Depot: Tebay
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Tebay | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4083 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4292 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 2B | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4469 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 24L | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9088 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9104 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9252 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 16 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 2C | Warwick | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 70 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2308 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2403 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 11D | Oxenholme | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2404 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 4A | Shrewsbury | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2424 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11E | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2396 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 11E | w/e | 07/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 67 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 11E | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4459 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 11E | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40064 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20G | Hellifield | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 11D | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43980 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 11D | on | 06/07/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42393 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 11C | Oxenholme | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 11D | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42393 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 11D | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40536 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 11D | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43028 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 11D | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43029 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 11D | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43035 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 11D | w/e | 20/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44360 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 3D | Aston | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 11D | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 12C | Workington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42404 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 11D | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43011 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 11D | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44345 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 11D | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43009 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 12H | on | 26/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43029 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 12H | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90157 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 12H | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42379 | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 12H | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42317 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 12C | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 12H | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42414 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 12H | on | 10/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42415 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 12H | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42278 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 24H | Hellifield | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 12H | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42187 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 12H | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42110 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 12H | on | 11/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42095 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 12C | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 12H | on | 04/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42210 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 12E | on | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42439 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 10B | Blackpool Central | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 12E | on | 14/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42232 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 12E | on | 29/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42225 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 12E | on | 18/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43033 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 12E | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42154 | w/e | 30/05/1964 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 12E | on | 14/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42665 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 8M | Southport | w/e | 11/06/1966 | 12E | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42251 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 12E | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42611 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 12E | w/e | 07/01/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43119 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 26/11/1966 | 12E | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42236 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 12E | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 91E | To Eastern Region |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42252 | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 12E | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 91E | To Eastern Region |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42134 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 12E | on | 01/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75019 | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12E | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75026 | w/e | 08/04/1967 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12E | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75027 | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12E | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75039 | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12E | w/e | 23/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75024 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 12E | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75032 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 12E | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75037 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 12E | w/e | 30/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75035 | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 12E | w/e | 22/07/1967 | Withdrawn |