Depot: Tunbridge Wells West
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Tunbridge Wells West | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2021 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75E | Three Bridges | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2022 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | w/e | 05/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2023 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2025 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2026 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75G | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2027 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | m/e | 02/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2028 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75G | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2029 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 75G | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2030 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 2215 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 2253 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | BTN | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Pacific Tanks | 4-6-2T | 2325 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Pacific Tanks | 4-6-2T | 2326 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 2390 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 74E | St Leonards | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 2393 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | BTN | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 2398 | q/e | 12/1935 | RED | Redhill | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2512 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 75B | Redhill | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2581 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | TON | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2582 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2589 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | m/e | 01/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2590 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RED | Redhill | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 2591 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75E | Three Bridges | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 531 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | P | 02/01/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 534 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | P | 02/01/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||||
Steam | I1X | 4-4-2T | 2001 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | I1X | 4-4-2T | 2003 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | I1X | 4-4-2T | 2004 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | I1X | 4-4-2T | 2006 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | I1X | 4-4-2T | 2603 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 531 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | P | 02/01/1948 | TWW | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | HOR | Horsham |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 534 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | P | 02/01/1948 | TWW | m/e | 31/08/1950 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2089 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | TWW | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne |
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 544 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | TWW | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2025 | on | 01/01/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | TWW | m/e | 01/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 32364 | on | 01/01/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | TWW | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | HOR | Horsham |
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 2394 | on | 01/01/1948 | STL | St Leonards | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | TWW | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | EBN | Eastbourne |
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 32253 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | BTN | Brighton | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | TWW | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 32082 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | BTN | Brighton | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | TWW | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 32087 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | TWW | m/e | 11/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | 32253 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | TWW | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | BTN | Brighton |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31016 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | TWW | w/e | 07/07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31182 | on | 01/01/1948 | RAM | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | TWW | w/e | 07/07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2075 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 6w/e | 12/12/1949 | TWW | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42096 | on | 15/07/1950 (New) | 75F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 74A | Ashford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42097 | on | 21/07/1950 (New) | 75F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 74A | Ashford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42098 | on | 28/07/1950 (New) | 75F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 74A | Ashford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42099 | on | 18/08/1950 (New) | 75F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42100 | on | 25/08/1950 (New) | 75F | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 74A | Ashford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42101 | on | 01/09/1950 (New) | 75F | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1C | Watford | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42102 | on | 08/09/1950 (New) | 75F | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42103 | on | 14/09/1950 (New) | 75F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42104 | on | 20/09/1950 (New) | 75F | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42105 | on | 27/09/1950 (New) | 75F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31158 | on | 01/01/1948 | AFD | Ashford | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 75F | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31158 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75F | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 32029 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75F | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42106 | on | 03/10/1950 | 74B | Ramsgate (New) | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75F | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31520 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 74A | Ashford | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 75F | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32582 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75E | Three Bridges | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 75F | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31520 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75F | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32582 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75F | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31520 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75F | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 74E | St Leonards |
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 32021 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75F | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32582 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75F | w/e | 29/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42095 | on | 09/06/1951 (New) | 75F | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32581 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | TON | Tonbridge | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75F | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32585 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75F | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42095 | on | 09/06/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West (New) | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75F | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80010 | on | 10/07/1951 (New) | 75F | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80011 | on | 21/07/1951 (New) | 75F | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31322 | on | 01/01/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 75F | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80012 | on | 17/08/1951 (New) | 75F | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80013 | on | 28/08/1951 (New) | 75F | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80014 | on | 05/09/1951 (New) | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80015 | on | 14/09/1951 (New) | 75F | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80016 | on | 20/09/1951 (New) | 75F | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31517 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | TON | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75F | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32587 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75F | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80017 | on | 08/10/1951 (New) | 75F | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31517 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 75F | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80018 | on | 13/10/1951 (New) | 75F | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42099 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 75F | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42102 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 75F | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41318 | m/e | 06/1952 (New) | 75F | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41319 | m/e | 06/1952 (New) | 75F | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41318 | m/e | 06/1952 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West (New) | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75F | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41319 | m/e | 06/1952 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West (New) | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75F | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80017 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 75G | Eastbourne | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 75F | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32517 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 75F | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41316 | m/e | 06/1952 | 75G | Eastbourne (New) | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 75F | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41317 | m/e | 06/1952 | 75G | Eastbourne (New) | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 75F | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80018 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 75B | Redhill | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75F | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41297 | m/e | 30/06/1952 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75F | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42103 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 75A | Brighton | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 75F | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30054 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 71D | Fratton | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75F | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30055 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 71D | Fratton | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75F | 7w/e | 20/04/1956 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30056 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 71B | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75F | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30057 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75F | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30058 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 71B | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75F | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30059 | on | 01/01/1948 | BM | Bournemouth | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75F | 7w/e | 20/04/1956 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42074 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 75F | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31278 | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 74C | Dover Marine | 7w/e | 20/04/1956 | 75F | w/e | 06/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31329 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 74C | Dover Marine | 7w/e | 20/04/1956 | 75F | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31310 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 74A | Ashford | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75F | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31327 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 74A | Ashford | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75F | w/e | 07/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31544 | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 74D | Tonbridge | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75F | w/e | 15/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42104 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75F | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42105 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75F | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42087 | m/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75F | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80015 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75A | Brighton | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80016 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 75A | Brighton | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80017 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75A | Brighton | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80018 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75A | Brighton | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80019 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75A | Brighton | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42106 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 75E | Three Bridges | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75F | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31554 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 74D | Tonbridge | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 75F | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42106 | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 75F | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31162 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 74E | St Leonards | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 75F | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31269 | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 74E | St Leonards | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 75F | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31530 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 75E | Three Bridges | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 75F | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41319 | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 75E | Three Bridges | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 75F | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42087 | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 75F | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31266 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 75F | w/e | 01/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31162 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 75E | Three Bridges | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75F | m/e | 07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31306 | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75F | 5w/e | 10/06/1960 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31522 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75F | w/e | 27/01/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80095 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75F | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80137 | on | 28/05/1956 | 34E | Neasden (New) | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75F | 4w/e | 17/12/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80138 | on | 12/06/1956 | 34E | Neasden (New) | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75F | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80139 | on | 26/06/1956 | 34E | Neasden (New) | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80140 | on | 10/07/1956 | 34E | Neasden (New) | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80141 | on | 25/07/1956 | 34E | Neasden (New) | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80142 | on | 09/08/1956 | 34E | Neasden (New) | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32509 | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 75F | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31161 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges | 5w/e | 10/06/1960 | 75F | w/e | 11/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31005 | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75F | w/e | 15/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31530 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75A | Brighton | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75F | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 73J | Tonbridge |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31533 | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 73J | Tonbridge | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 75F | w/e | 15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31543 | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 73J | Tonbridge | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 75F | w/e | 07/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31308 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73J | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 75F | on | 23/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31518 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31263 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31551 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 24/09/1962 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80010 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80011 | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80088 | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30133 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 71A | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30021 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 72B | Salisbury | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | 4w/e | 22/07/1963 | 70E | Salisbury |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30029 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70C | Guildford | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30379 | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30053 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30055 | 4w/e | 30/07/1962 | 70C | Guildford | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | w/e | 15/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30328 | 5w/e | 06/07/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth | 3w/e | 30/01/1963 | 75F | w/e | 03/03/1963 | Withdrawn |