Depot: Swindon
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Swindon | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 100 | on | 29/04/1902 | SDN | 2w/e | 14/06/1902 | SW Stock | Swindon Stock shed | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 100 | 2w/e | 14/06/1902 | SW Stock | Swindon Stock shed | on | 16/06/1902 | SDN | on | 02/08/1902 | B | Bristol Bath Road (B&E) |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4037 | on | 30/12/1910 | LA | Laira (New) | on | 07/06/1913 | SDN | on | 17/06/1913 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4000 | on | 21/11/1929 | SDN | on | 16/12/1930 | NA | Newton Abbot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5019 | on | 24/07/1932 (New) | SDN | on | 19/08/1932 | LA | Laira | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5021 | on | 17/08/1932 | LA | Laira (New) | on | 10/03/1933 | SDN | m/e | 31/03/1933 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4037 | m/e | 03/1933 | CARM | Carmarthen | on | 28/11/1933 | SDN | on | 19/12/1933 | CARM | Carmarthen |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2023 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4532 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SDN | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | TR | Truro | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4829 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5806 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SDN | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 129 | |||||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | 1499 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SDN | ||||||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3364 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3421 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1660 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SDN | ||||||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2902 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | LMTN | Leamington | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2954 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2978 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | SDN | m/e | 08/1946 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1331 | 0-6-0ST | 1331 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | OSY | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2651 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4028 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4071 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | SDN | on | 18/12/1938 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 3571 | 0-4-2T | 3571 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | SDN | m/e | 10/1942 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4089 | on | 17/02/1937 | LDR | Landore | on | 09/02/1938 | SDN | m/e | 02/1942 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4076 | on | 30/08/1935 | EXE | Exeter | on | 28/08/1938 | SDN | m/e | 10/1938 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4016 | m/e | 02/1933 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 14/04/1939 | SDN | on | 17/06/1939 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5048 | on | 19/01/1938 | LDR | Landore | on | 18/12/1939 | SDN | m/e | 02/1940 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5007 | on | 05/05/1938 | LDR | Landore | on | 15/03/1940 | SDN | on | 30/03/1940 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5080 | m/e | 08/1940 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 09/01/1941 | SDN | on | 20/03/1941 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | on | 13/06/1939 | LDR | Landore | on | 12/01/1941 | SDN | m/e | 02/1941 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5003 | on | 17/08/1937 | EXE | Exeter | on | 20/01/1941 | SDN | m/e | 03/1941 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4091 | on | 19/09/1939 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 05/08/1941 | SDN | on | 01/11/1941 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5068 | on | 01/02/1941 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 06/11/1941 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5043 | on | 13/03/1936 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | m/e | 12/1941 | SDN | on | 04/04/1942 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5093 | m/e | 03/1941 | LDR | Landore | on | 26/12/1941 | SDN | m/e | 02/1942 | LDR | Landore |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5048 | m/e | 01/1941 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 06/02/1942 | SDN | m/e | 02/1943 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5003 | on | 18/09/1941 | EXE | Exeter | on | 07/08/1942 | SDN | on | 27/08/1942 | TN | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5010 | m/e | 12/1940 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 20/01/1943 | SDN | m/e | 04/1943 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5067 | on | 21/07/1937 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 20/03/1943 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | m/e | 03/1939 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 21/04/1943 | SDN | m/e | 07/1943 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5964 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | SDN | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4853 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7794 | 4w/e | 03/11/1945 | 32 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5932 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6384 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5092 | m/e | 07/1943 | WOS | Worcester | on | 31/07/1946 | SDN | m/e | 11/1946 | WOS | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6902 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | m/e | 02/1941 | 85 | on | 08/10/1946 | SDN | on | 08/02/1947 | 85 | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5083 | on | 24/11/1937 | LDR | Landore | on | 06/12/1946 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5079 | m/e | 03/1941 | LDR | Landore | on | 24/01/1947 | SDN | m/e | 03/1947 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5015 | on | 16/10/1945 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 27/01/1947 | SDN | on | 03/04/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5017 | on | 01/04/1939 | WOS | Worcester | on | 14/02/1947 | SDN | m/e | 04/1947 | WOS | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5099 | on | 25/05/1946 | PDN | Old Oak Common (New) | on | 24/02/1947 | SDN | m/e | 05/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5043 | on | 04/04/1942 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 23/05/1947 | SDN | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 850 | 0-6-0ST | 992 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 02/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1366 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 30/06/1948 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1369 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1371 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | on | 21/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2014 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 11/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2017 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2060 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 12/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2224 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 87G | Carmarthen | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2250 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2568 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 05/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2723 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 08/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2908 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 12/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2913 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 31/05/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2927 | on | 01/10/1907 | CDF | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2934 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 06/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2935 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 12/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2945 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2947 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2949 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 01/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2954 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 07/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3645 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3666 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3682 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3684 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3724 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 05/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3737 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3739 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3748 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3780 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | on | 18/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4015 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 02/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4017 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 11/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4022 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 02/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4036 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 03/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4055 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 02/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4057 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 02/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4062 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 11/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4381 | on | 01/01/1934 | Sw Wks | Swindon Works | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4502 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | PZ | Penzance | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 10/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4507 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4510 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | PZ | Penzance | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | WES | Westbury |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4521 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | la | Moorswater | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4538 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4543 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | WES | Westbury | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4544 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4550 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | na | Kingsbridge | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4551 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | brd | Weston-super-Mare | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4585 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4590 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4592 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4651 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4697 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1400 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 06/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1433 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | sdn | Chippenham | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1436 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1446 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1453 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4905 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84K | Chester West | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4925 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4945 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4956 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5067 | on | 20/03/1943 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5068 | on | 06/11/1941 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | on | 19/05/1962 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5322 | on | 01/01/1934 | 66 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 81F | Oxford | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5367 | on | 01/01/1934 | 162 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5371 | on | 01/01/1934 | 107 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5396 | on | 01/01/1934 | Sw Wks | Swindon Works | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5510 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 10/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5534 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5563 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82E | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5566 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | spm | Wells | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5800 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 07/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5802 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 12/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5804 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5805 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 03/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5934 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5943 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5978 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 31/05/1948 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6320 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | OXF | Oxford | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6322 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6340 | on | 01/01/1934 | 111 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 81E | Didcot | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6357 | on | 01/01/1934 | 121 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 85A | Worcester | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6358 | on | 01/01/1934 | 215 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82D | Westbury | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6360 | on | 01/01/1934 | sdn | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6374 | on | 01/01/1934 | 114 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6384 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6387 | on | 01/01/1934 | 126 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 84C | Banbury | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6716 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 02/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6737 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 07/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6739 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6741 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6902 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 31/05/1948 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6935 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 31/05/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6965 | m/e | 09/1944 | 132 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 31/05/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7321 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | wes | Salisbury (GWR) | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7415 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7418 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7424 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7792 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 11/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7794 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8733 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 83E | St Blazey | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8779 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | wes | Frome | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9011 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | on | 24/11/1955 | To Store | |||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9018 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 9023 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | on | 24/11/1955 | To Store | |||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9400 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9600 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9720 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 11/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9721 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9772 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 01/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9773 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9790 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9795 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | on | 29/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1731 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 06/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1854 | 0-6-0PT | 1758 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3561 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | ||||||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3421 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | SDN | Swindon | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 04/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3452 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 04/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 645 | 0-6-0PT | 1542 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | sdn | Chippenham | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | ||||
Steam | Unclassified | 0-6-0ST | 2195 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 162 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | m/e | 01/1953 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5091 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 30/06/1947 | SDN | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2731 | on | 11/07/1947 | Withdrawn | on | 27/08/1947 (R) | SDN | m/e | 10/1947 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5069 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 30/09/1947 | SDN | m/e | 11/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 3901 | 2-6-2T | 3904 | on | 10/1933 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 (R) | SDN | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5091 | on | 30/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | SDN | m/e | 05/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3575 | on | 03/11/1912 | ANN | Annesley | m/e | 31/03/1948 | SDN | on | 23/01/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5083 | on | 29/08/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 30/04/1948 | SDN | on | 21/07/1948 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | on | 21/05/1948 | SDN | m/e | 30/06/1948 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | on | 21/05/1948 | SDN | Swindon | m/e | 30/06/1948 | SDN | on | 22/08/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4081 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | on | 10/07/1948 | SDN | on | 04/11/1950 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4612 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | SDN | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8793 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | SDN | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5083 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | SDN | Swindon | on | 21/07/1948 | SDN | m/e | 06/1956 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7014 | on | 21/07/1948 (New) | SDN | m/e | 08/1948 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7015 | m/e | 09/1948 (New) | SDN | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7017 | m/e | 09/1948 (New) | SDN | m/e | 11/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7015 | m/e | 09/1948 | SDN | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | SDN | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5009 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | m/e | 10/1948 | SDN | on | 14/10/1948 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5009 | m/e | 10/1948 | SDN | Swindon | on | 14/10/1948 | SDN | on | 24/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1366 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SDN | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4972 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SDN | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4168 | on | 01/11/1948 (New) | SDN | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | NEY | Neyland | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4169 | on | 16/11/1948 (New) | SDN | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | CARM | Carmarthen | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4973 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | SDN | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6908 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | SDN | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2822 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | SDN | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | CNYD | Croes Newydd |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5087 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 10/02/1949 | SDN | on | 24/02/1949 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2841 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | SDN | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | SALOP | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6914 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | SDN | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1403 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SDN | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7015 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SDN | m/e | 11/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5075 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | CHR | Chester West | on | 28/03/1949 | SDN | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5089 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 31/03/1949 | SDN | on | 14/04/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5087 | on | 24/02/1949 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 04/04/1949 | SDN | on | 02/05/1949 | PDN | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5098 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | LA | Laira | on | 30/05/1949 | SDN | on | 01/07/1949 | LA | Laira |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7900 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | SDN | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5080 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 16/08/1949 | SDN | on | 13/09/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1433 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | SDN | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5008 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 21/10/1949 | SDN | on | 04/02/1950 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5922 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | SDN | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6915 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | SDN | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7900 | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | SDN | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1436 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | SDN | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7006 | on | 14/10/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 20/01/1950 | SDN | on | 28/05/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 100A1 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 01/03/1950 | 82C | m/e | 31/03/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6909 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7012 | m/e | 08/1948 | LDR | Landore (New) | on | 14/04/1950 | 82C | on | 12/05/1950 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82C | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4032 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | LA | Laira | on | 27/06/1950 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7032 | on | 05/07/1950 (New) | 82C | on | 10/07/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 23/09/1950 | 82C | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7923 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7923 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 82C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4951 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | on | 23/09/1950 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 82C | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7037 | on | 09/09/1950 | 98S | on | 08/11/1950 | 82C | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82C | Swindon | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4951 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4536 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7037 | on | 08/11/1950 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82C | on | 06/09/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7016 | m/e | 09/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 08/12/1950 | 82C | on | 15/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4536 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90579 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90579 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | MC | Melton Constable |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3746 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3865 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4034 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4909 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4969 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5509 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5540 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4958 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4983 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43094 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 82C | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 31A | Cambridge |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1647 | on | 09/05/1951 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1648 | on | 18/05/1951 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1647 | on | 09/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 87C | Danygraig |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1648 | on | 18/05/1951 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 87C | Danygraig |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3746 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3865 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4034 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | m/e | 09/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4909 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4969 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5509 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5536 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5540 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75000 | m/e | 05/1951 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5564 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 82C | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5564 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 82C | Swindon | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 82C | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8472 | on | 31/07/1951 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4912 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4916 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7418 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8472 | on | 31/07/1951 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4912 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4916 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7418 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1403 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4032 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 83B | Taunton | on | 19/09/1951 | 82C | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4016 | on | 24/09/1951 | Withdrawn | on | 27/09/1951 (R) | 82C | |||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1403 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7027 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 17/10/1951 | 82C | on | 09/11/1951 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75006 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5325 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5327 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4538 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8783 | on | 15/06/1947 | SBZ | St Blazey | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4538 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8783 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | WOS | Worcester | on | 08/02/1952 | 82C | on | 05/01/1954 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1366 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8783 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7033 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 27/03/1952 | 82C | on | 28/04/1952 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1366 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8783 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9476 | on | 30/06/1952 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3854 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 81F | Oxford | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5226 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9476 | on | 30/06/1952 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2818 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 82C | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4254 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 82C | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5240 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 82C | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5077 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | on | 12/08/1952 | 82C | on | 22/09/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2818 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4254 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5240 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 82C | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4945 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5062 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 83B | Taunton | on | 14/10/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4934 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5062 | on | 14/10/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | on | 23/04/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5994 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6307 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6314 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6348 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6805 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83F | Truro |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6832 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6850 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7319 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | on | 22/08/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 02/11/1952 | 82C | on | 15/07/1955 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6368 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8497 | m/e | 12/1932 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 (R) | 82C | |||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8498 | m/e | 02/1933 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 (R) | 82C | |||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8497 | on | 30/11/1952 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8498 | on | 30/11/1952 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8499 | on | 30/11/1952 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6945 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 82C | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6307 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4073 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | on | 27/01/1953 | 82C | on | 27/03/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4907 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6823 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1367 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5534 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 1366 | 0-6-0PT | 1370 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2852 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82C | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2865 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2868 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3739 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5994 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6819 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6389 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4573 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5997 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6949 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6967 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7415 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7418 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8461 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75001 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75002 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75004 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5975 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75000 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75003 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82C | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4972 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 82C | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78004 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 82C | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5091 | m/e | 05/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | on | 03/02/1954 | 82C | m/e | 04/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1004 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1019 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 84A | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82C | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7413 | on | 15/06/1947 | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5784 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 82C | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7421 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 82C | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73022 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82C | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73027 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82C | on | 07/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2214 | on | 15/06/1947 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 82C | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4928 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 82C | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8793 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6309 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 82C | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7008 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | OXF | Oxford | on | 10/11/1954 | 82C | m/e | 01/1955 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5086 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 85A | Worcester | on | 30/12/1954 | 82C | on | 09/02/1955 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2262 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5351 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7408 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 82C | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1658 | on | 28/02/1955 (New) | 82C | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6699 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9604 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 82C | on | 12/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 1365 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 82C | on | 20/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6163 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1410 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5306 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5350 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 82C | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7018 | m/e | 06/1949 | LDR | Landore (New) | on | 15/08/1955 | 82C | on | 26/05/1956 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5084 | on | 15/07/1955 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 01/09/1955 | 82C | on | 19/10/1956 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1630 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4538 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82C | m/e | 05/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5984 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | CARM | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6912 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 9315 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82C | on | 18/06/1959 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5000 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 03/11/1955 | 82C | m/e | 19/05/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2215 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2879 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1462 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6639 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7421 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82C | m/e | 11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8433 | on | 31/03/1953 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2293 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 82C | m/e | 07/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6935 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 82C | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3763 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4953 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9605 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 82C | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 83C | Westbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5025 | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 05/1956 | 82C | on | 20/03/1958 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2203 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4697 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82C | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9672 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82C | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9740 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 84G | Shrewsbury | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82C | m/e | 02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75025 | m/e | 04/1954 | 83D | Laira (New) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75026 | m/e | 05/1954 | 83D | Laira (New) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 31/07/1956 | 82C | on | 21/08/1956 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6966 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75023 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1012 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82C | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1422 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82C | m/e | 06/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6902 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82C | m/e | 05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6993 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6355 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7020 | m/e | 06/1949 | CDF | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 08/11/1956 | 82C | on | 21/12/1956 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7035 | on | 01/10/1956 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 19/11/1956 | 82C | on | 01/12/1956 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4959 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73001 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73012 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73017 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82C | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73018 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82C | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73020 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 82C | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75002 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 89A | Oswestry | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1433 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82C | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6967 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2258 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 85A | Worcester | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82C | m/e | 12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13362 | on | 17/05/1957 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1410 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82C | m/e | 06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5547 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82C | m/e | 02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5986 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 82C | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73029 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 82C | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7415 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 82C | m/e | 02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6334 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82C | m/e | 04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6354 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82C | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | m/e | 10/1956 | 87E | Landore | on | 03/01/1958 | 82C | on | 12/11/1959 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | D600 | on | 24/01/1958 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5328 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82C | m/e | 07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6309 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6336 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6366 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 86K | Tredegar |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5023 | on | 27/01/1958 | 85A | Worcester | on | 20/03/1958 | 82C | on | 24/09/1962 | To Store | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2835 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82C | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6736 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82C | m/e | 02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | D601 | on | 28/03/1958 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 5815 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 82C | m/e | 04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5064 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 23/04/1958 | 82C | on | 11/09/1961 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | on | 21/08/1956 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 25/06/1958 | 82C | on | 16/10/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4102 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82C | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1464 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82C | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Warship | B-B | D800 | on | 11/08/1958 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5964 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5978 | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5981 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5983 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5997 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5005 | on | 20/03/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 26/09/1958 | 82C | m/e | 02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5086 | on | 09/02/1955 | 85A | Worcester | on | 03/10/1958 | 82C | on | 10/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1438 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5306 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5528 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82C | m/e | 11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5532 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8465 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 82C | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | 22 | B-B | D6300 | on | 12/01/1959 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3711 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | ABEEG | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5007 | on | 18/02/1957 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 02/02/1959 | 82C | on | 09/03/1961 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4129 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6391 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6758 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 86B | Newport Pill | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6769 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75027 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75029 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7427 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75024 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 84E | Tyseley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3803 | on | 05/12/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3804 | on | 11/12/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3758 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 82C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2086 | on | 05/06/1959 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 17/10/1966 | 73F | Ashford | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2087 | on | 24/06/1959 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2088 | on | 01/07/1959 (New) | 82C | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 16C | Derby | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5945 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2230 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5322 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5058 | on | 01/06/1957 | 83D | Laira | on | 22/09/1959 | 82C | on | 30/11/1959 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1010 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82C | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1015 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2215 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2250 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 82C | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1021 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2291 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2890 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9476 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 83F | Truro | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82C | m/e | 06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5536 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 82C | m/e | 12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7031 | on | 24/03/1959 | 83D | Laira | on | 05/01/1960 | 82C | on | 24/03/1962 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | D3/10 | 0-6-0 | 15100 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6327 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82C | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5002 | on | 12/11/1959 | 85A | Worcester | on | 08/02/1960 | 82C | on | 24/09/1962 | To Store | |
Steam | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 1364 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 82C | m/e | 02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1634 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 87C | Danygraig | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 82C | m/e | 06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1640 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 87C | Danygraig | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 82C | m/e | 07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4097 | m/e | 06/1957 | 87E | Landore | on | 04/04/1960 | 82C | on | 06/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1426 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 82C | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5044 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 04/07/1960 | 82C | on | 05/07/1960 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13187 | on | 04/11/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5035 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 06/09/1960 | 82C | on | 17/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1621 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2857 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82C | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5949 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82C | m/e | 05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5997 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82C | m/e | 07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6986 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8711 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82C | m/e | 03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4074 | on | 03/05/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | on | 31/10/1960 | 82C | on | 17/01/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2143 | on | 13/01/1961 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2144 | on | 19/01/1961 (New) | 82C | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4088 | on | 28/00/1958 | 85A | Worcester | on | 07/02/1961 | 82C | on | 24/09/1962 | To Store | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2145 | on | 12/02/1961 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2146 | on | 14/02/1961 (New) | 82C | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4852 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3818 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4644 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5555 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2187 | on | 08/03/1961 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | To Store | |||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2188 | on | 20/03/1961 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | To Store | |||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1023 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2189 | on | 31/03/1961 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | To Store | |||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2190 | on | 14/04/1961 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | DG | Danygraig | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3842 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4934 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9754 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 82D | Westbury |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2191 | on | 27/04/1961 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | DG | Danygraig | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2192 | on | 05/05/1961 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | DG | Danygraig | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2193 | on | 15/05/1961 (New) | 82C | on | 25/01/1969 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2194 | on | 23/05/1961 (New) | 82C | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2195 | on | 05/06/1961 (New) | 82C | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2196 | on | 08/06/1961 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4013 | on | 02/05/1961 | 83D | Laira (New) | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1029 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 82C | on | 05/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5040 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | on | 04/09/1961 | 82C | on | 19/10/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5568 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5570 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81C | Southall |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2126 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82C | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4027 | on | 15/08/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh (New) | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4947 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4948 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82C | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4978 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5369 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5943 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82C | m/e | 06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7907 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82C | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2192 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | DG | Danygraig | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82C | on | 25/01/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1664 | on | 31/03/1955 | 83E | St Blazey (New) | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 82C | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5050 | on | 08/08/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | on | 18/01/1962 | 82C | on | 05/04/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4612 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 82C | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4644 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 82C | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 87F | Llanelli |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4118 | on | 16/02/1962 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2181 | on | 21/02/1962 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4119 | on | 22/02/1962 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9680 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 82C | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4120 | on | 28/02/1962 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4121 | on | 07/03/1962 (New) | 82C | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4122 | on | 16/03/1962 (New) | 82C | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 83B | Taunton | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4123 | on | 20/03/1962 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4119 | on | 22/02/1962 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 82C | 2w/e | 13/01/1973 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1630 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 82C | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4909 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 82C | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4124 | on | 29/03/1962 (New) | 82C | w/e | 14/04/1973 | EJ | |||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4125 | on | 05/04/1962 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2186 | on | 23/05/1962 (New) | 82C | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4168 | on | 25/05/1962 (New) | 82C | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1019 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 82C | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3709 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 82C | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | on | 14/03/1962 | 98S | on | 11/08/1962 | 82C | on | 30/11/1963 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2182 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 82C | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2244 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 89C | Machynlleth | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 82C | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4930 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82C | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5939 | on | 15/06/1947 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82C | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4924 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82C | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6940 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 82C | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1006 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 82C | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4919 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 82C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4951 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5564 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5569 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6900 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 82C | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4980 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82C | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4991 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82C | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4993 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82C | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4950 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 81E | Didcot |
Diesel | D3/10 | 0-6-0 | 15100 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81C | Southall | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 82C | on | 21/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1008 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury | on | 08/09/1963 | 82C | on | 07/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1013 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury | on | 08/09/1963 | 82C | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1014 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury | on | 08/09/1963 | 82C | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1027 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 89A | Shrewsbury | on | 08/09/1963 | 82C | on | 05/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1020 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82C | m/e | 02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1024 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82C | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1028 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82C | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4919 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1011 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 82C | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73028 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 1000 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82C | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6106 | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82C | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6130 | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82C | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | Western | C-C | D1028 | on | 25/02/1964 (New) | 82C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 84A | Laira | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4916 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82C | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5955 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81F | Oxford | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82C | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7916 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 83D | Laira | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82C | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4569 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 83E | Yeovil Town | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 82C | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4591 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 72C | Yeovil Town | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 82C | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4916 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 82C | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7926 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 82C | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6106 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 85A | Worcester | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 82C | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6122 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 82C | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7808 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 82C | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7813 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 82C | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7816 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 82C | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7829 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 82C | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 81E | Didcot |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2186 | on | 23/05/1962 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 82C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 81F | Oxford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4169 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 82C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2566 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 32B | Ipswich | on | 12/09/1965 | 82C | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2569 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | on | 12/09/1965 | 82C | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | D2570 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | on | 12/09/1965 | 82C | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2119 | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | 85H | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 82C | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | 84A | Laira | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2114 | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | 85A | Worcester | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82C | m/e | 30/07/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2133 | on | 23/02/1960 | 83B | Taunton (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82C | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | 83B | Taunton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4014 | on | 16/05/1961 | 83A | Newton Abbot (New) | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | 82C | q/e | 22/05/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2123 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 85A | Worcester | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 82C | on | 28/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3504 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 82C | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2128 | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 85A | Worcester | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 82C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4164 | on | 09/05/1962 | 83B | Taunton (New) | m/e | 28/02/1967 | 82C | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2131 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 85A | Worcester | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82C | on | 06/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2138 | on | 05/04/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 82C | on | 24/06/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3999 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82C | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3114 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82C | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4162 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 82C | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3991 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82C | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2132 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 85A | Worcester | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82C | on | 24/06/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3183 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | on | 30/12/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3267 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3358 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | on | 01/02/1978 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3607 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | m/e | 10/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4122 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | 82C | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3102 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 82C | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2121 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 82C | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2121 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82C | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3972 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82C | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4163 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82C | w/e | 08/12/1973 | EH | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4165 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82C | w/e | 22/06/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3196 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 82C | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4023 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | q/e | 22/08/1970 | 82C | 2w/e | 25/01/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4125 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | 82C | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3513 | 6w/e | 14/08/1971 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | 82C | on | 15/07/1985 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3600 | on | 20/10/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 82C | on | 21/12/1977 | TI | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3750 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 13/01/1973 | 82C | on | 31/12/1980 | 98Ss | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3043 | 9w/e | 04/10/1972 | 70D | Eastleigh | w/e | 08/12/1973 | SW | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | EH | Eastleigh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3066 | w/e | 18/05/1974 | LA | Laira | w/e | 22/06/1974 | SW | 2w/e | 20/09/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08795 | w/e | 28/09/1974 | LA | Laira | 2w/e | 25/01/1975 | SW | m/e | 11/1981 | LA | Laira |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08804 | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | SW | m/e | 07/1981 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08839 | w/e | 22/02/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 20/09/1975 | SW | on | 10/01/1992 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08823 | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 10/1976 | SW | on | 02/08/1981 | CD | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08489 | w/e | 29/06/1974 | LA | Laira | m/e | 10/1977 | SW | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08487 | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | SW | on | 11/10/1987 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08259 | 2w/e | 05/04/1975 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 01/02/1978 | SW | on | 01/12/1980 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08411 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 6w/e | 13/05/1978 | SW | on | 28/02/2007 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08785 | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 02/08/1981 | SW |