Depot: Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 7778 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 10E | ||||||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10793 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 10E | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9176 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 10E | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10657 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 10E | ||||||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 7765 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 10E | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7B | Bangor | ||||
Steam | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7180 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7183 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7184 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 11204 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11316 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 24/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11319 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 9G | Gorton | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11471 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 16/10/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51495 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11491 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 23/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4125 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5E | Alsager | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4358 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4473 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12091 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 04/07/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12126 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12177 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 08/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12280 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 24/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12349 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 25/09/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12366 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12393 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12397 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 25/06/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12449 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12453 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 12E | Moor Row | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7393 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 12/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7453 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8L | Aintree | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8954 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9152 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | m/e | 09/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8918 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9303 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | on | 27/11/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9312 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9317 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | m/e | 03/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6628 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | m/e | 07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6637 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 17/09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6676 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6682 | m/e | 12/1947 | Withdrawn | on | 01/01/1948 (R) | 10E | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6692 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | on | 20/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11397 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 10E | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9212 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6632 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10E | m/e | 06/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6727 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10E | w/e | 06/08/1949 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 80 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 10E | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40084 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 10E | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 108 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 10E | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9072 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 10E | w/e | 26/02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9259 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 10E | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 46643 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 7B | Bangor | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 10E | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 6D | Chester Northgate |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6742 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 10E | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44379 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 10E | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9053 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 10E | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44379 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 10E | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47293 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 10E | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9053 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 10E | m/e | 05/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47293 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 10E | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7181 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 10E | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52393 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 10B | Preston | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 10E | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7451 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 10E | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49389 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 10E | on | 28/08/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43026 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 10E | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 12C | Workington | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43027 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 10E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43028 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 10E | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 11D | Tebay | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43029 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 10E | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 11D | Tebay | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47444 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 10E | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49262 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 10E | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 46727 | w/e | 06/08/1949 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 10E | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49205 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 10E | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 46658 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 10E | on | 09/12/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49205 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 10E | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58908 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 10E | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 4A | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9377 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 27/05/1950 | 10E | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9377 | w/e | 27/05/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58900 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58378 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58378 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 7180 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 10E | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58418 | w/e | 15/07/1950 | 12D | Workington | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58932 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 7D | Rhyl | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 46757 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43025 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 58418 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 58932 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 46757 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43025 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 10E | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 12C | Workington |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41285 | m/e | 11/1950 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 10E | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41286 | m/e | 11/1950 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 10E | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41287 | m/e | 11/1950 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 10E | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 7D | Rhyl |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44303 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 9A | Longsight | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 10E | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 47184 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 10E | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 47184 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 10E | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49391 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 10B | Preston | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 10E | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49196 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 10B | Preston | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 10E | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9239 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 10E | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49288 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 10E | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9239 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 10E | m/e | 09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49288 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 10E | w/e | 14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 46643 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 10E | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47366 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 10E | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47366 | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 10E | w/e | 28/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52125 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 10E | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52125 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 10E | w/e | 30/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52196 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 10E | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52162 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 10E | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52196 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 10E | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52196 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 10E | w/e | 05/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40080 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 10E | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41288 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 10E | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41289 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 10E | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44280 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 10E | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51441 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 10E | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44280 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 10E | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 47181 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 39A | Gorton | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 10E | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52338 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 10E | w/e | 08/06/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Sentinel | 0-4-0T | 47181 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 39A | Gorton | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 10E | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44438 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 10E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49318 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 10E | w/e | 02/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47288 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 10E | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47298 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 10E | w/e | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47452 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 10E | w/e | 27/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52270 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 10E | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49281 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 10E | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52429 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 10E | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43035 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 10E | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 11D | Tebay |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43915 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 5D | Stoke | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 10E | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58174 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 10D | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44350 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 10D | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44300 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5E | Alsager | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 10D | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52322 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 10D | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52366 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 10D | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41211 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 10D | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76079 | m/e | 02/1957 (New) | 10D | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51397 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 10D | on | 21/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52393 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 10D | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49304 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 2A | Rugby | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 10D | w/e | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52140 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10D | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52201 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10D | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47166 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | Bidston | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10D | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49448 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 10D | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43185 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 10D | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43213 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 10D | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43258 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 10D | on | 18/07/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43294 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 10D | on | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43506 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 10D | on | 02/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43763 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 10D | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 9G | Gorton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3367 | on | 11/07/1957 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) (New) | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8G | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43021 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8G | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43022 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8G | w/e | 06/06/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44192 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 8G | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44266 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 24L | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 8G | w/e | 27/03/1965 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44317 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 24L | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 8G | w/e | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13245 | on | 14/05/1956 | 5B | Crewe South (New) | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 8G | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47164 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 8G | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49352 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 8G | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76020 | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 06/06/1959 | 8G | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 21D | Aston |
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 12022 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8G | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 5B | Crewe South |
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 12023 | w/e | 23/10/1954 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8G | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58182 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8G | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 24K | Preston | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58291 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 8G | w/e | 18/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58177 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 8G | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47376 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8G | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49428 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 8G | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49449 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 8G | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44315 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 8G | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43344 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 8G | on | 07/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41212 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 8G | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41324 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 8G | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44086 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 8G | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44305 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 8G | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76023 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 8G | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90170 | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8G | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90212 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8G | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90702 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8G | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44497 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8G | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58177 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8G | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 12E | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 58182 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 24K | Preston | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8G | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90178 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8G | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90464 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8G | w/e | 21/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44117 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8G | w/e | 19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44596 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 8G | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44075 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 8G | w/e | 27/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2387 | on | 29/03/1961 (New) | 8G | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 21E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44493 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 8G | w/e | 26/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2374 | on | 11/08/1961 (New) | 8G | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2375 | on | 22/08/1961 (New) | 8G | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2376 | on | 07/09/1961 (New) | 8G | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47490 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 8G | w/e | 13/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44127 | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 99C | Crewe Works | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 8G | w/e | 16/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41286 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 8G | w/e | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47392 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 8G | w/e | 04/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47668 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 8G | w/e | 08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90606 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8G | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 40E | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90566 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 8G | w/e | 11/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90147 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 8G | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47377 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 8G | w/e | 15/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44484 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 8G | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44200 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 8G | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44439 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 8G | w/e | 11/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44536 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 8G | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90390 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 8G | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90187 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8G | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47367 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 8G | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90702 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 8G | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44356 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 8G | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43994 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 16D | Nottingham | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8G | on | 27/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76080 | m/e | 02/1957 | 24D | Lower Darwen (New) | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76081 | m/e | 02/1957 | 24D | Lower Darwen (New) | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76082 | m/e | 03/1957 | 24D | Lower Darwen (New) | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8G | w/e | 08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76083 | m/e | 03/1957 | 24D | Lower Darwen (New) | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8G | w/e | 22/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76084 | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90148 | on | 15/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8G | w/e | 24/04/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48053 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 16B | Annesley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48326 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | w/e | 16/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48479 | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | w/e | 12/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48623 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | w/e | 08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48647 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | w/e | 23/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48727 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48290 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 8G | w/e | 14/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48422 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 8G | w/e | 26/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41234 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 8G | w/e | 19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48251 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 8G | m/e | 10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48206 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48215 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 8G | w/e | 09/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48722 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 21/05/1966 | 8G | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48121 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 8G | w/e | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48614 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48750 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 8G | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48149 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 16G | Westhouses | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 8G | w/e | 14/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48362 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 24/09/1966 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47603 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8G | w/e | 12/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47671 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8G | w/e | 12/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76051 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8G | w/e | 29/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76075 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48167 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47279 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 8G | w/e | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47289 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 19/11/1966 | 8G | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48193 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48185 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 8G | w/e | 11/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48617 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 8G | w/e | 20/05/1967 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48153 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 04/02/1967 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48192 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 11/02/1967 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48279 | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48676 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 17/06/1967 | 8G | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |