Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 75 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 75 Week
» 11220 Month
» 111005 Year
» 1776381 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Swansea East Dock


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Swansea East Dock Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5210       8w/e 23/03/1946 SED 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9625 4w/e 26/01/1946 LDR Landore 8w/e 23/03/1946 SED 4w/e 19/05/1962 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4296 4w/e 20/04/1946 LLY Llanelly 4w/e 30/10/1948 SED 4w/e 31/03/1952 86J Aberdare
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5221       4w/e 30/10/1948 SED 4w/e 25/01/1958 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6613       4w/e 03/12/1949 SED 4w/e 09/08/1958 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1640       on 20/03/1951 (New) 87D 4w/e 04/10/1952 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5211       4w/e 31/03/1951 87D 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1646       on 01/05/1951 (New) 87D 4w/e 21/02/1953 84J Croes Newydd
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1641       3w/e 19/05/1951 87D 4w/e 30/01/1960 88E Abercynon
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 6355 on 01/01/1934 22 Bristol Bath Road 3w/e 19/05/1951 87D 4w/e 01/11/1952 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1640 4w/e 04/10/1952 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 01/11/1952 87D 8w/e 11/07/1953 87C Danygraig
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6644 4w/e 31/08/1951 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 29/11/1952 87D 4w/e 13/08/1955 87H Neyland
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7248 4w/e 30/04/1951 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 27/12/1952 87D 4w/e 09/10/1954 87E Landore
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4259       4w/e 27/12/1952 87D 4w/e 09/10/1954 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7226 4w/e 01/11/1952 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 27/12/1952 87D 4w/e 13/07/1957 87F Llanelly
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8431       on 31/01/1953 (New) 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9489       on 31/01/1953 (New) 87D m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5731 4w/e 20/04/1946 LLY Llanelly 8w/e 11/07/1953 87D 4w/e 28/01/1956 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7224       4w/e 31/10/1953 87D 4w/e 13/07/1957 87F Llanelly
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7718 4w/e 27/03/1954 87F Llanelly 4w/e 24/04/1954 87D m/e 04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8443       4w/e 24/04/1954 87D m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 1652       on 31/12/1954 (New) 87D m/e 01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5240 8w/e 26/03/1955 83E St Blazey 4w/e 23/04/1955 87D 4w/e 05/09/1959 87F Llanelly
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4221 4w/e 01/12/1945 137 Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 16/07/1955 87D 4w/e 04/10/1958 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam Unclassified 0-4-0ST 1144 4w/e 16/07/1955 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/11/1955 87D m/e 01/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5731 4w/e 28/01/1956 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 24/03/1956 87D 4w/e 06/10/1956 87C Danygraig
Steam Unclassified 0-4-0ST 1140 4w/e 05/11/1955 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) w/e 24/03/1956 87D m/e 05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4232 4w/e 01/12/1945 137 Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 21/04/1956 87D 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5262       m/e 16/06/1956 87D 4w/e 13/06/1959 87F Llanelly
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8408       4w/e 08/09/1956 87D m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8475 3w/e 17/05/1952 87C Danygraig 4w/e 08/09/1956 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8476 on 31/03/1952 87C Danygraig (New) 4w/e 08/09/1956 87D m/e 01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8483 on 31/05/1952 87C Danygraig (New) 4w/e 08/09/1956 87D m/e 02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9491 on 31/03/1954 87C Danygraig (New) 4w/e 08/09/1956 87D m/e 06/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9448 on 31/05/1951 87A Neath (Court Sart) (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 87D 4w/e 01/12/1956 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9485 on 31/10/1952 87C Danygraig (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 87D 4w/e 03/10/1959 87F Llanelly
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9492 4w/e 01/01/1955 87F Llanelly 4w/e 06/10/1956 87D 4w/e 23/02/1957 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7756 4w/e 26/01/1957 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 8w/e 20/04/1957 87D 4w/e 28/11/1959 85E Gloucester Barnwood
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7248 4w/e 13/07/1957 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 25/01/1958 87D 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7225       4w/e 25/01/1958 87D 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7226 4w/e 13/07/1957 87F Llanelly 4w/e 25/01/1958 87D 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7215 4w/e 30/11/1957 87F Llanelly 4w/e 25/01/1958 87D 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8414       4w/e 25/01/1958 87D m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8423 4w/e 31/08/1951 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 24/01/1959 87D m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9431 on 30/11/1950 87B Duffryn Yard (New) 4w/e 24/01/1959 87D m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 43xx 2-6-0 5361 4w/e 27/12/1958 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 21/03/1959 87D 4w/e 13/06/1959 87F Llanelly
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8418 4w/e 31/08/1951 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 11/07/1959 87D 4w/e 28/11/1959 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3694 4w/e 22/02/1958 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D 4w/e 28/11/1959 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6700 8w/e 20/04/1957 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6702 4w/e 14/06/1958 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6712 4w/e 02/11/1957 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6714 4w/e 23/04/1955 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6720 4w/e 08/08/1953 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 07/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6738 4w/e 21/02/1959 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D on 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6749 4w/e 18/05/1957 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D on 30/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6753 4w/e 21/02/1959 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6763 m/e 16/06/1956 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D 4w/e 25/02/1961 86B Newport Pill
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6767 4w/e 21/02/1959 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D on 12/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6768 4w/e 06/11/1954 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6770 4w/e 21/02/1959 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D 4w/e 30/01/1960 83F Truro
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6773 4w/e 11/07/1959 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6774 4w/e 10/08/1957 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6776 8w/e 20/04/1957 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 01/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6777 8w/e 20/04/1957 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6778 4w/e 07/09/1957 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D m/e 05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 74xx 0-6-0PT 7408 8w/e 26/03/1955 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D 4w/e 28/01/1961 87G Carmarthen
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47478 on 01/01/1948 4C Swansea (Upper Bank) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D w/e 03/10/1959 Wolverton Works
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47479 on 01/01/1948 4C Swansea (Upper Bank) 4w/e 05/09/1959 87D w/e 03/10/1959 Wolverton Works
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3661       4w/e 03/10/1959 87D 4w/e 15/07/1961 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4232 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig 4w/e 03/10/1959 87D m/e 10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5675 4w/e 24/01/1959 88A Radyr 4w/e 03/10/1959 87D 4w/e 29/06/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6613 4w/e 09/08/1958 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 03/10/1959 87D 4w/e 09/03/1963 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7248 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D 4w/e 15/12/1962 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4271 4w/e 11/07/1959 87F Llanelly 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D 4w/e 14/07/1962 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5210 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5211 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 88J Aberdare
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5230 4w/e 30/09/1951 87F Llanelly 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D 4w/e 09/03/1963 87D Swansea East Dock
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5232 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D 4w/e 18/06/1960 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5246 4w/e 04/10/1958 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D 4w/e 18/06/1960 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7225 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D 4w/e 09/09/1961 87F Llanelly
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7226 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 86E Severn Tunnel Junction
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7215 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D m/e 06/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5616 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5628 4w/e 13/06/1959 87C Danygraig 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D 4w/e 09/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6762 m/e 11/1948 TDU Tondu (New) 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D m/e 03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5704 4w/e 08/09/1956 87C Danygraig 4w/e 30/01/1960 87D m/e 05/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6719 4w/e 16/07/1955 87C Danygraig 4w/e 30/01/1960 87D m/e 07/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9744 4w/e 08/09/1956 87C Danygraig 4w/e 30/01/1960 87D 4w/e 20/05/1961 87F Llanelly
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3693       4w/e 21/05/1960 87D 4w/e 17/06/1961 87G Carmarthen
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4650       4w/e 21/05/1960 87D 4w/e 15/07/1961 86F Aberbeeg
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5783 4w/e 29/11/1952 81E Didcot 4w/e 21/05/1960 87D m/e 03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6754       4w/e 21/05/1960 87D 4w/e 05/11/1960 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 8488       4w/e 21/05/1960 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8750 4w/e 27/12/1952 81C Southall 4w/e 21/05/1960 87D m/e 05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8774       4w/e 21/05/1960 87D 4w/e 17/06/1961 88A Cardiff Canton
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8798 4w/e 16/05/1953 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 21/05/1960 87D m/e 06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Unclassified 0-4-0ST 1338 m/e 12/1943 TN Taunton 4w/e 18/06/1960 87D m/e 09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6755 4w/e 27/02/1960 84B Oxley 4w/e 13/08/1960 87D m/e 06/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6757 4w/e 21/05/1960 84B Oxley 4w/e 13/08/1960 87D on 12/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6765 4w/e 22/02/1958 88C Barry 4w/e 13/08/1960 87D 4w/e 30/11/1963 87D Swansea East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9749       4w/e 08/10/1960 87D on 09/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5609       4w/e 05/11/1960 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5623 4w/e 31/10/1950 88E Abercynon 4w/e 05/11/1960 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 88B Radyr
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3648       4w/e 28/01/1961 87D 4w/e 15/07/1961 87F Llanelly
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9441 8w/e 26/03/1955 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 28/01/1961 87D m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6741       4w/e 25/03/1961 87D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6764 m/e 11/1948 NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport) (New) 4w/e 20/05/1961 87D 4w/e 12/01/1963 87D Swansea East Dock
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3785 8w/e 23/03/1946 LDR Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D m/e 07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3797       4w/e 17/06/1961 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5631       4w/e 17/06/1961 87D m/e 09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6650 4w/e 18/06/1960 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D 4w/e 09/03/1963 88C Barry
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6688 4w/e 27/12/1952 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D 4w/e 09/09/1961 88B Radyr
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8794 4w/e 11/08/1956 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9416 4w/e 05/11/1960 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D m/e 01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9484 on 31/10/1952 87E Landore (New) 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9715 4w/e 11/08/1956 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D 4w/e 15/07/1961 87B Duffryn Yard
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9761       4w/e 17/06/1961 87D on 22/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42305 4w/e 05/09/1959 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D on 01/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42307 4w/e 05/09/1959 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D on 27/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42385 4w/e 05/09/1959 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D on 08/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42387 4w/e 05/09/1959 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D m/e 04/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42388 4w/e 05/09/1959 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D on 02/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42394 4w/e 05/09/1959 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D on 12/08/1962 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42182 4w/e 03/12/1960 87E Landore 4w/e 17/06/1961 87D on 12/08/1962 1A Willesden
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6602 4w/e 15/07/1961 87H Neyland 4w/e 12/08/1961 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 87E Landore
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7225 4w/e 09/09/1961 87F Llanelly 4w/e 02/12/1961 87D 4w/e 09/02/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9752       4w/e 21/04/1962 87D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3635 4w/e 25/03/1961 83G Penzance 4w/e 19/05/1962 87D on 17/05/1964 2A Tyseley
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7244 4w/e 09/09/1961 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 19/05/1962 87D 2w/e 17/11/1962 87F Llanelly
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9744 4w/e 20/05/1961 87F Llanelly 4w/e 19/05/1962 87D 4w/e 09/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80069 4w/e 23/01/1954 33B Tilbury on 15/07/1962 87D on 09/08/1964 70A Nine Elms
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80072 4w/e 23/01/1954 33B Tilbury on 15/07/1962 87D on 08/09/1963 2L Leamington
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80097 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford on 15/07/1962 87D on 14/07/1963 89D Oswestry
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80099 w/e 23/06/1962 30A Stratford on 15/07/1962 87D on 14/07/1963 89C Machynlleth
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80133 w/e 07/11/1959 33C Shoeburyness on 15/07/1962 87D 4w/e 06/04/1963 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80134 w/e 07/11/1959 33B Tilbury on 15/07/1962 87D 6w/e 13/04/1964 87F Llanelly
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6724 4w/e 05/10/1957 86B Newport Pill 4w/e 03/11/1962 87D m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6742 4w/e 31/03/1952 86B Newport Pill 4w/e 03/11/1962 87D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6754 4w/e 05/11/1960 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 03/11/1962 87D on 18/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5656 4w/e 26/12/1959 87F Llanelly 2w/e 17/11/1962 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 87E Landore
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9746       2w/e 17/11/1962 87D m/e 03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6760 4w/e 03/11/1962 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 15/12/1962 87D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6763 4w/e 25/02/1961 86B Newport Pill 4w/e 15/12/1962 87D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6772 on 02/11/1950 86B Newport Pill (New) 4w/e 15/12/1962 87D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST 51218 w/e 12/09/1959 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 15/12/1962 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6764 4w/e 20/05/1961 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 12/01/1963 87D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8714 4w/e 11/08/1962 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 09/02/1963 87D 6w/e 12/10/1964 82E Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 7248 4w/e 15/12/1962 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 09/03/1963 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 87E Landore
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 5230 4w/e 31/10/1959 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 09/03/1963 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 87F Llanelly
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6680 4w/e 17/06/1961 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 09/03/1963 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 88B Radyr
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4264 4w/e 13/08/1960 86B Newport Pill 4w/e 29/06/1963 87D m/e 07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 47003       on 14/07/1963 87D 2w/e 15/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4295 4w/e 13/08/1960 87F Llanelly 4w/e 27/07/1963 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 88H Tondu
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 5602 4w/e 13/08/1960 87F Llanelly 4w/e 27/07/1963 87D 4w/e 30/11/1963 88D Merthyr Tydfil
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9606 4w/e 07/09/1957 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 27/07/1963 87D 4w/e 20/07/1964 85B Gloucester Horton Road
Steam 0F 0-4-0T 41535 4w/e 18/05/1957 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 28/09/1963 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4227 4w/e 25/02/1956 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) 4w/e 02/11/1963 87D 4w/e 28/12/1963 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3671 w/e 11/03/1959 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 30/11/1963 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3733 w/e 11/03/1959 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 30/11/1963 87D m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6765 4w/e 13/08/1960 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 30/11/1963 87D m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9732 w/e 11/03/1959 72C Yeovil Town 4w/e 30/11/1963 87D m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3721 4w/e 31/12/1960 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 28/12/1963 87D m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4658 4w/e 09/03/1963 87H Neyland 4w/e 28/12/1963 87D m/e 05/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 74xx 0-6-0PT 7404       4w/e 28/12/1963 87D m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8732 4w/e 26/01/1957 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 28/12/1963 87D m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 8739 4w/e 14/07/1962 87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 28/12/1963 87D on 17/05/1964 2B Oxley
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9677 4w/e 07/09/1957 87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 28/12/1963 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9748 4w/e 06/04/1963 87H Neyland 4w/e 28/12/1963 87D m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3672 4w/e 30/11/1950 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 25/01/1964 87D m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4699 4w/e 01/06/1963 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 25/01/1964 87D m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 74xx 0-6-0PT 7427 4w/e 15/07/1961 86E Severn Tunnel Junction 4w/e 25/01/1964 87D m/e 06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9660 4w/e 27/07/1963 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 25/01/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9780 4w/e 09/02/1963 88H Tondu 4w/e 25/01/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3610 4w/e 16/06/1962 87B Duffryn Yard 4w/e 22/02/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87F Llanelly
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3603 4w/e 01/11/1958 86J Aberdare 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3615 2w/e 17/11/1962 88C Barry 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 88C Barry
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4663 4w/e 03/11/1962 88H Tondu 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 86F Aberbeeg
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9446 4w/e 27/07/1963 86F Aberbeeg 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9472 4w/e 09/02/1963 88B Radyr 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9473 on 31/05/1952 87A Neath (Court Sart) (New) 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 9480 4w/e 03/11/1962 88B Radyr 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9675       3w/e 04/05/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 9678 6w/e 13/04/1964 88J Aberdare 3w/e 04/05/1964 87D 7w/e 22/06/1964 87A Neath (Court Sart)