Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 750 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6150 Week
» 24202 Month
» 257122 Year
» 1922498 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Three Bridges


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Three Bridges Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam I1X 4-4-2T 2002       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A Brighton
Steam I1X 4-4-2T 2007       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2078       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2079       on 01/01/1948 3B on 04/11/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2080       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 03/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2081       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 05/02/1951 75E Three Bridges
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 2082       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 07/10/1950 75E Three Bridges
Steam Marsh Goods 0-6-0 2303       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2352       on 01/01/1948 3B w/e 24/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 2353       on 01/01/1948 3B on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 2400       on 01/01/1948 3B w/e 01/12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 2405       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Small Vulcans 0-6-0 2436       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 01/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2441       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2445       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 12/05/1951 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2451       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 12/05/1951 75B Redhill
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2465       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 06/10/1951 75D Horsham
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2480       on 01/01/1948 3B 3w/e 17/11/1956 75D Horsham
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2484       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 11/12/1954 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2497       on 01/01/1948 3B 6w/e 05/09/1951 70A Nine Elms
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2516       on 01/01/1948 3B 6w/e 20/04/1955 75A Brighton
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2519       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 22/03/1958 75A Brighton
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2520       on 01/01/1948 3B w/e 12/01/1957 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2522       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 12/05/1951 75D Horsham
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2527       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 11/12/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2529       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 10/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2532       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 06/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2545       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 12/05/1951 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2552       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 2553       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 2572       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 2585       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 09/09/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 2593       on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 08/12/1950 75B Redhill
Steam I1X 4-4-2T 2598       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 07/1948 Withdrawn
Steam I1X 4-4-2T 2599       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam I1X 4-4-2T 2601       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 02/1948 Withdrawn
Steam I1X 4-4-2T 2602       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam I1X 4-4-2T 2604       on 01/01/1948 3B m/e 09/1948 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 541 on 23/01/1939 GFD Guildford (New) on 01/01/1948 3B 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Q 0-6-0 542 m/e 03/1939 GFD Guildford (New) on 01/01/1948 3B 4w/e 09/09/1950 71A Eastleigh
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32584 on 01/01/1948 HOR Horsham 4w/e 09/09/1950 75E m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 32082 on 01/01/1948 3B Three Bridges 4w/e 07/10/1950 75E w/e 23/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 32090 on 01/01/1948 EBN Eastbourne 4w/e 07/10/1950 75E m/e 12/1950 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32347 4w/e 17/06/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 07/10/1950 75E 6w/e 20/03/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32348 on 01/01/1948 EBN Eastbourne 4w/e 07/10/1950 75E 4w/e 13/11/1950 75A Brighton
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32349 4w/e 17/06/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 07/10/1950 75E 4w/e 27/07/1951 71D Fratton
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 32029 4w/e 07/10/1950 75G Eastbourne 4w/e 08/12/1950 75E 4w/e 05/02/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32582 4w/e 07/10/1950 70E Reading (S.R.) 4w/e 08/12/1950 75E 6w/e 20/03/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32591 on 01/01/1948 TWW Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 08/12/1950 75E 4w/e 06/10/1951 70D Basingstoke
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 32081 on 01/01/1948 3B Three Bridges 4w/e 05/02/1951 75E m/e 09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 32075 4w/e 08/12/1950 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 20/03/1951 75E 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E Three Bridges
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32348 4w/e 13/11/1950 75A Brighton 6w/e 20/03/1951 75E 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E Three Bridges
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 32021 on 01/01/1948 TWW Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 11/04/1951 75E 4w/e 12/05/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 32075 6w/e 20/03/1951 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32348 6w/e 20/03/1951 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32526 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E 4w/e 11/12/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32528 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E m/e 03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32534 4w/e 07/10/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E m/e 10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32535 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E w/e 10/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32536 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E 4w/e 10/10/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32537 4w/e 08/12/1950 75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E 4w/e 10/10/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32538 6w/e 20/03/1951 75G Eastbourne 4w/e 12/05/1951 75E 4w/e 27/07/1951 75G Eastbourne
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 32021 4w/e 12/05/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West 7w/e 27/06/1951 75E m/e 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32481 on 01/01/1948 NORW Norwood Junction 6w/e 05/09/1951 75E 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A Brighton
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32348 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951 75E w/e 10/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32482 4w/e 30/06/1949 HOR Horsham 4w/e 06/10/1951 75E 8w/e 20/07/1953 75E Three Bridges
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42099 4w/e 06/10/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 21/01/1952 75E 4w/e 19/03/1952 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42102 on 08/09/1950 75F Tunbridge Wells West (New) 4w/e 21/01/1952 75E 4w/e 19/03/1952 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32347 4w/e 06/10/1951 75A Brighton 4w/e 19/03/1952 75E on 22/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32399 4w/e 05/02/1951 75D Horsham 4w/e 19/03/1952 75E 4w/e 26/05/1953 70D Basingstoke
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32571 4w/e 05/02/1951 75G Eastbourne 4w/e 19/03/1952 75E 8w/e 20/07/1953 75B Redhill
Steam Q 0-6-0 30544 4w/e 09/09/1950 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 19/03/1952 75E 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42092 on 03/05/1951 75A Brighton (New) 4w/e 19/03/1952 75E 3w/e 17/11/1956 74A Ashford
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41307       m/e 04/1952 (New) 75E 6w/e 21/06/1955 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42093 on 22/05/1951 75A Brighton (New) 9w/e 30/06/1952 75E 5w/e 18/12/1954 52A Gateshead
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42066 on 10/10/1950 74B Ramsgate (New) 6w/e 13/08/1952 75E w/e 11/03/1959 75A Brighton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32538 4w/e 27/07/1951 75G Eastbourne 8w/e 07/10/1952 75E 4w/e 10/10/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30951 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 5w/e 14/02/1953 75E 3w/e 01/11/1955 74A Ashford
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41303 6w/e 13/08/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 14/02/1953 75E 9w/e 08/02/1955 74A Ashford
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32345 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 8w/e 20/07/1953 75E on 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32346 4w/e 06/10/1951 75A Brighton 8w/e 20/07/1953 75E w/e 24/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32482 4w/e 06/10/1951 75E Three Bridges 8w/e 20/07/1953 75E 4w/e 06/11/1954 75A Brighton
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41297 5w/e 14/02/1953 75F Tunbridge Wells West 8w/e 20/07/1953 75E 6w/e 21/06/1955 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42106 9w/e 30/06/1952 75A Brighton 8w/e 20/07/1953 75E 3w/e 17/11/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32571 8w/e 20/07/1953 75B Redhill 4w/e 10/12/1953 75E 6w/e 18/06/1954 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31591 4w/e 27/07/1951 75B Redhill 4w/e 08/02/1954 75E 4w/e 11/12/1954 75B Redhill
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32344 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 4w/e 20/08/1954 75E 6w/e 05/10/1960 75A Brighton
Steam C 0-6-0 31724 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 11/12/1954 75E 5w/e 11/03/1955 75A Brighton
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 31591 4w/e 11/12/1954 75B Redhill 9w/e 08/02/1955 75E 5w/e 11/03/1955 70C Guildford
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32484 4w/e 11/12/1954 75C Norwood Junction 9w/e 08/02/1955 75E 4w/e 10/10/1955 75A Brighton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42086 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton 9w/e 08/02/1955 75E 3w/e 17/11/1956 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41313 9w/e 30/06/1952 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 11/03/1955 75E 6w/e 21/06/1955 73E Faversham
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30028 7w/e 27/06/1951 70C Guildford 6w/e 21/06/1955 75E 6w/e 15/06/1956 71A Eastleigh
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30052 8w/e 20/07/1953 75A Brighton 6w/e 21/06/1955 75E 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A Brighton
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30379 7w/e 27/06/1951 71A Eastleigh 6w/e 21/06/1955 75E 7w/e 19/12/1955 71A Eastleigh
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42069 6w/e 13/08/1952 74A Ashford 6w/e 21/06/1955 75E w/e 05/12/1959 1E Bletchley
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32526 4w/e 11/12/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 10/10/1955 75E 6w/e 01/04/1957 75D Horsham
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32527 4w/e 11/12/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 10/10/1955 75E w/e 05/11/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32536 4w/e 10/10/1955 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 01/11/1955 75E 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A Brighton
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30328 6w/e 21/06/1955 71B Bournemouth 7w/e 19/12/1955 75E 6w/e 15/06/1956 71A Eastleigh
Steam H 0-4-4T 31521 8w/e 20/07/1953 74A Ashford 6w/e 15/06/1956 75E 4w/e 14/01/1958 75E Three Bridges
Steam H 0-4-4T 31530 8w/e 20/07/1953 74D Tonbridge 6w/e 15/06/1956 75E q/e 06/06/1958 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32438 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 3w/e 17/11/1956 75E 4w/e 22/03/1958 70B Feltham
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42067 6w/e 21/06/1955 75A Brighton 3w/e 17/11/1956 75E w/e 11/03/1959 75A Brighton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42068 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A Brighton 3w/e 17/11/1956 75E w/e 05/12/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42070 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A Brighton 3w/e 17/11/1956 75E w/e 05/12/1959 1A Willesden
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42071 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A Brighton 3w/e 17/11/1956 75E w/e 05/12/1959 1E Bletchley
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32536 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A Brighton 6w/e 25/01/1957 75E w/e 11/03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32523 4w/e 12/05/1951 75D Horsham 6w/e 01/04/1957 75E w/e 10/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41319 6w/e 15/06/1956 74B Ramsgate 9w/e 12/06/1957 75E 3w/e 13/10/1958 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30052 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A Brighton 7w/e 08/10/1957 75E 3w/e 13/10/1958 75A Brighton
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30056 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A Brighton 7w/e 08/10/1957 75E 3w/e 13/10/1958 75A Brighton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32443 6w/e 25/01/1957 74D Tonbridge 7w/e 08/10/1957 75E 4w/e 14/01/1958 75C Norwood Junction
Steam H 0-4-4T 31521 6w/e 15/06/1956 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 14/01/1958 75E w/e 19/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42074 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 22/03/1958 75E w/e 11/03/1959 73H Dover Marine
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30110 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford q/e 06/06/1958 75E 3w/e 13/10/1958 75A Brighton
Steam H 0-4-4T 31162 q/e 06/06/1958 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 13/10/1958 75E 5w/e 26/11/1959 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam H 0-4-4T 31269 q/e 06/06/1958 75F Tunbridge Wells West 3w/e 13/10/1958 75E 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A Brighton
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75075 6w/e 15/06/1956 70D Basingstoke w/e 11/03/1959 75E 4w/e 24/09/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80010 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A Brighton w/e 11/03/1959 75E 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80011 3w/e 17/11/1956 75A Brighton w/e 11/03/1959 75E 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80012 4w/e 22/03/1958 75A Brighton w/e 11/03/1959 75E 3w/e 30/01/1963 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam H 0-4-4T 31161 4w/e 20/08/1954 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 14/06/1959 75E 5w/e 10/06/1960 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam H 0-4-4T 31522 4w/e 19/03/1952 74A Ashford 6w/e 14/06/1959 75E 5w/e 26/11/1959 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32463 4w/e 06/10/1951 75D Horsham 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E m/e 09/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32469 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E w/e 07/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32470 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E 4w/e 01/05/1962 75A Brighton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32522 4w/e 12/05/1951 75D Horsham 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E w/e 21/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32526 6w/e 01/04/1957 75D Horsham 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E w/e 06/02/1960 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32541 8w/e 07/10/1952 75D Horsham 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E 6w/e 22/10/1959 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Q 0-6-0 30544 4w/e 01/10/1953 75D Horsham 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E 3w/e 26/05/1961 75A Brighton
Steam Q 0-6-0 30545 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E m/e 27/01/1964 70A Nine Elms
Steam Q 0-6-0 30546 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E m/e 06/01/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam Q 0-6-0 30547 4w/e 10/10/1955 75D Horsham 5w/e 18/07/1959 75E w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam E2 0-6-0T 32107 9w/e 12/06/1957 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 22/10/1959 75E 4w/e 10/03/1960 71I Southampton Docks
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30052 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 26/11/1959 75E 5w/e 10/06/1960 75A Brighton
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30055 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 26/11/1959 75E 7w/e 23/08/1961 75E Three Bridges
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30109 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 26/11/1959 75E m/e 06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32337 4w/e 11/12/1954 70F Fratton 5w/e 26/11/1959 75E 4w/e 05/04/1960 75E Three Bridges
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32349 4w/e 27/07/1951 71D Fratton 5w/e 26/11/1959 75E 4w/e 05/04/1960 75E Three Bridges
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80087 4w/e 06/10/1956 6H Bangor 5w/e 31/12/1959 75E m/e 31/01/1960 73F Ashford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80088 4w/e 06/10/1956 6H Bangor 5w/e 31/12/1959 75E 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80089 4w/e 06/10/1956 6H Bangor 5w/e 31/12/1959 75E 3w/e 30/01/1963 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80094 w/e 17/10/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 31/12/1959 75E 3w/e 30/01/1963 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75070 w/e 11/03/1959 75A Brighton 6w/e 09/02/1960 75E 4w/e 24/09/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32564 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 10/03/1960 75E w/e 23/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32337 5w/e 26/11/1959 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 05/04/1960 75E 6w/e 05/10/1960 75A Brighton
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 32349 5w/e 26/11/1959 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 05/04/1960 75E w/e 24/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31306 5w/e 26/11/1959 75F Tunbridge Wells West 5w/e 10/06/1960 75E w/e 30/12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32441 4w/e 12/05/1951 75A Brighton 5w/e 18/03/1961 75E w/e 21/10/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32449 4w/e 17/12/1956 75A Brighton 5w/e 18/03/1961 75E w/e 17/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32553 m/e 10/02/1961 75B Redhill 5w/e 18/03/1961 75E w/e 19/08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30053 4w/e 10/03/1960 75A Brighton 7w/e 03/05/1961 75E 5w/e 02/07/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80087 m/e 31/01/1960 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961 75E 4w/e 17/12/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam H 0-4-4T 31551 6w/e 05/10/1960 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 75E 4w/e 24/09/1962 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam H 0-4-4T 31553 6w/e 09/02/1960 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 75E m/e 06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31892 4w/e 08/07/1960 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 75E w/e 24/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31893 4w/e 08/07/1960 73J Tonbridge 3w/e 26/05/1961 75E on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31894 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A Stewarts Lane 3w/e 26/05/1961 75E on 30/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30055 5w/e 26/11/1959 75E Three Bridges 7w/e 23/08/1961 75E 4w/e 30/07/1962 70C Guildford
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31891 6w/e 14/06/1959 75A Brighton 2w/e 10/10/1961 75E 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A Brighton
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 32474 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 2w/e 10/10/1961 75E 4w/e 01/05/1962 75A Brighton
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32525 m/e 10/02/1961 75C Norwood Junction m/e 09/11/1961 75E w/e 03/02/1962 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31530 5w/e 18/03/1961 73J Tonbridge m/e 08/12/1961 75E w/e 24/03/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 32438 8w/e 17/01/1961 75C Norwood Junction m/e 08/12/1961 75E w/e 30/12/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 30540 8w/e 20/07/1953 75C Norwood Junction m/e 08/12/1961 75E w/e 24/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31897 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 01/05/1962 75E 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane
Steam H 0-4-4T 31324 m/e 10/02/1961 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 28/05/1962 75E w/e 28/07/1962 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31263 4w/e 01/02/1962 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 5w/e 02/07/1962 75E 4w/e 24/09/1962 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 31890 2w/e 10/10/1961 75C Norwood Junction 5w/e 02/07/1962 75E 4w/e 17/12/1962 75A Brighton
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33024 m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham 4w/e 24/09/1962 75E w/e 25/08/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33026 4w/e 01/10/1953 70B Feltham 4w/e 24/09/1962 75E m/e 06/01/1964 70B Feltham
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33028 4w/e 28/05/1962 70B Feltham 4w/e 24/09/1962 75E w/e 03/02/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33029 4w/e 28/05/1962 70B Feltham 4w/e 24/09/1962 75E w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33014 m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham 4w/e 17/12/1962 75E w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33015 m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham 4w/e 17/12/1962 75E m/e 06/01/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33016 4w/e 06/11/1954 70B Feltham 4w/e 17/12/1962 75E w/e 25/08/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33017 m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham 4w/e 17/12/1962 75E w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33018 4w/e 06/11/1954 70B Feltham 4w/e 17/12/1962 75E m/e 06/01/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Q 0-6-0 30549 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane 4w/e 17/12/1962 75E w/e 21/07/1963 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 30543 4w/e 17/12/1962 75D Stewarts Lane 3w/e 07/01/1963 75E m/e 06/01/1964 75A Brighton
Steam Q 0-6-0 30544 5w/e 02/07/1962 75D Stewarts Lane 3w/e 07/01/1963 75E w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 30548 on 01/01/1948 BM Bournemouth 3w/e 07/01/1963 75E 3w/e 30/01/1963 71A Eastleigh
Steam Q 0-6-0 30536 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 3w/e 30/01/1963 75E w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q 0-6-0 30531 4w/e 17/12/1962 72A Exmouth Junction on 14/07/1963 75E m/e 06/01/1964 75A Brighton
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30029 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75E m/e 06/01/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30053 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75E m/e 06/01/1964 70F Bournemouth
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30055 w/e 15/09/1963 Withdrawn 4w/e 16/09/1963 (R) 75E      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30133 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75E m/e 06/01/1964 70E Salisbury
Steam M7 0-4-4T 30379 3w/e 30/01/1963 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75E w/e 06/10/1963 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31005 w/e 15/09/1963 Withdrawn 4w/e 16/09/1963 (R) 75E      
Steam H 0-4-4T 31263 4w/e 24/09/1962 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75E w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31518 4w/e 28/05/1962 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75E w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31544 w/e 15/09/1963 Withdrawn 4w/e 16/09/1963 (R) 75E      
Steam H 0-4-4T 31551 4w/e 24/09/1962 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 16/09/1963 75E w/e 05/01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33004 m/e 10/02/1961 70B Feltham 4w/e 14/10/1963 75E m/e 06/01/1964 70C Guildford
Steam Q1 0-6-0 33006 on 01/01/1948 GFD Guildford 4w/e 14/10/1963 75E m/e 06/01/1964 70C Guildford