Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 394 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 394 Week
» 27015 Month
» 27015 Year
» 1692391 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Tweedmouth


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Tweedmouth Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam G5 0-4-4T 7248       m/e 08/1894 TWD 4w/e 19/07/1952 52C Blaydon
Steam B13 4-6-0 2001       m/e 06/1899 (New) TWD m/e 01/1924 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B13 4-6-0 2007       m/e 03/1900 (New) TWD m/e 09/1924 HTN Heaton
Steam B13 4-6-0 738       m/e 06/1908 (New) TWD on 04/02/1927 SKN Stockton
Steam B13 4-6-0 739       m/e 06/1908 (New) TWD on 04/02/1927 SKN Stockton
Steam B13 4-6-0 741       m/e 06/1908 (New) TWD on 31/01/1930 Withdrawn
Steam B13 4-6-0 745       m/e 08/1908 (New) TWD on 08/12/1931 Withdrawn
Steam B13 4-6-0 747       m/e 09/1908 (New) TWD on 07/07/1924 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B13 4-6-0 754       m/e 01/1909 (New) TWD on 01/07/1924 HTN Heaton
Steam B16 4-6-0 909       m/e 08/1920 (New) TWD on 30/08/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B16 4-6-0 924       m/e 12/1920 (New) TWD on 08/05/1924 YK York (North)
Steam B16 4-6-0 926       m/e 12/1920 (New) TWD on 22/07/1929 YK York (North)
Steam B16 4-6-0 928       m/e 01/1921 (New) TWD on 01/08/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B16 4-6-0 1375       on 30/10/1923 (New) TWD on 16/09/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B16 4-6-0 1376       on 31/10/1923 (New) TWD on 29/08/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B16 4-6-0 1378       on 15/11/1923 (New) TWD on 09/10/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B16 4-6-0 1384       on 01/01/1924 (New) TWD on 08/05/1924 YK York (North)
Steam B13 4-6-0 756 m/e 01/1909 BLA Blaydon (New) on 07/09/1924 TWD on 18/02/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B13 4-6-0 2002 m/e 06/1899 HTN Heaton (New) m/e 01/1925 TWD m/e 01/1927 BLA Blaydon
Steam B13 4-6-0 752 m/e 11/1908 HTN Heaton (New) on 07/01/1925 TWD on 07/02/1926 ANN Annesley
Steam B13 4-6-0 754 on 01/07/1924 HTN Heaton on 07/01/1925 TWD on 18/02/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B13 4-6-0 759 m/e 03/1909 HTN Heaton (New) on 07/01/1925 TWD on 27/03/1933 NEV Neville Hill
Steam B13 4-6-0 752 on 07/02/1926 ANN Annesley on 20/09/1926 TWD on 18/02/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B13 4-6-0 754 on 18/02/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 04/04/1927 TWD on 13/06/1936 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B13 4-6-0 752 on 18/02/1927 HLD Hull Dairycoates on 07/04/1927 TWD on 23/06/1934 Withdrawn
Steam B16 4-6-0 933 m/e 03/1921 YK York (North) (New) on 22/10/1927 TWD on 09/08/1929 HLD Hull Dairycoates
Steam B16 4-6-0 921 m/e 10/1920 YK York (North) (New) on 11/06/1928 TWD on 22/07/1929 YK York (North)
Steam B16 4-6-0 1372 on 19/10/1923 HTN Heaton (New) on 20/07/1931 TWD on 16/10/1934 YK York (North)
Steam B16 4-6-0 1379 on 21/11/1923 HTN Heaton (New) on 20/07/1931 TWD on 16/10/1934 NEV Neville Hill
Steam B16 4-6-0 911 on 06/03/1925 YK York (North) on 28/10/1931 TWD on 16/10/1934 YK York (North)
Steam B16 4-6-0 921 on 22/07/1929 YK York (North) on 28/10/1931 TWD on 16/10/1934 YK York (North)
Steam J39 0-6-0 2735 on 14/06/1929 STM St Margarets (New) on 19/03/1939 TWD on 01/07/1939 MAL Malton
Steam J39 0-6-0 2736 on 20/06/1929 STM St Margarets (New) on 19/03/1939 TWD on 08/07/1939 CON Consett
Steam J39 0-6-0 1467 on 22/03/1934 NPT Newport (Teeside) (New) on 19/06/1939 TWD on 20/01/1940 GHD Gateshead
Steam J39 0-6-0 1585 on 06/05/1937 SUN Sunderland on 08/07/1939 TWD on 17/01/1940 BLA Blaydon
Steam J39 0-6-0 1459 on 28/03/1943 BLA Blaydon on 08/09/1943 TWD on 23/07/1945 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1587 on 28/03/1943 BLA Blaydon on 08/09/1943 TWD on 23/07/1945 DAR Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 1508 on 21/06/1943 BLA Blaydon on 08/09/1943 TWD on 23/07/1945 DAR Darlington
Steam V2 2-6-2 4890 on 28/03/1943 GHD Gateshead on 14/02/1944 TWD on 24/04/1944 GHD Gateshead
Steam V2 2-6-2 3659 on 22/10/1941 GHD Gateshead (New) on 03/11/1945 TWD on 08/06/1958 52B Heaton
Steam B1 4-6-0 1024       on 12/04/1947 (New) TWD on 01/07/1951 52A Gateshead
Steam B1 4-6-0 1025       on 22/04/1947 (New) TWD on 29/08/1948 HAY Haymarket
Steam B1 4-6-0 1198       on 02/06/1947 (New) TWD on 26/12/1948 BOR Borough Gardens
Steam B1 4-6-0 1199       on 04/06/1947 (New) TWD on 01/07/1951 52A Gateshead
Steam D20 4-4-0 2344       on 01/01/1948 TWD m/e 12/1949 ALN  
Steam D20 4-4-0 2347       on 01/01/1948 TWD w/e 15/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 2351       on 01/01/1948 TWD on 23/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 2352       on 01/01/1948 TWD 4w/e 20/06/1953 52B Heaton
Steam D20 4-4-0 2354       on 01/01/1948 TWD on 02/04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 2357       on 01/01/1948 TWD on 08/01/1951 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 2358       on 01/01/1948 TWD 4w/e 21/04/1951 52D Tweedmouth
Steam D20 4-4-0 2362       on 01/01/1948 TWD on 11/04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 62377       on 01/01/1948 TWD m/e 05/1949 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 2380       on 01/01/1948 TWD 4w/e 19/06/1954 52A Gateshead
Steam D20 4-4-0 2396       on 01/01/1948 TWD m/e 12/1949 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens
Steam J21 0-6-0 5026       on 01/01/1948 TWD m/e 10/1949 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 5039       on 01/01/1948 TWD 4w/e 21/04/1951 52C Blaydon
Steam J21 0-6-0 5067       on 01/01/1948 TWD 5w/e 24/03/1951 52B Heaton
Steam J21 0-6-0 5082       on 01/01/1948 TWD 4w/e 22/03/1952 52D Tweedmouth
Steam J21 0-6-0 5099       on 01/01/1948 TWD 5w/e 23/04/1955 52D Tweedmouth
Steam J27 0-6-0 5869       on 01/01/1948 TWD w/e 05/08/1961 52G Sunderland
Steam J27 0-6-0 5873       on 01/01/1948 TWD 3w/e 16/06/1956 54A Sunderland
Steam J73 0-6-0T 8363       on 01/01/1948 TWD 4w/e 23/01/1954 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
Steam J39 0-6-0 4863 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 04/01/1948 TWD on 28/02/1948 BLA Blaydon
Steam J39 0-6-0 4949 on 28/03/1943 DAR Darlington on 04/01/1948 TWD on 24/02/1948 BLA Blaydon
Steam J39 0-6-0 4711 on 03/08/1943 BLA Blaydon on 28/02/1948 TWD w/e 23/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 4813 on 19/12/1929 BLA Blaydon (New) on 28/02/1948 TWD on 03/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1025 on 29/08/1948 HAY Haymarket on 31/10/1948 TWD on 12/06/1960 52C Blaydon
Steam B1 4-6-0 61019 on 31/10/1948 DAR Darlington on 02/01/1949 TWD on 17/01/1954 52A Gateshead
Steam J39 0-6-0 64982 on 29/08/1948 BLA Blaydon on 23/05/1949 TWD on 19/11/1950 51A Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 64843 on 19/06/1943 BLA Blaydon on 05/06/1949 TWD on 20/08/1961 52G Sunderland
Steam J39 0-6-0 64854 on 21/06/1943 BLA Blaydon on 17/07/1949 TWD on 04/01/1953 54C Borough Gardens
Steam J39 0-6-0 64844 on 26/06/1943 BLA Blaydon on 14/08/1949 TWD on 03/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 64925 on 29/08/1948 BLA Blaydon on 14/08/1949 TWD on 03/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J39 0-6-0 4917 on 27/07/1943 BLA Blaydon on 23/10/1949 TWD on 09/09/1962 52d Alnmouth
Steam B1 4-6-0 61241 on 07/11/1948 DAR Darlington on 12/03/1950 52D on 12/06/1960 52C Blaydon
Steam B1 4-6-0 61322 on 31/10/1948 DAR Darlington on 12/03/1950 52D on 12/06/1960 52C Blaydon
Steam D15 4-4-0 62538 on 01/01/1948 STR Stratford 4w/e 25/11/1950 52D 5w/e 16/02/1952 32A Norwich Thorpe
Steam D20 4-4-0 62344 m/e 12/1949 ALN   4w/e 25/11/1950 52D on 28/03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 62365 m/e 12/1949 ALN   4w/e 25/11/1950 52D on 04/04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90008 m/e 12/1949 HLD Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 23/12/1950 52D 4w/e 19/05/1951 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam D20 4-4-0 62358 on 01/01/1948 TWD Tweedmouth 4w/e 21/04/1951 52D on 19/10/1954 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60884 on 19/11/1950 52B Heaton on 29/04/1951 52D on 08/05/1955 52B Heaton
Steam V2 2-6-2 60885 on 19/11/1950 52B Heaton on 29/04/1951 52D on 06/01/1952 52B Heaton
Steam V2 2-6-2 60886 on 06/05/1946 HTN Heaton on 29/04/1951 52D on 06/01/1952 52B Heaton
Steam V2 2-6-2 60887 on 06/02/1949 HTN Heaton on 29/04/1951 52D on 06/01/1952 52B Heaton
Steam D20 4-4-0 62355 on 01/01/1948 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens 5w/e 23/06/1951 52D on 14/11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 62375 on 01/01/1948 SBK Starbeck 5w/e 23/06/1951 52D 4w/e 20/06/1953 52A Gateshead
Steam D20 4-4-0 62383 m/e 12/1949 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens 5w/e 23/06/1951 52D on 13/05/1957 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 62396 m/e 12/1949 HLB Hull Botanic Gardens 5w/e 23/06/1951 52D 5w/e 21/03/1953 52D Tweedmouth
Steam K3 2-6-0 61901 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton 4w/e 19/01/1952 52D w/e 26/11/1960 50B Hull Dairycoates
Steam K3 2-6-0 61917 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton 4w/e 19/01/1952 52D w/e 16/09/1961 56B Ardsley
Steam K3 2-6-0 61930 on 01/01/1948 GHD Gateshead 4w/e 19/01/1952 52D w/e 14/10/1961 52H Tyne Dock
Steam K3 2-6-0 61962 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton 4w/e 19/01/1952 52D 4w/e 11/10/1958 52B Heaton
Steam K3 2-6-0 61985 on 01/01/1948 GHD Gateshead 4w/e 19/01/1952 52D w/e 26/11/1960 50B Hull Dairycoates
Steam J21 0-6-0 65082 on 01/01/1948 TWD Tweedmouth 4w/e 22/03/1952 52D on 01/01/1955 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60801 on 06/02/1949 HTN Heaton on 30/11/1952 52D on 07/06/1953 52A Gateshead
Steam V2 2-6-2 60806 on 06/02/1949 HTN Heaton on 30/11/1952 52D on 12/04/1953 52B Heaton
Steam V2 2-6-2 60811 on 06/02/1949 HTN Heaton on 30/11/1952 52D on 12/04/1953 52B Heaton
Steam V2 2-6-2 60835 on 06/02/1949 HTN Heaton on 30/11/1952 52D on 12/04/1953 52B Heaton
Steam V2 2-6-2 60926 on 19/11/1950 52B Heaton on 30/11/1952 52D on 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61899 on 01/01/1948 HLD Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 13/12/1952 52D 4w/e 17/09/1955 53A Hull Dairycoates
Steam K3 2-6-0 61932 4w/e 20/09/1952 52B Heaton 4w/e 13/12/1952 52D 4w/e 23/01/1954 52B Heaton
Steam K3 2-6-0 61952 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton 4w/e 13/12/1952 52D w/e 16/09/1961 50B Hull Dairycoates
Steam K3 2-6-0 61969 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton 4w/e 13/12/1952 52D w/e 14/10/1961 52H Tyne Dock
Steam J39 0-6-0 64941 on 20/05/1951 54C Borough Gardens on 04/01/1953 52D on 03/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 62371 on 01/01/1948 BLA Blaydon 5w/e 21/03/1953 52D 4w/e 20/06/1953 52A Gateshead
Steam D20 4-4-0 62396 5w/e 23/06/1951 52D Tweedmouth 5w/e 21/03/1953 52D 4w/e 19/06/1954 52A Gateshead
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67270 4w/e 19/07/1952 52B Heaton 5w/e 21/03/1953 52D 4w/e 22/05/1954 52C Blaydon
Steam V2 2-6-2 60807 on 06/02/1949 HTN Heaton on 12/04/1953 52D on 07/06/1953 52A Gateshead
Steam V2 2-6-2 60808 on 06/05/1946 HTN Heaton on 12/04/1953 52D on 08/06/1958 52B Heaton
Steam V2 2-6-2 60860 on 09/09/1951 52B Heaton on 12/04/1953 52D on 16/06/1957 52A Gateshead
Steam D20 4-4-0 62349 4w/e 20/06/1953 52A Gateshead 4w/e 24/10/1953 52D 4w/e 22/05/1954 52C Blaydon
Steam D20 4-4-0 62352 4w/e 20/06/1953 52B Heaton 4w/e 24/10/1953 52D 4w/e 19/06/1954 52A Gateshead
Steam D20 4-4-0 62360 4w/e 20/06/1953 52A Gateshead 4w/e 24/10/1953 52D 4w/e 19/06/1954 52A Gateshead
Steam D20 4-4-0 62371 4w/e 20/06/1953 52A Gateshead 4w/e 24/10/1953 52D on 19/10/1954 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 62375 4w/e 20/06/1953 52A Gateshead 4w/e 24/10/1953 52D 4w/e 19/06/1954 52A Gateshead
Steam J77 0-6-0T 68436       4w/e 24/10/1953 52D on 18/06/1956 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60805 on 06/02/1949 HTN Heaton on 27/12/1953 52D on 16/06/1957 52A Gateshead
Steam B1 4-6-0 61014 on 23/12/1946 GHD Gateshead (New) on 17/01/1954 52D on 14/06/1959 52A Gateshead
Steam G5 0-4-4T 67268 on 01/01/1948 BLA Blaydon 4w/e 22/05/1954 52D on 27/04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam J77 0-6-0T 68402 5w/e 21/03/1953 53A Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 22/05/1954 52D m/e 21/07/1956 52F Blyth (North)
Steam D20 4-4-0 62360 4w/e 19/06/1954 52A Gateshead 4w/e 23/10/1954 52D on 23/10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 62375 4w/e 19/06/1954 52A Gateshead 4w/e 23/10/1954 52D on 07/05/1957 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 62396 4w/e 19/06/1954 52A Gateshead 4w/e 23/10/1954 52D 5w/e 23/07/1955 50C Selby
Steam J21 0-6-0 65091 on 01/01/1948 DAR Darlington 5w/e 22/01/1955 52D on 09/11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 65099 on 01/01/1948 TWD Tweedmouth 5w/e 23/04/1955 52D 4w/e 08/03/1958 51E Stockton
Steam V2 2-6-2 60801 on 15/11/1953 52B Heaton on 03/05/1955 52D on 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 65078 5w/e 24/04/1954 51A Darlington 5w/e 18/06/1955 52D on 04/03/1957 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61199 on 01/07/1951 52A Gateshead on 25/09/1955 52D on 12/06/1960 52C Blaydon
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68682 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton m/e 21/07/1956 52D on 07/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68725 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton m/e 21/07/1956 52D on 04/04/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43057 3w/e 16/06/1956 52C Blaydon 4w/e 17/11/1956 52D 5w/e 20/07/1957 51D Middlesbrough
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43071 3w/e 16/06/1956 52C Blaydon 4w/e 17/11/1956 52D 5w/e 20/07/1957 51D Middlesbrough
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67656 on 01/01/1948 NEV Neville Hill 4w/e 18/05/1957 52D 5w/e 20/07/1957 52B Heaton
Steam V3 2-6-2T 67683 5w/e 17/12/1955 52C Blaydon 4w/e 18/05/1957 52D 5w/e 20/07/1957 52B Heaton
Steam D20 4-4-0 62387 5w/e 23/07/1955 50C Selby 5w/e 20/07/1957 52D on 02/09/1957 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 62395 4w/e 15/12/1956 50A York (North) 5w/e 20/07/1957 52D on 20/11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 62381 3w/e 16/06/1956 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 19/10/1957 52D on 19/11/1957 Withdrawn
Steam D20 4-4-0 62396 3w/e 16/06/1956 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 19/10/1957 52D m/e 12/1957 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 65061 4w/e 18/02/1956 52B Heaton 4w/e 14/12/1957 52D on 12/05/1958 Withdrawn
Steam J21 0-6-0 65070 3w/e 12/11/1955 52C Blaydon 4w/e 14/12/1957 52D w/e 17/10/1959 52F Blyth (North)
Steam V1 2-6-2T 67641 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton 4w/e 14/12/1957 52D 5w/e 14/06/1958 52B Heaton
Steam V1 2-6-2T 67642 4w/e 30/06/1950 52B Heaton 4w/e 14/12/1957 52D 5w/e 14/06/1958 52B Heaton
Steam V1 2-6-2T 67647 4w/e 19/07/1952 52B Heaton 4w/e 14/12/1957 52D 5w/e 14/06/1958 52B Heaton
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46476 5w/e 18/06/1955 51A Darlington 4w/e 08/02/1958 52D on 29/01/1962 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61854 4w/e 16/03/1957 53A Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 14/06/1958 52D w/e 16/09/1961 50B Hull Dairycoates
Steam K3 2-6-0 61934 on 01/01/1948 HLD Hull Dairycoates 5w/e 14/06/1958 52D w/e 16/09/1961 56B Ardsley
Steam A3 4-6-2 60069 on 28/03/1943 HTN Heaton on 14/09/1958 52D on 12/06/1960 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam A3 4-6-2 60072 on 28/03/1943 HTN Heaton on 14/09/1958 52D on 12/06/1960 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam V2 2-6-2 60843 on 08/06/1958 56C Copley Hill (Leeds) on 14/09/1958 52D on 02/12/1962 56B Ardsley
Steam V2 2-6-2 60865 on 14/10/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) on 14/09/1958 52D on 30/12/1962 52B Heaton
Steam V2 2-6-2 60913 on 14/10/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) on 14/09/1958 52D on 13/01/1963 52B Heaton
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46482 m/e 10/1951 51F West Auckland (New) w/e 17/10/1959 52D w/e 01/12/1962 51A Darlington
Steam J71 0-6-0T 68314 on 01/01/1948 GHD Gateshead w/e 23/01/1960 52D on 14/04/1960 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2594 on 19/01/1960 52E Percy Main (New) w/e 30/04/1960 52D w/e 16/12/1961 52A Gateshead
Steam J72 0-6-0T 68720 on 01/01/1948 GHD Gateshead w/e 14/05/1960 52D on 26/09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam K3 2-6-0 61844 4w/e 20/10/1956 52B Heaton w/e 17/09/1960 52D w/e 10/12/1960 52B Heaton
Steam K3 2-6-0 61962 4w/e 11/10/1958 52B Heaton w/e 17/09/1960 52D w/e 14/10/1961 52H Tyne Dock
Steam K3 2-6-0 61984 on 01/01/1948 HTN Heaton w/e 17/09/1960 52D w/e 16/09/1961 56B Ardsley
Steam V2 2-6-2 60929 on 08/06/1958 52A Gateshead on 10/09/1961 52D on 02/12/1962 50A York (North)
Steam V2 2-6-2 60934 on 08/06/1958 52A Gateshead on 10/09/1961 52D on 22/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60947 on 06/07/1952 52A Gateshead on 10/09/1961 52D on 01/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam V2 2-6-2 60949 on 01/07/1951 52A Gateshead on 10/09/1961 52D on 26/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A2 4-6-2 60538 on 22/05/1960 52B Heaton on 01/10/1961 52D on 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A2 4-6-2 60539 on 27/08/1948 HTN Heaton (New) on 01/10/1961 52D on 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A2 4-6-2 60511 on 08/09/1946 HTN Heaton on 01/10/1961 52D on 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A2 4-6-2 60517 on 28/11/1946 HTN Heaton (New) on 01/10/1961 52D on 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A2 4-6-2 60521 on 22/05/1960 52B Heaton on 01/10/1961 52D on 12/11/1962 Withdrawn
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2615 w/e 25/03/1961 52A Gateshead w/e 16/12/1961 52D w/e 24/08/1963 52A Gateshead
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46471 w/e 29/04/1961 52A Gateshead w/e 17/02/1962 52D on 18/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46473 w/e 29/04/1961 52A Gateshead w/e 17/02/1962 52D w/e 11/08/1962 50F Malton
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46474 w/e 21/01/1961 52B Heaton w/e 17/02/1962 52D 4w/e 30/11/1963 67E Dumfries
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46479 w/e 29/04/1961 52B Heaton w/e 17/02/1962 52D 4w/e 30/11/1963 67F Stranraer
Steam A1 4-6-2 60116 on 08/10/1948 HTN Heaton (New) on 09/09/1962 52D on 18/10/1964 52A Gateshead
Steam A1 4-6-2 60127 on 13/05/1949 HTN Heaton (New) on 09/09/1962 52D on 18/10/1964 52A Gateshead
Steam A1 4-6-2 60129 on 11/09/1960 52B Heaton on 09/09/1962 52D on 06/12/1964 52A Gateshead
Steam A1 4-6-2 60132 on 15/05/1960 52B Heaton on 09/09/1962 52D on 06/12/1964 52A Gateshead
Steam A1 4-6-2 60137 on 15/05/1960 52B Heaton on 09/09/1962 52D on 29/10/1962 Withdrawn
Steam A1 4-6-2 60142 on 11/09/1960 52B Heaton on 09/09/1962 52D on 25/10/1964 52A Gateshead
Steam A1 4-6-2 60143 on 15/05/1960 52B Heaton on 09/09/1962 52D on 08/09/1963 50A York (North)
Steam A1 4-6-2 60147 on 11/09/1960 52B Heaton on 09/09/1962 52D on 08/09/1963 50A York (North)
Steam A1 4-6-2 60151 on 15/05/1960 52B Heaton on 09/09/1962 52D on 18/10/1964 52A Gateshead
Steam A1 4-6-2 60155 on 11/09/1960 52B Heaton on 09/09/1962 52D on 04/11/1962 50A York (North)
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46475 m/e 08/1951 51A Darlington (New) w/e 01/12/1962 52D 4w/e 02/11/1963 67E Dumfries
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2594 w/e 16/12/1961 52A Gateshead w/e 24/08/1963 52D 4w/e 19/06/1965 51C West Hartlepool
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2594 w/e 16/12/1961 52A Gateshead w/e 24/08/1963 52D 4w/e 19/06/1965 52E Percy Main
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78024 w/e 08/12/1962 51A Darlington w/e 19/10/1963 52D on 29/11/1964 9G Gorton
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78025 w/e 22/12/1962 51F West Auckland w/e 19/10/1963 52D on 29/11/1964 9G Gorton
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78012 w/e 09/03/1963 51A Darlington w/e 09/11/1963 52D on 29/11/1964 9G Gorton
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77002 w/e 21/09/1963 55B Stourton w/e 21/11/1964 52D on 19/06/1966 55B Stourton
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 77004 w/e 21/09/1963 55B Stourton w/e 21/11/1964 52D on 19/06/1966 55B Stourton
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2049 w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main 4w/e 19/06/1965 52D w/e 11/01/1969 52A Gateshead