |
15/07/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2560 |
on |
01/02/1957 |
32B |
Ipswich (New) |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2561 |
5w/e |
24/08/1957 |
32B |
Ipswich |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
8F |
on |
26/08/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2562 |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2565 |
on |
15/06/1957 |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe (New) |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
8F |
on |
25/03/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2568 |
w/e |
25/09/1965 |
32B |
Ipswich |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
8F |
on |
26/08/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44842 |
w/e |
19/08/1961 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45395 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
6B |
Mold Junction |
w/e |
05/02/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48319 |
w/e |
23/11/1963 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
w/e |
19/02/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9H |
Patricroft |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48338 |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
w/e |
19/02/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9H |
Patricroft |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44962 |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
16F |
Burton |
w/e |
02/04/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46432 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
12C |
Workington |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
06/05/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
46515 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
06/05/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44732 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
15/07/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2566 |
on |
12/09/1965 |
82C |
Swindon |
w/e |
04/06/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2570 |
on |
12/09/1965 |
82C |
Swindon |
w/e |
04/06/1966 |
8F |
on |
22/07/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
42233 |
w/e |
27/11/1965 |
8M |
Southport |
w/e |
18/06/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
56A |
Wakefield |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48082 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
25/06/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
15/04/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48165 |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
w/e |
25/06/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2569 |
w/e |
04/06/1966 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
02/07/1966 |
8F |
on |
26/08/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48410 |
4w/e |
03/11/1962 |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44710 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
2D |
Banbury |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
24/12/1966 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45331 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
2D |
Banbury |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
8F |
m/e |
11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3198 |
8w/e |
25/06/1966 |
67A |
Corkerhill |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
8F |
on |
19/12/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44737 |
w/e |
14/05/1966 |
8K |
Bank Hall |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
14/01/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12097 |
on |
29/12/1951 |
16A |
Nottingham (New) |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
8F |
on |
28/03/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48678 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
16B |
Colwick |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45267 |
w/e |
18/12/1965 |
40E |
Colwick |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3791 |
on |
24/10/1959 |
15C |
Leicester Midland (New) |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
8F |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12072 |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
17A |
Derby |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
8F |
on |
21/12/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48117 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
16B |
Colwick |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45048 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
6J |
Holyhead |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
8F |
m/e |
11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48132 |
w/e |
25/12/1965 |
40E |
Colwick |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48705 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
2B |
Oxley |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48752 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
2B |
Oxley |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48325 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9H |
Patricroft |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48724 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
2B |
Oxley |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
28/10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44711 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45198 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
30/09/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45282 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45350 |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12004 |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
2G |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
8F |
on |
09/12/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12013 |
w/e |
16/04/1966 |
2G |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
8F |
on |
18/11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12020 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
8F |
on |
18/11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44658 |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
18/11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44819 |
w/e |
05/09/1964 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
8F |
m/e |
11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44831 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
8F |
m/e |
11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44920 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
8F |
m/e |
11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44985 |
w/e |
29/01/1966 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
8F |
m/e |
10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45116 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45268 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44776 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
w/e |
27/05/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
21/10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
76075 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
76077 |
m/e |
12/1956 |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (New) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
76079 |
m/e |
02/1957 |
10D |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (New) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
76080 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
76081 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
76084 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48033 |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9H |
Patricroft |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48153 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48167 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
10F |
Rose Grove |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48192 |
w/e |
11/02/1967 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48193 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48206 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48279 |
w/e |
17/06/1967 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48362 |
w/e |
24/09/1966 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48614 |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
48676 |
w/e |
17/06/1967 |
8G |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
21/10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44683 |
w/e |
29/05/1965 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44761 |
w/e |
10/04/1965 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
45310 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
5B |
Crewe South |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2088 |
w/e |
27/05/1967 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
07/12/1968 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7639 |
w/e |
08/04/1967 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2376 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
16C |
Derby |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
8F |
on |
11/05/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2377 |
on |
11/09/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
8F |
on |
11/05/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2378 |
on |
22/09/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
03/04/1971 |
87A |
Landore |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2379 |
on |
11/10/1961 |
17A |
Derby (New) |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
8F |
on |
11/05/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D211 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44682 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
5D |
Stoke |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
8F |
m/e |
11/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44780 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2126 |
w/e |
29/07/1967 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
8F |
on |
09/10/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7554 |
on |
03/07/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division (New) |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7555 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7556 |
on |
09/07/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division (New) |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7557 |
on |
04/08/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division (New) |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7640 |
w/e |
08/04/1967 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7642 |
w/e |
08/04/1967 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7643 |
w/e |
08/04/1967 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D243 |
4w/e |
03/12/1966 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D244 |
4w/e |
28/01/1967 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D245 |
4w/e |
28/01/1967 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
10A |
Carnforth |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D247 |
4w/e |
22/04/1967 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D249 |
4w/e |
22/04/1967 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7641 |
w/e |
08/04/1967 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7642 |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3184 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
EJ |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5273 |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7549 |
on |
28/05/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division (New) |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7552 |
on |
23/06/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division (New) |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12017 |
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
28/10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
12021 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
28/10/1967 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D241 |
4w/e |
25/03/1967 |
51L |
Thornaby |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D242 |
4w/e |
28/01/1967 |
51L |
Thornaby |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D246 |
4w/e |
28/01/1967 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D248 |
4w/e |
22/04/1967 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D385 |
4w/e |
08/10/1966 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D386 |
4w/e |
28/01/1967 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D387 |
4w/e |
08/10/1966 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D388 |
4w/e |
08/10/1966 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5198 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5199 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5200 |
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5201 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5259 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5260 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5261 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5262 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5263 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5264 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5265 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7506 |
on |
27/10/1964 |
16A |
Toton (New) |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7609 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7610 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7633 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
41C |
Wath |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7634 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
41C |
Wath |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7635 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
41C |
Wath |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7636 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
41C |
Wath |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7637 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
41C |
Wath |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3366 |
w/e |
29/11/1964 |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
w/e |
21/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
10/01/1970 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3361 |
6w/e |
13/04/1964 |
87E |
Landore |
w/e |
28/10/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
10/05/1969 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D389 |
4w/e |
08/10/1966 |
56B |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
11/11/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D255 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D267 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D268 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D269 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D310 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D311 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D312 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5293 |
w/e |
05/07/1967 |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7502 |
w/e |
12/08/1967 |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7560 |
w/e |
08/04/1967 |
D01 |
London Division |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D324 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D325 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D331 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D332 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5202 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5203 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5204 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5205 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7546 |
on |
07/05/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division (New) |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7547 |
on |
14/05/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division (New) |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7548 |
on |
20/05/1965 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division (New) |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D289 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D290 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8F |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D316 |
on |
18/04/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D317 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12038 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
16/12/1967 |
8F |
on |
25/01/1969 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5206 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5207 |
on |
16/01/1965 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5151 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5152 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5153 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5154 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5155 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5156 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5248 |
w/e |
02/12/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5249 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7551 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5250 |
w/e |
09/12/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D267 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D268 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D269 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D289 |
w/e |
06/01/1968 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D340 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D341 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D342 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D343 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3089 |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
2F |
Bescot |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
09/12/1973 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5255 |
w/e |
23/12/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5256 |
w/e |
23/12/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5257 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12065 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
2F |
Bescot |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
10/05/1969 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2214 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
13/07/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2225 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
19/04/1969 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2228 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
13/07/1968 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2389 |
w/e |
20/04/1968 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
20/07/1968 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2391 |
w/e |
20/04/1968 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
07/03/1970 |
|
To Store |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5242 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5244 |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5263 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5264 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5265 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7570 |
w/e |
12/08/1967 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7638 |
w/e |
22/07/1967 |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12073 |
w/e |
03/12/1960 |
1E |
Bletchley |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
on |
06/11/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12074 |
w/e |
03/12/1960 |
1E |
Bletchley |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
8F |
w/e |
18/12/1971 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7632 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
8F |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3177 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
1A |
Willesden |
w/e |
22/02/1969 |
8F |
w/e |
13/04/1974 |
WS |
Worcester |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2198 |
w/e |
02/11/1968 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
15/03/1969 |
8F |
w/e |
28/03/1970 |
|
To Store |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3192 |
w/e |
12/07/1969 |
8J |
Allerton |
w/e |
01/11/1969 |
8F |
w/e |
10/01/1970 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12088 |
w/e |
11/01/1969 |
1E |
Bletchley |
w/e |
29/11/1969 |
8F |
w/e |
14/11/1970 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3858 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
w/e |
10/01/1970 |
8F |
w/e |
14/11/1970 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2199 |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
07/03/1970 |
8F |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2392 |
w/e |
17/01/1970 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
w/e |
28/03/1970 |
8F |
on |
19/06/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2372 |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
11/04/1970 |
8F |
w/e |
25/04/1970 |
|
To Store |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2383 |
w/e |
27/07/1968 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
09/05/1970 |
8F |
w/e |
05/09/1970 |
16C |
Derby |
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
D2117 |
w/e |
09/05/1970 |
98S |
|
w/e |
29/08/1970 |
8F |
on |
09/10/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3006 |
on |
29/12/1968 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
10/10/1970 |
8F |
w/e |
18/03/1972 |
36A |
Doncaster |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3782 |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
14/11/1970 |
8F |
on |
01/12/1993 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12071 |
w/e |
10/10/1970 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
14/11/1970 |
8F |
on |
09/10/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12063 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
w/e |
23/01/1971 |
8F |
on |
01/01/1972 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12098 |
on |
27/02/1970 |
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
27/02/1971 (R) |
8F |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12065 |
w/e |
10/05/1969 |
8J |
Allerton |
w/e |
10/04/1971 |
8F |
on |
10/05/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
12077 |
w/e |
03/04/1971 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
8F |
on |
09/10/1971 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3538 |
w/e |
18/10/1969 |
2F |
Bescot |
w/e |
02/10/1971 |
8F |
on |
24/11/1988 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3104 |
w/e |
14/03/1970 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
8F |
w/e |
18/12/1971 |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3335 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
8F |
on |
31/12/1981 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3372 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
8F |
on |
29/06/1981 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3373 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
8F |
3w/e |
20/12/1975 |
DY |
Derby |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3832 |
w/e |
10/10/1970 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
8F |
w/e |
28/10/1972 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3858 |
w/e |
14/11/1970 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
8F |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3983 |
on |
13/08/1960 |
84E |
Tyseley (New) |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
8F |
on |
01/04/1996 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3407 |
w/e |
18/04/1970 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
13/11/1971 |
8F |
on |
06/02/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3354 |
w/e |
16/09/1967 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
w/e |
18/12/1971 |
8F |
on |
01/05/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3104 |
w/e |
18/12/1971 |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
2w/e |
01/01/1972 |
8F |
2w/e |
01/01/1972 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3102 |
w/e |
07/03/1970 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
8F |
w/e |
11/01/1976 |
DR |
Doncaster |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3783 |
w/e |
01/08/1970 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
8F |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3793 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
w/e |
15/01/1972 |
8F |
w/e |
14/04/1973 |
9A |
Longsight |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3784 |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
w/e |
26/02/1972 |
8F |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3005 |
w/e |
05/11/1966 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
DR |
Doncaster |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3367 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
on |
16/08/1988 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3368 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3369 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
on |
19/07/1981 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3371 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
on |
31/12/1981 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3374 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
on |
19/05/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3410 |
w/e |
05/11/1966 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
on |
16/08/1981 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3412 |
w/e |
16/11/1968 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
on |
04/07/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3846 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
w/e |
22/06/1974 |
AN |
Allerton |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3912 |
4w/e |
29/04/1972 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
on |
31/03/1992 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D4117 |
w/e |
26/06/1971 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
2w/e |
05/08/1972 |
8J |
Allerton |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D4139 |
w/e |
12/12/1970 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
8F |
w/e |
20/05/1972 |
1E |
Bletchley |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3462 |
w/e |
07/12/1968 |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
w/e |
13/05/1972 |
8F |
w/e |
22/06/1974 |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3083 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
27/05/1972 |
8F |
w/e |
06/04/1974 |
NH |
Newton Heath |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3425 |
w/e |
09/05/1970 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
w/e |
08/07/1972 |
8F |
on |
09/05/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3109 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
w/e |
22/07/1972 |
8F |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
NH |
Newton Heath |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3283 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
2w/e |
05/08/1972 |
8F |
w/e |
08/12/1973 |
NH |
Newton Heath |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3343 |
w/e |
06/12/1969 |
8J |
Allerton |
2w/e |
05/08/1972 |
8F |
on |
19/12/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D4000 |
4w/e |
31/12/1960 |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
2w/e |
05/08/1972 |
8F |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08072 |
w/e |
04/11/1972 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
13/01/1973 |
8F |
on |
01/06/1973 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3202 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
13/01/1973 |
8F |
w/e |
30/06/1973 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3740 |
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
13/01/1973 |
8F |
w/e |
09/06/1973 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3696 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
9A |
Longsight |
w/e |
24/02/1973 |
8F |
m/e |
10/1976 |
AN |
Allerton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5194 |
w/e |
09/05/1970 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
SP |
m/e |
10/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5195 |
w/e |
09/05/1970 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
SP |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
|
To Store |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5253 |
w/e |
06/01/1973 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
SP |
on |
07/09/1980 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5260 |
2w/e |
08/04/1972 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
SP |
on |
02/11/1980 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7626 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
SP |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7639 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
HA |
Haymarket |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7646 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
SP |
on |
01/10/1986 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7651 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
11/12/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7659 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D255 |
w/e |
03/02/1973 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5281 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5282 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5283 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5284 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5285 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
20/10/1973 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5286 |
w/e |
10/03/1973 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7599 |
w/e |
11/11/1972 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D5198 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7542 |
w/e |
10/07/1971 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
12/04/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7543 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
12/04/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7544 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7583 |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
65A |
Eastfield |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
HA |
Haymarket |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7584 |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
65A |
Eastfield |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
HA |
Haymarket |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7582 |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
64B |
Haymarket |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
HA |
Haymarket |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7590 |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
64B |
Haymarket |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
SP |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
HA |
Haymarket |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7597 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
SP |
on |
24/07/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D287 |
w/e |
11/03/1972 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
SP |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D288 |
2w/e |
10/06/1972 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
SP |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25284 |
2w/e |
25/08/1973 |
TI |
Tinsley |
w/e |
20/10/1973 |
SP |
on |
21/01/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D291 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
SP |
on |
02/09/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D325 |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
LO |
Longsight |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40090 |
w/e |
03/02/1973 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
SP |
on |
08/11/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08925 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
8J |
Allerton |
w/e |
23/03/1974 |
SP |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
D4120 |
9w/e |
18/03/1968 |
85A |
Worcester |
w/e |
13/04/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
27/07/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40003 |
w/e |
07/11/1970 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40021 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40022 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
SP |
on |
09/03/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40104 |
w/e |
09/02/1974 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40175 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
SP |
2w/e |
10/07/1976 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25290 |
w/e |
09/05/1970 |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25291 |
w/e |
09/05/1970 |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25292 |
w/e |
09/05/1970 |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25297 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
SP |
on |
01/09/1986 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40180 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
HA |
Haymarket |
w/e |
18/05/1974 |
SP |
on |
01/06/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40138 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40139 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40140 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40137 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25205 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
09/08/1975 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25266 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25190 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40170 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
SP |
on |
02/12/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40171 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
SP |
on |
13/12/1981 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40172 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
SP |
on |
12/09/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40174 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
SP |
on |
24/05/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40177 |
w/e |
05/02/1972 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
SP |
on |
09/07/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25093 |
w/e |
09/02/1974 |
HA |
Haymarket |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25094 |
4w/e |
25/05/1974 |
HA |
Haymarket |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
SP |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25186 |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
WN |
Willesden |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
SP |
2w/e |
12/07/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25289 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
HA |
Haymarket |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
SP |
m/e |
07/1977 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25308 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
HA |
Haymarket |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
SP |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25036 |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
w/e |
07/12/1974 |
SP |
on |
19/12/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25278 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
w/e |
07/12/1974 |
SP |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40003 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
SP |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40021 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
SP |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40045 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
SP |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08846 |
q/e |
22/05/1971 |
86B |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
SP |
on |
13/10/1989 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25058 |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
SP |
on |
03/02/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25197 |
w/e |
12/10/1968 |
D10 |
Preston Division |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
SP |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25249 |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
SP |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25064 |
w/e |
07/10/1972 |
41A |
Tinsley |
w/e |
08/03/1975 |
SP |
5w/e |
03/07/1976 |
IS |
Inverness |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25078 |
w/e |
07/10/1972 |
41A |
Tinsley |
w/e |
08/03/1975 |
SP |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
HA |
Haymarket |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25079 |
w/e |
07/10/1972 |
41A |
Tinsley |
w/e |
08/03/1975 |
SP |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
HA |
Haymarket |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25094 |
2w/e |
22/02/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
2w/e |
08/03/1975 |
SP |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40131 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
w/e |
12/04/1975 |
SP |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25048 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
SP |
on |
20/02/1986 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25060 |
w/e |
23/11/1968 |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
SP |
on |
09/12/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25302 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
SP |
m/e |
03/1977 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40055 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
SP |
on |
14/11/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40131 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
SP |
on |
03/10/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40181 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
SP |
on |
21/01/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25266 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
LO |
Longsight |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
SP |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40036 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
HM |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
01/02/1976 |
SP |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40046 |
w/e |
01/05/1971 |
55C |
Healey Mills |
w/e |
01/02/1976 |
SP |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25137 |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
TO |
Toton |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
SP |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40093 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
SP |
on |
02/12/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40140 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
SP |
on |
07/03/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40141 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
SP |
on |
09/10/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25112 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
SP |
m/e |
10/1977 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25114 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
SP |
m/e |
10/1977 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25115 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
SP |
m/e |
10/1977 |
TO |
Toton |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25192 |
w/e |
12/04/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
SP |
m/e |
04/1977 |
LO |
Longsight |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25248 |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
SP |
on |
28/11/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25031 |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
ED |
Eastfield |
4w/e |
12/06/1976 |
SP |
m/e |
10/1977 |
ED |
Eastfield |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25169 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
LA |
Laira |
2w/e |
10/07/1976 |
SP |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25046 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
TO |
Toton |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
SP |
on |
01/05/1977 |
HA |
Haymarket |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25047 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
TO |
Toton |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
SP |
on |
07/09/1980 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25287 |
on |
04/07/1976 |
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
25/09/1976 (R) |
SP |
on |
02/12/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08126 |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
LJ |
|
m/e |
10/1976 |
SP |
on |
02/11/1980 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25070 |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
BS |
Bescot |
m/e |
10/1976 |
SP |
on |
02/11/1980 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25172 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
HA |
Haymarket |
w/e |
11/12/1976 |
SP |
on |
01/02/1981 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40134 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
m/e |
01/1977 |
SP |
on |
31/05/1981 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40179 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
m/e |
01/1977 |
SP |
m/e |
04/1977 |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25147 |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
LO |
Longsight |
m/e |
04/1977 |
SP |
m/e |
07/1977 |
BS |
Bescot |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40191 |
w/e |
03/08/1968 |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
m/e |
07/1977 |
SP |
m/e |
10/1977 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40191 |
m/e |
07/1977 |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
m/e |
10/1977 |
SP |
on |
16/09/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25313 |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
TO |
Toton |
m/e |
02/1978 |
SP |
on |
18/03/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25213 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
TO |
Toton |
5w/e |
26/02/1978 |
SP |
on |
19/03/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40020 |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
LO |
Longsight |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
SP |
on |
29/08/1982 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25083 |
5w/e |
03/07/1976 |
IS |
Inverness |
on |
14/12/1980 |
SP |
on |
01/07/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25086 |
m/e |
02/1978 |
HA |
Haymarket |
on |
14/12/1980 |
SP |
on |
09/10/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08472 |
w/e |
29/03/1969 |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
on |
28/06/1981 |
SP |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25323 |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
m/e |
07/1981 |
SP |
on |
19/03/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08129 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
NH |
Newton Heath |
on |
16/08/1981 |
SP |
on |
17/07/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40063 |
on |
07/03/1960 |
64B |
Haymarket (New) |
m/e |
09/1981 |
SP |
on |
16/04/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40157 |
w/e |
19/05/1973 |
HA |
Haymarket |
m/e |
09/1981 |
SP |
on |
26/07/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40160 |
on |
20/09/1961 |
64B |
Haymarket (New) |
m/e |
09/1981 |
SP |
on |
26/11/1984 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40164 |
on |
25/10/1961 |
64B |
Haymarket (New) |
m/e |
09/1981 |
SP |
on |
04/07/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
40194 |
m/e |
10/1977 |
TE |
Thornaby |
m/e |
09/1981 |
SP |
on |
23/01/1985 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25219 |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
m/e |
09/1981 |
SP |
on |
03/04/1983 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
25268 |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
m/e |
09/1981 |
SP |
on |
01/03/1987 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08468 |
w/e |
25/11/1967 |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
on |
01/05/1988 |
SP |
on |
23/11/1988 |
|
Withdrawn |
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
08534 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
AN |
Allerton |
on |
04/09/1988 |
SP |
on |
31/08/2005 |
|
Withdrawn |