Depot: Stoke
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Stoke | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 98 | 0-6-2T | 2266 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5D | m/e | 12/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4366 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 5D | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2539 | on | 09/12/1935 | 5D | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2538 | on | 11/12/1935 | 5D | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2961 | w/e | 26/11/1938 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 08/07/1939 | 5D | w/e | 30/09/1939 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2966 | w/e | 04/02/1939 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 08/07/1939 | 5D | w/e | 30/09/1939 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4067 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4068 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4093 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4310 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4343 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4349 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4353 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 2E | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4363 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4369 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4373 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 99C | Crewe Works | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4377 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4378 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4380 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4383 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4388 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4391 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 2E | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4393 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | on | 05/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4448 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4B | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4478 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 25A | Wakefield | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4484 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 21B | Bescot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4489 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4496 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4498 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4499 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 26/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4500 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4502 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4503 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4508 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4513 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7320 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7338 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7370 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 10/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7587 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 07/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7596 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 5E | Alsager | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7599 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7609 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 25/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7610 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 11B | Workington | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7647 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7648 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 5C | Stafford | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7658 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 76 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 78 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 9A | Longsight | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 122 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 125 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8D | Widnes | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 126 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 127 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 128 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 157 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2320 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 5C | Stafford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2343 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2344 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2360 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 8C | Speke Junction | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 9C | Macclesfield |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2364 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2375 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2376 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2378 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2469 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2494 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2543 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | on | 11/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2584 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2585 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2603 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | on | 25/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2605 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2607 | on | 16/12/1936 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2609 | on | 22/12/1936 | 9A | Longsight (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | on | 13/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2663 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2664 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2665 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2666 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2667 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2668 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | on | 17/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2669 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2B | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2670 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2C | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2671 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2C | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2672 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2C | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2673 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2674 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2675 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2676 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2231 | on | 05/06/1946 | 23C | Southport (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 14C | St Albans |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2232 | on | 12/06/1946 | 23C | Southport (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 14C | St Albans |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2233 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2234 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2235 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2236 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2237 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5114 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5257 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5278 | m/e | 11/1936 | 14B | Kentish Town (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5324 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5325 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5326 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5352 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5381 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4438 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3915 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20B | Stourton | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4375 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4339 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5D | w/e | 18/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4309 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5D | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2663 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4507 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7281 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5D | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7380 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5D | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4455 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 5D | w/e | 23/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 28451 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 5D | m/e | 01/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42363 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5D | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 9C | Macclesfield |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44118 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 5D | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44118 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42349 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 5C | Stafford | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5D | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 28525 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 5D | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42431 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 5D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44379 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 5D | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4396 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 5D | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44548 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 5D | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44358 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 5D | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42479 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14C | St Albans | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2683 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42155 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42156 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42157 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42159 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42113 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 (New) | 5D | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42113 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42114 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 (New) | 5D | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42114 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42115 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 (New) | 5D | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42115 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42116 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 (New) | 5D | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42116 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke (New) | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 157 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42479 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2683 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42155 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42156 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42157 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42159 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42178 | w/e | 03/12/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42179 | 2w/e | 11/12/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42671 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 5D | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 85 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 5D | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42670 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5D | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42672 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5D | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4069 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 5D | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44120 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 5D | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4B | Northampton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42117 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 5D | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42156 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 5D | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 7B | Bangor |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44596 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 5D | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44596 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 5D | Stoke | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 85 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 5D | Stoke | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5D | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42323 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 91M | To London Midland Region |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42155 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42157 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5D | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 7B | Bangor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42443 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5D | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42445 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42449 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42458 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 10C | Patricroft |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42541 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5D | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42567 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5D | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42582 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42440 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 5D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 28616 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44067 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 05/08/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44077 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40088 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44077 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40088 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42155 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58389 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41255 | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction (New) | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 5D | on | 19/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58389 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5D | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42155 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5D | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42061 | on | 08/12/1950 (New) | 5D | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 9G | Northwich | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42062 | on | 15/12/1950 (New) | 5D | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42063 | on | 20/12/1950 (New) | 5D | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42064 | on | 21/12/1950 (New) | 5D | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42065 | on | 29/12/1950 (New) | 5D | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44308 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 5D | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44421 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 5D | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40144 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 5D | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44308 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 5D | Stoke | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5D | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44421 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 5D | Stoke | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5D | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40144 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 5D | Stoke | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 5D | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44448 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4B | Northampton | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 5D | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44448 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 5D | Stoke | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5D | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42378 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 5D | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42378 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 5D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40144 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5D | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42063 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 5D | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40201 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 5D | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40205 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 5D | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40201 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 5D | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40205 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 5D | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 2C | Warwick |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42061 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 5D | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44503 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5D | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 5E | Alsager |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42303 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5D | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42348 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5D | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40143 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5D | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44405 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 5E | Alsager |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47344 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5D | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40047 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40068 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44075 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44374 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44385 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42494 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 5D | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47472 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42494 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 5D | Stoke | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42590 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5D | on | 27/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42593 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 1C | Watford | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5D | on | 17/06/1962 | 33C | Shoeburyness |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40143 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6K | Rhyl | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40202 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40202 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44871 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45149 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42584 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42061 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42600 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 5D | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42667 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 5D | on | 13/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42234 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58376 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40081 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 1A | Willesden | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42360 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 9C | Macclesfield | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5D | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43980 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 5D | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43980 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 5D | Stoke | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 5D | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 11D | Tebay |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40143 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 5D | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44074 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5D | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42449 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5D | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42670 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5D | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44024 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17D | Rowsley | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5D | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44246 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17D | Rowsley | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5D | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47269 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5D | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47270 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5D | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42389 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5D | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42323 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 5D | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47451 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 10B | Preston | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5D | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 11B | Workington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42672 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5D | on | 17/06/1962 | 33C | Shoeburyness |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44432 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5D | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44871 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45381 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43864 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 5D | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58375 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58427 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42400 | on | 01/01/1948 | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 5D | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42582 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 5D | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42119 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 5D | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43864 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 5D | on | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43915 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5F | Uttoxeter | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 5D | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42233 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5D | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46429 | on | 04/12/1948 | 10B | Preston (New) | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5D | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46430 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 10B | Preston | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5D | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42669 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 1E | Bletchley | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 5D | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42659 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 5D | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42389 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5D | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44032 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 5D | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42419 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5D | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42420 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5D | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42421 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 3E | Monument Lane | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5D | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45185 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5D | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45301 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 6J | Holyhead | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42315 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5D | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42344 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5D | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42366 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5D | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42367 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5D | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44459 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 11E | Tebay | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42375 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 5F | Uttoxeter | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42358 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5F | Uttoxeter | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 5D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42454 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 5D | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42663 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 5D | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42418 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5C | Stafford | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5D | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42421 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5C | Stafford | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5D | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45189 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44473 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44807 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44517 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42449 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44363 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 1C | Watford | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5D | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44517 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 5D | Stoke | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5D | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46433 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 6K | Rhyl | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5D | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42368 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5E | Alsager | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5D | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47658 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5F | Uttoxeter | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5D | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46445 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 6K | Rhyl | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5D | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42375 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42378 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5D | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42435 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5D | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42475 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5D | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42494 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5C | Stafford | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 5D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42362 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 9C | Macclesfield | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5D | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42315 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5D | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45093 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45311 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5D | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44307 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5D | w/e | 06/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44593 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5D | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44271 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 5D | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42323 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 5D | w/e | 23/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42346 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 5D | on | 10/09/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42344 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 5D | on | 27/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44064 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 5D | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44315 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 5D | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44395 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 5D | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42347 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5D | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 9C | Macclesfield |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45003 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5D | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45044 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5D | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45060 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5D | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44186 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 5D | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 12H | Stranraer |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44344 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 5D | w/e | 12/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44326 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 5D | on | 31/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42362 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5D | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42418 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5D | on | 09/04/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42420 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5D | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 12E | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44271 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 5D | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44424 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 5D | w/e | 26/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44536 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 5D | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43840 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 5D | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44601 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 5D | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 11A | Barrow in Furness |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3798 | on | 05/12/1959 (New) | 5D | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 2E | Northampton | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3799 | on | 05/12/1959 (New) | 5D | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 2E | Northampton | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3800 | on | 12/12/1959 (New) | 5D | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44115 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 5D | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3801 | on | 19/12/1959 (New) | 5D | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3802 | on | 26/12/1959 (New) | 5D | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3866 | on | 14/01/1960 (New) | 5D | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3798 | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 5D | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5B | Crewe South |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3799 | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 5D | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5B | Crewe South |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3870 | on | 17/02/1960 (New) | 5D | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47451 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 11B | Workington | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 5D | w/e | 24/08/1963 | Wolverton Works | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42464 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11D | Oxenholme | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 5D | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 12G | Oxenholme |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42459 | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 5D | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44308 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 5D | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3800 | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48500 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42777 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42782 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 67C | Ayr |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42811 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42888 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42891 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42920 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42929 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 04/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44871 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45044 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45390 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 5D | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45350 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 5D | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47330 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 5D | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42885 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 5D | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42392 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 5D | w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42160 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 5D | on | 22/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42362 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 5D | w/e | 02/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45060 | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 5D | w/e | 04/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42562 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 5D | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42674 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 5D | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42851 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5D | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42923 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5D | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42787 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 5D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42887 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 5D | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42937 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 5D | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42315 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5D | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42887 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 5D | w/e | 29/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47310 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5D | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47341 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5D | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 21E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47349 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5D | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42924 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 5D | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42202 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 5D | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42198 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 5D | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42443 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 5D | w/e | 17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42663 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 5D | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45003 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5D | m/e | 06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42858 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 5D | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 67C | Ayr |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42877 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 5D | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42894 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 5D | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42778 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 5D | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42856 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 5D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44867 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 5D | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47280 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44842 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44874 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44916 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45231 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45295 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45321 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45324 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45375 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45408 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42876 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5D | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4108 | on | 23/11/1961 (New) | 5D | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4109 | on | 29/11/1961 (New) | 5D | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4110 | on | 08/12/1961 (New) | 5D | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42564 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 5D | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42889 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 5D | w/e | 05/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42925 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 5D | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44208 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 5D | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44242 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 5D | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78017 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 5D | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78056 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 5D | w/e | 16/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42926 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 5D | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42454 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 5D | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44079 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | w/e | 07/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44126 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44299 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | m/e | 05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44342 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | w/e | 26/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44349 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44352 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44354 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47596 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | w/e | 03/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47598 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47633 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | w/e | 08/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42224 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 33C | Shoeburyness | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42226 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 33C | Shoeburyness | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 2J | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45225 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42358 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 5D | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42066 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 5D | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 2J | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44750 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 5D | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44831 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 5D | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44844 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 5D | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45139 | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 5D | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45306 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 5D | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45414 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 5D | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45437 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 5D | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44370 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 5D | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42937 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 5D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47664 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 5D | w/e | 23/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44454 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 5D | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44517 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 5D | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47280 | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | w/e | 02/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42948 | w/e | 08/12/1956 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42949 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | on | 09/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42952 | w/e | 11/01/1941 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42953 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | w/e | 16/01/1963 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42959 | w/e | 09/02/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42961 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42963 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | w/e | 05/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42972 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42980 | w/e | 03/08/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42381 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42977 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 21C | Bushbury | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45074 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 18/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76020 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76022 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76023 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76051 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 16B | Colwick |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42956 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42965 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 21C | Bushbury |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45240 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45395 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45191 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 5D | w/e | 22/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76075 | m/e | 12/1956 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (New) | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 5D | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 16B | Colwick |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45241 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42542 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 5D | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45146 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 5D | w/e | 19/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45387 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 5D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45020 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 5D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45037 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 5D | w/e | 27/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45257 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 5D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42980 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5D | w/e | 11/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45020 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 5D | w/e | 11/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45257 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 5D | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45387 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 5D | w/e | 13/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44309 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 5D | w/e | 27/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44074 | 2w/e | 16/03/1963 | 67B | Hurlford | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5D | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44370 | 2w/e | 16/03/1963 | 67B | Hurlford | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5D | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42782 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 67C | Ayr | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5D | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42858 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 67C | Ayr | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5D | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45276 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 5D | w/e | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44126 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 5D | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48248 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 01/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48453 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48516 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 24/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48548 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48555 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 29/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44208 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44308 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 05/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44395 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44593 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45132 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45446 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75014 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75018 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75030 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75031 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 12/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75034 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75036 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 11/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75037 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 12E | Tebay |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75053 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 21D | Aston | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75056 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 11/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76086 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76088 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43003 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43073 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43112 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43115 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | on | 27/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76047 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76085 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43019 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43118 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 5D | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75040 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 5D | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75062 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 5D | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42226 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 2J | Aston | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 5D | on | 27/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48110 | on | 15/06/1963 | 84E | Tyseley | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 5D | w/e | 01/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42564 | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 5D | on | 08/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42605 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 5D | on | 19/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42665 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 5D | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42069 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 5D | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 2J | Aston |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44714 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 5D | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45268 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 5D | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76044 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48131 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5D | w/e | 27/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48246 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5D | w/e | 15/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48452 | on | 15/06/1963 | 84E | Tyseley | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5D | w/e | 29/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48697 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5D | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48768 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42070 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 5D | on | 26/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44179 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 5D | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43949 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 5D | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44218 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 5D | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44137 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 5D | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44682 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44713 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 5D | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45050 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45257 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 5D | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45270 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42478 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 5D | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 2J | Aston |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42488 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 5D | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42209 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 5D | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 2J | Aston |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42104 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 5D | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42075 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 5D | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 2J | Aston |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44421 | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 15E | Coalville | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 5D | w/e | 12/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47273 | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 5D | m/e | 12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75006 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | Croes Newydd | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 5D | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43022 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 5D | on | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76020 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 5D | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47649 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 5F | Uttoxeter | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 5D | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48291 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 5D | w/e | 02/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48018 | w/e | 01/08/1964 | 1H | Northampton | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48147 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 1H | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48354 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 1H | Northampton | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48369 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 1H | Northampton | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75020 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | Croes Newydd | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75023 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 89B | Croes Newydd | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 15/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75054 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 27/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76023 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 09/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76089 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 16B | Colwick |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76085 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 16B | Colwick |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76099 | 5w/e | 30/05/1964 | 67D | Ardrossan | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 16B | Colwick |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48012 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48171 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42478 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 2J | Aston | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42209 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 2J | Aston | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 5D | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44810 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 5D | w/e | 13/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45422 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 5D | w/e | 10/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44714 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 5D | w/e | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43021 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 5D | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48147 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 1H | Northampton | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 5D | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3802 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 5D | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4111 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 5D | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41212 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 5D | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41229 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 5D | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42583 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 5D | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42616 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 5D | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42080 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 5D | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48207 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 4A | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 5D | w/e | 15/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47307 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 5D | m/e | 09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47521 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 5D | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44813 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 5D | w/e | 03/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48353 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 5D | w/e | 10/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48738 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 5D | w/e | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48349 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5D | w/e | 15/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48527 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5D | w/e | 29/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43007 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43018 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5D | on | 22/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45322 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 5D | w/e | 10/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48766 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 5D | w/e | 25/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48767 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 5D | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44760 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 5D | w/e | 22/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44985 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 5D | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45038 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 5D | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45302 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 5D | w/e | 22/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | 15000 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5D | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | 15001 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5D | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | 15002 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5D | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | 15003 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5D | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75032 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5D | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 12E | Tebay |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75047 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5D | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75050 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5D | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3800 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 5D | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48343 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 5D | w/e | 18/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48256 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 5D | w/e | 29/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48514 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 5D | w/e | 29/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43001 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43088 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 5D | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43002 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75018 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | w/e | 17/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75035 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 12E | Tebay |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75050 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | w/e | 26/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78059 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46519 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | w/e | 08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46520 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 5E | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48526 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 5D | m/e | 09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47521 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 13/08/1966 | 5D | w/e | 08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44859 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48364 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48368 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16F | Burton | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44860 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2D | Banbury | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 5D | w/e | 28/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47590 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 5D | w/e | 12/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45299 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2D | Banbury | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45308 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2D | Banbury | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45292 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2A | Tyseley | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48085 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 03/12/1966 | 5D | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48375 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 03/12/1966 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48522 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 03/12/1966 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75024 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 6F | Machynlleth | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 5D | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 12E | Tebay |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44770 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 5D | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45405 | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 5D | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48061 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 2B | Oxley | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 5D | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48128 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 5D | w/e | 27/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48402 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2B | Oxley | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48729 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44661 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44805 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44840 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44876 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45052 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75013 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75046 | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75055 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 5D | w/e | 27/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75002 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 03/06/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75006 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75029 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75047 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75052 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75071 | on | 12/07/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48669 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48697 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 10/06/1967 | 5D | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3876 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 55E | Normanton | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 5D | w/e | 02/10/1971 | 55C | Healey Mills |