Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 738 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6138 Week
» 24190 Month
» 257110 Year
» 1922486 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Stewarts Lane


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Stewarts Lane Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 850       m/e 08/1926 (New) BAT m/e 03/1930 EXJ Exmouth Junction
Steam Lord Nelson 4-6-0 850 m/e 03/1930 EXJ Exmouth Junction m/e 04/1930 BAT on 27/02/1940 9E Nine Elms
Steam B4 0-4-0T 86       on 01/01/1948 BAT 8w/e 13/05/1954 74C Dover Marine
Steam B4 0-4-0T 90       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 05/1948 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 763       on 01/01/1948 BAT 5w/e 12/08/1955 70D Basingstoke
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 764       on 01/01/1948 BAT 2w/e 07/07/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 765       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 07/10/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 775       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 776       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 778       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 13/11/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 780       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 08/12/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 781       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 05/02/1951 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 793       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 794       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C Dover Marine
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 795       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C Dover Marine
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 796       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C Dover Marine
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 797       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 07/10/1950 73C Hither Green
Steam H 0-4-4T 1005       on 01/01/1948 BAT 6w/e 21/06/1955 74A Ashford
Steam E1A 4-4-0 1019       on 01/01/1948 BAT 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam E1A 4-4-0 1067       on 01/01/1948 BAT 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam D1 4-4-0 1145       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam E1A 4-4-0 1160       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam E1A 4-4-0 1163       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam E1A 4-4-0 1165       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam H 0-4-4T 1177       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 11/04/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam E1A 4-4-0 1179       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 10/1950 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 1184       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam D1 4-4-0 1247       on 01/01/1948 BAT 5w/e 11/12/1952 73E Faversham
Steam H 0-4-4T 1259       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 08/12/1950 73E Faversham
Steam H 0-4-4T 1263       on 01/01/1948 BAT 3w/e 09/05/1955 75B Redhill
Steam H 0-4-4T 1266       on 01/01/1948 BAT q/e 06/06/1958 74D Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 1293       on 01/01/1948 BAT w/e 05/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 1295       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 74A Ashford
Steam 1302 0-4-0CT 1302       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 07/1949 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 1307       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam H 0-4-4T 1311       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 30/06/1952 75B Redhill
Steam H 0-4-4T 1319       on 01/01/1948 BAT 5w/e 24/08/1953 75A Brighton
Steam H 0-4-4T 1321       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 1329       on 01/01/1948 BAT 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C Dover Marine
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1405       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 10/02/1961 73J Tonbridge
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1410       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 22/07/1963 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1411       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 22/07/1963 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1412       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 22/07/1963 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1413       on 01/01/1948 BAT 6w/e 14/06/1959 73H Dover Marine
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1414       on 01/01/1948 BAT 6w/e 14/06/1959 73H Dover Marine
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1445       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1454       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 11/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D1 4-4-0 1492       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 05/02/1951 73E Faversham
Steam D1 4-4-0 1494       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 05/02/1951 73E Faversham
Steam E1A 4-4-0 1497       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 30/06/1949 BA Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 1498       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 08/02/1954 73C Hither Green
Steam E1A 4-4-0 1504       on 01/01/1948 BAT w/e 15/02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam E1A 4-4-0 1506       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam E1A 4-4-0 1507       on 01/01/1948 BAT 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 1508       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam E1A 4-4-0 1511       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 08/12/1950 74A Ashford
Steam E 4-4-0 1514       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam E 4-4-0 1515       on 01/01/1948 BAT w/e 21/07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam E 4-4-0 1516       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford
Steam H 0-4-4T 1554       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 30/06/1952 74D Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 1575       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 10/02/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 1576       on 01/01/1948 BAT 7w/e 08/10/1957 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 1578       on 01/01/1948 BAT w/e 24/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1582       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1661       on 01/01/1948 BAT 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C Dover Marine
Steam C 0-6-0 1681       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 1683       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 1690       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 30/06/1952 73C Hither Green
Steam C 0-6-0 1694       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 08/07/1960 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam R1 0-4-4T 1706       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 07/10/1950 74E St Leonards
Steam R1 0-4-4T 1710       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1712       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam C 0-6-0 1714       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 27/07/1951 73E Faversham
Steam C 0-6-0 1716       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 27/07/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 1717       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 27/07/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 1718       on 01/01/1948 BAT w/e 24/09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 1719       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 17/12/1956 75C Norwood Junction
Steam C 0-6-0 1722       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam D1 4-4-0 1736       on 01/01/1948 BAT on 30/12/1950 Withdrawn
Steam D1 4-4-0 1743       on 01/01/1948 BAT 5w/e 14/02/1953 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam D1 4-4-0 1745       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 05/02/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam D1 4-4-0 1749       on 01/01/1948 BAT 5w/e 14/02/1953 75B Redhill
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 1760       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 09/09/1950 74D Tonbridge
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 1764       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 1765       on 01/01/1948 BAT 7w/e 19/12/1955 73E Faversham
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 1769       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 30/06/1952 74A Ashford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1810       on 01/01/1948 BAT 6w/e 14/06/1959 73H Dover Marine
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1811       on 01/01/1948 BAT 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1812       on 01/01/1948 BAT 6w/e 14/06/1959 70C Guildford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1813       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 01/10/1953 72B Salisbury
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1903       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1904       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1905       on 01/01/1948 BAT 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1906       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 06/11/1954 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1907       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 30/06/1952 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1908       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 30/06/1952 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1909       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 30/06/1952 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1910       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 30/06/1952 70A Nine Elms
Steam W 2-6-4T 1912       on 01/01/1948 BAT 5w/e 24/08/1953 73C Hither Green
Steam W 2-6-4T 1914       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 24/11/1960 75C Norwood Junction
Steam W 2-6-4T 1915       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam E2 0-6-0T 2100       on 01/01/1948 BAT 3w/e 26/05/1961 71I Southampton Docks
Steam E2 0-6-0T 2101       on 01/01/1948 BAT 6w/e 25/01/1957 71I Southampton Docks
Steam E2 0-6-0T 2102       on 01/01/1948 BAT 3w/e 26/05/1961 71I Southampton Docks
Steam E2 0-6-0T 2103       on 01/01/1948 BAT 3w/e 26/05/1961 71I Southampton Docks
Steam E2 0-6-0T 2104       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 12/06/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam E2 0-6-0T 2105       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 12/06/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam E2 0-6-0T 2106       on 01/01/1948 BAT 3w/e 26/05/1961 71I Southampton Docks
Steam E2 0-6-0T 2107       on 01/01/1948 BAT 9w/e 12/06/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam T 0-6-0T 1602       on 01/01/1948 BAT m/e 07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C133       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C134       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C135       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 17/06/1950 72B Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C136       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 08/12/1950 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C137       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C138       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 72D Plymouth Friary
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C139       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 19/05/1951 30A Stratford
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C140       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 12/05/1951 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C154       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C155       on 01/01/1948 BAT 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34056 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 30/06/1949 BAT 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30793 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70B Feltham
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31764 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A 4w/e 08/12/1950 74A Ashford
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31767 on 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C Dover Marine
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31904 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34033 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A 4w/e 12/05/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 1623 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A 4w/e 07/10/1950 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31793 on 01/01/1948 YEO Yeovil Town 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A 4w/e 07/10/1950 70E Reading (S.R.)
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31803 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A 4w/e 08/12/1950 70C Guildford
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34034 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A 4w/e 07/10/1950 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34035 4w/e 17/06/1950 72B Salisbury 4w/e 09/09/1950 73A 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A Brighton
Steam P 0-6-0T 1558 on 01/01/1948 FOL Folkestone Junction 4w/e 07/10/1950 73A 5w/e 14/02/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34074 4w/e 09/09/1950 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 07/10/1950 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34075 4w/e 09/09/1950 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 07/10/1950 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42070       on 02/11/1950 (New) 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 74B Ramsgate
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42071       on 06/11/1950 (New) 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42072       on 12/11/1950 (New) 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30791 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 13/11/1950 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30792 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 13/11/1950 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42073       on 17/11/1950 (New) 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42074       on 24/11/1950 (New) 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30772 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 4w/e 08/12/1950 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30773 4w/e 07/10/1950 72B Salisbury 4w/e 08/12/1950 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31497 4w/e 17/06/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/12/1950 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam H 0-4-4T 31500 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/12/1950 73A 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Diesel D16/2 1Co-Co1 10201       on 30/12/1950 (New) 73A 4w/e 19/03/1952 70A Nine Elms
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42080       on 12/01/1951 (New) 73A 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42081       on 24/01/1951 (New) 73A 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42082       on 01/02/1951 (New) 73A 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30765 4w/e 08/12/1950 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 05/02/1951 73A 5w/e 12/08/1955 71B Bournemouth
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30794 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951 73A 6w/e 18/06/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30795 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951 73A 6w/e 18/06/1954 73C Hither Green
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30796 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951 73A 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam D1 4-4-0 31745 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 05/02/1951 73A m/e 03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42083       on 09/02/1951 (New) 73A 4w/e 22/03/1952 50A York (North)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42084       on 19/02/1951 (New) 73A 4w/e 22/03/1952 51D Middlesbrough
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30791 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 20/03/1951 73A 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam H 0-4-4T 31320 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 11/04/1951 73A 4w/e 29/10/1953 75A Brighton
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30791 6w/e 20/03/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 5w/e 16/09/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30792 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 9w/e 12/06/1957 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30797 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30798 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam H 0-4-4T 31265 4w/e 08/12/1950 74D Tonbridge 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A w/e 06/08/1960 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31269 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 4w/e 29/10/1953 74E St Leonards
Steam C 0-6-0 31573 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 7w/e 08/10/1957 73C Hither Green
Steam C 0-6-0 31579 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 7w/e 08/10/1957 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 31712 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 4w/e 27/07/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 31713 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 4w/e 27/07/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 31715 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 4w/e 27/07/1951 73E Faversham
Steam I1X 4-4-2T 32596 on 01/01/1948 EBN Eastbourne 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34087       4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34088       4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34089       4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 5w/e 16/02/1952 30A Stratford
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34090       4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 9w/e 12/06/1957 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34100 m/e 12/1949 RAM Ramsgate (New) 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 7w/e 27/06/1951 74B Ramsgate
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42085 on 27/02/1951 75A Brighton (New) 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A 4w/e 22/03/1952 52B Heaton
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30767 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30768 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30769 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 6w/e 27/03/1953 74C Dover Marine
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30777 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30778 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30779 4w/e 05/02/1951 70A Nine Elms 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam L1 4-4-0 31758 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 4w/e 21/01/1952 74A Ashford
Steam L1 4-4-0 31759 4w/e 17/06/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 4w/e 21/01/1952 74A Ashford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31901 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 4w/e 11/12/1954 75A Brighton
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31902 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 4w/e 11/12/1954 75A Brighton
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31903 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 4w/e 11/12/1954 75A Brighton
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31904 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 31580 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A w/e 08/08/1953 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31581 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A w/e 12/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31582 4w/e 12/05/1951 73C Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A w/e 07/06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31583 on 01/01/1948 GIL Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A 4w/e 10/10/1955 74D Tonbridge
Steam C 0-6-0 31584 4w/e 12/05/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A w/e 17/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31899 4w/e 12/05/1951 75B Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A 4w/e 06/10/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31900 4w/e 12/05/1951 75B Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A 4w/e 06/10/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33036 on 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A 8w/e 07/10/1952 74D Tonbridge
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33037 on 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A 8w/e 07/10/1952 73C Hither Green
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33038 on 01/01/1948 FEL Feltham 4w/e 27/07/1951 73A 8w/e 07/10/1952 71A Eastleigh
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 70004 on 30/03/1951 30A Stratford (New) 4w/e 06/10/1951 73A 4w/e 12/07/1958 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42089 on 06/04/1951 75A Brighton (New) 4w/e 19/03/1952 73A w/e 05/12/1959 14D Neasden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42091 on 25/04/1951 75A Brighton (New) 4w/e 19/03/1952 73A w/e 05/12/1959 14D Neasden
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30770 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 5w/e 12/08/1955 70D Basingstoke
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30771 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 4w/e 10/10/1955 70D Basingstoke
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30772 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 6w/e 27/03/1953 74B Ramsgate
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30773 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 5w/e 16/09/1955 70A Nine Elms
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30774 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 2w/e 07/07/1955 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30922 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 8w/e 07/10/1952 74B Ramsgate
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31892 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 4w/e 01/10/1953 73C Hither Green
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31893 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 4w/e 01/10/1953 73C Hither Green
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31899 4w/e 06/10/1951 73C Hither Green 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 4w/e 01/10/1953 75B Redhill
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31900 4w/e 06/10/1951 73C Hither Green 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 4w/e 01/10/1953 75B Redhill
Steam W 2-6-4T 31915 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 4w/e 24/11/1960 75C Norwood Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34089 5w/e 16/02/1952 30A Stratford 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42090 on 15/04/1951 75A Brighton (New) 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A w/e 05/12/1959 14D Neasden
Steam L1 4-4-0 31758 4w/e 21/01/1952 74A Ashford 6w/e 13/08/1952 73A 5w/e 11/12/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam L1 4-4-0 31759 4w/e 21/01/1952 74A Ashford 6w/e 13/08/1952 73A 5w/e 11/12/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31891 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 07/10/1952 73A 5w/e 11/12/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30915 on 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 5w/e 11/12/1952 73A 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A Brighton
Steam P 0-6-0T 31555 4w/e 07/10/1950 74C Dover Marine 5w/e 11/12/1952 73A on 05/02/1955 Withdrawn
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30950 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 5w/e 14/02/1953 73A 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A Brighton
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31165 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 14/02/1953 73A 4w/e 26/05/1953 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30915 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A Brighton 4w/e 26/05/1953 73A 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam D1 4-4-0 31509 4w/e 11/04/1951 73E Faversham 4w/e 26/05/1953 73A 8w/e 20/07/1953 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam D1 4-4-0 31545 4w/e 11/04/1951 73E Faversham 4w/e 26/05/1953 73A 8w/e 20/07/1953 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30769 6w/e 27/03/1953 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30772 6w/e 27/03/1953 74B Ramsgate 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 4w/e 20/08/1954 73C Hither Green
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30915 4w/e 26/05/1953 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 3w/e 17/11/1956 74B Ramsgate
Steam D1 4-4-0 31743 5w/e 14/02/1953 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam D1 4-4-0 31749 5w/e 14/02/1953 75B Redhill 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam L1 4-4-0 31758 4w/e 26/05/1953 73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 4w/e 01/10/1953 74A Ashford
Steam L1 4-4-0 31759 4w/e 26/05/1953 73D Gillingham (Kent) 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 4w/e 01/10/1953 74A Ashford
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33018 4w/e 26/05/1953 70C Guildford 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 5w/e 24/08/1953 70C Guildford
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33019 6w/e 27/03/1953 74B Ramsgate 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 5w/e 24/08/1953 70C Guildford
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33022 6w/e 27/03/1953 74B Ramsgate 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 4w/e 01/10/1953 70C Guildford
Steam Q 0-6-0 30541 on 01/01/1948 3B Three Bridges 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 4w/e 01/10/1953 71B Bournemouth
Steam Q 0-6-0 30544 4w/e 19/03/1952 75E Three Bridges 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A 4w/e 01/10/1953 75D Horsham
Steam C 0-6-0 31461 4w/e 27/07/1951 73E Faversham 4w/e 01/10/1953 73A 6w/e 01/04/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31815 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 4w/e 01/10/1953 73A 8w/e 13/05/1954 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31816 4w/e 06/10/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 01/10/1953 73A 8w/e 13/05/1954 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 31221 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 08/02/1954 73A 4w/e 06/11/1954 74A Ashford
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34017 on 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 4w/e 19/03/1954 73A 7w/e 08/10/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam H 0-4-4T 31551 4w/e 30/12/1953 75B Redhill 8w/e 13/05/1954 73A 6w/e 05/10/1960 73J Tonbridge
Steam H 0-4-4T 31261 8w/e 20/07/1953 74D Tonbridge 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A w/e 07/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31550 4w/e 01/10/1953 75B Redhill 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A w/e 25/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31552 4w/e 01/10/1953 74D Tonbridge 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31900 4w/e 01/10/1953 75B Redhill 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A 4w/e 11/12/1954 75A Brighton
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31907 9w/e 30/06/1952 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A 4w/e 06/11/1954 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31908 9w/e 30/06/1952 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A 4w/e 06/11/1954 74D Tonbridge
Steam Q 0-6-0 30537 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A 4w/e 06/11/1954 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Q 0-6-0 30538 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A 4w/e 06/11/1954 75C Norwood Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34065 9w/e 30/06/1952 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 18/06/1954 73A 6w/e 21/06/1955 70A Nine Elms
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30794 6w/e 18/06/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 20/08/1954 73A w/e 11/03/1959 70D Basingstoke
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30795 6w/e 18/06/1954 73C Hither Green 4w/e 20/08/1954 73A 4w/e 10/10/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam W 2-6-4T 31921 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 4w/e 20/08/1954 73A 4w/e 24/11/1960 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Small Radials 0-6-2T 32455 4w/e 05/02/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 20/08/1954 73A 6w/e 24/02/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33015 6w/e 18/06/1954 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 06/11/1954 73A 9w/e 08/02/1955 70A Nine Elms
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33017 8w/e 13/05/1954 75A Brighton 4w/e 06/11/1954 73A 9w/e 08/02/1955 70A Nine Elms
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33038 6w/e 18/06/1954 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 06/11/1954 73A 9w/e 08/02/1955 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31906 4w/e 06/11/1954 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/12/1954 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31907 4w/e 06/11/1954 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 11/12/1954 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42088 on 30/03/1951 75A Brighton (New) 4w/e 11/12/1954 73A w/e 05/12/1959 14D Neasden
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31408 4w/e 01/10/1953 73B Bricklayers Arms 9w/e 08/02/1955 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 73F Ashford
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41296 4w/e 20/08/1954 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 11/03/1955 73A 3w/e 17/11/1956 72E Barnstaple Junction
Steam C 0-6-0 31253 4w/e 11/12/1954 70C Guildford 6w/e 20/04/1955 73A 7w/e 08/10/1957 73C Hither Green
Steam P 0-6-0T 31558 8w/e 13/05/1954 75A Brighton 3w/e 09/05/1955 73A w/e 06/02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31896 4w/e 06/10/1951 75B Redhill 3w/e 09/05/1955 73A 6w/e 01/04/1957 74D Tonbridge
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31897 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 3w/e 09/05/1955 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 70B Feltham
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31898 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 3w/e 09/05/1955 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 72B Salisbury
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73081       m/e 06/1955 (New) 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam D1 4-4-0 31545 8w/e 20/07/1953 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 21/06/1955 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31894 4w/e 06/10/1951 75B Redhill 6w/e 21/06/1955 73A 6w/e 01/04/1957 74D Tonbridge
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31895 4w/e 06/10/1951 75B Redhill 6w/e 21/06/1955 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 70B Feltham
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35014 4w/e 20/08/1954 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 21/06/1955 73A 6w/e 15/06/1956 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73082       m/e 07/1955 (New) 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73083       m/e 07/1955 (New) 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73084       m/e 07/1955 (New) 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73085       m/e 08/1955 (New) 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73086       m/e 08/1955 (New) 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73087       m/e 08/1955 (New) 73A 7w/e 27/08/1956 71G Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73088       m/e 09/1955 (New) 73A 4w/e 17/05/1958 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73089       m/e 09/1955 (New) 73A q/e 06/06/1958 70A Nine Elms
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30795 4w/e 10/10/1955 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 15/06/1956 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70B Feltham
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35015 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 6w/e 15/06/1956 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32448 4w/e 12/05/1951 75B Redhill 3w/e 17/11/1956 73A 6w/e 25/01/1957 75C Norwood Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42086 9w/e 08/02/1955 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 17/11/1956 73A 4w/e 22/03/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42087 6w/e 15/06/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 17/11/1956 73A 5w/e 18/07/1959 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam C 0-6-0 31719 4w/e 17/12/1956 75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 25/01/1957 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 35001 on 01/01/1948 EXJ Exmouth Junction 6w/e 25/01/1957 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30915 3w/e 17/11/1956 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 01/04/1957 73A 4w/e 14/01/1958 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam C 0-6-0 31583 4w/e 10/10/1955 74D Tonbridge 6w/e 01/04/1957 73A m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42106 3w/e 17/11/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West 6w/e 01/04/1957 73A 4w/e 22/03/1958 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30908 4w/e 08/12/1950 74E St Leonards 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70D Basingstoke
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30909 4w/e 05/02/1951 74E St Leonards 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 31037 4w/e 08/02/1954 74A Ashford 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A 7w/e 08/10/1957 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam C 0-6-0 31317 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C Dover Marine 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A w/e 24/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31894 6w/e 01/04/1957 74D Tonbridge 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 75E Three Bridges
Steam O1 0-6-0 31048 4w/e 07/10/1950 74A Ashford 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam O1 0-6-0 31064 4w/e 27/07/1951 74A Ashford 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A w/e 24/05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34005 4w/e 11/04/1951 70A Nine Elms 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A 4w/e 14/01/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42074 3w/e 17/11/1956 74B Ramsgate 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A 4w/e 22/03/1958 75E Three Bridges
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73087 5w/e 19/07/1957 71G Bath Green Park (S&D) 7w/e 08/10/1957 73A 4w/e 17/05/1958 82F Bath Green Park (S&D)
Steam P 0-6-0T 31178 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine 7w/e 08/10/1957 73A w/e 07/06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30915 6w/e 01/04/1957 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 14/01/1958 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A Brighton
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34077       4w/e 14/01/1958 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34082       4w/e 14/01/1958 73A 4w/e 22/03/1958 74C Dover Marine
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34084 4w/e 12/05/1951 74B Ramsgate 4w/e 24/02/1958 73A 4w/e 22/03/1958 74C Dover Marine
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34100 7w/e 27/06/1951 74B Ramsgate 4w/e 24/02/1958 73A 4w/e 16/09/1963 70E Salisbury
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34085 4w/e 24/02/1958 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 22/03/1958 73A 8w/e 17/01/1961 71B Bournemouth
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34086 4w/e 24/02/1958 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 22/03/1958 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30802 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford q/e 06/06/1958 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30803 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford q/e 06/06/1958 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30937 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms q/e 06/06/1958 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 73F Ashford
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30938 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms q/e 06/06/1958 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 73H Dover Marine
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30939 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms q/e 06/06/1958 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 73H Dover Marine
Steam D1 4-4-0 31145 4w/e 24/02/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 13/10/1958 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam O1 0-6-0 31370 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 3w/e 13/10/1958 73A 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Electric Class 70 C-C 20001 on 26/07/1941 BTN Brighton (New) 1w/e 11/03/1959 73A 4w/e 22/08/1966 75A Brighton
Electric Class 70 C-C 20002 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 1w/e 11/03/1959 73A 4w/e 22/08/1966 75A Brighton
Electric Class 70 C-C 20003 m/e 09/1948 BTN Brighton (New) 1w/e 11/03/1959 73A 4w/e 22/08/1966 75A Brighton
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75074 7w/e 08/10/1957 70D Basingstoke w/e 11/03/1959 73A 4w/e 22/07/1963 75C Norwood Junction
Steam C 0-6-0 31724 q/e 06/06/1958 73C Hither Green 3w/e 01/05/1959 73A 5w/e 26/11/1959 75A Brighton
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30920 9w/e 12/06/1957 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A m/e 10/02/1961 75A Brighton
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30921 9w/e 12/06/1957 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A 7w/e 23/08/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30922 8w/e 07/10/1952 74B Ramsgate 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A m/e 09/11/1961 75A Brighton
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30923 w/e 11/03/1959 70D Basingstoke 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam C 0-6-0 31714 4w/e 27/07/1951 73E Faversham 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam C 0-6-0 31715 4w/e 27/07/1951 73E Faversham 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A w/e 11/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31896 6w/e 01/04/1957 74D Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 70B Feltham
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31899 6w/e 21/06/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 72B Salisbury
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31900 6w/e 21/06/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 14/06/1959 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 72B Salisbury
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75069 6w/e 14/06/1959 71B Bournemouth 5w/e 26/11/1959 73A 4w/e 19/08/1963 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80066 on 15/07/1953 1C Watford (New) 5w/e 31/12/1959 73A 6w/e 09/02/1960 73F Ashford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80067 on 04/08/1953 1C Watford (New) 5w/e 31/12/1959 73A 6w/e 12/10/1964 83G Templecombe (S&D)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80068 on 21/08/1953 1C Watford (New) 5w/e 31/12/1959 73A 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A Brighton
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80081 w/e 07/11/1959 1A Willesden 5w/e 31/12/1959 73A 4w/e 22/07/1963 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Steam C 0-6-0 31229 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73A 4w/e 08/07/1960 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31019 4w/e 05/04/1960 72B Salisbury 4w/e 06/05/1960 73A w/e 29/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam E1A 4-4-0 31067 4w/e 05/04/1960 72B Salisbury 4w/e 06/05/1960 73A w/e 11/11/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31823 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/07/1960 73A 4w/e 22/07/1963 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31824 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/07/1960 73A 4w/e 22/07/1963 75B Redhill
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32438 4w/e 22/03/1958 70B Feltham 6w/e 05/10/1960 73A 8w/e 17/01/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam C 0-6-0 31579 4w/e 08/07/1960 70B Feltham 8w/e 17/01/1961 73A w/e 07/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84020 on 27/03/1957 74A Ashford (New) m/e 10/02/1961 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30925 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961 73A 7w/e 23/08/1961 70D Basingstoke
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30926 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34001 7w/e 08/10/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34004 4w/e 24/02/1958 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 10/02/1961 73A 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam H 0-4-4T 31542 4w/e 08/07/1960 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 18/03/1961 73A w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31854 5w/e 19/07/1957 74A Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 73A on 11/08/1963 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4631 w/e 11/03/1959 73H Dover Marine m/e 09/11/1961 73A 4w/e 30/07/1962 72C Yeovil Town
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30926 3w/e 26/05/1961 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 09/11/1961 73A 4w/e 04/01/1962 70D Basingstoke
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30929 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms m/e 09/11/1961 73A 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A Brighton
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30930 9w/e 12/06/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms m/e 09/11/1961 73A 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A Brighton
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80034 5w/e 31/12/1959 73F Ashford 4w/e 28/05/1962 73A 4w/e 19/08/1963 75A Brighton
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80084 5w/e 31/12/1959 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A Brighton
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80085 3w/e 26/05/1961 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A Brighton
Steam H 0-4-4T 31305 4w/e 10/10/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N1 2-6-0 31822 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31825 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D 4w/e 19/08/1963 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31826 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31827 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D 4w/e 16/09/1963 75B Redhill
Steam N1 2-6-0 31876 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N1 2-6-0 31877 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N1 2-6-0 31878 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N1 2-6-0 31879 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam N1 2-6-0 31880 6w/e 14/06/1959 73J Tonbridge 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31895 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D on 23/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31896 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31897 4w/e 01/05/1962 75E Three Bridges 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D w/e 17/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31898 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 30537 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A Brighton 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D w/e 08/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 30538 5w/e 18/03/1961 75A Brighton 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D 3w/e 07/01/1963 71B Bournemouth
Steam Q 0-6-0 30544 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A Brighton 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D 3w/e 07/01/1963 75E Three Bridges
Steam Q 0-6-0 30549 4w/e 04/01/1962 75A Brighton 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D 4w/e 17/12/1962 75E Three Bridges
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75070 6w/e 09/02/1960 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 24/09/1962 75D 4w/e 19/08/1963 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75075 w/e 11/03/1959 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 24/09/1962 75D 4w/e 22/07/1963 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Q 0-6-0 30543 4w/e 09/09/1950 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 17/12/1962 75D 3w/e 07/01/1963 75E Three Bridges
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80012 w/e 11/03/1959 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 30/01/1963 75D 4w/e 24/06/1963 70B Feltham
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80089 5w/e 31/12/1959 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 30/01/1963 75D 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A Brighton
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80094 5w/e 31/12/1959 75E Three Bridges 3w/e 30/01/1963 75D 4w/e 16/09/1963 75A Brighton
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75067 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 19/04/1963 75D 4w/e 16/09/1963 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75068 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A Brighton 4w/e 19/04/1963 75D 4w/e 16/09/1963 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31818 4w/e 01/02/1962 72A Exmouth Junction on 11/08/1963 75D w/e 01/09/1963 Withdrawn
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6007 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6008 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6009 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6010 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6011 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6012 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6013 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6014 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6015 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6016 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6017 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6018 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6019 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6020 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6021 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6022 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6023 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6024 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6025 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6026 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6027 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D on 16/07/1972 Withdrawn
Electric ED's Bo-Bo E6028 4w/e 09/07/1967 70D Eastleigh 4w/e 14/06/1968 75D      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 33115 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh on 04/10/1987 SL on 10/05/1989 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 33116 4w/e 21/12/1964 70D Eastleigh on 04/10/1987 SL      
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 33117 4w/e 27/08/1962 71A Eastleigh on 04/10/1987 SL on 01/05/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 33118 4w/e 22/08/1966 70D Eastleigh on 04/10/1987 SL on 16/04/1993 Withdrawn
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 33119 w/e 10/10/1967 70D Eastleigh on 04/10/1987 SL on 26/10/1989 Withdrawn
Diesel 60 Co-Co 60045       on 25/03/1991 (New) SL      
Diesel 60 Co-Co 60046       on 04/04/1991 (New) SL      
Diesel 60 Co-Co 60047       on 04/04/1991 (New) SL      
Diesel 60 Co-Co 60001       on 29/08/1991 (New) SL      
Diesel 60 Co-Co 60086       on 16/01/1992 (New) SL      
Diesel 60 Co-Co 60040       on 06/02/1992 (New) SL      
Diesel 60 Co-Co 60093       on 21/02/1992 (New) SL      
Diesel 60 Co-Co 60016       on 09/02/1993 (New) SL      
Diesel 60 Co-Co 60009       on 11/02/1993 (New) SL